Coupons, Inc. v. Stottlemire Featured Case

Plaintiff Coupons, Inc. alleged that Defendant John Stottlemire intentionally circumvented technological measures used to limit the number of times a visitor to the coupons.com website may print a coupon.

Plaintiff: Coupons, Inc.
Defendant: John Stottlemire
Case Number: 5:2007cv03457
Filed: July 2, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2009 FILE located at Federal Records Center (FRC), San Bruno, CA: Accession No: 021-2009-5152, Box No: 118. (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2009)
May 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 153 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 152 Stipulation filed by Coupons, Inc., ***Civil Case Terminated.. Signed by Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 5/1/09. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2009)
April 22, 2009 Filing 152 STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT by Coupons, Inc. (Alameda, Carly) (Filed on 4/22/2009) Modified on 4/22/2009 (bw, COURT STAFF).
April 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ORDER by Judge Howard R. Lloyd granting 133 Motion for Settlement (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2009)
March 13, 2009 Filing 150 ANSWER to Third Amended Complaint re ( 878 ) by John Stottlemire. (Stottlemire, John) (Filed on 3/13/2009) Text modified on 3/16/2009 linkage added (bw, COURT STAFF).
February 24, 2009 Filing 149 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 2/24/2009 before Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd (Date Filed: 2/24/2009) re 133 (Tape #FTR.) (pmc, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/24/2009)
February 17, 2009 Filing 148 NOTICE of Entry of Order Granting Plaintiff's Administrative Motion to Seal by Coupons, Inc. (Alameda, Carly) (Filed on 2/17/2009) Text modified on 2/25/2009 (bw, COURT STAFF).
February 13, 2009 Filing 147 DECLARATION FILED UNDER SEAL. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2009)
February 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER by Judge Howard R. Lloyd granting 140 Motion to Seal Document (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2009)
February 10, 2009 Filing 145 Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Summarily Enforce Settlement Agreemen re ( 133 ) filed by John Stottlemire. (Stottlemire, John) (Filed on 2/10/2009) Linkage added on 2/11/2009 (bw, COURT STAFF).
February 5, 2009 Filing 144 (Proposed) Denying Plaintiff Coupons, Inc.'s Administrative Motion to File Under Seal re 143 by John Stottlemire. (Stottlemire, John) (Filed on 2/5/2009) Text modified on 2/6/2009 (bw, COURT STAFF).
February 5, 2009 Filing 143 Opposition to Plaintiff Coupons, Inc.'s Administrative Motion to File Under Seal re ( 140 ) filed by John Stottlemire. (Stottlemire, John) (Filed on 2/5/2009) Linkage added on 2/6/2009 (bw, COURT STAFF).
February 4, 2009 Filing 142 Declaration of Proof of Service Filed by Coupons, Inc. (Alameda, Carly) (Filed on 2/4/2009) Text modified on 2/4/2009 (bw, COURT STAFF).
February 4, 2009 DOCUMENT RECEIVED UNDER SEAL. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2009)
February 3, 2009 Filing 141 Declaration of Dennis M. Cusack in Support of Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Pursuant to N.D. CAL L.R. 79-5(d) re 140 filed by Coupons, Inc. (Cusack, Dennis) (Filed on 2/3/2009) Text modified on 2/4/2009 (bw, COURT STAFF).
February 3, 2009 Filing 140 Administrative MOTION to File Under Seal re 139 filed by Coupons, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 (Proposed) Order (Cusack, Dennis) (Filed on 2/3/2009) Text modified on 2/4/2009 (bw, COURT STAFF).
February 3, 2009 Filing 139 Declaration of Steven Boal in Opposition to to Defendant's Motion to Summarily Enforce Settlement Agreement re 137 filed by Coupons, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-D, # 2 Exhibit E-J(Cusack, Dennis) (Filed on 2/3/2009) Text modified on 2/4/2009 (bw, COURT STAFF). incorrect event type used when posting document
February 3, 2009 Filing 138 Declaration of Dennis M. Cusack in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Summarily Enforce Settlement Agreement re ( 137 filed by Coupons, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-F (Cusack, Dennis) (Filed on 2/3/2009) Text modified on 2/4/2009 (bw, COURT STAFF). incorrect event type used when posting document
February 3, 2009 Filing 137 Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Summarily Enforce Settlement Agreement re 133 filed byCoupons, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 (Proposed) Order (Cusack, Dennis) (Filed on 2/3/2009) Text modified on 2/4/2009 (bw, COURT STAFF).
January 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER by Judge Howard R. Lloyd granting 125 Motion to Stay (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2009)
January 27, 2009 Filing 135 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 1/27/2009 before Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd (Date Filed: 1/27/2009) re 125 (Tape #FTR.) (pmc, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/27/2009)
January 26, 2009 Filing 134 Request for Judicial Notice In Opposition To Defendant's Motion To Stay Discovery re ( 125 ) filed by Coupons, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Cusack, Dennis) (Filed on 1/26/2009) Linkage added on 1/27/2009 (bw, COURT STAFF).
January 20, 2009 Filing 133 Motion to Summarily Enforce Settlement Agreement filed by John Stottlemire. Motion Hearing set for 2/24/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, San Jose. (Stottlemire, John) (Filed on 1/20/2009) Text modified on 1/22/2009 conforming to posted document caption (bw, COURT STAFF).
January 13, 2009 Filing 132 Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Stay Discovery re (125]) filed by John Stottlemire. (Stottlemire, John) (Filed on 1/13/2009) Text modified on 1/14/2009 (bw, COURT STAFF).
January 13, 2009 Filing 131 Reply to Defendant's Opposition to Motion to Direct the Parties to Return to Early Neutral Evaluation Pursuant to ADR L.R. 5-2 amd Civil L.R. 7 filed by Coupons, Inc. (Alameda, Carly) (Filed on 1/13/2009) Text modified on 1/14/2009 (bw, COURT STAFF).
January 6, 2009 Filing 130 DECLARATION of Dennis M. Cusack in Opposition to To Defendant's Motion To Stay Discovery re 129 filed by Coupons, Inc. (Cusack, Dennis) (Filed on 1/6/2009) Text modified on 1/7/2009 (bw, COURT STAFF).
January 6, 2009 Filing 129 Opposition To Defendant's Motion To Stay Discovery re ( 125 ) filed by Coupons, Inc. (Cusack, Dennis) (Filed on 1/6/2009) Text modified and linkage added on 1/7/2009 (bw, COURT STAFF).
January 6, 2009 Filing 128 Opposition to Motion to Direct the Parties to Return to Early Neutral Evaluation Pursuant to ADR L.R. 5-2, and Civil L.R. 7 filed by John Stottlemire. (Stottlemire, John) (Filed on 1/6/2009) Text modified on 1/6/2009 (bw, COURT STAFF).
December 19, 2008 Filing 127 (Proposed) Order Granting re MOTION to Stay Discovery Pending Resolution of Defendant's soon-to-be filed Motion to Summarily Enforce Settlement Agreement re 125 (Stottlemire, John) (Filed on 12/19/2008) Text modified on 12/19/2008 (bw, COURT STAFF).
December 19, 2008 Filing 126 Declaration of John Stottlemire in Support of MOTION to Stay Discovery Pending Resolution of Defendant's soon-to-be filed Motion to Summarily Enforce Settlement Agreement re 125 filed by John Stottlemire. (Stottlemire, John) (Filed on 12/19/2008) Text modified on 12/19/2008 (bw, COURT STAFF).
December 19, 2008 Filing 125 MOTION to Stay Discovery Pending Resolution of Defendant's soon-to-be filed Motion to Summarily Enforce Settlement Agreement filed by John Stottlemire. Motion Hearing set for 1/27/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, San Jose. (Stottlemire, John) (Filed on 12/19/2008) Text modified on 12/19/2008 (bw, COURT STAFF).
December 16, 2008 Filing 124 NOTICE of Change of Address Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 3-11(a) by John Allan Stottlemire (Stottlemire, John) (Filed on 12/16/2008) Text modified on 12/16/2008 (bw, COURT STAFF).
December 5, 2008 Filing 123 (Proposed) Order Granting Motion to Direct the Parties to Return to Early Neutral Evaluation Pursuant to ADR L.R 5-2 and Civil L.R. 7 re 119 by Coupons, Inc. (Alameda, Carly) (Filed on 12/5/2008) Text modified on 12/8/2008 (bw, COURT STAFF).
December 5, 2008 Filing 122 Declaration of Neil A. Goteiner in Support of Motion to Direct the Parties to Return to Early Neutral Evaluation Pursuant to ADR L.R 5-2 and Civil L.R. 7 re 119 filed by Coupons, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A & B to Declaration of Neil A. Goteiner (Alameda, Carly) (Filed on 12/5/2008) Text modified on 12/8/2008 conforming to posted document caption (bw, COURT STAFF).
December 5, 2008 Filing 121 Declaration of Dennis M. Cusack in Support of Motion to Direct the Parties to Return to Early Neutral Evaluation Pursuant to ADR L.R 5-2 and Civil L.R. 7 re 119 filed by Coupons, Inc. (Alameda, Carly) (Filed on 12/5/2008) Text modified on 12/8/2008 conforming to posted document caption (bw, COURT STAFF).
December 5, 2008 Filing 120 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Direct the Parties to Return to Early Neutral Evaluation Pursuant to ADR L.R 5-2 and Civil L.R. 7 re 119 filed by Coupons, Inc. (Alameda, Carly) (Filed on 12/5/2008) Text modified on 12/8/2008 conforming to posted document caption incorrect event type used when posting document (bw, COURT STAFF).
December 5, 2008 Filing 119 Motion to Direct the Parties to Return to Early Neutral Evaluation Pursuant to ADR L.R 5-2 and Civil L.R. 7 by Coupons, Inc. (Alameda, Carly) (Filed on 12/5/2008) Text modified on 12/8/2008 conforming to posted document caption (bw, COURT STAFF).
December 1, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER by Judge Howard R. Lloyd granting 108 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re 112 MOTION Administrative Relief Requesting that the Court set a Status Conference for December 16, 2008 or as soon thereafter as is possible, 108 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer the Third Amended Complaint ; denying 112 Motion Status Conference (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2008)
November 26, 2008 Filing 117 NOTICE of Change of Address by John Allan Stottlemire (Stottlemire, John) (Filed on 11/26/2008)
November 25, 2008 Filing 116 Opposition to Motion for Administrative Relief Pursuant to Civil L. R. 7-11 Requesting that the Court set a Status Conference filed by Coupons, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 (Proposed) Order (Goteiner, Neil) (Filed on 11/25/2008) Text modified on 11/26/2008 conforming to posted document caption (bw, COURT STAFF).
November 25, 2008 Filing 115 (Proposed) Order Denying Administrative Motion to Extend Time to Answer Third Amended Complaint re 114 by Coupons, Inc. (Goteiner, Neil) (Filed on 11/25/2008) Text modified on 11/26/2008 (bw, COURT STAFF).
November 24, 2008 Filing 114 Opposition in Part to Administrative Motion to Extend Time to Answer the Third Amended Complaint re 108 filed by Coupons, Inc. (Goteiner, Neil) (Filed on 11/24/2008) Text modified on 11/25/2008 (bw, COURT STAFF).
November 24, 2008 Filing 113 Letter from Neil A. Goteiner to Hon. Howard R. Lloyd re Settlement Status and Time to File Answer. (Goteiner, Neil) (Filed on 11/24/2008)
November 23, 2008 Filing 112 Administrative Relief Pursuant to civil L. R. 7-11 Requesting that the Court set a Status Conference for December 16, 2008 or as soon thereafter as is possible filed by John Stottlemire. (Stottlemire, John) (Filed on 11/23/2008) Text modified on 11/24/2008 conforming to posted document caption (bw, COURT STAFF).
November 17, 2008 Filing 111 CERTIFICATION OF ENE Session on 11/13/2008, case fully settled, ENE complete. Signed by Evaluator, Harold J. McElhinny dated 11/13/2008. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2008) (af, COURT STAFF).
November 14, 2008 Filing 110 Letter from Plaintiff's Counsel re successful ENE. (Alameda, Carly) (Filed on 11/14/2008)
November 12, 2008 Filing 109 Letter from Evaluator, Harold J. McElhinny, dated 11/10/08.. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2008)
November 12, 2008 Filing 108 Administrative Motion to Extend Time to Answer Third Amended Complaint re ( 87 )filed by John Stottlemire. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Of John Stottlemire In Support of Motion to Extend Time, # 2 (Proposed) Order (Stottlemire, John) (Filed on 11/12/2008) Text modified on 11/12/2008 conforming to posted docouments, linkage added (bw, COURT STAFF).
November 12, 2008 ADR Remark: The locale for the ENE scheduled on Thursday, November 13, 2008 will now be Morrison & Foerster LLP, 425 Market Street, 33rd Floor, San Francisco, CA 94105. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2008)
November 7, 2008 Set/Reset Hearings: ENE Hearing set for 11/13/2008 10:00 AM., at the offices of Morrison & Foerster, 755 Page Mill Road, Palo Alto, CA 94304-1018, 650-813-5600 (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2008)
November 6, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd denying 96 Motion for Sanctions; denying 97 Motion to Dismiss (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2008)
November 4, 2008 Filing 106 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 11/4/2008 before Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd (Date Filed: 11/4/2008) re 97 , 96 . (Tape #FTR.) (pmc, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/4/2008)
October 31, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 105 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING ENE DEADLINE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 10/31/08. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2008)
October 27, 2008 Filing 104 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order to Extend Deadline for Conducting Early Neutral Evaluation (with cover letter) by Coupons, Inc. (Cusack, Dennis) (Filed on 10/27/2008) Modified on 11/4/2008 (bw, COURT STAFF).
October 22, 2008 Filing 103 Letter from Evaluator, Harold J. McElhinny, dated 10/21/08. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2008)
October 22, 2008 Set/Reset Hearings: ENE Hearing set for 11/13/2008 10:00 AM., at the Evaluator's offices, Morrison & Foerster, 425 Market Street, San Francisco, CA 94105. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2008)
October 20, 2008 Filing 102 Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Third Amended Complaint ( 97 ) filed by John Stottlemire. (Stottlemire, John) (Filed on 10/20/2008) Modified text to add linkage on 10/21/2008 (srm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 11/4/2008 (bw, COURT STAFF).
October 20, 2008 Filing 101 Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Sanctions Pursuant to Rule 11 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure ( 96 ) filed by John Stottlemire. (Stottlemire, John) (Filed on 10/20/2008) Modified text to add linkage on 10/21/2008 (srm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 11/4/2008 (bw, COURT STAFF).
October 7, 2008 Filing 100 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Third Amended Complaint re 97 filed by Coupons, Inc. (Cusack, Dennis) (Filed on 10/7/2008) Text modified on 10/8/2008 (bw, COURT STAFF).
October 7, 2008 Filing 99 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition to Defendant Stottlemire's Motion for Sanctions Pursuant to Rule 11 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure re 96 filed by Coupons, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A & B)(Cusack, Dennis) (Filed on 10/7/2008)Text modified on 10/8/2008 (bw, COURT STAFF).
September 22, 2008 Filing 98 (Proposed) Order Granting MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint re 97 by John Stottlemire. (Stottlemire, John) (Filed on 9/22/2008) Text modified on 9/22/2008 (bw, COURT STAFF).
September 22, 2008 Filing 97 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint re ( 87 ) filed by John Stottlemire. Motion Hearing set for 11/4/2008 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, San Jose. (Stottlemire, John) (Filed on 9/22/2008) Linkage 9/22/2008 (bw, COURT STAFF).
September 3, 2008 Filing 96 MOTION for Sanctions Pursuant to Rule 11 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure filed by John Stottlemire. Motion Hearing set for 11/4/2008 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, San Jose. (Stottlemire, John) (Filed on 9/3/2008)
August 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 95 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 94 Stipulation filed by Coupons, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 8/25/08. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2008)
August 20, 2008 Filing 94 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order to Extend Deadline for Conducting Early Neutral Evaluation by Coupons, Inc. (Cusack, Dennis) (Filed on 8/20/2008) Modified on 8/21/2008 (bw, COURT STAFF).
August 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd granting in part and denying in part 89 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2008)
July 31, 2008 Filing 92 (Proposed) Order Denying Defendant's Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Third Amended Complaint re 90 by Coupons, Inc. (Alameda, Carly) (Filed on 7/31/2008) Text modified on 7/31/2008 (bw, COURT STAFF).
July 31, 2008 Filing 91 Declaration of Dennis M. Cusack in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Third Amended Complaint 90 filed by Coupons, Inc. (Alameda, Carly) (Filed on 7/31/2008) Text modified on 7/31/2008 (bw, COURT STAFF).
July 31, 2008 Filing 90 Memorandum in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Amended Complaint re ( 89 ) filed by Coupons, Inc. (Alameda, Carly) (Filed on 7/31/2008) Text modified and Linkage added on 7/31/2008 (bw, COURT STAFF).
July 28, 2008 Filing 89 Administrative MOTION to Extend Time to Respond to Third Amended Complaint re 87 filed by John Stottlemire. (Stottlemire, John) (Filed on 7/28/2008) Text modified on 7/29/2008 conforming to posted document caption (bw, COURT STAFF).
July 25, 2008 Filing 88 Letter from Evaluator, Harold J. McElhinny dated 7/25/2008. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2008)
July 25, 2008 Pre ENE phone conference scheduled on Friday, July 25, 2008 at 1:00 p.m. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2008)
July 25, 2008 Set/Reset Hearings: ENE Hearing set for 9/8/2008 10:00 AM., at the offices of Morrison & Foerster LLP, 425 Market Street, 33rd Floor, San Francisco, CA 94105. ENE statements should be in Evaluator's possession no later than close of business on Tuesday, 9/2/2008. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2008)
July 22, 2008 Filing 87 Third Amended Complaint (jury demand) against John Stottlemire. Filed by Coupons, Inc. (Cusack, Dennis) (Filed on 7/22/2008) Modified on 7/23/2008 (bw, COURT STAFF).
July 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 86 STIPULATION AND ORDER VACATING PRE-TRIAL AND TRIAL DATES AND SETTING FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR 9/23/08 re 85 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 7/18/08. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2008)
July 17, 2008 Filing 85 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER TO VACATE PRE-TRIAL AND TRIAL DATES AND SET FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE by Coupons, Inc. (Cusack, Dennis) (Filed on 7/17/2008) Modified on 7/18/2008 (bw, COURT STAFF).
July 2, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 84 STIPULATION AND ORDER re ( 82 ) . Signed by Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 07/02/08. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2008) Linkage added on 7/8/2008 (bw, COURT STAFF).
July 2, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER by Judge Howard R. Lloyd granting in part and denying in part 49 Motion to Dismiss; denying 79 Motion to Strike. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2008)
July 1, 2008 Filing 82 STIPULATION and (Proposed) Order to Extend Deadline for Conducting Early Neutral Evaluation by Coupons, Inc. (Alameda, Carly) (Filed on 7/1/2008) Text modified on 7/1/2008 (bw, COURT STAFF).
May 29, 2008 ADR Remark: The deadline for conducting the ENE has been extended to July 18, 2008 78 . (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2008)
May 20, 2008 Filing 81 Opposition of Defendant's Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Letter Brief filed by Coupons, Inc. (Alameda, Carly) (Filed on 5/20/2008) Modified on 5/21/2008 (bw, COURT STAFF).
May 19, 2008 Filing 80 (Proposed) Order Granting Defendant's Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Supplemental Letter Brief Following Hearing on Motion to Dismiss ( 79 ) by John Stottlemire. (Stottlemire, John) (Filed on 5/19/2008) Linkage added on 5/19/2008 (bw, COURT STAFF).
May 19, 2008 Filing 79 MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Supplemental Letter Brief Following Hearing on Motion to Dismiss filed by John Stottlemire. (Stottlemire, John) (Filed on 5/19/2008)
May 13, 2008 Filing 78 STIPULATION and Order to Extend Deadline for Conducting ENE. Signed by Judge Howard R. Lloyd. by Coupons, Inc. (Cusack, Dennis) (Filed on 5/13/2008) Modified on 5/14/2008 (bw, COURT STAFF)). Modified on 5/15/2008 (bw, COURT STAFF).
May 13, 2008 Filing 77 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 5/13/2008 before Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd (Date Filed: 5/13/2008) re 49 (Tape #FTR.) (pmc, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/13/2008)
May 12, 2008 Filing 76 Letter dated 5/12/2008 from Evaluator, Harold J. McElhinny. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2008)
May 12, 2008 Set/Reset Hearings: ENE Hearing set for 7/9/2008 10:00 AM., at the Evaluator's office, Morrison & Foerster, 425 Market Street, San Francisco, CA 94105. Please take note that this date is beyond the court set deadline for the ENE and is subject to approval by the court. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2008)
May 1, 2008 ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference conducted on 5/1/2008 by Robin W. Siefkin, ADR Program Staff Attorney. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2008)
April 23, 2008 Filing 75 ADR Clerk's Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference on Thursday, May 1, 2008 at 2:00 p.m. pacific time. The ADR Program will initiate the call. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2008)
April 16, 2008 Filing 74 Letter dated April 16, 2008 from Evaluator, Harold J. McElhinny. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2008)
April 11, 2008 Filing 73 Reply to Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss ( 64 ) re: ( 49 ) filed by John Stottlemire. (Stottlemire, John) (Filed on 4/11/2008) Modified to add linkage on 4/14/2008 (srm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 4/15/2008 conforming to posted document caption (bw, COURT STAFF).
April 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER re 71 Stipulation to Extend Deadline for Conducting Early Neutral Evaluation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 4/10/08. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2008)
April 10, 2008 Remark : Copy of ADR Stipulation and Order re: ENE deadline extension mailed to evaluator Harold J. McElhinny. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2008)
April 8, 2008 Filing 71 STIPULATION and [PROPOSED] ORDER TO EXTEND DEADLINE FOR CONDUCTING EARLY NEUTRAL EVALUATION by Coupons, Inc. (Alameda, Carly) (Filed on 4/8/2008) Modified on 4/9/2008 (bw, COURT STAFF).
April 7, 2008 Filing 70 Declaration of Proof of Service for Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss served on Defendant John Stottlemire on Friday, April 4, 2008, re ( 64 ), ( 65 ), ( 68 ) filed by Coupons, Inc. (Alameda, Carly) (Filed on 4/7/2008) Text modified on 4/7/2008 to conform to posted document caption, linkage added (bw, COURT STAFF).
April 4, 2008 Filing 69 **FILED IN ERROR* SEE DOCKET ( 68 )**** AFFIDAVIT of Service for Opposition to Motion to Dismiss via Mail served on John Stottlemire, defendant on 04/04/2008, filed by Coupons, Inc. (Alameda, Carly) (Filed on 4/4/2008) Modified on 4/7/2008 (bw, COURT STAFF).
April 4, 2008 Filing 68 (Proposed) Order Denying Defendant John Stottlemire's Motion to Dismiss re 64 Coupons, Inc. (Alameda, Carly) (Filed on 4/4/2008) Text modified on 4/7/2008 conforming to posted document caption (bw, COURT STAFF).
April 4, 2008 Filing 67 EXHIBITS E to the appendix of Non-Federal and Unpublished authorities Cited in Coupon's Opposition to Stottlemeire's Motion to Dismiss Ure 65 Appendix, Exhs E-I, of Non-Federal and Unpublished Authorities filed by Coupons, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit G through I to the Appendix) (Related document(s) 65 ) (Alameda, Carly) (Filed on 4/4/2008) Text modified on 4/7/2008 conforming to posted document caption (bw, COURT STAFF).
April 4, 2008 Filing 66 EXHIBIT D to the Appexdix of Non-Federal and Unpublished Authorities Cited in Coupon's Opposition to Stottlemire's Motion to Dismiss re 65 Appendix, of Non-Federal and Unpublished Authorities filed byCoupons, Inc. (Related document(s) 65 ) (Alameda, Carly) (Filed on 4/4/2008) Text modified on 4/7/2008 conforming to posted document caption (bw, COURT STAFF).
April 4, 2008 Filing 65 Appendix of Non-Federal and Unpublished authorities Cited in Coupon's Coupons' Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition to Defendant Stottlemire's Motion to Dismiss re 64 filed by Coupons, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A through C to Appendix of Non-Federal and Unpublished Authorities)(Related document(s) 64 ) (Alameda, Carly) (Filed on 4/4/2008) Text modified on 4/7/2008 conforming to posted document caption (bw, COURT STAFF).
April 4, 2008 Filing 64 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition to Defendant Stottlemire's Motion to Dismiss ( 49 ) filed by Coupons, Inc. (Alameda, Carly) (Filed on 4/4/2008) Text modified on 4/7/2008 conforming to posted document caption, linkage added (bw, COURT STAFF).
April 3, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER re 62 Stipulation to Continue Hearing; STIPULATION AND ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 4/3/08. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2008)
April 3, 2008 Filing 62 STIPULATION and (Proposed) Order to Continue Hearing Date on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss re 49 . 61 by Electronic Frontier Foundation. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jennifer Lynch in Support of Stipulation and [Proposed] Order to Continue Hearing Date)(Lynch, Jennifer) (Filed on 4/3/2008) Text modified on 4/4/2008 conforming to posted document caption (bw, COURT STAFF).
March 31, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER re 57 Stipulation to extend dates. Hearing on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss CONTINUED to 5/6/2008 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 3/31/08. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2008)
March 31, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd granting 56 Amicus Curiae Motion for Leave to Appear. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2008)
March 31, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd granting 55 Motion to File Amicus Curiae Brief. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2008)
March 28, 2008 Filing 58 Declaration of Dennis M. Cusack in Support of Stipulation and [Proposed] Order to Extend Time to File Opposition and Reply to Motion to Dismiss 57 filed byCoupons, Inc. (Related document(s) 57 ) (Cusack, Dennis) (Filed on 3/28/2008) Modified on 3/31/2008 (bw, COURT STAFF).
March 28, 2008 Filing 57 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order to Extend Time to File Opposition and Reply to Motion to Dismiss by Coupons, Inc. (Cusack, Dennis) (Filed on 3/28/2008) Modified on 3/31/2008 (bw, COURT STAFF).
March 25, 2008 Filing 56 MOTION of the Electronic Frontier Foundation for Leave to Particiapate in Oral Argument filed by Electronic Frontier Foundation. Motion Hearing set for 4/22/2008 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, San Jose. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Lynch, Jennifer) (Filed on 3/25/2008) Text modified on 3/25/2008 conforming to posted document caption (bw, COURT STAFF).
March 25, 2008 Filing 55 Motion and of the Electronic Frontier Foundation for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief in Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss ( 49 ) filed by Electronic Frontier Foundation. Motion Hearing set for 4/22/2008 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, San Jose. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jennifer Lynch In Support of Motion to File Amicus Brief, # 2 (Proposed) Order, # 3 Exhibit Amicus Brief of Electronic Frontier Foundation in Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss) (Lynch, Jennifer) (Filed on 3/25/2008) Text modified on 3/26/2008 conforming to posted document caption, linkage added (bw, COURT STAFF).
March 17, 2008 Filing 54 Letter dated 3/14/2008 from Evaluator, Harold J. McElhinny. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2008)
March 17, 2008 Set/Reset Hearings: ENE Hearing set for 5/5/2008 10:00 AM., at the evaluator's offices, Morrison Foerster, 425 Market Street, San Francisco, CA 94105. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2008)
March 13, 2008 Filing 53 Letter dated 3/13/2008 from Harold J. McElhinny rescheduing the pre ENE telephone conference from 9:30 a.m., to 9:45 a.m., on 3/14/2008. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2008)
March 4, 2008 Filing 52 Letter dated 3/4/2008 from Evaluator, Harold J. McElhinny's office. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2008)
March 4, 2008 Pre ENE phone conference scheduled on Friday, March 14, 2008 at 9:30 a.m. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2008)
February 28, 2008 Filing 51 Letter dated 2/28/2008 from Evaluator, Harold J. McElhinny. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2008)
February 27, 2008 Filing 50 ADR Clerk's Notice Appointing Harold J. McElhinny as ENE Evaluator. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2008)
February 26, 2008 Filing 49 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint filed by John Stottlemire. Motion Hearing set for 4/22/2008 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, San Jose. (Stottlemire, John) (Filed on 2/26/2008)
February 20, 2008 ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference conducted on 2/20/2008 by Robin W. Siefkin, ADR Program Staff Attorney. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2008)
February 11, 2008 Filing 48 ADR Clerk's Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference on Wednesday, February 20, 2008 at 10:00 a.m. The ADR Program will initiate the call. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2008)
February 6, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Early Neutral Evaluation; CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 3/23/2009 08:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, San Jose. Pretrial Conference set for 3/17/2009 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 2/6/08. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2008)
February 5, 2008 Filing 46 Minute Entry: Initial Case Management Conference held on 2/5/2008 before Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd (Date Filed: 2/5/2008). (Tape #FTR.) (pmc, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/5/2008)
January 29, 2008 Filing 45 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT filed by John Stottlemire. (Stottlemire, John) (Filed on 1/29/2008) Text modified on 1/30/2008 conforming to posted document caption (bw, COURT STAFF).
January 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd granting in part and denying in part 43 Administrative Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2008)
January 14, 2008 Filing 43 Administrative MOTION to Extend Time to Respond to Second Amended Complaint re 41 Amended Complaint filed by John Stottlemire. (Stottlemire, John) (Filed on 1/14/2008) Text modified on 1/15/2008 (bw, COURT STAFF).
January 7, 2008 Filing 42 STIPULATION to Extend Time To Respond to Second Amended Complaint re 41 Amended Complaint by John Stottlemire. (Stottlemire, John) (Filed on 1/7/2008) Text modified on 1/8/2008 (bw, COURT STAFF).
January 2, 2008 Summons Issued as to John Stottlemire re Second Amended Complaint ( 41 ) (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2008)
December 27, 2007 Filing 41 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against John Stottlemire. Filed byCoupons, Inc. (Cusack, Dennis) (Filed on 12/27/2007) Text modified on 12/27/2007 (bw, COURT STAFF).
December 12, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd granting 38 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorneys Hollis Beth Hire and John Lawrence Slafsky terminated. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2007)
December 12, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd:granting in part and denying in part 12 Motion to Dismiss; denying 12 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 15 Motion for Sanctions; denying 28 Motion to Strike. Plaintiff has until January 2, 2008 to file amended complaint. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2007)
December 7, 2007 Filing 38 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Coupons, Inc. (Hire, Hollis) (Filed on 12/7/2007) Modified on 12/10/2007 (bw, COURT STAFF).
December 7, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER re-setting the Case Management Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 12/7/07. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2007)
December 4, 2007 Filing 36 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 12/4/2007 before Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd (Date Filed: 12/4/2007) re 12 , 15 , 28 Case Management Conference set for 2/5/2008 01:30 PM. (Tape #FTR.) (pmc, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/4/2007)
November 20, 2007 Filing 35 Reply to Hollis Beth Hire Wilson Sonsini Goodrich and Rosati's Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Sanctions filed by Hollis Beth Hire 26 and Coupons, Inc 21 filed by John Stottlemire. (Stottlemire, John) (Filed on 11/20/2007) Text modified on 11/21/2007 (bw, COURT STAFF).
November 20, 2007 Filing 34 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by John Stottlemire re 31 Reply to Opposition Request for Judicial Notice, Objections to Evidence and Motion to Strike (Stottlemire, John) (Filed on 11/20/2007)
November 20, 2007 Filing 33 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by John Stottlemire re 30 Reply to Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss or in the Alternative for Summary Judgment (Stottlemire, John) (Filed on 11/20/2007)
November 20, 2007 Filing 32 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by John Stottlemire re 29 Declaration in Support, of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss or in the Alternative Motion for Summary Judgment (Stottlemire, John) (Filed on 11/20/2007)
November 20, 2007 Filing 31 Reply to Opposition Defendant's to Request for Judicial Notice re ( 13 ) , filed by John Stottlemire. (Stottlemire, John) (Filed on 11/20/2007) Text modified on 11/21/2007 (bw, COURT STAFF).
November 20, 2007 Filing 30 Reply to Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss or in the Alternative for Summary Judgment filed by John Stottlemire. (Stottlemire, John) (Filed on 11/20/2007) Modified on 11/20/2007 (bw, COURT STAFF).
November 19, 2007 Filing 29 Declaration of John A Stottlemire in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss or in the Alternative Motion for Summary Judgment 13 filed by John Stottlemire. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits G and H) (Related document(s) 13 ) (Stottlemire, John) (Filed on 11/19/2007) Modified on 11/20/2007 (bw, COURT STAFF).
November 14, 2007 Filing 28 Ex Parte MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion To Dismiss ( 21 , ( 22 ), ( 23 ), ( 24 ), ( 25 ) filed by John Stottlemire. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Stottlemire, John) (Filed on 11/14/2007) Modified on 11/15/2007 and linkage added (bw, COURT STAFF).
November 13, 2007 Filing 27 Declaration of HOLLIS BETH HIRE in Support of 26 filed by Coupons, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Related document(s) 26 ) (Hire, Hollis) (Filed on 11/13/2007) Text modified on 11/15/2007 (bw, COURT STAFF).
November 13, 2007 Filing 26 HOLLIS BETH HIRE AND WILSON SONSINI GOODRICH & ROSATI'S MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT STOTTLEMIRE'S MOTION FOR SANCTIONS ( 15 ) filed by Coupons, Inc. (Hire, Hollis) (Filed on 11/13/2007) Text modified and linkage added on 11/15/2007 (bw, COURT STAFF).
November 13, 2007 Filing 25 Declaration of Proof of Service by Coupons, Inc. re 21 (Cusack, Dennis) (Filed on 11/13/2007) Text modified on 11/15/2007 (bw, COURT STAFF).
November 13, 2007 Filing 24 Declaration of JEFFREY WEITZMAN in Support of 21 filed by Coupons, Inc. (Related document(s) 21 ) (Cusack, Dennis) (Filed on 11/13/2007) Text modified on 11/15/2007 (bw, COURT STAFF).
November 13, 2007 Filing 23 Declaration of ED (BUD) MILLER in Support of 21 of Motion to Dismiss - Motion to Strike - Motion for Sanctions filed by Coupons, Inc. (Related document(s) 21 ) (Cusack, Dennis) (Filed on 11/13/2007) Text modified on 11/15/2007 (bw, COURT STAFF).
November 13, 2007 Filing 22 Appendix in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss re 21 filed by Coupons, Inc. (Related document(s) 21 ) (Cusack, Dennis) (Filed on 11/13/2007) Text modified on 11/15/2007 (bw, COURT STAFF).
November 13, 2007 Filing 21 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition to Defendant Stottlemire's Motion to Dismuiss or in the Alternative Motion for Summary Judgment; Opposition to Request for Judicial Notice, Objections to Evidence and Motion to Strike; Coupon's Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Sanction re ( 12 ), ( 15 ), ( 28 ) filed by Coupons, Inc. (Cusack, Dennis) (Filed on 11/13/2007) Text modified and linkage added on 11/15/2007 (bw, COURT STAFF).
October 24, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER re 17 Notice to Continue Hearing and Case Management Dates filed by Coupons, Inc., and 19 Memorandum in Opposition filed by John Stottlemire (re: Ineffective substitution of counsel). Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 10/24/07. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2007)
October 24, 2007 Set/Reset Hearings: Motion Hearing set for 12/4/2007 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, San Jose re: Docket Nos. 12 and 15 . (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2007)
October 22, 2007 Filing 19 Opposition to Motion to Continue Hearing and Case Management Dates re ( 17 ) filed by John Stottlemire. (Stottlemire, John) (Filed on 10/22/2007) Text modified on 10/23/2007, linkage added (bw, COURT STAFF).
October 22, 2007 Filing 18 Declaration in of Dennis M. Cusack in Support of Motion to Continue Hearing and Case Management Dates 17 filed by Coupons, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order For Continuance of Hearing and Case Management Dates)(Related document(s) 17 ) (Cusack, Dennis) (Filed on 10/22/2007) Modified on 10/23/2007 (bw, COURT STAFF).
October 22, 2007 Filing 17 Motion to Continue Hearing and Case Management Dates by Coupons, Inc. (Cusack, Dennis) (Filed on 10/22/2007) Text modified on 10/23/2007 (bw, COURT STAFF).
October 19, 2007 Filing 16 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Dennis M. Cusack (Cusack, Dennis) (Filed on 10/19/2007)
October 15, 2007 Filing 15 Motion for Sanctions Pursuant to Rule 11 of the Federal Rules of Procedure; Supporting Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by John Stottlemire. Motion Hearing set for 11/20/2007 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, San Jose. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Request For Judicial Notice and Exhibits# 2 (Proposed) Order (Stottlemire, John) (Filed on 10/15/2007)Text modified on 10/15/2007 (bw, COURT STAFF).
September 24, 2007 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by John Stottlemire re ( 12 ), ( 13 ) (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2007)
September 24, 2007 Filing 13 REQUEST of Judicial Notice in Support of John Stottlemire's Motion to Dismiss Coupons, Inc.'s First Amended Complaint ( 11 ), or in the Alternative, Summary Judgment re ( 12 ) by John Stottlemire. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2007) Modified on 9/27/2007 (bw, COURT STAFF).
September 24, 2007 Filing 12 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim on Which Relief can be Granted, or in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by John Stottlemire. Motion Hearing set for 11/13/2007 10:00 AM. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2007)
September 24, 2007 (Proposed) Order Granting Defendant John Stottlemire's Motion to Dismiss Coupons, Inc's First Amended Complaint ( 11 ) Pursuant to Rule 12(B)(6) of the Federal Fule of Civil Procedure filed by John Stottlemire. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2007)
August 29, 2007 Filing 11 First Amended Complaint for Violations of the Digital Millennium Copyright Act and Related State Law Claims against all defendants. Filed by Coupons, Inc. (Hire, Hollis) (Filed on 8/29/2007) Text modified on 8/30/2007 to conform to document caption post by counsel (bw, COURT STAFF). Modified on 8/31/2007 (sp, COURT STAFF).
August 29, 2007 Filing 10 CONSENT to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Coupons, Inc.(Hire, Hollis) (Filed on 8/29/2007) Modified on 8/30/2007 (bw, COURT STAFF).
August 1, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING Administrative Motion to Allow Pro Se Defendant to E-file. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 8/1/07. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2007)
August 1, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd granting in part and denying in part re 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 1 Complaint, Response due by 9/24/2007.(hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2007)
August 1, 2007 Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/6/2007 01:30 PM. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2007)
August 1, 2007 Set/Reset Deadlines: Last day to meet and confer re: initial disclosures, etc... 10/16/2007. Case Management Statement due by 10/30/2007. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2007)
July 26, 2007 Filing 7 Opposition to Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint filed by Coupons, Inc. (Hire, Hollis) (Filed on 7/26/2007) Text modified on 8/8/2007 to conform to document caption post by counsel (bw, COURT STAFF).
July 24, 2007 Filing 6 CONSENT to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by John Stottlemire. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2007)
July 24, 2007 Filing 5 Administrative Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint ( 1 ) filed by John Stottlemire. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2007)
July 24, 2007 (Proposed) Order Granting Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint ( 1 ), re 5 by John Stottlemire. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2007)
July 23, 2007 Filing 4 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT ( 1 ) by Coupons, Inc. (Hire, Hollis) (Filed on 7/23/2007) Modified on 7/24/2007 (bw, COURT STAFF).
July 18, 2007 Filing 3 Proof of Personal Service of Summons on Defendant John Stottlemire on 7/6/2007, answer due 7/26/2007.re ( 1 ), ( 2 ) filed by Coupons, Inc. (Hire, Hollis) (Filed on 7/18/2007) Modified on 7/19/2007 hyper link added (bw, COURT STAFF).
July 2, 2007 Filing 2 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 10/2/2007. Case Management Conference set for 10/9/2007 01:30 PM. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2007) Additional attachment(s) added on 7/2/2007 (bw, COURT STAFF).
July 2, 2007 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Violations of the Digital Millennium Copyright Act and Related State Law Claims (Summons Issued; jury demand; against John Stottlemire ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 54611001279). Filed by Coupons, Inc.. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2007) Additional attachment(s) added on 7/2/2007 (bw, COURT STAFF).
July 2, 2007 Summons Issued as to John Stottlemire. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2007)
July 2, 2007 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2007)
July 2, 2007 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding Copyright Infringement (cc: form mailed to register). (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2007)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coupons, Inc. v. Stottlemire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Coupons, Inc.
Represented By: John Lawrence Slafsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Stottlemire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?