Louis Vuitton Malletier, S.A. v. Akanoc Solutions, Inc. et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: Louis Vuitton Malletier, S.A.
Defendant: Akanoc Solutions, Inc., Managed Solutions Group, Inc. and Steven Chen
Case Number: 5:2007cv03952
Filed: August 1, 2007
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Outside US
Presiding Judge: James Ware
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1051 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 19, 2010 304 Featured Case ORDER Granting 303 Motion to Vacate Re Debtor Examination of Steve Chen. Signed by Judge James Ware on 8/19/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2010)
August 18, 2010 303 MOTION to Vacate 302 Clerks Notice Re Debtor Examination of Steve Chen filed by Louis Vuitton Malletier, S.A.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Vacating Debtor Examination of Steve Chen)(Coombs, J.) (Filed on 8/18/2010)
August 16, 2010 302 CLERKS NOTICE CONTINUING HEARING. Judgment Debtor Exam set for 8/24/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2010)
July 13, 2010 301 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER Setting Date for Continued Judgment Debtor Examination re 299 Stipulation. Judgment Debtor Exam set for 8/23/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge James Ware on 7/13/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2010)
July 12, 2010 300 Featured Case Minute Entry: Motion Hearing not held on 7/12/2010 before Judge James Ware (Date Filed: 7/12/2010). No Appearances made, matter is ordered off calendar. (Court Reporter Irene Rodriguez.) (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/12/2010)
July 9, 2010 299 Featured Case STIPULATION re 298 Order, Set Hearings,, RE CONTINUANCE OF DEBTOR EXAMINATION OF STEVE CHEN by Louis Vuitton Malletier, S.A.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING CONTINUANCE OF DEBTOR EXAMINATION OF STEVE CHEN)(Coombs, J.) (Filed on 7/9/2010)
June 30, 2010 298 Featured Case ORDER Granting 297 Application for Appearance and Examination re Enforcement of Judgment. Judgment Debtor Exam set for 7/12/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge James Ware on 6/30/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2010)
June 28, 2010 297 Featured Case APPLICATION for Writ of Appearance and Examination Re: Enforcement of Judgment of Judgment Debtor Steve Chen by Louis Vuitton Malletier, S.A.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order to Appear for Examination Re: Enforcement of Judgment of Judgment Debtor)(Coombs, J.) (Filed on 6/28/2010)
June 22, 2010 296 Featured Case Transcript of Proceedings held on 01/25/2010, before Judge Ware. Court Reporter/Transcriber Irene L. Rodriguez, Telephone number (408)947-8160. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 7/13/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/23/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/20/2010. (Rodriguez, Irene) (Filed on 6/22/2010)
June 17, 2010 295 Featured Case Costs Taxed in amount of $ $13,827.41 against Defendants.(srm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2010)
June 4, 2010 294 Featured Case Transcript of Proceedings held on 02/22/2010, before Judge James Ware. Court Reporter/Transcriber Summer Fisher, Telephone number 408-288-6150. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/2/2010. (Fisher, Summer) (Filed on 6/4/2010)
May 17, 2010 293 Featured Case Transcript Designation and Ordering Form for proceedings held on 01/25/2010 docket # 275 court reporter Irene Rodriguez and 02/22/2010 docket # 280 court reporter Summer Clanton before Judge James Ware, Transcript due by 06/18/2010. (Lowe, James) (Filed on 5/17/2010) Modified text on 5/18/2010 (cv, COURT STAFF).
May 4, 2010 292 Featured Case USCA Case Number 10-16015 9th Circuit Court of Appeals for 291 Notice of Cross Appeal, No. Setting cross-appeal briefing schedule as follows: First cross appeal brief due 07/28/2010 for Akanoc Solutions, Inc., Steven Chen and Managed Solutions Group, Inc.. Second brief on cross appeal due 08/27/2010 for Louis Vuitton Malletier, S.A.. Third brief on cross appeal due 09/27/2010 for Akanoc Solutions, Inc., Steven Chen and Managed Solutions Group, Inc. Optional cross appeal reply brief is due 14 days from service of third cross appeal brief. filed by Louis Vuitton Malletier, S.A.. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2010)
May 3, 2010 291 Featured Case NOTICE OF CROSS APPEAL as to 281 Order on Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law,, Order on Motion in Limine, Order on Motion for Permanent Injunction, Order on Motion to Dismiss, Order on Motion for New Trial, Order on Motion for Judgment NOV, 282 Order by Louis Vuitton Malletier, S.A.. Filing fee $ 455. Appeal Record due by 6/2/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Order, # 2 Exhibit Judgment, # 3 Exhibit Docketing Statement)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2010) Modified on 5/3/2010 (cv, COURT STAFF).
April 29, 2010 290 Featured Case ORDER Granting 289 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Brian S. Edwards terminated. Signed by Judge James Ware on 4/29/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2010)
April 22, 2010 289 Featured Case MOTION to WITHDRAW as Attorney OF BRIAN S. EDWARDS AS CO-COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANTS formerly with Gauntlett & Associates. The Defendants will continue to be represented in this law suit by David A. Gauntlett and James A. Lowe of Gauntlety & Associates (Lowe, James) (Filed on 4/22/2010) Modified on 4/22/2010 (cv, COURT STAFF).
April 20, 2010 288 Featured Case USCA Case Number 10-15909 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. The schedule is set as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 04/27/2010. Transcript ordered by 05/19/2010. Transcript due 06/18/2010. Appellant Akanoc Solutions, Inc., Appellant Steven Chen and Appellant Managed Solutions Group, Inc. opening brief due 07/28/2010. Appellee Louis Vuitton Malletier, S.A. answering brief due 08/27/2010. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 14 days after service of the answering brief. for 286 Notice of Appeal, filed by Akanoc Solutions, Inc., Managed Solutions Group, Inc., Steven Chen. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2010)
April 19, 2010 287 Featured Case Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re 286 Notice of Appeal, (srm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2010)
April 19, 2010 286 Featured Case NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 281 Order on Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law,, Order on Motion in Limine, Order on Motion for Permanent Injunction, Order on Motion to Dismiss, Order on Motion for New Trial, Order on Motion for Judgment NOV 282 Order by Akanoc Solutions, Inc., Steven Chen, Managed Solutions Group, Inc.. Filing fee $ 455 receipt number 54611007191. Appeal Record due by 5/19/2010. (srm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2010)
April 2, 2010 285 Featured Case BILL OF COSTS by Louis Vuitton Malletier, S.A.. (Coombs, J.) (Filed on 4/2/2010)
April 2, 2010 284 Featured Case ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to 282 Order :NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT OF JUDGMENT AWARDING STATUTORY DAMAGES AND PERMANENT INJUNCTION Acknowledgement filed by Louis Vuitton Malletier, S.A.. (Coombs, J.) (Filed on 4/2/2010)
April 2, 2010 283 Featured Case ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to 282 Order :NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT OF JUDGMENT AWARDING STATUTORY DAMAGES AND PERMANENT INJUNCTION Acknowledgement filed by Louis Vuitton Malletier, S.A.. (Coombs, J.) (Filed on 4/2/2010)
March 19, 2010 282 Featured Case JUDGMENT AWARDING STATUTORY DAMAGES AND PERMANENT INJUNCTION. Signed by Judge James Ware on March 19, 2010. (jwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2010) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/25/2010: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits A&B) (ecg, COURT STAFF).
March 19, 2010 281 Featured Case ORDER by Judge James Ware granting in part and denying in part 209 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law; granting in part and denying in part 210 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law; terminating 215 Motion in Limine; granting 256 Motion for Permanent Injunction; denying 269 Motion to Dismiss; denying 272 Motion for New Trial; granting in part and denying in part 273 Motion for Judgment NOV (jwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2010)
February 22, 2010 280 Featured Case Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 2/22/2010 before Judge James Ware (Date Filed: 2/22/2010) re 210 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law, 273 MOTION for Judgment, 209 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law, 269 MOTION to Dismiss, 272 MOTION for New Trial. Matter Submitted, the Court to issue further Order following hearing. (Court Reporter Summer Clanton.) (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/22/2010)
February 8, 2010 279 Featured Case Declaration of James A. Lowe in Support of 278 Reply Memorandum DECLARATION OF JAMES A. LOWE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' REPLY ON MOTION FOR RULE 59 RELIEF filed byAkanoc Solutions, Inc., Steven Chen, Managed Solutions Group, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1625 to Lowe Decl, # 2 Exhibit 1626 to Lowe Decl, # 3 Exhibit 1627 to Lowe Decl, # 4 Exhibit 1628 to Lowe Decl, # 5 Exhibit 1629 to Lowe Decl)(Related document(s) 278 ) (Lowe, James) (Filed on 2/8/2010)
February 8, 2010 278 Featured Case Reply Memorandum re 269 MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANTS' REPLY ON MOTION FOR RULE 59 RELIEF filed byAkanoc Solutions, Inc., Steven Chen, Managed Solutions Group, Inc.. (Lowe, James) (Filed on 2/8/2010)
February 1, 2010 277 Featured Case Memorandum in Opposition re 272 MOTION for New Trial or Other Relief Pursuant to Rule 59; Declaration and Exhibits in Support filed byLouis Vuitton Malletier, S.A.. (Coombs, J.) (Filed on 2/1/2010)
February 1, 2010 276 Featured Case AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re 273 MOTION for Judgment Declaration and Exhibits in Support filed byLouis Vuitton Malletier, S.A.. (Coombs, J.) (Filed on 2/1/2010)
January 25, 2010 275 Featured Case Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 1/25/2010 before Judge James Ware (Date Filed: 1/25/2010) re 256 MOTION for Permanent Injunction. Matter submitted. The Court to issue further Order following hearing. (Court Reporter Irene Rodriguez.) (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/25/2010)
January 25, 2010 274 Featured Case *** FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE SEE [275 *** Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 1/25/2010 before Judge James Ware (Date Filed: 1/25/2010) re 256 MOTION for Permanent Injunction. Matter submitted, the Court to issue further Order. (Court Reporter Irene Rodriguez.) (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/25/2010) Modified text on 1/25/2010 (ecg, COURT STAFF).
January 21, 2010 273 Featured Case MOTION for Judgment pursuant to RULE 50(b) MOTION filed by Akanoc Solutions, Inc., Steven Chen, Managed Solutions Group, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 2/22/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Lowe, James) (Filed on 1/21/2010) Modified text on 1/26/2010 (cv, COURT STAFF).
January 21, 2010 272 Featured Case MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL OR OTHER RELIEF PURSUANT TO RULE 59 filed by Akanoc Solutions, Inc., Steven Chen, Managed Solutions Group, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 2/22/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Lowe, James) (Filed on 1/21/2010) Modified on 1/26/2010,(counsel selected incorrect event.) (cv, COURT STAFF).
January 20, 2010 271 Featured Case ORDER Granting AS MODIFIED 266 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Defendants' shall not exceed 35 pages. Signed by Judge James Ware on 1/20/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2010)
January 19, 2010 270 Featured Case Declaration of James A. Lowe in Support of 269 MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS PURSUANT TO RULE 50 AND ALTERNATIVELY FOR NEW TRIAL OR OTHER RELIEF PURSUANT TO RULE 59 filed byAkanoc Solutions, Inc., Steven Chen, Managed Solutions Group, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 74 to Lowe Decl, # 2 Exhibit 449 to Lowe Decl, # 3 Exhibit 450 to Lowe Decl, # 4 Exhibit 1559 to Lowe Decl, # 5 Exhibit 1598 to Lowe Decl, # 6 Exhibit 1613 to Lowe Decl, # 7 Exhibit 1620 to Lowe Decl, # 8 Exhibit 1621 to Lowe Decl, # 9 Exhibit 1622 to Lowe Decl, # 10 Exhibit 1623 to Lowe Decl, # 11 Exhibit 1624 to Lowe Decl)(Related document(s) 269 ) (Lowe, James) (Filed on 1/19/2010)
January 19, 2010 269 Featured Case MOTION to Dismiss PURSUANT TO RULE 50 AND ALTERNATIVELY MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL OR OTHER RELIEF PURSUANT TO RULE 59 filed by Akanoc Solutions, Inc., Steven Chen, Managed Solutions Group, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 2/22/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Lowe, James) (Filed on 1/19/2010) Modified on 1/20/2010,(counsel failed to select multiple motions.) (cv, COURT STAFF).
January 19, 2010 268 Featured Case Opposition re 266 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages and objections to untimely motion; DECLARATION IN SUPPORT filed by Louis Vuitton Malletier, S.A.. (Coombs, J.) (Filed on 1/19/2010) Modified on 1/19/2010 (cv, COURT STAFF).
January 18, 2010 267 Featured Case Declaration of James A. Lowe in Support of 266 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages filed by Akanoc Solutions, Inc., Steven Chen, Managed Solutions Group, Inc.. (Related document(s) 266 ) (Lowe, James) (Filed on 1/18/2010) Modified on 1/19/2010 (cv, COURT STAFF).
January 18, 2010 266 Featured Case MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages filed by Akanoc Solutions, Inc., Steven Chen, Managed Solutions Group, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Lowe, James) (Filed on 1/18/2010) Modified on 1/19/2010 (cv, COURT STAFF).
January 11, 2010 265 Featured Case REPLY TO DEFENDANTS' EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO COOMBS DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF 256 MOTION FOR PERMANENT INJUNCTION; DECLARATION AND EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT filed by Louis Vuitton Malletier, S.A.. (Coombs, J.) (Filed on 1/11/2010) Modified on 1/12/2010,(counsel failed to properly link to motion.) (cv, COURT STAFF).
January 11, 2010 264 Featured Case RESPONSE in Support re 256 MOTION for Permanent Injunction and Memorandum ; Declaration and Exhibits in Support filed byLouis Vuitton Malletier, S.A.. (Coombs, J.) (Filed on 1/11/2010)
January 6, 2010 263 Featured Case Transcript of Proceedings held on 08/21/09, before Judge Ware. Court Reporter/Transcriber Irene L. Rodriguez, Telephone number (408)947-8160. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 1/27/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/8/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/6/2010. (Rodriguez, Irene) (Filed on 1/6/2010)
January 6, 2010 262 Featured Case Transcript of Proceedings held on 08/20/09, before Judge Ware. Court Reporter/Transcriber Irene L. Rodriguez, Telephone number (408)947-8160. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 1/27/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/8/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/6/2010. (Rodriguez, Irene) (Filed on 1/6/2010)
January 6, 2010 261 Featured Case Transcript of Proceedings held on 08/19/09, before Judge Ware. Court Reporter/Transcriber Irene L. Rodriguez, Telephone number (408)947-8160. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 1/27/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/8/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/6/2010. (Rodriguez, Irene) (Filed on 1/6/2010)
January 6, 2010 260 Featured Case Transcript of Proceedings held on 08/18/09, before Judge Ware. Court Reporter/Transcriber Irene L. Rodriguez, Telephone number (408)947-8160. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 1/27/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/8/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/6/2010. (Rodriguez, Irene) (Filed on 1/6/2010)
January 4, 2010 259 Featured Case EVIDENTIARY OBJECTION TO THE COOMBS DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S 256 MOTION FOR A PERMANENT INJUNCTION by Akanoc Solutions, Inc., Steven Chen, Managed Solutions Group, Inc.. (Lowe, James) (Filed on 1/4/2010) Modified on 1/5/2010 (cv, COURT STAFF).
January 4, 2010 258 Featured Case DECLARATION of James A. Lowe in support of 257 Memorandum in Opposition, filed by Akanoc Solutions, Inc., Steven Chen, Managed Solutions Group, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1616 to Lowe Decl, # 2 Exhibit 1617 to Lowe Decl, # 3 Exhibit 1618 to Lowe Decl, # 4 Exhibit 616 to Lowe Decl, # 5 Exhibit 1546 to Lowe Decl, # 6 Exhibit 1547 to Lowe Decl, # 7 Exhibit 1559 to Lowe Decl, # 8 Exhibit 54 to Lowe Decl, # 9 Exhibit 55 to Lowe Decl)(Related document(s) 257 ) (Lowe, James) (Filed on 1/4/2010) Modified on 1/5/2010 (cv, COURT STAFF).
January 4, 2010 257 Featured Case Memorandum in Opposition re 256 MOTION for Permanent Injunction and Memorandum DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO VUITTON'S MOTION FOR A PERMANENT INJUNCTION filed byAkanoc Solutions, Inc., Steven Chen, Managed Solutions Group, Inc.. (Lowe, James) (Filed on 1/4/2010)
December 21, 2009 256 Featured Case MOTION for Permanent Injunction and Memorandum filed by Louis Vuitton Malletier, S.A.. Motion Hearing set for 1/25/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Coombs, J.) (Filed on 12/21/2009)
December 15, 2009 255 Featured Case Transcript of Proceedings held on August 26, 2009, before Judge James Ware. Court Reporter/Transcriber Peter Torreano, Telephone number (408) 379-0900. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/12/2010. (mz, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2009)
December 7, 2009 254 Featured Case Transcript of Proceedings held on August 25, 2009 (pages 1-117), before Judge James Ware. Court Reporter/Transcriber Jana L. Ridenour. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 12/28/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/4/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/4/2010. (Attachments: # 1 pages 118-232) (sp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2009)
November 23, 2009 253 Featured Case ORDER FOLLOWING 11/23/2009 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Motion Hearing re Permanent Injunction set for 1/25/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Motion Hearing re Post Trial Motions set for 2/22/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge James Ware on 11/23/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/23/2009)
November 23, 2009 252 Featured Case Minute Entry: Further Case Management Conference held on 11/23/2009 before Judge James Ware (Date Filed: 11/23/2009). Motion Hearing re Permanent Injunction set for 1/25/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Motion Hearing re Post Trial Motions set for 2/22/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Court Reporter Unreported.) (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/23/2009)
November 20, 2009 251 Featured Case DECLARATION OF JAMES A. LOWE RE: POST-TRIAL RESPONSES TO VUITTON'S INFRINGEMENT NOTICES related document 249 by Akanoc Solutions, Inc., Steven Chen, Managed Solutions Group, Inc.. (Lowe, James) (Filed on 11/20/2009) Modified on 11/25/2009,(to conform with document posted by counsel.)(cv, COURT STAFF).
November 20, 2009 250 Featured Case DECLARATION OF STEVE CHEN RE: POST-TRIAL RESPONSES TO VUITTON'S INFRINGEMENT NOTICES related document 249 by Akanoc Solutions, Inc., Steven Chen, Managed Solutions Group, Inc.. (Lowe, James) (Filed on 11/20/2009) Modified on 11/25/2009,(to conform with document posted by counsel.) (cv, COURT STAFF).
November 18, 2009 249 Featured Case AFFIDAVIT SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF J. ANDREW COOMBS RE INJUNCTIVE PHASE by Louis Vuitton Malletier, S.A.. (Coombs, J.) (Filed on 11/18/2009)
October 29, 2009 248 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER Continuing Case Management Conference from 11/4/2009 to 11/23/2009 re 247 Stipulation. Further Case Management Conference set for 11/23/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge James Ware on 10/28/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2009)
October 28, 2009 247 Featured Case STIPULATION re 246 Clerks Notice STIPULATION TO CONTINUE NOVEMBER 4, 2009 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; [PROPOSED] ORDER by Akanoc Solutions, Inc., Steven Chen, Managed Solutions Group, Inc.. (Lowe, James) (Filed on 10/28/2009)
October 27, 2009 246 Featured Case CLERKS NOTICE CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE from 11/2/2009. Case Management Conference set for 11/4/2009 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2009)
October 27, 2009 245 Featured Case SUPPLEMENTAL RULE 50(a) BRIEF ON NON-APPLICATION OF LANHAM ACT TO EXTRATERRITORIAL TRADEMARK INFRINGEMENT filed byAkanoc Solutions, Inc., Steven Chen, Managed Solutions Group, Inc.. (Related document(s) 210 ) (Lowe, James) (Filed on 10/27/2009) Modified text on 10/29/2009,(to conform with document posted by counsel.) (cv, COURT STAFF).
October 27, 2009 244 Featured Case SUPPLEMENTAL RULE 50(a) BRIEF ON impossibility OF EXTRATERRITORIAL COPYRIGHT INFRINGEMENT filed by Akanoc Solutions, Inc., Steven Chen, Managed Solutions Group, Inc.. (Related document(s) 209 ) (Lowe, James) (Filed on 10/27/2009) Modified text on 10/28/2009,(to conform with document posted by counsel.) (cv, COURT STAFF).
October 9, 2009 243 Featured Case DECLARATION OF J. ANDREW COOMBS RE 242 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT by Louis Vuitton Malletier, S.A.. (Coombs, J.) (Filed on 10/9/2009) Modified on 10/15/2009 (cv, COURT STAFF).
October 9, 2009 242 Featured Case CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Akanoc Solutions, Inc., Steven Chen, Managed Solutions Group, Inc.. (Lowe, James) (Filed on 10/9/2009)
October 8, 2009 241 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE OF POST-TRIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE from 10/19/2009 to 11/2/2009 re 240 Stipulation. Joint Case Management Conference statement due 10/9/2009. Case Management Conference set for 11/2/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge James Ware on 10/8/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2009)
October 6, 2009 240 Featured Case STIPULATION RE CONTINUANCE OF POST-TRIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE by Louis Vuitton Malletier, S.A.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Continuance of Post-Trial Case Management Conference)(Coombs, J.) (Filed on 10/6/2009)
September 30, 2009 239 Featured Case ORDER SETTING POST-TRIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Conference statement due 10/9/2009. Further Case Management Conference set for 10/19/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Please see Order for further specifics. Signed by Judge James Ware on 9/29/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2009)
September 4, 2009 238 Featured Case PRELIMINARY RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S 237 SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF RE EXTRA TERRITORIAL APPLICATION OF U.S. COPYRIGHT AND TRADEMARK LAWS, AND TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT by Akanoc Solutions, Inc., Steven Chen, Managed Solutions Group, Inc.. (Lowe, James) (Filed on 9/4/2009) Modified on 9/8/2009,(counsel failed to properly link to which document it relates to.) (cv, COURT STAFF).
September 3, 2009 237 Featured Case SUPPLEMENTAL Brief re Applicability of US Copyright and Trademark Laws to California Based Web Hosting Defendants; Request for Entry of Judgment in favor of Plaintiff consistent with the jury's unanimous verdict filed by Louis Vuitton Malletier, S.A.. (Coombs, J.) (Filed on 9/3/2009) Modified on 9/4/2009 (cv, COURT STAFF).
September 2, 2009 236 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF TO FILE A RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS' OBJECTIONS TO LANGUAGE OF VUITTON'S PROPOSED PERMANENT INJUNCTION re 202 Stipulation. Signed by Judge James Ware on 9/1/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2009)
August 28, 2009 235 Featured Case JURY VERDICT. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2009)
August 28, 2009 234 Featured Case JURY NOTES AND SUPPLEMENTAL INSTRUCTIONS DURING DELIBERATIONS. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2009)
August 28, 2009 233 Featured Case Minute Entry: Jury Trial held on 8/28/2009, Jury Trial completed on 8/28/2009 before Judge James Ware (Date Filed: 8/28/2009). (Court Reporter Jana Ridenour.) (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/28/2009)
August 27, 2009 232 Featured Case Minute Entry: Jury Trial held on 8/27/2009 before Judge James Ware (Date Filed: 8/27/2009). Further Jury Trial set for 8/28/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Court Reporter Jana Ridenour.) (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/27/2009)
August 27, 2009 231 Featured Case Proposed Form of Verdict by the Court (SECOND REVISED - FINAL). (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2009)
August 27, 2009 230 Featured Case Proposed Form of Verdict by the Court (REVISED). (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2009)
August 26, 2009 229 Featured Case Proposed Form of Verdict by the Court. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2009)
August 26, 2009 228 Featured Case Joint Exhibit List (FINAL). Court Note: These are the exhibits admitted for use during deliberations. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2009)
August 26, 2009 227 Featured Case CLOSING Jury Instructions. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2009)
August 26, 2009 226 Featured Case Minute Entry: Jury Trial held on 8/26/2009 before Judge James Ware (Date Filed: 8/26/2009). Further Jury Trial set for 8/27/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Court Reporter Peter Torreano.) (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/26/2009)
August 26, 2009 225 Featured Case ORDER TO JURY COMMISSIONER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Jury Commissioner shall furnish morning refreshments and lunch in the above entitled matter at the expense of the United States District Court through Le Boulanger for the members of the jury during deliberations effective for August 27, 2008 through August 28, 2009 and as needed for August 31, 2008 through September 4, 2008. Signed by Judge James Ware on 8/26/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2009)
August 25, 2009 224 Featured Case Jury Notes One through Three During Trial on August 25, 2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2009)
August 25, 2009 223 Featured Case Proposed Form of Verdict by Akanoc Solutions, Inc., Steven Chen, Managed Solutions Group, Inc. DEFENDANTS' PROPOSED VERDICT FORMS REGARDING STATUTORY DAMAGES (COPYRIGHT and TRADEMARK). (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Verdict Form)(Lowe, James) (Filed on 8/25/2009)
August 25, 2009 222 Featured Case Proposed Jury Instructions by Akanoc Solutions, Inc., Steven Chen, Managed Solutions Group, Inc. DEFENDANT'S SUPPLEMENTAL JURY INSTRUCTION NO. 29. (Lowe, James) (Filed on 8/25/2009)
August 25, 2009 221 Featured Case Minute Entry: Jury Trial held on 8/25/2009 before Judge James Ware (Date Filed: 8/25/2009). Pretrial Conference set for 8/26/2009 08:30 AM, Further Jury Trial set for 8/26/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Court Reporter Jana Ridenour.) (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/25/2009)
August 25, 2009 220 Featured Case Proposed Form of Verdict by Akanoc Solutions, Inc., Steven Chen, Managed Solutions Group, Inc. DEFENDANTS' PROPOSED VERDICT FORMS RE TRADEMARK INFRINGEMENT. (Attachments: # 1 2nd of 17 verdict forms, # 2 3rd of 17 verdict forms, # 3 4th of 17 verdict forms, # 4 5th of 17 verdict forms, # 5 6th of 17 verdict forms, # 6 7th of 17 verdict forms, # 7 8th of 17 verdict forms, # 8 9th of 17 verdict forms, # 9 10th of 17 verdict forms, # 10 11th of 17 verdict forms, # 11 12th of 17 verdict forms, # 12 13th of 17 verdict forms, # 13 14th of 17 verdict forms, # 14 15th of 17 verdict forms, # 15 16th of 17 verdict forms, # 16 17th of 17 verdict forms)(Lowe, James) (Filed on 8/25/2009)
August 25, 2009 219 Featured Case Proposed Form of Verdict by Akanoc Solutions, Inc., Steven Chen, Managed Solutions Group, Inc. DEFENDANTS' PROPOSED VERDICT FORMS RE COPYRIGHT INFRINGEMENT. (Attachments: # 1 2nd of 17 verdict forms, # 2 3rd of 17 verdict forms, # 3 4th of 17 verdict forms, # 4 5th of 17 verdict forms, # 5 6th of 17 verdict forms, # 6 7th of 17 verdict forms, # 7 8th of 17 verdict forms, # 8 9th of 17 verdict forms, # 9 10th of 17 verdict forms, # 10 11th of 17 verdict forms, # 11 12th of 17 verdict forms, # 12 13th of 17 verdict forms, # 13 14th of 17 verdict forms, # 14 15th of 17 verdict forms, # 15 16th of 17 verdict forms, # 16 17th of 17 verdict forms)(Lowe, James) (Filed on 8/25/2009)
August 25, 2009 218 Featured Case PROPOSED SUPPLEMENTAL JURY INSTRUCTIONS. (Lowe, James) (Filed on 8/25/2009) Modified on 8/25/2009 (cv, COURT STAFF).
August 25, 2009 217 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OF LAW ON ISSUES RELATED TO STATUTORY DAMAGES (Lowe, James) (Filed on 8/25/2009) Modified on 8/25/2009 (cv, COURT STAFF).
August 24, 2009 216 Featured Case Proposed Form of Verdict by Louis Vuitton Malletier, S.A.. (Coombs, J.) (Filed on 8/24/2009)
August 24, 2009 215 Featured Case MOTION in Limine to Exclude Testimony of Richard Gralnik Concerning ISP Practices and the Reasonableness of Defendants' Policies filed by Louis Vuitton Malletier, S.A.. (Coombs, J.) (Filed on 8/24/2009)
August 24, 2009 214 Featured Case Memorandum in Opposition re 210 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law REGARDING: CONTRIBUTORY TRADEMARK INFRINGEMENT CLAIM filed by Louis Vuitton Malletier, S.A.. (Coombs, J.) (Filed on 8/24/2009) Modified on 8/25/2009 (cv, COURT STAFF).
August 24, 2009 213 Featured Case Memorandum in Opposition re 209 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law regarding: CONTRIBUTORY COPYRIGHT INFRINGEMENT CLAIM filed by Louis Vuitton Malletier, S.A.. (Coombs, J.) (Filed on 8/24/2009) Modified on 8/25/2009 (cv, COURT STAFF).
August 21, 2009 212 Featured Case Minute Entry: Jury Trial held on 8/21/2009 before Judge James Ware (Date Filed: 8/21/2009). Further Jury Trial set for 8/25/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Court Reporter Irene Rodriguez.) (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/21/2009)
August 20, 2009 211 Featured Case Minute Entry: Jury Trial held on 8/20/2009 before Judge James Ware (Date Filed: 8/20/2009). Further Jury Trial set for 8/21/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Court Reporter Irene Rodriguez.) (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/20/2009)
August 20, 2009 210 Featured Case MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law DEFENDANTS' RULE 50(a) MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW REGARDING: CONTRIBUTORY TRADEMARK INFRINGEMENT CLAIM filed by Akanoc Solutions, Inc., Steven Chen, Managed Solutions Group, Inc.. (Lowe, James) (Filed on 8/20/2009)
August 20, 2009 209 Featured Case MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law DEFENDANTS' RULE 50(a) MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW REGARDING: CONTRIBUTORY COPYRIGHT INFRINGEMENT CLAIM filed by Akanoc Solutions, Inc., Steven Chen, Managed Solutions Group, Inc.. (Lowe, James) (Filed on 8/20/2009)
August 19, 2009 208 Featured Case AMENDED Minute Entry: Jury Trial held on 8/19/2009 before Judge James Ware (Date Filed: 8/19/2009). Further Jury Trial set for 8/20/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Court Reporter Irene Rodriguez.) (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/19/2009)
August 18, 2009 206 Featured Case Exhibit List (Revised) by Louis Vuitton Malletier, S.A... (Coombs, J.) (Filed on 8/18/2009) Modified docket text on 8/19/2009 (ecg, COURT STAFF).
August 18, 2009 205 Featured Case OPENING Jury Instructions. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2009)
August 18, 2009 204 Featured Case Minute Entry: Jury Selection held on 8/18/2009, Jury Trial began on 8/18/2009 before Judge James Ware (Date Filed: 8/18/2009). Further Jury Trial set for 8/19/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Court Reporter Irene Rodriguez.) (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/18/2009)
August 18, 2009 203 Featured Case ORDER by Judge James Ware granting 194 Motion in Limine; temporarily granting in part and denying in part 194 Motion ; denying 195 Motion in Limine; granting 196 Motion in Limine; granting 198 Motion ; granting 199 Motion (jwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2009)
August 17, 2009 202 Featured Case STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order FOR ADMINISTRATIVE LEAVE FOR PLAINTIFF TO FILE A RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS OBJECTIONS TO LANGUAGE OF VUITTONS PROPOSED PERMANENT INJUNCTION [Dockets 191, 192, 192-2]; [ by Louis Vuitton Malletier, S.A.. (Attachments: # 1 REPLY OF PLAINTIFF LOUIS VUITTON MALLETIER, S.A. TO DEFENDANTS OBJECTIONS TO PROPOSED INJUNCTION)(Coombs, J.) (Filed on 8/17/2009) Modified on 8/18/2009 (cv, COURT STAFF).
August 17, 2009 201 Featured Case Proposed Voir Dire by Akanoc Solutions, Inc., Steven Chen, Managed Solutions Group, Inc. DEFENDANTS' PROPOSED VOIR DIRE QUESTIONS. (Lowe, James) (Filed on 8/17/2009)
August 15, 2009 200 Featured Case Proposed Voir Dire by Louis Vuitton Malletier, S.A.. (Coombs, J.) (Filed on 8/15/2009)
August 15, 2009 199 Featured Case MOTION TO LODGE ORIGINAL TRANSCRIPT OF JULIANA LUK for trial AND DESIGNATION OF PORTIONS of the transcript TO BE READ into evidence filed by Louis Vuitton Malletier, S.A.. (Coombs, J.) (Filed on 8/15/2009) Modified text on 8/17/2009 (cv, COURT STAFF).
August 15, 2009 198 Featured Case MOTION TO LODGE ORIGINAL TRANSCRIPT OF STEVEN CHEN for trial AND DESIGNATION OF PORTIONS of the transcript TO BE READ into evidence filed by Louis Vuitton Malletier, S.A.. (Coombs, J.) (Filed on 8/15/2009) Modified text on 8/17/2009 (cv, COURT STAFF).
August 12, 2009 197 Featured Case Memorandum in Opposition DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO VUITTON'S MOTION IN LIMINE #1 TO EXCLUDE QUARTERLY REVENUE REPORTS AT TRIAL filed byAkanoc Solutions, Inc., Steven Chen, Managed Solutions Group, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Lowe Decl ISO Opposition, # 2 Exhibit 1600 to Lowe Decl ISO Opposition)(Lowe, James) (Filed on 8/12/2009)
August 11, 2009 196 Featured Case MOTION in Limine DEFENDANTS' MOTION IN LIMINE #17 TO EXCLUDE VUITTON'S EXHIBITS NUMBERED 619 AND 620 AND EXPERT TESTIMONY ABOUT ACTIONS TAKEN AFTER DEPOSITION filed by Akanoc Solutions, Inc., Steven Chen, Managed Solutions Group, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Lowe Decl ISO Defts MIL #17, # 2 Exhibits to Lowe Decl ISO Defts MIL #17)(Lowe, James) (Filed on 8/11/2009)
August 11, 2009 195 Featured Case MOTION in Limine DEFENDANTS' MOTION IN LIMINE #16 TO PRECLUDE VUITTON FROM REFERRING TO "WILLFUL BLINDNESS" DURING OPENING STATEMENTS filed by Akanoc Solutions, Inc., Steven Chen, Managed Solutions Group, Inc.. (Lowe, James) (Filed on 8/11/2009)
August 11, 2009 194 Featured Case MOTION in Limine, MOTION For Leave to File Motions In Limine #16 and #17 filed by Akanoc Solutions, Inc., Steven Chen, Managed Solutions Group, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Lowe Decl ISO Admin Mtn, # 2 Exhibits 1601 and 1602 to Admin Mtn, # 3 [Proposed] Order Granting Admin Mtn)(Lowe, James) (Filed on 8/11/2009) Modified on 3/18/2010 (cv, COURT STAFF).
August 11, 2009 193 Featured Case ORDER by Judge James Ware granting 190 Motion for Leave to File (jwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2009)
August 7, 2009 192 Featured Case Declaration of James A. Lowe in Support of DEFENDANTS' OBJECTIONS TO LANGUAGE OF VUITTON'S PROPOSED PERMANENT INJUNCTION filed by Akanoc Solutions, Inc., Steven Chen, Managed Solutions Group, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Group Exhibit 1600 to Lowe Declaration)(Related document(s) 191 ) (Lowe, James) (Filed on 8/7/2009) Modified on 8/14/2009 (cv, COURT STAFF).
August 7, 2009 191 Featured Case OBJECTIONS to re 188 Proposed Order DEFENDANTS' OBJECTIONS TO LANGUAGE OF VUITTON'S PROPOSED PERMANENT INJUNCTION by Akanoc Solutions, Inc., Steven Chen, Managed Solutions Group, Inc.. (Lowe, James) (Filed on 8/7/2009)
August 5, 2009 190 Featured Case MOTION for Leave to File to File Plaintiff's Motion in Limine No. 1 to Exclude Evidence of Financial Condition of Plaintiff and its Affiliates; Declaration in Support filed by Louis Vuitton Malletier, S.A.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Administrative Leave to File Plaintiff's Motion in Limine No. 1 to Exclude Evidence of Financial Condition of Plaintiff and its Affiliates, # 2 Plaintiff's Motion in Limine No. 1 to Exclude Evidence of Financial Condition of Plaintiff and its Affiliates; Declaration and Exhibits in Support)(Coombs, J.) (Filed on 8/5/2009)
July 31, 2009 189 Featured Case OBJECTIONS to re 161 Proposed Jury Instructions,,,, by Louis Vuitton Malletier, S.A.. (Coombs, J.) (Filed on 7/31/2009)
July 31, 2009 188 Featured Case Proposed Order re Permanent Injunction by Louis Vuitton Malletier, S.A.. (Coombs, J.) (Filed on 7/31/2009)
July 15, 2009 187 Featured Case FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER - JURY TRIAL; Denying 184 Motion for Leave to File. Deadline for Plaintiff to file its proposed permanent injunction due 7/31/2009, Defendants' objections due 8/7/2009. Jury Selection set for 8/18/2009 09:00 AM ; Jury Trial set for 8/18/2009 01:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. ***On the day before the first day of trial, each party SHALL lodge with chambers an exhibit binder for the Court. *** The proffering party SHALL retain custody of all exhibits, schedules, summaries, diagrams or charts to be used at the trial.Signed by Judge James Ware on 7/15/2009 (jwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2009) Modified docket text on 7/16/2009 (ecg, COURT STAFF). Modified on 8/17/2009 (cv, COURT STAFF).
July 13, 2009 186 Featured Case Minute Entry: Interim Pretrial Conference (Date Filed: 7/13/2009). Jury Selection set for 8/18/2009 09:00 AM ; Jury Trial set for 8/18/2009 01:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. The Court to issue further Order following conference. (Court Reporter Unreported.) (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/13/2009)
July 10, 2009 185 Featured Case Memorandum in Opposition re 184 MOTION for Leave to File MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF ORDER RE: MOTIONS IN LIMINE; DECLARATION IN SUPPORT DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO VUITTON'S REQUEST FOR LEAVE TO FILE MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATIOBN OF JULY 9, 2009 ORDER RE MOTIONS IN LIMINE filed byAkanoc Solutions, Inc., Steven Chen, Managed Solutions Group, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Lowe Declaration)(Lowe, James) (Filed on 7/10/2009)
July 10, 2009 184 Featured Case MOTION for Leave to File MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF ORDER RE: MOTIONS IN LIMINE; DECLARATION IN SUPPORT filed by Louis Vuitton Malletier, S.A.. (Coombs, J.) (Filed on 7/10/2009)
July 9, 2009 183 Featured Case ORDER by Judge James Ware denying 104 Motion in Limine; denying 105 Motion in Limine; denying 106 Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part 107 Motion in Limine; denying 108 Motion in Limine; denying 109 Motion in Limine; denying 110 Motion in Limine; granting 111 Motion in Limine; denying 112 Motion in Limine; denying 164 Motion in Limine; denying 165 Motion in Limine; denying 166 Motion in Limine; granting 175 Motion for Leave to File; denying 179 Motion in Limine; denying 180 Motion in Limine; granting 181 Motion in Limine (jwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2009)
July 9, 2009 182 Featured Case CLERKS NOTICE Changing Time for Conference. Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/13/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. James Ware. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2009)
July 6, 2009 181 Featured Case MOTION in Limine DEFENDANTS' MOTION IN LIMINE #15 TO PRECLUDE VUITTON'S EXPERT WITNESS FROM PROVIDING ADDITIONAL TESTIMONY ABOUT ACTIONS OR OPINIONS NOT DISCLOSED PRIOR TO HIS DEPOSITION filed by Akanoc Solutions, Inc., Steven Chen, Managed Solutions Group, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 James Lowe Declaration)(Lowe, James) (Filed on 7/6/2009)
July 6, 2009 180 Featured Case MOTION in Limine DEFENDANTS' MOTION IN LIMINE #14 TO EXCLUDE VUITTON'S UNTIMELY TRIAL EXHIBITS filed by Akanoc Solutions, Inc., Steven Chen, Managed Solutions Group, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Christopher Lai Declaration, # 2 Exhibit 1591 to Lai Declaration, # 3 Exhibit 1592 to Lai Declaration, # 4 Exhibit 1593 to Lai Declaration, # 5 Exhibit 1594 to Lai Declaration, # 6 Exhibit 1595 to Lai Declaration, # 7 Exhibit 1596 to Lai Declaration)(Lowe, James) (Filed on 7/6/2009)
July 6, 2009 179 Featured Case MOTION in Limine DEFENDANTS' MOTION IN LIMINE #13 TO EXCLUDE THE TESTIMONY OF JOSEPH T. MURIN AND PHIL COOPER filed by Akanoc Solutions, Inc., Steven Chen, Managed Solutions Group, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Lowe Declaration, # 2 Exhibit 1597 to Lowe Declaration)(Lowe, James) (Filed on 7/6/2009)
July 6, 2009 178 Featured Case Proposed Order re 175 MOTION for Leave to File DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR ADMINISTRATIVE RELIEF FOR LEAVE TO FILE MOTIONS IN LIMINE #13, #14 AND #15 by Akanoc Solutions, Inc., Steven Chen, Managed Solutions Group, Inc.. (Lowe, James) (Filed on 7/6/2009)
July 6, 2009 177 Featured Case Declaration of Christopher Lai in Support of 175 MOTION for Leave to File DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR ADMINISTRATIVE RELIEF FOR LEAVE TO FILE MOTIONS IN LIMINE #13, #14 AND #15 filed byAkanoc Solutions, Inc., Steven Chen, Managed Solutions Group, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1595 to Lai Declaration)(Related document(s) 175 ) (Lowe, James) (Filed on 7/6/2009)
July 6, 2009 176 Featured Case Declaration of James A. Lowe in Support of 175 MOTION for Leave to File DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR ADMINISTRATIVE RELIEF FOR LEAVE TO FILE MOTIONS IN LIMINE #13, #14 AND #15 filed byAkanoc Solutions, Inc., Steven Chen, Managed Solutions Group, Inc.. (Related document(s) 175 ) (Lowe, James) (Filed on 7/6/2009)
July 6, 2009 175 Featured Case MOTION for Leave to File DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR ADMINISTRATIVE RELIEF FOR LEAVE TO FILE MOTIONS IN LIMINE #13, #14 AND #15 filed by Akanoc Solutions, Inc., Steven Chen, Managed Solutions Group, Inc.. (Lowe, James) (Filed on 7/6/2009)
July 2, 2009 174 Featured Case ORDER CONTINUING FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/13/2009 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge James Ware on 6/30/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2009)
June 29, 2009 173 Featured Case Reply to Opposition re 166 MOTION in Limine DEFENDANTS' MOTION IN LIMINE #12 TO EXCLUDE THE INTRODUCTION OF VUITTON'S COMPUTER HARD DRIVE AND COMPUTER DATA PATHS filed byAkanoc Solutions, Inc., Steven Chen, Managed Solutions Group, Inc.. (Lowe, James) (Filed on 6/29/2009)
June 29, 2009 172 Featured Case Reply to Opposition re 165 MOTION in Limine DEFENDANTS' MOTION IN LIMINE #11 TO BAR VUITTON FROM PRESENTING NON-RELEVANT EVIDENCE AT TRIAL filed byAkanoc Solutions, Inc., Steven Chen, Managed Solutions Group, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Lowe Suppl Decl ISO Defts MIL #11, # 2 Exhibits 1587, 1588, 1589 to Lowe Suppl Decl ISO Defts MIL #11)(Lowe, James) (Filed on 6/29/2009)
June 29, 2009 171 Featured Case Reply to Opposition re 164 MOTION in Limine DEFENDANTS' MOTION IN LIMINE #10 TO BAR TESTIMONY AND EVIDENCE OF LIABILITY INSURANCE filed byAkanoc Solutions, Inc., Steven Chen, Managed Solutions Group, Inc.. (Lowe, James) (Filed on 6/29/2009)
June 22, 2009 170 Featured Case Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants' ( 166 ) Motion in Limine No. 12 to Exclude Defendants' Servers and Data Paths filed byLouis Vuitton Malletier, S.A.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Part 1 of 2), # 2 Exhibit A (Part 2 of 2), # 3 Exhibit B (Part 1 of 2), # 4 Exhibit B (Part 2 of 2))(Coombs, J.) (Filed on 6/22/2009) Modified text to add linkage on 6/23/2009 (srm, COURT STAFF).
June 22, 2009 169 Featured Case Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants' ( 165 ) Motion in Limine No. 11 to Bar Non-Relevant Evidence at Trial; Declaration of J. Andrew Coombs in Support filed byLouis Vuitton Malletier, S.A.. (Coombs, J.) (Filed on 6/22/2009) Modified text to add linkage on 6/23/2009 (srm, COURT STAFF).
June 22, 2009 168 Featured Case Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants' ( 164 ) Motion in Limine No. 10 to Bar Testimony and Evidence of Liability Insurance filed byLouis Vuitton Malletier, S.A.. (Coombs, J.) (Filed on 6/22/2009) Modified text to add linkage on 6/23/2009 (srm, COURT STAFF).
June 10, 2009 167 Featured Case ORDER by Judge James Ware denying 148 Motion to Require Plaintiff to Limit Infringement Contentions; Finding as Moot 154 Stipulation (jwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2009) Modified docket text on 6/11/2009 (ecg, COURT STAFF).
June 5, 2009 166 Featured Case MOTION in Limine DEFENDANTS' MOTION IN LIMINE #12 TO EXCLUDE THE INTRODUCTION OF VUITTON'S COMPUTER HARD DRIVE AND COMPUTER DATA PATHS filed by Akanoc Solutions, Inc., Managed Solutions Group, Inc., Steven Chen. (Attachments: # 1 Richard Gralnik Declaration, # 2 Christopher Lai Declaration)(Lowe, James) (Filed on 6/5/2009)
June 5, 2009 165 Featured Case MOTION in Limine DEFENDANTS' MOTION IN LIMINE #11 TO BAR VUITTON FROM PRESENTING NON-RELEVANT EVIDENCE AT TRIAL filed by Akanoc Solutions, Inc., Managed Solutions Group, Inc., Steven Chen. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of James Lowe)(Lowe, James) (Filed on 6/5/2009)
June 5, 2009 164 Featured Case MOTION in Limine DEFENDANTS' MOTION IN LIMINE #10 TO BAR TESTIMONY AND EVIDENCE OF LIABILITY INSURANCE filed by Akanoc Solutions, Inc., Managed Solutions Group, Inc., Steven Chen. (Lowe, James) (Filed on 6/5/2009)
June 5, 2009 163 Featured Case Proposed Jury Instructions by Louis Vuitton Malletier, S.A.. (Wang, Annie) (Filed on 6/5/2009)
June 5, 2009 162 Featured Case Proposed Jury Instructions by Louis Vuitton Malletier, S.A. , Akanoc Solutions, Inc., Managed Solutions Group, Inc., and Steven Chen, et al. CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 160 . (Wang, Annie) (Filed on 6/5/2009)
June 5, 2009 161 Featured Case Proposed Jury Instructions by Akanoc Solutions, Inc., Managed Solutions Group, Inc., Steven Chen DEFENDANTS' PROPOSED MODEL JURY INSTRUCTIONS. (Attachments: # 1 Supplemental Jury Instruction #1, # 2 Supplemental Jury Instruction #2, # 3 Supplemental Jury Instruction #3, # 4 Supplemental Jury Instruction #4, # 5 Supplemental Jury Instruction #5, # 6 Supplemental Jury Instruction #6, # 7 Supplemental Jury Instruction #7, # 8 Supplemental Jury Instruction #8, # 9 Supplemental Jury Instruction #9, # 10 Supplemental Jury Instruction #10, # 11 Supplemental Jury Instruction #11, # 12 Supplemental Jury Instruction #12, # 13 Supplemental Jury Instruction #13, # 14 Supplemental Jury Instruction #14, # 15 Supplemental Jury Instruction #15, # 16 Supplemental Jury Instruction #16, # 17 Supplemental Jury Instruction #17, # 18 Supplemental Jury Instruction #18, # 19 Supplemental Jury Instruction #20, # 20 Supplemental Jury Instruction #21, # 21 Supplemental Jury Instruction #22, # 22 Supplemental Jury Instruction #23)(Lowe, James) (Filed on 6/5/2009)
June 5, 2009 160 Featured Case *** FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE DOCKET # 162 . *** Proposed Jury Instructions by Louis Vuitton Malletier, S.A.. (Attachments: # 1 PLAINTIFF'S PROPOSED SUPPLEMENTAL JURY INSTRUCTIONS)(Wang, Annie) (Filed on 6/5/2009) Modified on 6/8/2009 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
June 5, 2009 159 Featured Case Exhibit List by Louis Vuitton Malletier, S.A... (Wang, Annie) (Filed on 6/5/2009)
June 5, 2009 158 Featured Case Pretrial Conference Statement by Louis Vuitton Malletier, S.A.. (Wang, Annie) (Filed on 6/5/2009)
June 5, 2009 157 Featured Case Witness List by Louis Vuitton Malletier, S.A.. (Wang, Annie) (Filed on 6/5/2009)
June 1, 2009 156 Featured Case Reply Memorandum re 148 MOTION Require Plaintiff to "Pare Down" its Infringement Contentions for Trial filed by Akanoc Solutions, Inc., Managed Solutions Group, Inc., Steven Chen. (Lowe, James) (Filed on 6/1/2009) Modified on 6/3/2009 (cv, COURT STAFF).
May 26, 2009 155 Featured Case Memorandum in Opposition re 148 MOTION Require Plaintiff to "Pare Down" its Infringement Contentions for Trial filed byLouis Vuitton Malletier, S.A.. (Coombs, J.) (Filed on 5/26/2009)
May 22, 2009 154 Featured Case STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order RE CONTINUANCE OF HEARING ON 148 DEFENDANTS MOTION TO REQUIRE PLAINTIFF TO PARE DOWN ITS INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS FOR TRIAL by Louis Vuitton Malletier, S.A.. (Attachments: # 1 [PROPOSED] ORDER (Wang, Annie) (Filed on 5/22/2009) Modified on 5/26/2009,(counsel failed to properly link to motion.) (cv, COURT STAFF).
May 13, 2009 153 Featured Case EXHIBIT re 152 Order on Motion to Seal (Attachments: # 1 Signature Page (Declarations/Stipulations))(Related document(s) 152 ) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2009)
May 12, 2009 152 Featured Case ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd denying 139 Plaintiff's Motion to Seal Document. Exhibit A to Declaration of Joseph T. Murin filed in support of plaintiff's motion for modification (Docket #137) shall be placed in the court's public records. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2009)
May 12, 2009 151 Featured Case ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd granting in part and denying in part 137 . Plaintiff's motion for modification of inspection protocol is granted. Plaintiff's request for sanctions is denied. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2009)
May 12, 2009 150 Featured Case Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 5/12/2009 before Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd (Date Filed: 5/12/2009) re 137 (Tape #FTR.) (pmc, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/12/2009)
May 11, 2009 149 Featured Case Declaration of James A. Lowe in Support of 148 MOTION Require Plaintiff to "Pare Down" its Infringement Contentions for Trial filed byAkanoc Solutions, Inc., Managed Solutions Group, Inc., Steven Chen. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1541 to Lowe Decl, # 2 Exhibit 1542 to Lowe Decl)(Related document(s) 148 ) (Lowe, James) (Filed on 5/11/2009)
May 11, 2009 148 Featured Case MOTION Require Plaintiff to "Pare Down" its Infringement Contentions for Trial filed by Akanoc Solutions, Inc., Managed Solutions Group, Inc., Steven Chen. Motion Hearing set for 6/15/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Attachments: # 1 [Proposed] Order)(Lowe, James) (Filed on 5/11/2009)
April 28, 2009 147 Featured Case Reply Memorandum re 137 MOTION for Modification of Order for Inspection and Sanctions ; Declaration and Exhibits in Support filed byLouis Vuitton Malletier, S.A.. (Coombs, J.) (Filed on 4/28/2009)
April 24, 2009 146 Featured Case DECLARATION of James A. Lowe in support of 143 Memorandum in Opposition, filed by Akanoc Solutions, Inc., Managed Solutions Group, Inc., Steven Chen. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1531 to Lowe Decl, # 2 Exhibit 1532 to Lowe Decl, # 3 Exhibit 1533 to Lowe Decl, # 4 Exhibit 1534 to Lowe Decl, # 5 Exhibit 1535 to Lowe Decl, # 6 Exhibit 1536 to Lowe Decl, # 7 Exhibit 1537 to Lowe Decl, # 8 Exhibit 1538 to Lowe Decl, # 9 Exhibit 1539 to Lowe Decl, # 10 Exhibit 1540 to Lowe Decl)(Related document(s) 143 ) (Lowe, James) (Filed on 4/24/2009) Modified on 4/28/2009 (cv, COURT STAFF).
April 24, 2009 145 Featured Case DECLARATION of Richard Gralnik in support of 143 Memorandum in Opposition, filed by Akanoc Solutions, Inc., Managed Solutions Group, Inc., Steven Chen. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1530 to Gralnik Decl)(Related document(s) 143 ) (Lowe, James) (Filed on 4/24/2009) Modified on 4/28/2009,(counsel used incorrect event.) (cv, COURT STAFF).
April 24, 2009 144 Featured Case DECLARATION of Steve Chen in support of 143 Memorandum in Opposition, filed by Akanoc Solutions, Inc., Managed Solutions Group, Inc., Steven Chen. (Related document(s) 143 ) (Lowe, James) (Filed on 4/24/2009) Modified on 4/28/2009,(counsel used incorrect event.) (cv, COURT STAFF).
April 24, 2009 143 Featured Case Memorandum in Opposition re 137 MOTION for Modification of Order for Inspection and Sanctions filed by Akanoc Solutions, Inc., Managed Solutions Group, Inc., Steven Chen. (Lowe, James) (Filed on 4/24/2009) Modified on 4/29/2009 (cv, COURT STAFF).
April 20, 2009 142 Featured Case ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd granting 140 plaintiff's Motion to Shorten Time. Motion hearing re 137 set for 5/12/2009, 10:00 AM. Defendants' opposition due by 4/24/2009, 5:00 PM. Plaintiff's reply due by 4/28/2009. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2009)
April 16, 2009 141 Featured Case Memorandum in Opposition re 140 MOTION to Shorten Time to Hear 137 Motion for Modification of Order for Inspection and Sanctions MOTION to Shorten Time to Hear 137 Motion for Modification of Order for Inspection and Sanctions DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO VUITTON'S MOTION FOR SHORTENING OF TIME TO HEAR MOTION FOR MODIFICATION OF ORDER FOR INSPECTION AND SANCTIONS filed byAkanoc Solutions, Inc., Managed Solutions Group, Inc., Steven Chen. (Lowe, James) (Filed on 4/16/2009)
April 16, 2009 Featured Case Received Document Exhibit (submitted) under seal. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2009)
April 16, 2009 140 Featured Case MOTION to Shorten Time to Hear 137 Motion for Modification of Order for Inspection and Sanctions filed by Louis Vuitton Malletier, S.A.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Coombs, J.) (Filed on 4/16/2009) Modified on 4/16/2009,(counsel failed to properly link to motion.) (cv, COURT STAFF).
April 15, 2009 139 Featured Case MOTION to Seal Exhibit A to Plaintiff's 137 Notice and Motion for Modification of Order for Inspection and Sanctions; CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 138 filed by Louis Vuitton Malletier, S.A.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Coombs, J.) (Filed on 4/15/2009) Modified on 4/16/2009,(counsel failed to properly link to motion.) (cv, COURT STAFF).
April 14, 2009 138 Featured Case *** FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE DOCKET # 139 . *** MOTION to Seal Exhibit A to Plaintiff's Notice and Motion for Modification of Order for Inspection and Sanctions filed by Louis Vuitton Malletier, S.A.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Coombs, J.) (Filed on 4/14/2009) Modified on 4/15/2009 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
April 14, 2009 137 Featured Case MOTION for Modification of 124 Order for Inspection and Sanctions filed by Louis Vuitton Malletier, S.A.. Motion Hearing set for 5/26/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, San Jose. (Attachments: # 1 [Proposed] Order Granting Motion for Modification of Order for Inspection and Sanctions)(Coombs, J.) (Filed on 4/14/2009) Modified on 4/15/2009,(counsel failed to properly link to which document it relates to.) (cv, COURT STAFF).
March 26, 2009 136 Featured Case FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER - JURY TRIAL: Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/6/2009 03:00 PM, Jury Selection set for 8/18/2009 09:00AM, Conference re Jury Instructions set for 8/18/2009 at 1:00 PM, Jury Trial set for 8/19/2009 01:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Please see Order for further specifics. Signed by Judge James Ware on 3/25/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2009)
March 23, 2009 135 Featured Case Minute Entry: Interim Pretrial Conference (Date Filed: 3/23/2009). Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/6/2009 03:00 PM, Jury Trial set for 8/19/2009 01:00 PM, Jury Selection set for 8/18/2009 09:00AM. in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Court Reporter Unreported.) (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/23/2009)
March 16, 2009 134 Featured Case Reply to Opposition re 112 MOTION in Limine Defendants' Motion in Limine No. 9 to Exclude Testimony About the Genuineness of Goods filed byAkanoc Solutions, Inc., Managed Solutions Group, Inc., Steven Chen. (Attachments: # 1 Lowe Supplemental Declaration)(Lowe, James) (Filed on 3/16/2009)
March 16, 2009 133 Featured Case Reply to Opposition re 111 MOTION in Limine Defendants' Motion in Limine No. 8 to Redact All Exhibit References to IPCybercrime.com filed byAkanoc Solutions, Inc., Managed Solutions Group, Inc., Steven Chen. (Lowe, James) (Filed on 3/16/2009)
March 16, 2009 132 Featured Case Reply to Opposition re 110 MOTION in Limine Defendants' Motion in Limine No. 7 to Exclude Evidence Not Previously Disclosed in Initial and Supplemental Disclosures filed byAkanoc Solutions, Inc., Managed Solutions Group, Inc., Steven Chen. (Lowe, James) (Filed on 3/16/2009)
March 16, 2009 131 Featured Case Reply to Opposition re 109 MOTION in Limine Defendants' Motion in Limine No. 6 To Exclude Testimony About Pinging Internet Domains filed byAkanoc Solutions, Inc., Managed Solutions Group, Inc., Steven Chen. (Attachments: # 1 Lowe Supplemental Declaration)(Lowe, James) (Filed on 3/16/2009)
March 16, 2009 130 Featured Case Reply to Opposition re 108 MOTION in Limine Defendants' Motion in Limine No. 5 to Exclude Emails Sent Between Defendants and Their Customers Discussing Subsequent Remedial Measures filed byAkanoc Solutions, Inc., Managed Solutions Group, Inc., Steven Chen. (Lowe, James) (Filed on 3/16/2009)
March 16, 2009 129 Featured Case Reply to Opposition re 107 MOTION in Limine Defendants' Motion in Limine No. 4 to Exclude All Testimony About Counterfeiting in China filed byAkanoc Solutions, Inc., Managed Solutions Group, Inc., Steven Chen. (Lowe, James) (Filed on 3/16/2009)
March 16, 2009 128 Featured Case Reply to Opposition re 106 MOTION in Limine Defendants' Motion in Limine No. 3 to Exclude All Testimony About Defendants' Alleged Reputation filed byAkanoc Solutions, Inc., Managed Solutions Group, Inc., Steven Chen. (Lowe, James) (Filed on 3/16/2009)
March 16, 2009 127 Featured Case Reply to Opposition re 105 MOTION in Limine Defendants' Motion in Limine No. 2 to Exclude Internet Material and Testimony About Internet Material filed byAkanoc Solutions, Inc., Managed Solutions Group, Inc., Steven Chen. (Lowe, James) (Filed on 3/16/2009)
March 16, 2009 126 Featured Case Reply to Opposition re 104 MOTION in Limine Defendants' Motion in Limine #1 to Exclude Testimony of J. Andrew Coombs filed byAkanoc Solutions, Inc., Managed Solutions Group, Inc., Steven Chen. (Lowe, James) (Filed on 3/16/2009)
March 16, 2009 125 Featured Case Response to Vuitton's Objections to defendants' Proposed Jury Instructions filed by Akanoc Solutions, Inc., Managed Solutions Group, Inc., Steven Chen. (Lowe, James) (Filed on 3/16/2009) Modified on 3/18/2009 (cv, COURT STAFF).
March 10, 2009 124 Featured Case ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd re 94 Discovery Protocol. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2009)
March 9, 2009 123 Featured Case OBJECTIONS to Defendants' 103 Proposed Jury Instructions by Louis Vuitton Malletier, S.A.. (Coombs, J.) (Filed on 3/9/2009) Modified on 3/10/2009 (cv, COURT STAFF).
March 9, 2009 122 Featured Case Memorandum in Opposition re 112 MOTION in Limine Defendants' Motion in Limine No. 9 to Exclude Testimony About the Genuineness of Goods ; Declaration of J. Andrew Coombs, Exhibits in Support filed byLouis Vuitton Malletier, S.A.. (Coombs, J.) (Filed on 3/9/2009)
March 9, 2009 121 Featured Case Memorandum in Opposition re 111 MOTION in Limine Defendants' Motion in Limine No. 8 to Redact All Exhibit References to IPCybercrime.com filed byLouis Vuitton Malletier, S.A.. (Coombs, J.) (Filed on 3/9/2009)
March 9, 2009 120 Featured Case Memorandum in Opposition re 110 MOTION in Limine Defendants' Motion in Limine No. 7 to Exclude Evidence Not Previously Disclosed in Initial and Supplemental Disclosures ; Declaration of J. Andrew Coombs, Exhibits in Support filed byLouis Vuitton Malletier, S.A.. (Coombs, J.) (Filed on 3/9/2009)
March 9, 2009 119 Featured Case Memorandum in Opposition re 109 MOTION in Limine Defendants' Motion in Limine No. 6 To Exclude Testimony About Pinging Internet Domains ; Declaration of J. Andrew Coombs, Exhibits in Support filed byLouis Vuitton Malletier, S.A.. (Coombs, J.) (Filed on 3/9/2009)
March 9, 2009 118 Featured Case Memorandum in Opposition re 108 MOTION in Limine Defendants' Motion in Limine No. 5 to Exclude Emails Sent Between Defendants and Their Customers Discussing Subsequent Remedial Measures ; Declaration of J. Andrew Coombs, Exhibits in Support filed byLouis Vuitton Malletier, S.A.. (Coombs, J.) (Filed on 3/9/2009)
March 9, 2009 117 Featured Case Memorandum in Opposition re 107 MOTION in Limine Defendants' Motion in Limine No. 4 to Exclude All Testimony About Counterfeiting in China ; Declaration of J. Andrew Coombs, Exhibits in Support filed byLouis Vuitton Malletier, S.A.. (Coombs, J.) (Filed on 3/9/2009)
March 9, 2009 116 Featured Case Memorandum in Opposition re 106 MOTION in Limine Defendants' Motion in Limine No. 3 to Exclude All Testimony About Defendants' Alleged Reputation ; Declaration of J. Andrew Coombs, Exhibits in Support filed byLouis Vuitton Malletier, S.A.. (Coombs, J.) (Filed on 3/9/2009)
March 9, 2009 115 Featured Case Memorandum in Opposition re 105 MOTION in Limine Defendants' Motion in Limine No. 2 to Exclude Internet Material and Testimony About Internet Material ; Declaration of J. Andrew Cooombs, Exhibits in Support filed byLouis Vuitton Malletier, S.A.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A, B, C, D, E, F, # 2 Exhibits G, H, I, J, K, L)(Coombs, J.) (Filed on 3/9/2009)
March 9, 2009 114 Featured Case Memorandum in Opposition re 104 MOTION in Limine Defendants' Motion in Limine #1 to Exclude Testimony of J. Andrew Coombs ; Declaration of J. Andrew Coombs; Exhibits in Support filed byLouis Vuitton Malletier, S.A.. (Coombs, J.) (Filed on 3/9/2009)
March 2, 2009 113 Featured Case OBJECTIONS to re 101 Proposed Jury Instructions by Akanoc Solutions, Inc., Managed Solutions Group, Inc., Steven Chen. (Lowe, James) (Filed on 3/2/2009)
February 23, 2009 112 Featured Case MOTION in Limine Defendants' Motion in Limine No. 9 to Exclude Testimony About the Genuineness of Goods filed by Akanoc Solutions, Inc., Managed Solutions Group, Inc., Steven Chen. Motion Hearing set for 3/23/2009 03:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of James A. Lowe in Support of Motion in Limine No. 9)(Lowe, James) (Filed on 2/23/2009)
February 23, 2009 111 Featured Case MOTION in Limine Defendants' Motion in Limine No. 8 to Redact All Exhibit References to IPCybercrime.com filed by Akanoc Solutions, Inc., Managed Solutions Group, Inc., Steven Chen. Motion Hearing set for 3/23/2009 03:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Lowe, James) (Filed on 2/23/2009)
February 23, 2009 110 Featured Case MOTION in Limine Defendants' Motion in Limine No. 7 to Exclude Evidence Not Previously Disclosed in Initial and Supplemental Disclosures filed by Akanoc Solutions, Inc., Managed Solutions Group, Inc., Steven Chen. Motion Hearing set for 3/23/2009 03:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Lowe, James) (Filed on 2/23/2009)
February 23, 2009 109 Featured Case MOTION in Limine Defendants' Motion in Limine No. 6 To Exclude Testimony About Pinging Internet Domains filed by Akanoc Solutions, Inc., Managed Solutions Group, Inc., Steven Chen. Motion Hearing set for 3/23/2009 03:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of James A. Lowe in Support of Motion in Limine No. 6)(Lowe, James) (Filed on 2/23/2009)
February 23, 2009 108 Featured Case MOTION in Limine Defendants' Motion in Limine No. 5 to Exclude Emails Sent Between Defendants and Their Customers Discussing Subsequent Remedial Measures filed by Akanoc Solutions, Inc., Managed Solutions Group, Inc., Steven Chen. Motion Hearing set for 3/23/2009 03:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Lowe, James) (Filed on 2/23/2009)
February 23, 2009 107 Featured Case MOTION in Limine Defendants' Motion in Limine No. 4 to Exclude All Testimony About Counterfeiting in China filed by Akanoc Solutions, Inc., Managed Solutions Group, Inc., Steven Chen. Motion Hearing set for 3/23/2009 03:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of James A. Lowe in Support of Motion in Limine No. 4)(Lowe, James) (Filed on 2/23/2009)
February 23, 2009 106 Featured Case MOTION in Limine Defendants' Motion in Limine No. 3 to Exclude All Testimony About Defendants' Alleged Reputation filed by Akanoc Solutions, Inc., Managed Solutions Group, Inc., Steven Chen. Motion Hearing set for 3/23/2009 03:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of James A. Lowe in Support of Motion in Limine No. 3)(Lowe, James) (Filed on 2/23/2009)
February 23, 2009 105 Featured Case MOTION in Limine Defendants' Motion in Limine No. 2 to Exclude Internet Material and Testimony About Internet Material filed by Akanoc Solutions, Inc., Managed Solutions Group, Inc., Steven Chen. Motion Hearing set for 3/23/2009 03:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of James A. Lowe in Support of Motion in Limine No. 2)(Lowe, James) (Filed on 2/23/2009)
February 23, 2009 104 Featured Case MOTION in Limine Defendants' Motion in Limine #1 to Exclude Testimony of J. Andrew Coombs filed by Akanoc Solutions, Inc., Managed Solutions Group, Inc., Steven Chen. Motion Hearing set for 3/23/2009 03:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Lowe, James) (Filed on 2/23/2009)
February 23, 2009 103 Featured Case Proposed Jury Instructions by Akanoc Solutions, Inc., Managed Solutions Group, Inc., Steven Chen. (Attachments: # 1 Supplemental Jury Instruction No. 1, # 2 Supplemental Jury Instruction No. 2, # 3 Supplemental Jury Instruction No. 3, # 4 Supplemental Jury Instruction No. 4, # 5 Supplemental Jury Instruction No. 5, # 6 Supplemental Jury Instruction No. 6, # 7 Supplemental Jury Instruction No. 7, # 8 Supplemental Jury Instruction No. 8, # 9 Supplemental Jury Instruction No. 9, # 10 Supplemental Jury Instruction No. 10, # 11 Supplemental Jury Instruction No. 11, # 12 Supplemental Jury Instruction No. 12, # 13 Supplemental Jury Instruction No. 13, # 14 Supplemental Jury Instruction No. 14, # 15 Supplemental Jury Instruction No. 15, # 16 Supplemental Jury Instruction No. 16, # 17 Supplemental Jury Instruction No. 17)(Lowe, James) (Filed on 2/23/2009)
February 23, 2009 102 Featured Case Pretrial Conference Statement by Louis Vuitton Malletier, S.A.. (Coombs, J.) (Filed on 2/23/2009)
February 23, 2009 101 Featured Case Proposed Jury Instructions by Louis Vuitton Malletier, S.A.. (Coombs, J.) (Filed on 2/23/2009)
January 14, 2009 100 Featured Case NOTICE by Louis Vuitton Malletier, S.A. re 94 MOTION for an administrative order to set protocol re: discovery and MOTION to compel payment of costs by defendants re Partial Withdrawal of Administration Motion Filed November 10, 2008 (Wang, Annie) (Filed on 1/14/2009)
December 23, 2008 99 Featured Case ORDER by Judge James Ware granting in part and denying in part 47 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 73 Motion for Summary Judgment (jwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2008)
November 12, 2008 98 Featured Case Proposed Order re 94 Administrative Motion re Discovery Orders by Akanoc Solutions, Inc., Managed Solutions Group, Inc., Steven Chen. (Lowe, James) (Filed on 11/12/2008) Modified on 11/18/2008,(counsel failed to properly link to motion.) (cv, COURT STAFF).
November 12, 2008 97 Featured Case DECLARATION of Christopher Lai in Opposition to 94 MOTION for an administrative order to set protocol re: discovery and MOTION to compel payment of costs by defendants filed byAkanoc Solutions, Inc., Managed Solutions Group, Inc., Steven Chen. (Related document(s) 94 ) (Lowe, James) (Filed on 11/12/2008)
November 12, 2008 96 Featured Case DECLARATION of J. A. Lowe in Opposition re 94 MOTION for an administrative order to set protocol re: discovery and MOTION to compel payment of costs by defendants filed by Akanoc Solutions, Inc., Managed Solutions Group, Inc., Steven Chen. (Lowe, James) (Filed on 11/12/2008) Modified text on 11/18/2008 (cv, COURT STAFF).
November 12, 2008 95 Featured Case Memorandum in Opposition re 94 MOTION for an administrative order to set protocol re: discovery and MOTION to compel payment of costs by defendants Defendants' Opposition to Vuitton's Administrative Motion re Discovery Orders filed byAkanoc Solutions, Inc., Managed Solutions Group, Inc., Steven Chen. (Lowe, James) (Filed on 11/12/2008)
November 10, 2008 94 Featured Case MOTION for an ADMINISTRATIVE order re:RE DISCOVERY and MOTION to compel payment of costs by defendants; DECLARATION OF J. ANDREW COOMBS (Coombs, J.) (Filed on 11/10/2008) Modified on 11/12/2008,(counsel used incorrect event.)(cv, COURT STAFF).
September 15, 2008 93 Featured Case PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER - JURY TRIAL: Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/23/2009 03:00 PM, Jury Selection set for 4/7/2009 09:00 AM, Jury Trial set for 4/8/2009 1:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Please see Order for further specifics. Signed by Judge James Ware on 9/15/2008. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2008)
August 25, 2008 91 Featured Case EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS to the Coombs Declaration in Support of Vuitton's Opposition to defendants' Supplemental Motion for Summary Judgment by Akanoc Solutions, Inc., Managed Solutions Group, Inc., Steven Chen. (Lowe, James) (Filed on 8/25/2008) Modified on 8/26/2008 (cv, COURT STAFF).
August 25, 2008 90 Featured Case Reply Memorandum re 73 Supplemental MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Akanoc Solutions, Inc., Managed Solutions Group, Inc., Steven Chen. (Lowe, James) (Filed on 8/25/2008) Modified text on 8/26/2008 (cv, COURT STAFF).
August 25, 2008 89 Featured Case Response to Vuitton's Objections to Declarations and Exhibits Filed in Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Akanoc Solutions, Inc., Managed Solutions Group, Inc., Steven Chen. (Lowe, James) (Filed on 8/25/2008) Modified text on 8/26/2008 (cv, COURT STAFF).
August 25, 2008 88 Featured Case EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS to the Coombs 80 Declaration by Akanoc Solutions, Inc., Managed Solutions Group, Inc., Steven Chen. (Lowe, James) (Filed on 8/25/2008) Modified text on 8/26/2008 (cv, COURT STAFF).
August 25, 2008 87 Featured Case EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS to the Holmes 79 Declaration t by Akanoc Solutions, Inc., Managed Solutions Group, Inc., Steven Chen. (Lowe, James) (Filed on 8/25/2008) Modified text on 8/26/2008 (cv, COURT STAFF).
August 25, 2008 86 Featured Case EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS to the Livadkin 78 Declaration by Akanoc Solutions, Inc., Managed Solutions Group, Inc., Steven Chen. (Lowe, James) (Filed on 8/25/2008) Modified text on 8/26/2008 (cv, COURT STAFF).
August 25, 2008 85 Featured Case Declaration of James A. Lowe in Support of 47 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Akanoc Solutions, Inc., Managed Solutions Group, Inc., Steven Chen. (Related document(s) 47 ) (Lowe, James) (Filed on 8/25/2008) Modified text on 8/26/2008 (cv, COURT STAFF).
August 25, 2008 84 Featured Case REPLY to Response to Motion re 47 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Akanoc Solutions, Inc., Managed Solutions Group, Inc., Steven Chen. (Lowe, James) (Filed on 8/25/2008) Modified text on 8/26/2008 (cv, COURT STAFF).
August 22, 2008 83 Featured Case JOINT PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL AND TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE STATEMENT AND [PROPOSED] ORDER by Louis Vuitton Malletier, S.A.. (Coombs, J.) (Filed on 8/22/2008) Modified on 8/25/2008 (cv, COURT STAFF).
August 18, 2008 82 Featured Case Memorandum in Opposition re 73 Supplemental MOTION for Summary Judgment ; Declaration and Exhibits in Support filed byLouis Vuitton Malletier, S.A.. (Coombs, J.) (Filed on 8/18/2008)
August 18, 2008 81 Featured Case OBJECTIONS to re 51 Declaration in Support, 48 Declaration in Support, 49 Declaration in Support, by Louis Vuitton Malletier, S.A.. (Coombs, J.) (Filed on 8/18/2008)
August 18, 2008 80 Featured Case Declaration of J. Andrew Coombs in Support of 77 Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment; Exhibits thereto filed byLouis Vuitton Malletier, S.A.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A; Exhibit B; Exhibit C; Exhibit D, # 2 Exhibit E; Exhibit F)(Related document(s) 77 ) (Coombs, J.) (Filed on 8/18/2008)
August 18, 2008 79 Featured Case Declaration of Robert L. Holmes in Support of 77 Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment filed byLouis Vuitton Malletier, S.A.. (Related document(s) 77 ) (Coombs, J.) (Filed on 8/18/2008)
August 18, 2008 78 Featured Case Declaration of Nikolay Livadkin in Support of 77 Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment; Exhibits thereto filed byLouis Vuitton Malletier, S.A.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - 1 of 2, # 2 Exhibit A - 2 of 2, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C)(Related document(s) 77 ) (Coombs, J.) (Filed on 8/18/2008)
August 18, 2008 77 Featured Case Memorandum in Opposition re 47 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed byLouis Vuitton Malletier, S.A.. (Coombs, J.) (Filed on 8/18/2008)
August 7, 2008 76 Featured Case ORDER OVERRULING 69 Defendant's Objection to 65 Order to Compel. Signed by Judge James Ware on August 7, 2008. (jwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2008)
August 4, 2008 75 Featured Case Declaration of James A. Lowe in Support of 73 Supplemental MOTION for Summary Judgment filed byAkanoc Solutions, Inc., Managed Solutions Group, Inc., Steven Chen. (Related document(s) 73 ) (Lowe, James) (Filed on 8/4/2008)
August 4, 2008 74 Featured Case Declaration of Steve Chen in Support of 73 Supplemental MOTION for Summary Judgment filed byAkanoc Solutions, Inc., Managed Solutions Group, Inc., Steven Chen. (Related document(s) 73 ) (Lowe, James) (Filed on 8/4/2008)
August 4, 2008 73 Featured Case Supplemental MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Akanoc Solutions, Inc., Managed Solutions Group, Inc., Steven Chen. Motion Hearing set for 9/8/2008 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Lowe, James) (Filed on 8/4/2008)
July 29, 2008 72 Featured Case ANSWER to Amended Complaint Answer to First Amended Complaint; Demand for Jury Trial byAkanoc Solutions, Inc., Managed Solutions Group, Inc., Steven Chen. (Lowe, James) (Filed on 7/29/2008)
July 28, 2008 71 Featured Case AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR CONTRIBUTORY AND VICARIOUS TRADEMARK INFRINGEMENT; CONTRIBUTORY AND VICARIOUS COPYRIGHT INFRINGEMENT against Akanoc Solutions, Inc., Managed Solutions Group, Inc., Steven Chen. Filed byLouis Vuitton Malletier, S.A.. (Coombs, J.) (Filed on 7/28/2008)
July 28, 2008 70 Featured Case RELATED CASE ORDER: The court has reviewed the motion and determined that NO cases are related and NO reassignments shall occur. Signed by Judge James Ware on 7/25/2008. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2008)
July 25, 2008 69 Featured Case OBJECTIONS to re 65 Order on Motion to Compel Defendants' Objection to Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Production of Documents by Akanoc Solutions, Inc., Managed Solutions Group, Inc., Steven Chen. (Lowe, James) (Filed on 7/25/2008)
July 25, 2008 68 Featured Case ORDER Re: Related Cases. This case is NOT related to C 08-03255 HRL. Signed by Judge James Ware on 07/25/08. (jwlc3, COURT STAFF)(Filed on 7/25/2008)
July 25, 2008 67 Featured Case ORDER by Judge James Ware granting 64 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint; denying 66 Stipulation to continue Preliminary Pretrial Conference. (jwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2008)
July 16, 2008 66 Featured Case STIPULATION RE CONTINUANCE OF PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE by Louis Vuitton Malletier, S.A.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Continuance of Preliminary Pretrial Conference)(Coombs, J.) (Filed on 7/16/2008)
July 15, 2008 65 Featured Case ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd granting 30 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Documents. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2008)
July 15, 2008 64 Featured Case MOTION for Leave to File a First Amended Complaint; Declaration in Support filed by Louis Vuitton Malletier, S.A.. Motion Hearing set for 9/8/2008 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Attachments: # 1 PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF LEAVE TO FILE A FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT, # 2 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR: CONTRIBUTORY AND VICARIOUS TRADEMARK INFRINGEMENT; CONTRIBUTORY AND VICARIOUS COPYRIGHT INFRINGEMENT)(Coombs, J.) (Filed on 7/15/2008)
June 25, 2008 63 Featured Case ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd granting 59 Defendants' Motion for Leave to File Statement of Recent Decision. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2008)
June 23, 2008 62 Featured Case DECLARATION of J. Andrew Coombs re Defendants' Administrative 59 Motion to File a Statement of Recent Decision filed by Louis Vuitton Malletier, S.A.. (Coombs, J.) (Filed on 6/23/2008) Modified on 6/23/2008,(counsel failed to properly link to motion.) (cv, COURT STAFF).
June 20, 2008 61 Featured Case Proposed Order re 59 MOTION for leave to file statement of Recent Decision, by Akanoc Solutions, Inc., Managed Solutions Group, Inc., Steven Chen. (Lowe, James) (Filed on 6/20/2008) Modified on 6/23/2008 (cv, COURT STAFF).
June 20, 2008 60 Featured Case Declaration of Brian S. Edwards in Support of 59 Statement of Recent Decision, filed byAkanoc Solutions, Inc., Managed Solutions Group, Inc., Steven Chen. (Related document(s) 59 ) (Lowe, James) (Filed on 6/20/2008)
June 20, 2008 59 Featured Case MOTION for leave to file a Statement of Recent Decision filed by Akanoc Solutions, Inc., Managed Solutions Group, Inc., Steven Chen. (Lowe, James) (Filed on 6/20/2008) Modified on 6/23/2008,(counsel used incorrect event.) (cv, COURT STAFF).
June 19, 2008 57 Featured Case ORDER Granting 54 Motion to Seal Document. Signed by Judge James Ware on 6/19/2008. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2008)
June 6, 2008 56 Featured Case Minute Entry: Settlement Conference held on June 6, 2008 before Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd. Case did not settle. (Date Filed: 6/6/2008). () (pmc, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/6/2008)
May 30, 2008 58 Featured Case EXHIBITS 1502 AND 1502A UNDER SEAL (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2008)
May 30, 2008 55 Featured Case CLERK'S NOTICE re: Failure to E-File the proposed order and/or Failure to Register as an E-Filer (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2008)
May 30, 2008 Featured Case Proposed Order re 54 MOTION for leave to file under Seal PAGES 22-28 and 61-62 of exhibit 1502 of the deposition transcript by plaintiff Louis Vuitton Exhibit 1502 to Document 51 by Akanoc Solutions, Inc., Managed Solutions Group, Inc., Steven Chen. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2008)
May 30, 2008 Featured Case Received Redacted Version of Exhibit 1502 (SUBMITTED) under seal (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2008)
May 30, 2008 Featured Case Received EXHIBIT 1502 (SUBMITTED) under seal(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2008)
May 29, 2008 54 Featured Case MOTION for leave to file under Seal PAGES of the deposition transcript by plaintiff Louis Vuitton Exhibit 1502 to Document 51 filed by Akanoc Solutions, Inc., Managed Solutions Group, Inc., Steven Chen. (Attachments: # 1 Signature Page (Declarations/Stipulations) Declaration of James A. Lowe In Support thereof (Lowe, James) (Filed on 5/29/2008) Modified text on 5/30/2008 (cv, COURT STAFF).
May 20, 2008 53 Featured Case CLERK'S NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing from 6/23/2008 to 9/8/2008 re 47 Motion for Summary Judgment. Motion Hearing set for 9/8/2008 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2008)
May 19, 2008 52 Featured Case Proposed Order re 47 MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment by Akanoc Solutions, Inc., Managed Solutions Group, Inc., Steven Chen. (Lowe, James) (Filed on 5/19/2008)
May 19, 2008 51 Featured Case Declaration of James A. Lowe in Support of 47 MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment filed byAkanoc Solutions, Inc., Managed Solutions Group, Inc., Steven Chen. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1502, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 1503, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 1504)(Related document(s) 47 ) (Lowe, James) (Filed on 5/19/2008)
May 19, 2008 50 Featured Case Declaration of Will Lone in Support of 47 MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment filed byAkanoc Solutions, Inc., Managed Solutions Group, Inc., Steven Chen. (Related document(s) 47 ) (Lowe, James) (Filed on 5/19/2008)
May 19, 2008 49 Featured Case Declaration in Support of 47 MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment Declaration of Juliana Luk in Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment filed byAkanoc Solutions, Inc., Managed Solutions Group, Inc., Steven Chen. (Related document(s) 47 ) (Lowe, James) (Filed on 5/19/2008)
May 19, 2008 48 Featured Case Declaration of Steve Chen in Support of 47 MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment filed byAkanoc Solutions, Inc., Managed Solutions Group, Inc., Steven Chen. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1500, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 1501)(Related document(s) 47 ) (Lowe, James) (Filed on 5/19/2008)
May 19, 2008 47 Featured Case MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Akanoc Solutions, Inc., Managed Solutions Group, Inc., Steven Chen. Motion Hearing set for 6/23/2008 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Lowe, James) (Filed on 5/19/2008) Modified on 5/22/2008 (cv, COURT STAFF).
April 29, 2008 46 Featured Case Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 4/29/2008 before Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd (Date Filed: 4/29/2008) re 30 (Tape #FTR.) (pmc, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/29/2008)
April 28, 2008 45 Featured Case Declaration of J. Andrew Coombs in Support of 30 MOTION to Compel Production or Inspection of Electronic Records filed byLouis Vuitton Malletier, S.A.. (Related document(s) 30 ) (Coombs, J.) (Filed on 4/28/2008)
April 24, 2008 44 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER Granting Limited Enlargement of Discovery Cutoff Date from 4/28/2008 to 4/29/2008 re 43 Stipulation filed by Louis Vuitton Malletier, S.A. All other dates set in the November 15, 2007 scheduling order 23 remain unchanged: Last Date to Hear Dispositive Motions due by 6/30/2008. Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 9/8/2008 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge James Ware on 4/24/2008. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2008)
April 23, 2008 43 Featured Case STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING LIMITED ENLARGEMENT OF THE DISCOVERY CUT-OFF DATE by Louis Vuitton Malletier, S.A.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Coombs, J.) (Filed on 4/23/2008)
April 18, 2008 42 Featured Case OBJECTIONS to 40 Reply Brief and Accompanying Declarations of J. Andrew Coombs Filed by Louis Vuitton Malletier, S.A. In Support of Its Motion to Compel by Akanoc Solutions, Inc., Managed Solutions Group, Inc., Steven Chen. (Lowe, James) (Filed on 4/18/2008) Modified on 4/21/2008 (cv, COURT STAFF).
April 15, 2008 41 Featured Case ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd granting in part and denying in part 28 defendants' motion to compel plaintiff's deposition. Motion hearing set for 4/22/2008 is vacated. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2008)
April 15, 2008 40 Featured Case RESPONSE in Support of Plaintiff's 30 Motion to Compel Production or to Permit Inspection; Declaration of J. Andrew Coombs and Exhibits In Support filed by Louis Vuitton Malletier, S.A.. (Coombs, J.) (Filed on 4/15/2008) Modified on 4/15/2008,(counsel failed to link to motion.) (cv, COURT STAFF).
April 8, 2008 39 Featured Case DECLARATION of James A. Lowe in Opposition to 30 MOTION to Compel Production or Inspection of Electronic Records Declaration of James A. Lowe in Opposition to Motion to Compel Production of Electronic Communications on Internet Servers filed byAkanoc Solutions, Inc., Managed Solutions Group, Inc., Steven Chen. (Related document(s) 30 ) (Lowe, James) (Filed on 4/8/2008)
April 8, 2008 38 Featured Case DECLARATION of Steven Chen in Opposition to 30 MOTION to Compel Production or Inspection of Electronic Records Declaration of Steven Chen in Opposition to Motion to Compel Production of Electronic Communications on Internet Servers filed byAkanoc Solutions, Inc., Managed Solutions Group, Inc., Steven Chen. (Related document(s) 30 ) (Lowe, James) (Filed on 4/8/2008)
April 8, 2008 37 Featured Case Memorandum in Opposition re 30 MOTION to Compel Production or Inspection of Electronic Records Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition to Motion to Compel Production of Electronic Communications Contained on Internet Servers filed byAkanoc Solutions, Inc., Managed Solutions Group, Inc., Steven Chen. (Lowe, James) (Filed on 4/8/2008)
April 8, 2008 36 Featured Case OBJECTIONS to re 28 MOTION to Compel the Deposition of Plaintiff Louis Vuitton Malletier, S.A. Evidentiary Objections to the Declaration of J. Andrew Coombs by Akanoc Solutions, Inc., Managed Solutions Group, Inc., Steven Chen. (Lowe, James) (Filed on 4/8/2008)
April 8, 2008 35 Featured Case Declaration of James A. Lowe in Support of 28 MOTION to Compel the Deposition of Plaintiff Louis Vuitton Malletier, S.A. filed byAkanoc Solutions, Inc., Managed Solutions Group, Inc., Steven Chen. (Related document(s) 28 ) (Lowe, James) (Filed on 4/8/2008)
April 8, 2008 34 Featured Case Declaration of Steven Chen in Support of 28 MOTION to Compel the Deposition of Plaintiff Louis Vuitton Malletier, S.A. filed byAkanoc Solutions, Inc., Managed Solutions Group, Inc., Steven Chen. (Related document(s) 28 ) (Lowe, James) (Filed on 4/8/2008)
April 8, 2008 33 Featured Case Reply Memorandum re 28 MOTION to Compel the Deposition of Plaintiff Louis Vuitton Malletier, S.A. Reply Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Compel the Deposition of Plaintiff Louis Vuitton Malletier, S.A. filed byAkanoc Solutions, Inc., Managed Solutions Group, Inc., Steven Chen. (Lowe, James) (Filed on 4/8/2008)
April 2, 2008 32 Featured Case MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 28 MOTION to Compel the Deposition of Plaintiff Louis Vuitton Malletier, S.A. filed byLouis Vuitton Malletier, S.A.. (Related document(s) 28 ) (Coombs, J.) (Filed on 4/2/2008)
March 26, 2008 31 Featured Case NOTICE by Akanoc Solutions, Inc., Managed Solutions Group, Inc., Steven Chen Request for Removal of George K. Rosenstock from the Court's Service List (Lowe, James) (Filed on 3/26/2008)
March 25, 2008 30 Featured Case MOTION to Compel Production or Inspection of Electronic Records filed by Louis Vuitton Malletier, S.A.. Motion Hearing set for 4/29/2008 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, San Jose. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Compel Production or Inspection of Electronic Records)(Coombs, J.) (Filed on 3/25/2008)
March 11, 2008 29 Featured Case Declaration of Brian S. Edwards In Support of 28 Motion to Compel Deposition of Plaintiff Louis Vuitton, S.A. filed by Akanoc Solutions, Inc., Managed Solutions Group, Inc., Steven Chen. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to Edwards Declaration, # 2 Exhibit B to Edwards Declaration, # 3 Exhibit C to Edwards Declaration, # 4 Exhibit D to Edwards Declaration)(Lowe, James) (Filed on 3/11/2008) Modified on 3/12/2008,(counsel failed to link to motion.) (cv, COURT STAFF).
March 11, 2008 28 Featured Case MOTION to Compel the Deposition of Plaintiff Louis Vuitton Malletier, S.A. filed by Akanoc Solutions, Inc., Managed Solutions Group, Inc., Steven Chen. Motion Hearing set for 4/22/2008 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, San Jose. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order on Motion to Compel Deposition of Plaintiff Louis Vuitton Malletier, S.A.)(Lowe, James) (Filed on 3/11/2008)
March 6, 2008 27 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER continuing settlement conference. Settlement conference continued to 6/6/2008, 9:30 a.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 3/6/2008. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2008)
March 5, 2008 26 Featured Case Proposed Order Granting 25 Continuance of Settlement Conference Hearing from 4/4/08 at 9:30am to 6/6/08 at 9:30am. by Louis Vuitton Malletier, S.A.. (Coombs, J.) (Filed on 3/5/2008) Modified on 3/6/2008 (cv, COURT STAFF).
March 5, 2008 25 Featured Case STIPULATION Re Continuance of Settlement Conference by Louis Vuitton Malletier, S.A.. (Coombs, J.) (Filed on 3/5/2008)
January 4, 2008 24 Featured Case CLERK'S NOTICE of Settlement Conference and Order. Settlement Conference set for 4/4/2007 09:30 AM. before Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd. (pmc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2008)
November 20, 2007 Featured Case ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference conducted on 11/20/07 by HAH. Parties to contact referral judge for a settlement conference. (tjs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2007)
November 16, 2007 Featured Case ADR Remark: The ADR Phone Conference has been rescheduled to 2:30 p.m. on 11/20/07. (tjs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2007)
November 15, 2007 23 Featured Case SCHEDULING ORDER: The Case Management Conference set for 11/19/2007 is VACATED. The parties are order to comply with the following schedule: Close of All Discovery due by 4/28/2008. Last Date to Hear Dispositive Motions due by 6/30/2008. Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 9/8/2008 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Please see Order for further specifics. Signed by Judge James Ware on 11/14/2007. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2007)
November 15, 2007 Featured Case ADR Remark: The ADR Phone Conference has been rescheduled to 3:00 p.m. on 11/16/07. (tjs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2007)
November 9, 2007 22 Featured Case ADR Clerks Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference on 11/15/07 at 2:30 p.m. Please take note that plaintiff's counsel initiates the call to all parties. (tjs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2007)
November 8, 2007 21 Featured Case JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT and [Proposed] Order filed by Louis Vuitton Malletier, S.A.. (Coombs, J.) (Filed on 11/8/2007)
November 8, 2007 20 Featured Case ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5b) of discussion of ADR options (Coombs, J.) (Filed on 11/8/2007)
November 2, 2007 19 Featured Case STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER (MODIFIED BY THE COURT) re 15 Stipulated Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 11/2/2007. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2007) Modified to create case relationship on 11/5/2007 (ecg, COURT STAFF).
November 1, 2007 18 Featured Case NOTICE of need for ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d) (Coombs, J.) (Filed on 11/1/2007)
October 29, 2007 17 Featured Case ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5b) of discussion of ADR options ADR Certification by Parties and Counsel (Lowe, James) (Filed on 10/29/2007)
October 29, 2007 16 Featured Case Case Assigned to Judge Howard R. Lloyd as referral judge. (sp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2007)
October 25, 2007 15 Featured Case STIPULATION Stipulation and [Proposed] Protective Order by Akanoc Solutions, Inc.. (Lowe, James) (Filed on 10/25/2007)
October 10, 2007 14 Featured Case CLERK'S NOTICE re: Failure to E-File complaint and/or Failure to Register as an E-Filer (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2007)
September 10, 2007 13 Featured Case ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byAkanoc Solutions, Inc., Managed Solutions Group, Inc.. (Lowe, James) (Filed on 9/10/2007)
September 6, 2007 12 Featured Case NOTICE of Change of Address by J. Andrew Coombs (Coombs, J.) (Filed on 9/6/2007)
August 27, 2007 11 Featured Case CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of summons and complaint as to defendant Steven Chen by Louis Vuitton Malletier, S.A. (Coombs, J.) (Filed on 8/27/2007) Modified text on 9/11/2007 (cv, COURT STAFF).
August 27, 2007 10 Featured Case CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of summons and complaint as to defendant Managed Solutions Group Inc. by Louis Vuitton Malletier, S.A. (Coombs, J.) (Filed on 8/27/2007) Modified text on 9/11/2007 (cv, COURT STAFF).
August 27, 2007 9 Featured Case CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of summons and complaint as to defendant Akanoc Solutions Inc. by Louis Vuitton Malletier, S.A. (Coombs, J.) (Filed on 8/27/2007) Modified text on 9/11/2007 (cv, COURT STAFF).
August 8, 2007 8 Featured Case CLERK'S NOTICE Resetting Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 11/9/2007. Case Management Conference set for 11/19/2007 10:00 AM Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. James Ware. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2007)
August 7, 2007 7 Featured Case ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge James Ware for all further proceedings. Judge Maria-Elena James no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 8/7/07. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2007)
August 6, 2007 6 Featured Case CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (bjt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2007)
August 2, 2007 5 Featured Case REPORT on the filing of an action regarding TRADEMARK INFRINGEMENT (cc: form mailed to register). (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2007)
August 1, 2007 4 Featured Case Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge by Louis Vuitton Malletier, S.A.. (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2007) Additional attachment(s) added on 10/23/2007 (cv, COURT STAFF).
August 1, 2007 3 Featured Case Certificate of Interested Entities by Louis Vuitton Malletier, S.A. (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2007) Additional attachment(s) added on 10/23/2007 (cv, COURT STAFF).
August 1, 2007 Featured Case CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2007)
August 1, 2007 2 Featured Case ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 11/1/2007. Case Management Conference set for 11/8/2007 10:00 AM.. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 8/1/07. (Attachments: # 1 Judge Standing Order# 2 Court Standing Order# 3 Consent/Decline Form)(ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2007)
August 1, 2007 1 Featured Case COMPLAINT /issued summons against Akanoc Solutions, Inc., Managed Solutions Group, Inc., Steven Chen ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 34611008940.). Filed byLouis Vuitton Malletier, S.A.. (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2007) Additional attachment(s) added on 10/23/2007 (cv, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Louis Vuitton Malletier, S.A. v. Akanoc Solutions, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louis Vuitton Malletier, S.A.
Represented By: Annie S Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Akanoc Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Managed Solutions Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Chen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?