Krenn v. County of Santa Clara et al

Plaintiff: Esther Krenn
Defendant: County of Santa Clara, Santa Clara Department of Correction (DOC), Santa Clara Valley Health and Hospital System (SCVHHS), Edward Flores, Toby Wong, Kim Roberts, Robert Sillen, Maryann Barry, Christine Ferry, Denise Becker, Beverly Purdy, Amarjit Grewal, N Mager and Dela Cruz
Case Number: 5:2007cv02295
Filed: April 27, 2007
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Patricia V. Trumbull
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 7, 2009 95 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE FROM 5/11/2009 TO 5/18/2009. Preliminary Pretrial Conference statement due 5/11/2009 Pretrial Conference set for 5/18/2009 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge James Ware on 5/7/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2009)
May 1, 2009 94 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER TO DISMISS PURSUANT TO FRCP 41(a)(1) as to DEFENDANTS OFFICE OF THE SHERIFF, DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTION, AND SANTA CLARA VALLEY HEALTH AND HOSPITAL SYSTEM; LAURIE SMITH; EDWARD FLORES; TOBY WONG; KIM ROBERTS; ROBERT SILLEN; MARYAN N BARRY; DENISE BECKER; CHRISTINE FERRY; BEVERLY PURDY; AMARJIT GREWAL; NANCY MAGER; and HERBIE DE LA CRUZ re 92 Stipulation. Defendants Dela Cruz; Christine Ferry; Edward Flores; Amarjit Grewal; N Mager; Beverly Purdy; Kim Roberts; Santa Clara Cou nty Sheriff's Department (SCCSD); Santa Clara Department of Correction (DOC); Santa Clara Valley Health and Hospital System (SCVHHS); Robert Sillen; Laurie Smith; Toby Wong; Maryann Barry and Denise Becker terminated. Signed by Judge James Ware on 5/1/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2009)
March 31, 2009 90 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT to Extend Current Case Schedule re 88 Stipulation. Close of ALL Discovery due by 7/8/2009. Last Date to Hear Dispositive Motions due by 9/14/2009. Preliminary Pretrial Conference Statement due 5/29/2009. Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 6/8/2009 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge James Ware on 3/31/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2009)
February 20, 2009 86 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER EXCUSING ATTENDANCE AT SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 2/20/09. (rssec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2009)
January 29, 2009 85 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 59 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Production of Documents. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on 1/29/09. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 1/29/2009)
January 21, 2009 84 Opinion or Order of the Court THIRD ORDER MODIFYING SCHEDULING ORDER re 83 Proposed Order, filed by Kim Roberts, et al.. Signed by Judge James Ware on January 21, 2009. (jwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2009)
November 13, 2008 76 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING FURTHER SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Further Settlement Conference set for 2/27/2009 09:30 AM. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 11/13/08. (rssec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2008)
November 4, 2008 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying Defendants' Implied Request for an Order. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on 11/3/08. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 11/4/2008)
October 30, 2008 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER EXCUSING ATTENDANCE AT SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 10/30/08. (rssec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Krenn v. County of Santa Clara et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Esther Krenn
Represented By: Geri Lynn Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Santa Clara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Santa Clara Department of Correction (DOC)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Santa Clara Valley Health and Hospital System (SCVHHS)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward Flores
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toby Wong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kim Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Sillen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maryann Barry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christine Ferry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denise Becker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beverly Purdy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amarjit Grewal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N Mager
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dela Cruz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?