Ferreyra v. Good Samaritan Hospital et al
Plaintiff: Frank Ferreyra
Defendant: Good Samaritan Hospital, Hospital Corporation of America, Inc., Engineers and Scientists of California, Local #20, International Federation of Professional and Technical Engineers and AFL-CIO & CLC
Case Number: 5:2007cv02581
Filed: May 15, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 29:151 Labor: Review of Agency Action
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 42 STIPULATION AND ORDER for Dismissal with Prejudice re 41 Stipulation. Each party shall bear their own fees and costs. The Clerk shallclose this file. Signed by Judge James Ware on 1/8/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2009)
December 16, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER SETTING DEADLINE FOR FILING STIPULATED DISMISSAL re 39 Affidavit filed by Frank Ferreyra. Deadline to file stipulated dismissal on or before 12/22/2008. Failure to do so will result in a Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b) dismissal for lack of prosecution. Signed by Judge James Ware on 12/16/2008. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2008)
September 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re Settlement. Show Cause Response due by 10/10/2008. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 10/20/2008 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. James Ware. Signed by Judge James Ware on 9/24/2008. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ferreyra v. Good Samaritan Hospital et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Good Samaritan Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hospital Corporation of America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Engineers and Scientists of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Local #20, International Federation of Professional and Technical Engineers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AFL-CIO & CLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Ferreyra
Represented By: Steven Paul Cohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?