Mahroom, et al v. Best Western International, Inc.

Plaintiff: Majid Mahroom and Adiba Mahroom
Defendant: Best Western International, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2007cv02351
Filed: April 30, 2007
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Monterey
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Referring Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition For Removal--Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 12, 2010 281 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY re 279 , (55 in 5:08-cv-00136-JF). Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 10/1/10. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2010)
May 3, 2010 257 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT AND PERMANENT INJUNCTION. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 5/3/2010. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2010)
November 19, 2009 242 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING POST-TRIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 241 . Case Management Conference set for 1/8/2010 10:30 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 11/19/09. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2009)
October 15, 2009 236 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR REFERRAL TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE BERNARD ZIMMERMAN FOR POST-TRIAL SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE re 234 . Further Case Management Conference set for 11/20/2009 10:30 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 10/7/09. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2009)
October 9, 2009 235 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SCHEDULING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 10/9/2009. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2009)
April 22, 2009 205 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Jeremy Fogel granting 201 Motion to Appear by Telephone; granting 202 Motion to Expedite (jflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2009)
April 17, 2009 197 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Jeremy Fogel granting in part and denying in part 185 Motion in Limine; denying 186 Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part 187 Motion in Limine; denying 188 Motion in Limine; denying 189 Motion in Limine; denying 190 Motion in Limine (jflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2009)
March 30, 2009 182 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Jeremy Fogel granting in part and denying in part 164 Motion to Amend/Correct (jflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2009)
February 2, 2009 163 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Jeremy Fogel denying 156 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (jflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2009)
October 31, 2008 155 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING 154 STIPULATION TO EXTEND THE EXPERT DISCOVERY DEADLINE. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 10/31/08. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2008)
October 1, 2008 152 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY re 151 . Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 9/26/08. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mahroom, et al v. Best Western International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Majid Mahroom
Represented By: John C. Gorman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adiba Mahroom
Represented By: John C. Gorman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Best Western International, Inc.
Represented By: Antony E. Buchignani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?