Ford Motor Credit Companym, LLC v. Lewis Family Enterprises, Inc.

Plaintiff: Ford Motor Credit Company, LLC
Defendant: Lewis Family Enterprises, Inc. and Steven Robert Lewis
Case Number: 5:2007cv03301
Filed: June 22, 2007
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: James Ware
Referring Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 30, 2010 139 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/30/2010. (rslc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2010)
May 19, 2010 135 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: 102 , 107 GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PLAINTIFF'S AND COUNTER-DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 05/19/2010. (rslc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2010)
March 15, 2010 127 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: 125 , 126 SETTING SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTION HEARING ON 04/15/2010 at 1:30 pm. Plaintiff and Counterdefendant shall submit reply briefs on or before 03/22/2010. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 03/15/2010. (rslc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2010)
March 7, 2010 125 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Judge Seeborg on 3/7/2010. (rslc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2010)
January 8, 2010 115 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 114 Stipulation. Signed by Judge Seeborg on 1/8/2010. (rslc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2010)
November 17, 2009 101 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: 100 EXTENDING THE DEADLINE FOR DISCOVERY. (rslc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2009)
August 5, 2009 97 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: 96 APPROVING STIPULATED REQUEST AND CONTINUING TRIAL DATE AND EXTENDING DEADLINES IN FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER. (rslc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2009)
May 29, 2009 95 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: 93 EXTENDING DEADLINE FOR DISCOVERY (rslc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2009)
September 17, 2008 84 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 83 Stipulation, filed by Steven Robert Lewis, Lewis Family Enterprises, Inc. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 9/17/08. (rssec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2008)
June 27, 2007 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Defendants have advised the Court that they will be represented by counsel who is presently out of the country. It is not feasible to obtain a determination from all parties as to whether they would consent to the jurisdiction by the date that would permit timely consideration for preliminary relief. This action SHALL be reassigned to a district court judge.Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 6/27/07. (rssec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2007) Modified on 7/30/2007 (cv, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ford Motor Credit Companym, LLC v. Lewis Family Enterprises, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ford Motor Credit Company, LLC
Represented By: David E. Pinch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lewis Family Enterprises, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Robert Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?