Securities And Exchange Commission v. Mercury Interactive LLC et al
Plaintiff: Securities And Exchange Commission
Defendant: Amnon Landan, Sharlene Abrams, Douglas Smith, Susan Skaer and Mercury Interactive LLC
Case Number: 5:2007cv02822
Filed: May 31, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 375 ORDER RE 373 , 374 MOTION TO DISBURSE FUNDS TO THE UNITED STATES TREASURY. Signed by Judge Alsup on 3/26/2014. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2014).
February 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 372 ORDER AMENDING FINAL JUDGMENT by Hon. William Alsup granting 369 Motion to Alter Judgment. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2014).
February 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 370 ORDER RE 369 CONSENT MOTION TO MODIFY JUDGMENT AS TO DEFENDANT DOUGLAS SMITH. Signed by Judge Alsup on 2/11/2014. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2014).
February 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 365 ORDER CONTINUING PRE-TRIAL AND TRIAL DATES (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2013)
February 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 362 SECOND ORDER RE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND MOTIONS IN LIMINE (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2013)
February 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 324 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT SUSAN SKAER'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT re 271 MOTION for Summary Judgment SUSAN SKAER'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed by Susan Skaer (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2013)
January 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 312 ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STRIKE (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2013)
January 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 282 AMENDED REMINDER NOTICE OF UPCOMING TRIAL (3/11/2013) AND FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE (2/25/2013 at 2:00 PM) re 281 Reminder Notice). Signed by Judge William Alsup on 1/9/2013. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2013)
January 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 281 REMINDER NOTICE OF UPCOMING TRIAL (3/13/2013) AND FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE (2/25/2013 at 2:00 PM). Signed by Judge William Alsup on 1/8/2013. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2013)
September 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 259 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM NON-DISPOSITIVE PRETRIAL ORDER OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE re 256 MOTION From Non-dispositive Pretrial Order of Magistrate Judge re 249 Order on Motion for Sanctions Defendant's Motion for Relief From Non-Dispositive Pretrial Order of Magistrate Judge filed by Susan Skaer (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2012)
September 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 257 ORDER RE DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM NON-DISPOSITIVE PRETRIAL ORDER OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE re 256 MOTION From Non-dispositive Pretrial Order of Magistrate Judge re 249 Order on Motion for Sanctions Defendant's Motion for Relief From Non-Dispositive Pretrial Order of Magistrate Judge filed by Susan Skaer (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2012)
August 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 249 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley denying 212 Defendants' Motion for Sanctions AND RECOMMENDING CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT DATES (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2012)
July 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 239 AMENDED ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 237 Stipulation Granting Further Extension for Filing Supplemental Briefing on Defendants' Motion for Discovery Sanctions. Defendant's supplemental brief due: 7/25/2012 by noon. Plaintiff's supplemental brief due: 7/31/2012 by noon. Hearing is scheduled for 8/3/2012 at 10:00 a.m. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2012)
June 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 232 ORDER RE: REQUEST FOR ADDITIONAL DISCOVERY. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 6/21/2012. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2012)
June 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 229 ] ORDER GRANTING SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY AND BRIEFING ON DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR DISCOVERY SANCTIONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 6/12/2012. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2012)
April 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 206 ORDER RE: BRIEFING OF REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 4/16/2012. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2012)
November 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 198 ORDER DENYING 184 DEFENDANT SUSAN SKAER'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 11/22/2011. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2011)
October 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 190 SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 189 Clerks Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 7/6/11. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2011)
October 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 183 STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING DEPOSITIONS PURSUANT TO RULE 29 re 182 Stipulation filed by Susan Skaer (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2011)
June 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 172 STIPULATION AND ORDER RESCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (approving 171 ). The Case Management Conference set for 6/10/2011 is CONTINUED to 7/15/2011 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 6/7/2011. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2011)
May 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 170 STIPULATION AND ORDER RESCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (approving 169 ). The Case Management Conference set for 5/13/2011 is CONTINUED to 6/10/2011 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 5/10/2011. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2011)
April 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION; AND GRANTING 155 MOTION FOR INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 4/7/2011. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2011)
January 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 159 STIPULATION AND ORDER RESCHEDULING HEARING ON 155 DEFENDANT DOUGLAS SMITH'S MOTION TO CERTIFY ORDER FOR INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL AND EXTENDING MR. SMITH'S TIME TO FILE REPLY BRIEF (approving 158 ). The Motion Hearing set for 2/11/2011 is CONTINUED to 3/4/2011 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Jeremy Fogel. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 1/26/2011. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2011)
October 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 149 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING DEFENDANTS' TIME TO ANSWER (approving 148 ). Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 10/8/2010. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2010)
September 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 124 , 129 , 132 MOTIONS TO DISMISS, WITHOUT LEAVE TO AMEND. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 9/27/2010. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2010)
October 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 123 STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING CASE SCHEDULE (approving 121 ). Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 10/28/2009. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2009)
September 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER GRANTING 98 , 102 , 103 DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS WITH LEAVE TO AMEND AND DENYING AS MOOT ALTERNATIVE MOTIONS FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT AND TO STRIKE. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 9/15/2009. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2009)
January 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER RELATING CASES. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 12/18/08. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2009)
December 12, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 97 JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND DEFENDANTS LANDAN'S, SMITH'S AND SKAER'S TIME TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADING TO THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT (approving doc. no. 96 ). Motions or other responses due by 12/23/2008. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 12/12/08. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2008)
December 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 95 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE RESPONSE OF DEFENDANT SHARLENE ABRAMS TO AMENDED COMPLAINT (approving doc. no. 93 ). Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 12/10/08. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2008)
November 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 92 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 90 to Extend Defendants Landan's, Abrams', Smith's and Skaer's Time to File Responsive Pleading to the First Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 11/3/08. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2008)
October 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 88 STIPULATION AND ORDER Moving Hearing On Case Management Conference (approving docket no. 87 ). Case Management Conference set for 10/10/08 is CONTINUED to 2/13/2009 at 10:30 AM. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 10/7/08. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2008)
September 30, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER BY JUDGE JEREMY FOGEL GRANTING IN PART 49 , 54 , 57 MOTIONS TO DISMISS OF DEFENDANTS LANDAN, SMITH AND SKAER WITH LEAVE TO AMEND; AND VACATING 45 DEFENDANT ABRAMS' MOTION TO DISMISS. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Securities And Exchange Commission v. Mercury Interactive LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Securities And Exchange Commission
Represented By: Joseph V Vest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amnon Landan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharlene Abrams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Skaer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mercury Interactive LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?