Sarsfield v. County of San Benito et al
Plaintiff: John J. Sarsfield
Defendant: County of San Benito, Jaime Del La Cruz, Reb Monaco, Anthony Botelho and Don Marcus
Case Number: 5:2007cv02528
Filed: February 2, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
Presiding Judge: Jeremy Fogel
Presiding Judge: Patricia V. Trumbull
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 123 STIPULATION AND ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 11/5/10. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2010)
May 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 76 MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Judge Jeremy Fogel. (jflc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2010)
February 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 74 STIPULATION AND ORDER MODIFYING CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULE AND SETTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FOR HEARING (approving 73 ). Motion Hearing set for 4/16/2010 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 2/2/2010. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2010)
August 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 67 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 66 Granting Leave to File Fourth Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 8/10/09. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2009)
January 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull Denying 43 Motion to Compel Plaintiff to Answer Deposition Questions. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 1/13/2009)
January 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER re 42 to Non-Party Brian Conroy to Show Cause Why He Should Not Be Compelled to Appear for Deposition. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on 1/5/09. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 1/5/2009)
December 12, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 45 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 39 Shortening Time for Hearing on Defendants' Discovery Motions. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on 12/12/08. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 12/12/2008)
December 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 44 STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR REQUEST FOR AN ORDER SHORTENING TIME FOR HEARING ON MOTION TO MODIFY SCHEDULING ORDER AND CONTINUE TRIAL (approving doc. no. 37 ). Motion Hearing set for 12/19/2008 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 12/10/08. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2008)
November 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 34 STIPULATION AND ORDER re Appointment of Anne Lawlor Goyette as ENE Mediator re 31 . Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 11/20/08. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sarsfield v. County of San Benito et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John J. Sarsfield
Represented By: Stephan A. Barber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of San Benito
Represented By: Stephan A. Barber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jaime Del La Cruz
Represented By: Stephan A. Barber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reb Monaco
Represented By: Stephan A. Barber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Botelho
Represented By: Stephan A. Barber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Don Marcus
Represented By: Stephan A. Barber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?