Wilton Miwok Rancheria et al v. Kempthorne et al
Plaintiff: Wilton Miwok Rancheria and Dorothy Andrews
Defendant: Michael O. Leavitt, United States Department of Health and Human Services, Dirk Kempthorne, Carl J. Artman and The United States Department of the Interior
Case Number: 5:2007cv02681
Filed: May 21, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Patricia V. Trumbull
Presiding Judge: Patricia V. Trumbull
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 156 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Case Management Conference set for 6/10/2011 is CONTINUED to 7/15/2011 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 6/8/2011. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2011)
May 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER DENYING 139 APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on May 17, 2011. (jflc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2011)
May 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 144 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Case Management Conference set for 5/6/2011 is CONTINUED to 6/10/2011 10:30 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 5/5/2011. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2011)
March 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 138 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME AND CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re (103 in 5:07-cv-05706-JF), (137 in 5:07-cv-02681-JF). Case Management Conference set for 5/6/2011 10:30 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 3/30/11. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2011)
January 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 108 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME re (104 in 5:07-cv-02681-JF), (73 in 5:07-cv-05706-JF). Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 1/21/10. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2010)
January 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 103 PLEASE DISREGARD DOCKET #103. DOCKETED IN ERROR. (jflc3, COURT STAFF)
December 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER EXTENDING TIME. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 12/17/2009. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2009)
December 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER REQUESTING FURTHER BRIEFING. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 12/9/2009. (jflc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2009)
August 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER ENLARGING TIME TO RESPOND TO ALL MOTIONS OF PROPOSED INTERVENORS AND CONTINUING HEARING DATE. Motion Hearing set for 10/30/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 8/28/2009. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2009)
January 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 56 STIPULATION AND ORDER re (55 in 5:07-cv-02681-JF) to Continue Further Case Management Conference. Further Case Management Conference set for 1/30/2009 10:30 AM. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 1/16/09. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2009)
November 13, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 53 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (approving docket no. 52 ). Case Management Conference set for 12/12/2008 10:30 AM. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 11/13/08. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2008)
October 20, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 51 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (approving docket no. 50 ). Further Case Management Conference set for 11/14/2008 10:30 AM. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 10/17/08. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2008)
September 24, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 48 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE, granting docket no. 47 . Further Case Management Conference previously set on 9/26/08 is CONTINUED to 10/17/2008 at 10:30 AM. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 9/24/08. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2008)
May 29, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING re 2 MOTION to Relate Case . Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 5/25/07. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2007)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilton Miwok Rancheria et al v. Kempthorne et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael O. Leavitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Health and Human Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dirk Kempthorne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carl J. Artman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The United States Department of the Interior
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilton Miwok Rancheria
Represented By: Christina Kazhe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dorothy Andrews
Represented By: Christina Kazhe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?