Hunter v. Okun et al

Plaintiff: Anita Hunter
Defendant: Edward H Okun, Okun Holdings, Inc., Investment Propertities of America, LLC and Richard B Simring
Case Number: 5:2007cv02795
Filed: May 30, 2007
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: James Ware
Referring Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1962 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 24, 2013 413 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE Pursuant to Docket No. 412. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 4/24/13. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2013)
July 15, 2011 404 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: DISCOVERY REFERRAL. Signed by Judge James Ware on 7/15/11. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2011)
March 2, 2011 386 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Revised Order Preliminarily Approving the Wave III Class Settlement with Jorden Burt LLP and Richard Simring re (383 in 5:07-cv-02795-JW) Proposed Order filed by Anita Hunter, (488 in 5:09-cv-02079-JW) Proposed Order filed by Anita Hunter. Signed by Judge James Ware on 3/2/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2011)
February 25, 2011 381 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REQUESTING AMENDED PROPOSED ORDER. Accordingly, on or before February 28, 2011, the parties shall submit Amended Proposed Orders that comport with the timing requirements of In re Mercury, namely, the parties shall include timing provisions for the filing of requests for attorneys fees and the class members' objections, if any, to the fee requests. Further, pending preliminary approval of the settlement, the Court will set a Final Fairness Hearing for June 27, 2011, at 9 a.m. Thus, in their Amended Proposed Orders, the parties shall use this putative Final Fairness Hearing date to adjust all other deadlines accordingly. Signed by Judge James Ware on 2/25/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2011)
October 20, 2010 377 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT SETTING WAVE III PRELIMINARY APPROVAL HEARING re 376 Proposed Order. All supporting Motions and Proposed Orders due by 1/21/2011. Motion Hearing set for 2/7/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge James Ware on 10/20/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2010)
September 3, 2010 375 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING Revised Final Approval Order and Judgment of Dismissal Re: Wave II Settlement with Lockton re 367 Proposed Order (Correction of 372 ). Signed by Judge James Ware on 9/3/2010. (ecgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2010)
August 31, 2010 373 Opinion or Order of the Court FINAL APPROVAL ORDER RE: WAVE II SETTLEMENT WITH TODD PAJONAS. Signed by Judge James Ware on August 31, 2010. (jwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2010)
May 26, 2010 354 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 353 Depositions of Incarcerated Defendants. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on 5/26/10. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 5/26/2010)
May 13, 2010 348 Opinion or Order of the Court PRELIMINARY APPROVAL ORDER RE THE TODD PAJONAS SETTLEMENT re 346 Proposed Order. Signed by Judge James Ware on 5/13/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2010)
May 4, 2010 338 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING WAVE I PROCESSING FEE re 327 Stipulation. Signed by Judge James Ware on 5/4/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2010)
February 4, 2010 319 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; SETTING HEARING ON MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF WAVE II SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT re 318 Case Management Statement. The Case Management Conference set for 2/8/2010 is VACATED. The Court sets a Hearing on Preliminary Approval of Wave II Settlement Agreement for for 5/10/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. The parties shall notice their motion in accordance with the Civil Local Rules of the Court. Signed by Judge James Ware on 2/3/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2010)
October 28, 2009 311 Opinion or Order of the Court WAVE I JUDGMENT. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED ADJUDGED AND DECREED that the recovery of the Plaintiffs, if any, on their respective asserted and assertable claims against any Non-Settling Defendants shall be reduced by the amount of the Wave I Settling Defen dants' equitable and proportionate share of joint and several liability, as will be determined later by the Court in the allocation of recoverable damages or costs incurred by the Plaintiffs. Without affecting the finality of this Judgment, this Court shall retain continuing jurisdiction over the above-referenced action and the Wave I Settling Defendants for purposes of supervising, administering, implementing, enforcing and interpreting the Judgment, the claims process to be established an d the distribution of funds to Settlement Class members, if any. THIS COURT FINDS that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 54(b), there is no just reason for the delay in entering this Judgment and Judgment is hereby entered. Signed by Judge James Ware on 10/27/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2009)
October 16, 2009 307 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING Stipulation to Stay Proceeding as to Defendant San Francisco Series of Lockton Companies, LLC re (306 in 5:07-cv-02795-JW) Stipulation. The Court simply orders that because Defendant San Francisco Series of Lockton Companies, LLC is one of the participants in the Wave II settlement, Defendant need not Answer or participate in discovery at this time. Signed by Judge James Ware on 10/15/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2009)
October 8, 2009 305 Opinion or Order of the Court FINAL APPROVAL ORDER OF WAVE I SETTLEMENTS; granting [283 in 5:07-cv-02795-JW] Motion ; granting [289 in 5:07-cv-02795-JW] Motion for Joinder. Please see Order for further specifics. Signed by Judge James Ware on 10/7/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2009)*** THIS ENTRY IS BEING USED TO SPREAD THE COURT'S ORDER IN ALL MEMBER CASES AS LISTED ON M:09-cv-02028-JW CASE DOCKET***
October 7, 2009 302 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING TELEPHONIC CONFERENCE FOR OCTOBER 8, 2009 AT NOON (PST). Telephonic Conference set for 10/8/2009 12:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose.The parties shall coordinate a conference line with a number for the Court to use for dialing in. The parties are to contact the Courtroom Deputy, Ms. Elizabeth Garcia, with the dial in number by 11 a.m. Class counsel, related defendants, and counsel for the Trustee are required to participate in the Court's telephonic conference. Please see Order for further specifics. Signed by Judge James Ware on 10/7/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2009)
October 5, 2009 300 Opinion or Order of the Court FINAL ORDER DIRECTING THE PARTIES TO SET UP TELEPHONIC APPEARANCES FOR HEARING. This registration to appear by telephone with Tele-Court is EXTENDED to October 6, 2009 at Noon Pacific / 3:00 pm Eastern. The Court further allows class members to participate by listening (only) to the proceedings. Please see Order for further specifics. Signed by Judge James Ware on 10/5/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2009)
September 24, 2009 293 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING THE PARTIES TO SET UP TELEPHONIC CONFERENCE LINE FOR HEARING. On or before 10/1/2009, the parties shall contact Ms. Elizabeth Garcia, Courtroom Deputy for Judge James Ware to provide her with the call in number and an email list of all those who will be making appearances by telephone. Signed by Judge James Ware on 9/24/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2009)
September 21, 2009 291 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER Granting Request For Stay of Proceeding as to Defendants by Chad Greenberg, Andrew McCabe, Daniel McCabe, Shirley McCabe, Pete McCann re 284 Stipulation. Said Defendants need not file any responsive pleadings, need not participate in any pretrial or trial matters, and need not make any further Court appearances pending Final Approval of their settlement with Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge James Ware on 9/21/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2009)
August 4, 2009 270 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER Staying Proceedings as to Defendants J. Patrick Dowdall, William A. Hazel, James F. Livesey, Charles D. Subrt re 247 Stipulation. Signed by Judge James Ware on 7/29/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2009)
May 26, 2009 196 Opinion or Order of the Court RELATED CASE ORDER re 193 MOTION to Relate C07-2795 JW and C09-2079 RS Case filed by Anita Hunter. The case management conference set for 6/22/2009 at 10:00 AM. The parties are to file a Joint Case Management Conferencestatement by 6/12/2009. Related cases: Create association to 5:09-cv-02079-RS. Signed by Judge James Ware on 5/26/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2009)
May 22, 2009 194 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge James Ware lifting stay; setting case management conference; denying pending motions; finding stipulations 188 , 189 , 190 , 191 as moot (jwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2009) Modified docket text/relationship on 6/15/2009 (ecg, COURT STAFF).
April 16, 2009 186 Opinion or Order of the Court TRANSFER ORDER from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, pursuant to 28 USC 1407, re: Case transferred in from District of Massachusetts; Quirk Infiniti, Inc., v. Wachovia Bank, N.A., Case Number 1:08-12060. certified copy of transfer order. re 180 Order (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2009)
February 26, 2009 180 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER STAYING CASE PENDING MDL PANEL'S HEARING ON MOTION TO TRANSFER re 179 Stipulation,, filed by Anita Hunter. Signed by Judge James Ware on February 26, 2009. (jwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2009)
February 20, 2009 177 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER Finding as Moot Re: Filing of Plaintiffs' Opposition and Wachovia's Reply Re: Wachovia's Motion to Transfer re 175 Stipulation filed by Anita Hunter. The Motion has been continued to the original hearing date. Briefing should follow in accordance with the Local Rules. Signed by Judge James Ware on 2/20/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2009)
January 30, 2009 155 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER to Extend Time for Defendant Steven Allred to Respond to First Amended Complaint by 3/2/2009 re 143 Stipulation. Signed by Judge James Ware on 1/30/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2009)
January 16, 2009 120 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER to extend time to respond to the Amended complaint by 2/2/09 re 105 Stipulation. Signed by Judge James Ware on 1/16/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2009)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hunter v. Okun et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward H Okun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Okun Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Investment Propertities of America, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard B Simring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anita Hunter
Represented By: Kathleen Card
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?