Mandrigues et al-v-World Savings, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Wilma R Minyen, Charles R. Whipple, Juanita Jones, Christina Clausen, Dolores Mandrigues, Bonnie Mincey and Mark Clausen
Defendant: World Savings Bank, World Savings, Inc., FSB and Wachovia Mortgage Corporation
Not Classified By Court: Susan Nava, Chad Ryan, Andy Nava, Michael V. Hargett and Nathaniel C. Dayton
Case Number: 5:2007cv04497
Filed: August 30, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Jeremy Fogel
Referring Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1601
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2011. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2011 Filing 222 NOTICE by Dolores Mandrigues OF FIRM AND ADDRESS CHANGE (Arbogast, David) (Filed on 11/1/2011)
September 27, 2011 Filing 221 ****FILED IN ERROR - DISREGARD****ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Edward J. Davila for all further proceedings. Judge Jeremy Fogel no longer assigned to the case.Signed by The Executive Committee on 09/27/2011. (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2011) Modified on 9/29/2011 (sp, COURT STAFF).
May 17, 2011 Filing 220 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 5/17/2011. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2011)
May 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 219 ORDER (1) GRANTING FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT; (2) ADDRESSING OBJECTIONS; (3) DENYING MARCELLA ROSE'S MOTION TO INTERVENE; (4) APPROVING SERVICE PAYMENTS TO CLASS REPRESENTATIVES; AND (5) AWARDING ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 5/17/2011. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2011)
April 29, 2011 Filing 218 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 4/29/2011 before Judge Jeremy Fogel (Date Filed: 4/29/2011) re (157 in 5:09-md-02015-JF) MOTION to Certify Class and Final Approval of Settlement, (117 in 5:09-md-02015-JF) MOTION for Attorney Fees. The Court takes the motions under submission. (Court Reporter Summer Fisher.) (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/29/2011)
April 29, 2011 Filing 217 NOTICE by Nathaniel C. Dayton (Dominguez, Adriana) (Filed on 4/29/2011)
April 29, 2011 Filing 216 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Charles R. Whipple re #215 MOTION to Intervene (Dominguez, Adriana) (Filed on 4/29/2011)
April 29, 2011 Filing 215 MOTION to Intervene filed by Charles R. Whipple. Motion Hearing set for 4/29/2011 09:00 AM before Hon. Jeremy Fogel. (Dominguez, Adriana) (Filed on 4/29/2011)
April 18, 2011 Filing 214 NOTICE by Michael V. Hargett re (205 in 5:07-cv-04497-JF, 136 in 5:09-md-02015-JF) MOTION to Compel, (133 in 5:09-md-02015-JF) MOTION to Quash DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO QUASH OBJECTOR MICHAEL V. HARGETT'S SUBPOENA OF CORPORATE REPRESENTATIVE (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2011)
April 18, 2011 ***Deadlines terminated. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2011)
April 8, 2011 Filing 213 Proposed Order re (133 in 5:09-md-02015-JF) MOTION to Quash DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO QUASH OBJECTOR MICHAEL V. HARGETT'S SUBPOENA OF CORPORATE REPRESENTATIVE by Michael V. Hargett. (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2011)
April 8, 2011 Filing 212 OPPOSITION to Motion to Quash filed byMichael V. Hargett. (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2011)
April 6, 2011 Filing 211 Letter from Michael V. Hargett. (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2011)
April 6, 2011 Filing 210 Proposed Order re (209 in 5:07-cv-04497-JF, 140 in 5Nathaniel C. Dayton,:09-md-02015-JF) MOTION to Appear by Telephone by Michael V. Hargett. (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2011) .
April 6, 2011 Filing 209 MOTION to Appear by Telephone filed by Michael V. Hargett. (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2011) .
April 6, 2011 Filing 208 Proposed Order re (138 in 5:09-md-02015-JF, 207 in 5:07-cv-04497-JF) MOTION to Shorten Time by Michael V. Hargett(gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2011) .
April 6, 2011 Filing 207 MOTION to Shorten Time filed by Michael V. Hargett. (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2011) .
April 6, 2011 Filing 206 Proposed Order re (205 in 5:07-cv-04497-JF, 136 in 5:09-md-02015-JF) MOTION to Compel by Michael V. Hargett. (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2011) .
April 6, 2011 Filing 205 MOTION to Compel filed by Michael V. Hargett. Motion Hearing set for 5/10/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2011).
March 18, 2011 Filing 204 OBJECTION to Proposed Settlement, Payment of Fees and Expenses to Class Counsel, and Entry of Judgment and Order of Dismissal and MOTION to Postpone Approval of Proposed Settlement to Permit Further Evaluation of Newly Revealed/Discovered Evidence by Nathaniel C. Dayton, Chad Ryan, Andy Nava, Susan Nava. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit I - L, #2 Page #2 to Objection)(gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2011)
March 1, 2011 Filing 203 NOTICE of Intent to Appear and Object to Settlement, Payment of Fees and Expenses to Class Counsel, and Entry of Judgment and Order of Dismissal by Michael V. Hargett (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2011)
March 1, 2011 Filing 202 REQUEST for Admissions to Defendant, Wachovia Mortgage Corporation by Michael V. Hargett. (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2011)
March 1, 2011 Filing 201 MEMORANDUM in Support re #199 Objection filed byMichael V. Hargett. (Related document(s) #199 ) (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2011)
March 1, 2011 Filing 200 AFFIDAVIT in support of #199 Objection by Michael V. Hargett. (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2011) .
March 1, 2011 Filing 199 OBJECTION to Proposed Settlement, Payment of Fees and Expensses to Class Counsel, and Entry of Judgment and Order of Dismissal by Michael V. Hargett. (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2011)
December 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 198 ORDER: (1) PROVISIONALLY CERTIFYING A SETTLEMENT CLASS; (2) PRELIMINARILY APPROVING CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT; (3) APPOINTING CLASS REPRESENTATIVES, CLASS COUNSEL AND SETTLEMENT ADMINISTRATOR; (4) APPROVING FORM AND METHODS OF CLASS NOTICE; AND (5) SCHEDULING HEARING ON MOTIONS FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT AND PAYMENT OF ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS. Motion Hearing set for 4/29/2011 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Jeremy Fogel. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 12/16/2010. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2010)
December 6, 2010 Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal for all discovery purposes. Magistrate Judge Patricia V. Trumbull no longer assigned to the case.(mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2010)
October 20, 2010 Filing 197 CLERKS NOTICE The Motion Hearing and Case Management Conference set for 10/28/2010 are VACATED. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2010)
September 10, 2010 Filing 196 CLERKS NOTICE The Motion Hearing and Case Management Conference set for 9/16/2010 are CONTINUED to 10/28/2010 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2010)
August 18, 2010 Filing 195 CLERKS NOTICE The court has reviewed the motion and determined that no cases are related and no reassignments shall occur. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2010)
July 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 194 ORDER RELATING HOLMES ACTION by Judge Jeremy Fogel.(jflc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2010)
June 24, 2010 Filing 193 CLERKS NOTICE The Motion Hearing and Case Management Conference set for 7/1/2010 are CONTINUED to 9/16/2010 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2010)
June 14, 2010 Filing 192 CLERKS NOTICE Advising Counsel of Change in MDL Master Case Number Format (sp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2010)
May 17, 2010 Filing 191 CLERKS NOTICE The Motion Hearing set for 5/20/2010 is CONTINUED to 7/1/2010 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2010)
February 24, 2010 Filing 190 CLERKS NOTICE The Motion Hearing set for 3/11/2010 is CONTINUED to 5/20/2010 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2010)
February 1, 2010 Filing 189 CLERKS NOTICE The Motion Hearing set for 2/5/2010 is CONTINUED to 3/11/2010 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2010)
January 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 188 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Patricia V. Trumbull for all further discovery matters. Judge Richard Seeborg no longer assigned to the case.Signed by The Executive Committee on 01/12/2010. (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2010)
August 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 187 RELATED CASE ORDER. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 8/11/09. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2009)
April 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 186 ORDER DESIGNATING CLASS COUNSEL STRUCTURE. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 4/13/09. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2009)
April 3, 2009 Filing 185 NOTICE by Dolores Mandrigues OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-2) (Arbogast, David) (Filed on 4/3/2009)
April 2, 2009 Filing 184 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Dolores Mandrigues re #183 Status Report RE: CLASS COUNSEL STRUCTURE; and [PROPOSED] ORDER (Arbogast, David) (Filed on 4/2/2009)
April 2, 2009 Filing 183 STATUS REPORT RE: CLASS COUNSEL STRUCTURE by Dolores Mandrigues. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Arbogast, David) (Filed on 4/2/2009)
March 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 182 ORDER RE #171 MOTIONS FOR APPOINTMENT OF LEAD COUNSEL AND TO SHORTEN TIME. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 3/26/09. (jflc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2009)
March 18, 2009 Filing 181 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian Stephen Kabateck For Plaintiffs And The Putative Class (Kabateck, Brian) (Filed on 3/18/2009)
March 17, 2009 Filing 180 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Dolores Mandrigues re #178 Response in Support, #179 Declaration in Support, MANDRIGUES PLAINTIFFS REPLY TO SOUTH CAROLINA ATTORNEYS OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF LEAD COUNSEL (Arbogast, David) (Filed on 3/17/2009)
March 17, 2009 Filing 179 Declaration of Steven M Bronson in Support of #178 Response in Support of MANDRIGUES PLAINTIFFS REPLY TO SOUTH CAROLINA ATTORNEYS OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF LEAD COUNSEL filed byDolores Mandrigues. (Related document(s) #178 ) (Arbogast, David) (Filed on 3/17/2009)
March 16, 2009 Filing 178 REPLY TO SOUTH CAROLINA ATTORNEYS #176 OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF LEAD COUNSEL filed byDolores Mandrigues. (Arbogast, David) (Filed on 3/16/2009) Modified on 3/17/2009 (gm, COURT STAFF).
March 13, 2009 Filing 177 Reply Memorandum re #171 MOTION to Shorten Time TO HEAR MANDRIGUES PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF LEAD COUNSEL Defendants' Response To Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion For Order Shortening Time And Motion for Appointment Of Lead Counsel In MDL Proceedings filed byWachovia Mortgage Corporation, World Savings, Inc., World Savings Bank. (Nelson, Jack) (Filed on 3/13/2009)
March 13, 2009 Filing 176 Memorandum in Opposition re #171 MOTION to Shorten Time TO HEAR MANDRIGUES PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF LEAD COUNSEL filed byBonnie Mincey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Daniel O. Myers, #2 Exhibit B - Proposed Case Management Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(Myers, Daniel) (Filed on 3/13/2009)
March 12, 2009 Filing 175 NOTICE by Dolores Mandrigues OF FILING OF NOTICE OF OPPOSITION OF POTENTIAL TAG-ALONG ACTION AND ORDER (Arbogast, David) (Filed on 3/12/2009)
March 12, 2009 Filing 174 NOTICE by Dolores Mandrigues OF FILING OF POTENTIAL TAG-ALONG ACTIONS (Arbogast, David) (Filed on 3/12/2009)
March 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ORDER RE MOTIONS FOR APPOINTMENT OF LEAD COUNSEL AND TO SHORTEN TIME. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 3/5/09. (jflc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2009)
March 4, 2009 Filing 172 NOTICE by Juanita Jones, Wilma R Minyen, Mark Clausen, Christina Clausen, Dolores Mandrigues re #171 MOTION to Shorten Time TO HEAR MANDRIGUES PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF LEAD COUNSEL NOTICE OF ERRATA-Motion for Appointment of Lead Counsel incorrectly contained a divider marked Exhibit B instead of "Exhibit A" (Berns, Jeffrey) (Filed on 3/4/2009)
March 4, 2009 Filing 171 MOTION to Shorten Time TO HEAR MANDRIGUES PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF LEAD COUNSEL filed by Juanita Jones, Wilma R Minyen, Mark Clausen, Christina Clausen, Dolores Mandrigues. Motion Hearing set for 3/10/2009 09:00 AM. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Motion for Appointment of Lead Counsel, #2 Exhibit B- with Exhibits 1-3, #3 Exhibit B- Exhibits 4-5, #4 Exhibit B- with exhibits 6-12, #5 Exhibit B- Exhibit 13-17, #6 Exhibit B- With Exhibits 18-21, #7 Exhibit B- with Exhibit 22-24, #8 Proposed Order, #9 Affidavit Certificate of Service)(Berns, Jeffrey) (Filed on 3/4/2009)
March 3, 2009 Filing 170 NOTICE by Dolores Mandrigues OF FILING OF POTENTIAL TAG-ALONG ACTION (Arbogast, David) (Filed on 3/3/2009)
March 3, 2009 Filing 169 NOTICE by Dolores Mandrigues OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-1) (Arbogast, David) (Filed on 3/3/2009)
February 13, 2009 Filing 168 NOTICE by Dolores Mandrigues OF RULING (Arbogast, David) (Filed on 2/13/2009)
February 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 167 ORDER by Judge Jeremy Fogel granting #164 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Christopher A. Seeger (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2009)
February 11, 2009 Filing 166 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Jeffrey K Berns (Berns, Jeffrey) (Filed on 2/11/2009)
January 30, 2009 Filing 163 NOTICE of Appearance by David M. Arbogast OF ERIC M. GEORGE FOR PLAINTIFFS AND THE PUTATIVE CLASS (Arbogast, David) (Filed on 1/30/2009)
January 29, 2009 Filing 165 Proposed Order re #164 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 210.00, receipt number 54611005499.) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 210.00, receipt number 54611005499.) by Juanita Jones, Wilma R Minyen, Mark Clausen, Christina Clausen, Dolores Mandrigues. (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2009)
January 29, 2009 Filing 164 MOTION for Attorney Christopher A. Seeger for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 210.00, receipt number 54611005499.) filed by Juanita Jones, Wilma R Minyen, Mark Clausen, Christina Clausen, Dolores Mandrigues. (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2009)
January 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 159 ORDER by Judge Jeremy Fogel granting #106 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Christopher A. Seeger. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2009)
January 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER DENYING #85 MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AND ENTERING STAY OF ACTION pending a decision by the JPML. Plaintiffs motion for class certification will be terminated without prejudice, and may be re-noticed following and in accordance with the JPMLs decision. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 1/20/09. (jflc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2009) Modified on 9/28/2011 (cv, COURT STAFF).
January 18, 2009 Filing 156 Proposed Order re #106 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 210.00, receipt number 54611004312.) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 210.00, receipt number 54611004312.) Christopher A. Seeger by Dolores Mandrigues. (Arbogast, David) (Filed on 1/18/2009)
January 16, 2009 Filing 158 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 1/16/2009 before Judge Jeremy Fogel (Date Filed: 1/16/2009) re #81 MOTION to Certify Class, #85 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. The motions are taken under submission. Further Case Management Conference held on 1/16/2009 before Judge Jeremy Fogel (Date Filed: 1/16/2009). (Court Reporter Summer Clanton.) (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/16/2009)
January 15, 2009 Filing 162 EXHIBITS F,H,J,L and N to Declaration (FILED UNDER SEAL) filed byError: party not known. (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2009) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/11/2017: #1 162-2) (bwS, COURT STAFF).
January 15, 2009 Filing 161 EXHIBITS a-C to Declaration (FILED UNDER SEAL) filed byError: party not known. (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2009) (bwS, COURT STAFF).
January 15, 2009 Filing 160 EXHIBITS A and D to Declaration (FILED UNDER SEAL) filed byError: party not known. (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2009) (bwS, COURT STAFF).
January 15, 2009 Filing 155 Declaration of Jeffrey Berns in response to Court Order limiting Argument filed byJuanita Jones, Wilma R Minyen, Mark Clausen, Christina Clausen, Dolores Mandrigues. (Berns, Jeffrey) (Filed on 1/15/2009)
January 15, 2009 Filing 154 Declaration of David Mandel in response to Court Order limiting Argument filed byJuanita Jones, Wilma R Minyen, Mark Clausen, Christina Clausen, Dolores Mandrigues. (Berns, Jeffrey) (Filed on 1/15/2009)
January 15, 2009 Filing 153 Declaration of Margery Golant in response to Court Order limiting Argument filed byJuanita Jones, Wilma R Minyen, Mark Clausen, Christina Clausen, Dolores Mandrigues. (Berns, Jeffrey) (Filed on 1/15/2009)
January 15, 2009 Filing 152 Declaration of Sean O'Toole in response to Court Order limiting Argument filed byJuanita Jones, Wilma R Minyen, Mark Clausen, Christina Clausen, Dolores Mandrigues. (Berns, Jeffrey) (Filed on 1/15/2009)
January 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ORDER by Judge Jeremy Fogel granting #132 Motion to Seal. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2009)
January 15, 2009 Filing 150 OBJECTIONS to re #146 Declaration in Support, #144 Declaration in Support : Defendants' Objections to Evidence Filed in Support of Plaintiffs' Reply Re: Motion for Class certification and Reply Re: Application for Preliminary Injunction by Wachovia Mortgage Corporation. (Adornato, Alicia) (Filed on 1/15/2009)
January 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER LIMITING SCOPE OF ORAL ARGUMENT ON PENDING MOTIONS. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 1/14/09. (jflc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2009)
January 12, 2009 Filing 148 Reply Memorandum in Support of Preliminary Injunction filed byJuanita Jones, Wilma R Minyen, Mark Clausen, Christina Clausen, Dolores Mandrigues. (Berns, Jeffrey) (Filed on 1/12/2009)
January 12, 2009 Filing 147 Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion for Class Certification filed byJuanita Jones, Wilma R Minyen, Mark Clausen, Christina Clausen, Dolores Mandrigues. (Berns, Jeffrey) (Filed on 1/12/2009)
January 12, 2009 Filing 146 Declaration of Alicia Minyen in Support filed byJuanita Jones, Wilma R Minyen, Mark Clausen, Christina Clausen, Dolores Mandrigues. (Berns, Jeffrey) (Filed on 1/12/2009)
January 12, 2009 Filing 145 Declaration of Richard Minyen in Support filed byJuanita Jones, Wilma R Minyen, Mark Clausen, Christina Clausen, Dolores Mandrigues. (Berns, Jeffrey) (Filed on 1/12/2009)
January 12, 2009 Filing 144 Declaration of Steven Bronson In Support filed byJuanita Jones, Wilma R Minyen, Mark Clausen, Christina Clausen, Dolores Mandrigues. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 13-15)(Berns, Jeffrey) (Filed on 1/12/2009)
January 12, 2009 Filing 143 OBJECTIONS to #119 Roberts Declaration in Opposition by Juanita Jones, Wilma R Minyen, Mark Clausen, Christina Clausen, Dolores Mandrigues. (Berns, Jeffrey) (Filed on 1/12/2009) Modified on 1/13/2009 (gm, COURT STAFF).
January 12, 2009 Filing 142 OBJECTIONS to #121 Goldberg Declaration in Opposition by Juanita Jones, Wilma R Minyen, Mark Clausen, Christina Clausen, Dolores Mandrigues. (Berns, Jeffrey) (Filed on 1/12/2009) Modified on 1/13/2009 (gm, COURT STAFF).
January 12, 2009 Filing 141 OBJECTIONS to #117 Request for Judicial Notice in Opposition by Juanita Jones, Wilma R Minyen, Mark Clausen, Christina Clausen, Dolores Mandrigues. (Berns, Jeffrey) (Filed on 1/12/2009) Modified on 1/13/2009 (gm, COURT STAFF).
January 12, 2009 Filing 140 OBJECTIONS to #118 Hairr Declaration in Opposition by Juanita Jones, Wilma R Minyen, Mark Clausen, Christina Clausen, Dolores Mandrigues. (Berns, Jeffrey) (Filed on 1/12/2009) Modified on 1/13/2009 (gm, COURT STAFF).
January 12, 2009 Filing 139 OBJECTIONS to #120 Donigan Declaration in Opposition by Juanita Jones, Wilma R Minyen, Mark Clausen, Christina Clausen, Dolores Mandrigues. (Berns, Jeffrey) (Filed on 1/12/2009) Modified on 1/13/2009 (gm, COURT STAFF).
January 12, 2009 Filing 138 OBJECTIONS to #116 Barone Declaration in Opposition by Juanita Jones, Wilma R Minyen, Mark Clausen, Christina Clausen, Dolores Mandrigues. (Berns, Jeffrey) (Filed on 1/12/2009) Modified on 1/13/2009 (gm, COURT STAFF).
January 12, 2009 Filing 137 Declaration of Ted Scholz in Support of #114 Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification and Application for Preliminary Injunction: Supplemental Declaration filed byWachovia Mortgage Corporation. (Related document(s) #114 ) (Adornato, Alicia) (Filed on 1/12/2009)
January 8, 2009 Filing 136 STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d in Support of Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification and Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Application for a Preliminary Injunction filed byWachovia Mortgage Corporation. (Adornato, Alicia) (Filed on 1/8/2009)
January 5, 2009 Received Exhibits A and D to Declaration (FILED UNDER SEAL). (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2009)
January 5, 2009 Received Exhibits A-C to Declaration (FILED UNDER SEAL). (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2009)
January 5, 2009 Received Exhibits F,H,J,L and N to Declaration (FILED UNDER SEAL). (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2009)
January 5, 2009 Filing 135 Declaration of John Frangoulis in Support of #114 Memorandum in Opposition : Supplemental Declaration filed byWachovia Mortgage Corporation, World Savings Bank. (Related document(s) #114 ) (Yandell, Keith) (Filed on 1/5/2009)
January 5, 2009 Filing 134 NOTICE by Wachovia Mortgage Corporation, World Savings Bank re #114 Memorandum in Opposition of Manual Filing of Documents In Opposition to PI and Class Certification Motions (Yandell, Keith) (Filed on 1/5/2009)
January 5, 2009 Filing 133 Declaration of Keith D. Yandell in Support of #132 MOTION to Seal Documents in Opposition to PI and Class Certification Motions MOTION to Seal Document filed byWachovia Mortgage Corporation, World Savings Bank. (Related document(s) #132 ) (Yandell, Keith) (Filed on 1/5/2009)
January 5, 2009 Filing 132 MOTION to Seal Documents in Opposition to PI and Class Certification Motions, MOTION to Seal Document filed by Wachovia Mortgage Corporation, World Savings Bank. Motion Hearing set for 1/16/2009 09:00 AM. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Yandell, Keith) (Filed on 1/5/2009)
January 5, 2009 Filing 131 Declaration of Ron Tremblay in Support of #114 Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification filed byWachovia Mortgage Corporation. (Related document(s) #114 ) (Adornato, Alicia) (Filed on 1/5/2009)
January 5, 2009 Filing 130 Declaration of Tracy Henson in Support of #114 Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification filed byWachovia Mortgage Corporation. (Related document(s) #114 ) (Adornato, Alicia) (Filed on 1/5/2009)
January 5, 2009 Filing 129 Declaration of John Campbell in Support of #114 Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification filed byWachovia Mortgage Corporation. (Related document(s) #114 ) (Adornato, Alicia) (Filed on 1/5/2009)
January 5, 2009 Filing 128 Certificate of Interested Entities by Wachovia Mortgage Corporation, World Savings Bank -SUPPLEMENTAL CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES (Yandell, Keith) (Filed on 1/5/2009)
January 5, 2009 Filing 127 Declaration of David Johnston in Support of #114 Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification filed byWachovia Mortgage Corporation. (Related document(s) #114 ) (Adornato, Alicia) (Filed on 1/5/2009)
January 5, 2009 Filing 126 Declaration of James Reeve in Support of #114 Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification filed byWachovia Mortgage Corporation. (Related document(s) #114 ) (Adornato, Alicia) (Filed on 1/5/2009)
January 5, 2009 Filing 125 Declaration of David Hoffman in Support of #114 Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification filed byWachovia Mortgage Corporation. (Related document(s) #114 ) (Adornato, Alicia) (Filed on 1/5/2009)
January 5, 2009 Filing 124 Declaration of Keith D. Yandell in Support of #114 Memorandum in Opposition filed byWachovia Mortgage Corporation, World Savings Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 of 6, #2 Exhibit Part 2 of 6, #3 Exhibit Part 3 of 6, #4 Exhibit Part 4 of 6, #5 Exhibit Part 5 of 6, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6 of 6)(Related document(s) #114 ) (Yandell, Keith) (Filed on 1/5/2009)
January 5, 2009 Filing 123 Declaration of John Frangoulis in Support of #114 Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification filed byWachovia Mortgage Corporation. (Related document(s) #114 ) (Adornato, Alicia) (Filed on 1/5/2009)
January 5, 2009 Filing 122 Declaration of Ted Scholz in Support of #114 Memorandum in Opposition filed byWachovia Mortgage Corporation, World Savings Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Part 1 of 5, #2 Exhibit Part 2 of 5, #3 Exhibit Part 3 of 5, #4 Exhibit Part 4 of 5, #5 Exhibit Part 5 of 5)(Related document(s) #114 ) (Yandell, Keith) (Filed on 1/5/2009)
January 5, 2009 Filing 121 Declaration of Michael B. Goldberg in Support of #114 Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification filed byWachovia Mortgage Corporation. (Related document(s) #114 ) (Adornato, Alicia) (Filed on 1/5/2009)
January 5, 2009 Filing 120 Declaration of Ryan Donigan in Support of #114 Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification filed byWachovia Mortgage Corporation. (Related document(s) #114 ) (Adornato, Alicia) (Filed on 1/5/2009)
January 5, 2009 Filing 119 Declaration of Jeff Roberts in Support of #114 Memorandum in Opposition filed byWachovia Mortgage Corporation, World Savings Bank. (Related document(s) #114 ) (Yandell, Keith) (Filed on 1/5/2009)
January 5, 2009 Filing 118 Declaration of Lisa Hairr in Support of #114 Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification filed byWachovia Mortgage Corporation. (Related document(s) #114 ) (Adornato, Alicia) (Filed on 1/5/2009)
January 5, 2009 Filing 117 Request for Judicial Notice re #114 Memorandum in Opposition filed byWachovia Mortgage Corporation, World Savings Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Related document(s) #114 ) (Yandell, Keith) (Filed on 1/5/2009)
January 5, 2009 Filing 116 Declaration of Victoria Barone in Support of #114 Memorandum in Opposition filed byWachovia Mortgage Corporation. (Related document(s) #114 ) (Adornato, Alicia) (Filed on 1/5/2009)
January 5, 2009 Filing 115 Memorandum in Opposition Plaintiff's Application for a Preliminary Injunction filed byWachovia Mortgage Corporation, World Savings Bank. (Yandell, Keith) (Filed on 1/5/2009)
January 5, 2009 Filing 114 Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification filed byWachovia Mortgage Corporation, World Savings Bank. (Yandell, Keith) (Filed on 1/5/2009)
January 2, 2009 Filing 113 Declaration of David M. Arbogast in Support of #83 Declaration in Support, #82 Brief, Supplemental filed byDolores Mandrigues. (Related document(s) #83 , #82 ) (Arbogast, David) (Filed on 1/2/2009)
December 31, 2008 Filing 112 NOTICE of Appearance by David M. Arbogast of Gerson H. Smoger and Steven M. Bronson for Plaintiffs and the Putative Class (Arbogast, David) (Filed on 12/31/2008)
December 30, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER RELATING CASES C07-4491 JW CASE to pending actions C07-4498 JF; C07-4501 JF, C07-4497 JF. *** Case C07-4491 JW SHALL be assigned to Judge Fogel and SHALL be referred to as "C 07-4491 JF."***. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 12/10/08. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2008) Modified text on 1/7/2009 (cv, COURT STAFF).
December 17, 2008 Filing 110 RESPONSE to Proposal Re Interim Stipulation Re Injunctive Relief by Wachovia Mortgage Corporation. (Adornato, Alicia) (Filed on 12/17/2008)
December 15, 2008 Filing 109 NOTICE of Appearance by Theodore Tyler Ting (Ting, Theodore) (Filed on 12/15/2008)
December 12, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER DENYING #97 MOTION FOR ADMINISTRATIVE RELIEF. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 12/12/08. (jflc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2008)
December 4, 2008 Filing 107 **DOCKETED IN ERROR, PLEASE DISREGARD**(Incorrect Attorney Caption) Proposed Order re #106 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 210.00, receipt number 54611004312.) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 210.00, receipt number 54611004312.) by Juanita Jones, Wilma R Minyen, Mark Clausen, Christina Clausen, Dolores Mandrigues. (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2008) Modified on 12/10/2008 (dlm, COURT STAFF).
December 4, 2008 Filing 106 MOTION for Attorney Christopher A. Seeger for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 210.00, receipt number 54611004312.) filed by Juanita Jones, Wilma R Minyen, Mark Clausen, Christina Clausen, Dolores Mandrigues. (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2008)
December 2, 2008 Filing 105 NOTICE of Appearance by David M. Arbogast Christopher A. Seeger (Arbogast, David) (Filed on 12/2/2008)
December 1, 2008 Filing 104 DECLARATION of Jeffrey K. Berns in Support to #103 Declaration in Support, #102 Memorandum in Opposition to Admistrative Motion to Stay filed byJuanita Jones, Wilma R Minyen, Mark Clausen, Christina Clausen, Dolores Mandrigues. (Related document(s) #103 , #102 ) (Berns, Jeffrey) (Filed on 12/1/2008) Modified on 12/2/2008 (gm, COURT STAFF).
December 1, 2008 Filing 103 DECLARATION of Jeffrey K. Berns in Support to #102 Memorandum in Opposition to Administrative Motion to Stay filed byJuanita Jones, Wilma R Minyen, Mark Clausen, Christina Clausen, Dolores Mandrigues. (Related document(s) #102 ) (Berns, Jeffrey) (Filed on 12/1/2008) Modified on 12/2/2008 (gm, COURT STAFF).
December 1, 2008 Filing 102 Memorandum in Opposition to Administrative #97 Motion to Stay filed byJuanita Jones, Wilma R Minyen, Mark Clausen, Christina Clausen, Dolores Mandrigues. (Berns, Jeffrey) (Filed on 12/1/2008) Modified on 12/2/2008 (gm, COURT STAFF).
November 21, 2008 Filing 101 Minute Entry: Further Case Management Conference held on 11/21/2008 before Judge Jeremy Fogel (Date Filed: 11/21/2008). Further Case Management Conference set for 1/16/2009 10:30 AM. (Court Reporter Kristen Moody.) (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/21/2008)
November 21, 2008 Filing 100 **DOCKETED IN ERROR,PLEASE DISREGARD**Minute Entry: Further Case Management Conference held on 11/21/2008 before Judge Jeremy Fogel (Date Filed: 11/21/2008). Further Case Management Conference set for 1/16/2009 10:30 AM. (Court Reporter Kristen Moody.) (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/21/2008) Modified on 11/26/2008 (dlm, COURT STAFF).
November 21, 2008 Filing 99 Proposed Order re #97 MOTION for Administrative Relief Re Briefing and Hearing Dates for Pending Motion for Class Certification and Application for Preliminary Injunction by Wachovia Mortgage Corporation. (Adornato, Alicia) (Filed on 11/21/2008)
November 21, 2008 Filing 98 Declaration of Jack R. Nelson in Support of #97 MOTION for Administrative Relief Re Briefing and Hearing Dates for Pending Motion for Class Certification and Application for Preliminary Injunction filed byWachovia Mortgage Corporation. (Related document(s) #97 ) (Adornato, Alicia) (Filed on 11/21/2008)
November 21, 2008 Filing 97 MOTION for Administrative Relief Re Briefing and Hearing Dates for Pending Motion for Class Certification and Application for Preliminary Injunction filed by Wachovia Mortgage Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 1/16/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. (Adornato, Alicia) (Filed on 11/21/2008)
November 20, 2008 Filing 96 Sealed Document. (srm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2008) (bwS, COURT STAFF).
November 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER GRANTING re #87 MOTION to Seal Document. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 11/14/08. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2008)
November 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER GRANTING re #91 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Michael J. Quirk. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 11/10/08. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2008)
November 14, 2008 Filing 93 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT - JOINT filed by Wachovia Mortgage Corporation, World Savings Bank. (Yandell, Keith) (Filed on 11/14/2008)
November 14, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 92 STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING HEARING AND MODIFYING BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR PLAINTIFFS' MOTIONS FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION AND FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION (approving docket no. #88 ). Motion Hearing set for 1/16/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 11/14/08. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2008)
November 13, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER by Judge Jeremy Fogel granting #79 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Mark R. Cuker. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2008)
November 13, 2008 Filing 89 Declaration of Keith D. Yandell in Support of #88 Stipulation, Request and [Proposed] Order Continuing Hearing and Modifying Briefing Schedule for Plaintiffs' Motions for Class Certification and for Preliminary Injunction filed byWachovia Mortgage Corporation. (Related document(s) #88 ) (Adornato, Alicia) (Filed on 11/13/2008)
November 13, 2008 Filing 88 STIPULATION Requested and [Proposed] Order Continuing Hearing and Modifying Briefing Schedule for Plaintiffs' Motions for Class Certification and for Preliminary Injunction by Wachovia Mortgage Corporation. (Adornato, Alicia) (Filed on 11/13/2008)
November 7, 2008 Filing 87 MOTION to Seal Document and File Documents under Seal filed by Juanita Jones, Wilma R Minyen, Mark Clausen, Christina Clausen, Dolores Mandrigues. Motion Hearing set for 12/12/2008 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Berns, Jeffrey) (Filed on 11/7/2008)
November 7, 2008 Filing 86 Brief re #84 Declaration in Support, #83 Declaration in Support, #85 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction & Notice of Motion Memorandum of Points & Authorities filed byJuanita Jones, Wilma R Minyen, Mark Clausen, Christina Clausen, Dolores Mandrigues. (Related document(s) #84 , #83 , #85 ) (Berns, Jeffrey) (Filed on 11/7/2008)
November 7, 2008 Filing 85 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction & Notice of Motion filed by Juanita Jones, Wilma R Minyen, Mark Clausen, Christina Clausen, Dolores Mandrigues. Motion Hearing set for 12/12/2008 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. (Berns, Jeffrey) (Filed on 11/7/2008)
November 7, 2008 Filing 84 Declaration of Jeffrey Berns in Support of #81 MOTION to Certify Class AND NOTICE OF MOTION, #82 Brief, Memorandum of Points & Authorities filed byJuanita Jones, Wilma R Minyen, Mark Clausen, Christina Clausen, Dolores Mandrigues. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Part 1, #2 Exhibit Part 2, #3 Exhibit Part 3, #4 Exhibit Part 4, #5 Exhibit Part 5, #6 Exhibit Part 6)(Related document(s) #81 , #82 ) (Berns, Jeffrey) (Filed on 11/7/2008)
November 7, 2008 Filing 83 Declaration of David Arbogast in Support of #81 MOTION to Certify Class AND NOTICE OF MOTION, #82 Brief, Memorandum of Points & Authorities filed byJuanita Jones, Wilma R Minyen, Mark Clausen, Christina Clausen, Dolores Mandrigues. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit to David Arbogast Declaration)(Related document(s) #81 , #82 ) (Berns, Jeffrey) (Filed on 11/7/2008)
November 7, 2008 Filing 82 Brief re #81 MOTION to Certify Class AND NOTICE OF MOTION MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES filed byJuanita Jones, Wilma R Minyen, Mark Clausen, Christina Clausen, Dolores Mandrigues. (Related document(s) #81 ) (Berns, Jeffrey) (Filed on 11/7/2008)
November 7, 2008 Filing 81 MOTION to Certify Class AND NOTICE OF MOTION filed by Juanita Jones, Wilma R Minyen, Mark Clausen, Christina Clausen, Dolores Mandrigues. Motion Hearing set for 12/12/2008 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. (Berns, Jeffrey) (Filed on 11/7/2008)
November 5, 2008 Filing 91 MOTION for Attorney Michael J. Quirk for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 210.00, receipt number 54611004170.) filed by Juanita Jones, Wilma R Minyen, Mark Clausen, Christina Clausen, Dolores Mandrigues. (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2008)
November 5, 2008 Filing 80 Proposed Order re #79 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 210.00, receipt number 54611004169.) by Juanita Jones, Wilma R Minyen, Mark Clausen, Christina Clausen, Dolores Mandrigues. (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2008) .
November 5, 2008 Filing 79 MOTION for Attorney Mark R. Cuker for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 210.00, receipt number 54611004169.) filed by Juanita Jones, Wilma R Minyen, Mark Clausen, Christina Clausen, Dolores Mandrigues. (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2008)
November 1, 2008 Filing 78 NOTICE of Appearance by David M. Arbogast of Mark R. Cuker and Michael J. Quirk for Plaintiffs and the Putative Class (Arbogast, David) (Filed on 11/1/2008)
September 26, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER GRANTING #75 STIPULATED REQUEST CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Conference set for 11/7/08 is CONTINUED to 11/21/2008 at 10:30 AM. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 9/26/08. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2008)
September 25, 2008 Filing 76 Declaration of Keith D. Yandell in Support of #75 Stipulation filed byWachovia Mortgage Corporation, World Savings, Inc., World Savings Bank. (Related document(s) #75 ) (Yandell, Keith) (Filed on 9/25/2008)
September 25, 2008 Filing 75 STIPULATION - STIPULATED REQUEST AND [PROPOSED] ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE by Wachovia Mortgage Corporation, World Savings, Inc., World Savings Bank. (Yandell, Keith) (Filed on 9/25/2008)
September 23, 2008 Filing 74 CLERK'S NOTICE Case Management Conference set for 11/7/2008 10:30 AM. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2008)
August 14, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 73 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #72 Stipulation filed by Dolores Mandrigues. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 8/14/08. (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2008)
August 1, 2008 Filing 72 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER RE E-DISCOVERY PROTOCOL by Dolores Mandrigues. (Arbogast, David) (Filed on 8/1/2008)
June 20, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg denying #48 Motion to Compel (rslc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2008)
June 18, 2008 Filing 70 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 6/18/2008 before Judge Richard Seeborg (Date Filed: 6/18/2008) re #48 MOTION to Compel filed by Dolores Mandrigues. The matter is taken under submission. (Tape #FTR.) (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/18/2008)
June 16, 2008 Filing 69 Reply Memorandum re #48 MOTION to Compel filed byDolores Mandrigues. (Arbogast, David) (Filed on 6/16/2008)
June 13, 2008 Filing 68 OBJECTIONS to re #65 Reply Memorandum :WORLD SAVINGS BANK FSBS OBJECTIONS TO EVIDENCE SUBMITTED WITH PLAINTIFFS REPLY MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL by Wachovia Mortgage Corporation, World Savings Bank. (Yandell, Keith) (Filed on 6/13/2008)
June 4, 2008 Filing 67 OBJECTIONS to and Notice of Intention to Strike Portions of the Declaration of Lisa Beens Filed in Support of Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel by Dolores Mandrigues. (Arbogast, David) (Filed on 6/4/2008)
June 4, 2008 Filing 66 Declaration of DAVID M. ARBOGAST in Support of #65 Reply Memorandum to Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel filed byDolores Mandrigues. (Related document(s) #65 ) (Arbogast, David) (Filed on 6/4/2008)
June 4, 2008 Filing 65 Reply Memorandum In Support of #48 Motion to Compel filed byDolores Mandrigues. (Arbogast, David) (Filed on 6/4/2008) Modified on 6/5/2008 (gm, COURT STAFF).
June 3, 2008 Filing 64 DECLARATION (FILED UNDER SEAL) filed byError: party not known. (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2008)
June 3, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting #59 Motion to Seal (rssec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2008)
May 28, 2008 Received Declaration (FILED UNDER SEAL). (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2008)
May 28, 2008 Filing 62 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Wachovia Mortgage Corporation, World Savings Bank re #58 Notice (Other), Notice (Other) - Declaration of Lisa Beens and Proposed Order Sealing Document (Yandell, Keith) (Filed on 5/28/2008)
May 28, 2008 Filing 61 Proposed Order re #59 MOTION to Seal -- Administrative Motion To File The Declaration Of Lisa Beens In Opposition To Plaintiffs Motion To Compel Names, Addresses And Telephone Numbers Under Seal by Wachovia Mortgage Corporation, World Savings Bank. (Yandell, Keith) (Filed on 5/28/2008)
May 28, 2008 Filing 60 Declaration of Keith D. Yandell in Support of #59 MOTION to Seal -- Administrative Motion To File The Declaration Of Lisa Beens In Opposition To Plaintiffs Motion To Compel Names, Addresses And Telephone Numbers Under Seal filed byWachovia Mortgage Corporation, World Savings Bank. (Related document(s) #59 ) (Yandell, Keith) (Filed on 5/28/2008)
May 28, 2008 Filing 59 MOTION to Seal -- Administrative Motion To File The Declaration Of Lisa Beens In Opposition To Plaintiffs Motion To Compel Names, Addresses And Telephone Numbers Under Seal filed by Wachovia Mortgage Corporation, World Savings Bank. Motion Hearing set for 6/13/2008 09:30 AM in Courtroom #4, 5th Floor, San Jose. (Yandell, Keith) (Filed on 5/28/2008)
May 28, 2008 Filing 58 NOTICE by Wachovia Mortgage Corporation, World Savings Bank re #56 Memorandum in Opposition :Notice of Manual Filing of Declaration of Lisa Beens In Opposition to Motion to Compel (Declaration submitted under seal) (Yandell, Keith) (Filed on 5/28/2008)
May 28, 2008 Filing 57 DECLARATION of Victoria Barone in Opposition to #48 MOTION to Compel filed byWachovia Mortgage Corporation, World Savings Bank. (Related document(s) #48 ) (Yandell, Keith) (Filed on 5/28/2008)
May 28, 2008 Filing 56 Memorandum in Opposition re #48 MOTION to Compel filed byWachovia Mortgage Corporation, World Savings Bank. (Yandell, Keith) (Filed on 5/28/2008)
May 21, 2008 Filing 55 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Wachovia Mortgage Corporation, World Savings Bank. (Yandell, Keith) (Filed on 5/21/2008)
May 9, 2008 Filing 54 Answer to Amended Complaint #24 Amended Complaint Answer Of Defendants World Savings Inc. And Wachovia Mortgage Corporation To Plaintiffs' Corrected Second Amended Complaint byWachovia Mortgage Corporation, World Savings, Inc.. (Nelson, Jack) (Filed on 5/9/2008)
May 9, 2008 Filing 53 Wachovia Mortgage, FSB (Formerly Known As, And Sued As, "World Savings Bank, FSB" ANSWER to Amended Complaint Plaintiffs' Corrected Second Amended Complaint byWachovia Mortgage Corporation, World Savings Bank. (Nelson, Jack) (Filed on 5/9/2008)
May 8, 2008 Filing 52 Amended MOTION to Compel filed by Dolores Mandrigues. Motion Hearing set for 6/18/2008 09:30 AM in Courtroom #4, 5th Floor, San Jose. (Arbogast, David) (Filed on 5/8/2008)
May 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 51 PROTECTIVE ORDER re #47 . Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 5/7/08. (rssec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2008)
May 7, 2008 Filing 50 Declaration of David M. Arbogast in Support of #48 MOTION to Compel, #49 Brief filed byDolores Mandrigues. (Related document(s) #48 , #49 ) (Arbogast, David) (Filed on 5/7/2008)
May 7, 2008 Filing 49 Brief re #48 MOTION to Compel filed byDolores Mandrigues. (Related document(s) #48 ) (Arbogast, David) (Filed on 5/7/2008)
May 7, 2008 Filing 48 MOTION to Compel filed by Dolores Mandrigues. Motion Hearing set for 6/13/2008 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. (Arbogast, David) (Filed on 5/7/2008)
May 6, 2008 Filing 47 STIPULATION PROTECTIVE [PROPOSED] ORDER by Dolores Mandrigues. (Arbogast, David) (Filed on 5/6/2008)
April 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER GRANTING re #42 First MOTION to Substitute Attorney Jeffrey Berns filed by Mark Clausen, Wilma R Minyen, Juanita Jones, Christina Clausen, #43 First MOTION to Substitute Attorney Jeffrey Berns filed by Dolores Mandrigues. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 4/24/08. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2008)
April 21, 2008 Filing 45 NOTICE by Juanita Jones, Wilma R Minyen, Mark Clausen, Christina Clausen, Dolores Mandrigues Firm and Address Change (Berns, Jeffrey) (Filed on 4/21/2008)
April 21, 2008 Filing 44 NOTICE by Juanita Jones, Wilma R Minyen, Mark Clausen, Christina Clausen, Dolores Mandrigues Of Firm Name Change (Berns, Jeffrey) (Filed on 4/21/2008)
April 17, 2008 Filing 43 First MOTION to Substitute Attorney Jeffrey Berns filed by Dolores Mandrigues. Motion Hearing set for 5/16/2008 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. (Berns, Jeffrey) (Filed on 4/17/2008)
April 17, 2008 Filing 42 First MOTION to Substitute Attorney Jeffrey Berns filed by Juanita Jones, Wilma R Minyen, Mark Clausen, Christina Clausen. Motion Hearing set for 5/16/2008 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. (Berns, Jeffrey) (Filed on 4/17/2008)
April 11, 2008 Filing 41 NOTICE of Appearance by James Mark Moore Attorney for Plaintiff, Dolores Mandrigues (Moore, James) (Filed on 4/11/2008)
April 9, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER by Judge Jeremy Fogel denying #25 Motion to Dismiss (jflc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2008)
April 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER GRANTING re #38 Stipulation Moving Status Conference Hearing to a date to be set. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 4/4/08. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2008)
April 2, 2008 Filing 38 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER MOVING STATUS CONFERENCE HEARING -- CORRECTION OF DOCKET #37 . by Wachovia Mortgage Corporation, World Savings, Inc., World Savings Bank. (Yandell, Keith) (Filed on 4/2/2008)
April 2, 2008 Filing 37 *** FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE DOCKET #38 . *** STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER MOVING STATUS CONFERENCE HEARING by Wachovia Mortgage Corporation, World Savings, Inc., World Savings Bank. (Yandell, Keith) (Filed on 4/2/2008) Modified on 4/3/2008 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
March 21, 2008 Filing 36 CLERK'S NOTICE The court has reviewed the motion and determined that case number CV-07-4500-RMW is NOT related and no reassignment shall occur. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2008)
March 11, 2008 Filing 35 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 2/29/2008 before Judge Jeremy Fogel. Court Reporter: Summer Clanton.. (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2008)
February 29, 2008 Filing 34 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 2/29/2008 before Judge Jeremy Fogel (Date Filed: 2/29/2008) re #25 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, Motion to Strike Portions of Plaintiffs' Corrected Second Amended Complaint filed by World Savings Bank, Wachovia Mortgage Corporation, World Savings, Inc.. The motion is taken under submission. Further Case Management Conference set for 4/11/2008 10:30 AM. (Court Reporter Summer Clanton.) (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/29/2008)
February 27, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER RELATING CASE NUMBER CV-07-4498-JF. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 2/26/08. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2008)
February 27, 2008 Filing 32 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting SUPPLEMENTAL JOINT RULE 26(F) REPORT. (Arbogast, David) (Filed on 2/27/2008)
February 15, 2008 Filing 31 Reply Memorandum re #25 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, Motion to Strike Portions of Plaintiffs' Corrected Second Amended Complaint filed byWachovia Mortgage Corporation, World Savings, Inc., World Savings Bank. (Yandell, Keith) (Filed on 2/15/2008)
February 8, 2008 Filing 30 Declaration of David M. Arbogast in Support of #29 Memorandum in Opposition TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS filed byDolores Mandrigues. (Related document(s) #29 ) (Arbogast, David) (Filed on 2/8/2008)
February 8, 2008 Filing 29 Memorandum in Opposition TO #25 DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS filed byDolores Mandrigues. (Arbogast, David) (Filed on 2/8/2008) Modified on 2/11/2008 (gm, COURT STAFF).
February 4, 2008 Filing 28 Brief re #25 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, Motion to Strike Portions of Plaintiffs' Corrected Second Amended Complaint - Supplemental Memorandum of Points and Authorities, Based on Newly Issued Authority, In Support of Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Corrected Second Amended Complaint filed byWachovia Mortgage Corporation, World Savings, Inc., World Savings Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Related document(s) #25 ) (Yandell, Keith) (Filed on 2/4/2008)
January 22, 2008 Filing 27 Request for Judicial Notice re #25 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, Motion to Strike Portions of Plaintiffs' Corrected Second Amended Complaint filed byWachovia Mortgage Corporation, World Savings, Inc., World Savings Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A&B to RJN, #2 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Dismiss)(Related document(s) #25 ) (Yandell, Keith) (Filed on 1/22/2008)
January 22, 2008 Filing 26 Brief re #25 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, Motion to Strike Portions of Plaintiffs' Corrected Second Amended Complaint filed byWachovia Mortgage Corporation, World Savings, Inc., World Savings Bank. (Related document(s) #25 ) (Yandell, Keith) (Filed on 1/22/2008)
January 22, 2008 Filing 25 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, Motion to Strike Portions of Plaintiffs' Corrected Second Amended Complaint filed by Wachovia Mortgage Corporation, World Savings, Inc., World Savings Bank. Motion Hearing set for 2/29/2008 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. (Yandell, Keith) (Filed on 1/22/2008)
December 31, 2007 Filing 24 AMENDED COMPLAINT CORRECTED SECOND against all defendants. Filed byDolores Mandrigues. (Arbogast, David) (Filed on 12/31/2007)
December 31, 2007 Filing 23 *** POSTED IN ERROR *** please see corrected #24 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against all defendants. Filed by Dolores Mandrigues. (Moore, James) (Filed on 12/31/2007) Modified on 9/28/2011 (cv, COURT STAFF).
December 14, 2007 Filing 22 Minute Entry: Initial Case Management Conference held on 12/14/2007 before Judge Jeremy Fogel (Date Filed: 12/14/2007). Plaintiff is granted leave to file an amended complaint by 12/31/07. The motion hearing set on 1/4/2008 is vacated. Further Case Management Conference set for 2/29/2008 09:00 AM. Motion Hearing set for 2/29/2008 09:00 AM. (Court Reporter Summer Clanton.) (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/14/2007)
December 5, 2007 Filing 21 NOTICE by Delores Mandrigues NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL (Arbogast, David) (Filed on 12/5/2007)
December 5, 2007 Filing 20 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT - JOINT RULE 26(f) REPORT filed by Wachovia Mortgage Corporation, World Savings, Inc., World Savings Bank. (Yandell, Keith) (Filed on 12/5/2007)
November 29, 2007 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Delores Mandrigues. World Savings Bank served on 10/17/2007, answer due 11/6/2007. (Arbogast, David) (Filed on 11/29/2007)
November 29, 2007 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Delores Mandrigues. World Savings, Inc. served on 10/17/2007, answer due 11/6/2007. (Arbogast, David) (Filed on 11/29/2007)
November 7, 2007 Filing 17 NOTICE by Wachovia Mortgage Corporation, World Savings Bank re #12 MOTION to Dismiss Or, In The Alternative, Motion To Strike Portions Of Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint - NOTICE OF ERRATA Correcting Typographical Error Re Hearing Date From 2007 To 2008 On Motion To Dismiss Papers, And Certificate Of Interested Parties, Filed On November 6, 2007 (Yandell, Keith) (Filed on 11/7/2007)
November 6, 2007 Filing 16 Certificate of Interested Entities by Wachovia Mortgage Corporation, World Savings Bank (Yandell, Keith) (Filed on 11/6/2007)
November 6, 2007 Filing 15 Proposed Order re #12 MOTION to Dismiss Or, In The Alternative, Motion To Strike Portions Of Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint by Wachovia Mortgage Corporation, World Savings Bank. (Yandell, Keith) (Filed on 11/6/2007)
November 6, 2007 Filing 14 Request for Judicial Notice re #12 MOTION to Dismiss Or, In The Alternative, Motion To Strike Portions Of Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint filed byWachovia Mortgage Corporation, World Savings Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A and B To RJN)(Related document(s) #12 ) (Yandell, Keith) (Filed on 11/6/2007)
November 6, 2007 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM in Support re #12 MOTION to Dismiss Or, In The Alternative, Motion To Strike Portions Of Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint filed byWachovia Mortgage Corporation, World Savings Bank. (Related document(s) #12 ) (Yandell, Keith) (Filed on 11/6/2007)
November 6, 2007 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss Or, In The Alternative, Motion To Strike Portions Of Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint filed by Wachovia Mortgage Corporation, World Savings Bank. Motion Hearing set for 1/4/2008 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. (Yandell, Keith) (Filed on 11/6/2007)
October 31, 2007 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Delores Mandrigues Proof of Service Summons and Complaint on Wachovia Mortgage Corporation (Arbogast, David) (Filed on 10/31/2007)
October 31, 2007 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Delores Mandrigues Proof of Service Summons and Complaint on World Savings Bank, FSB (Arbogast, David) (Filed on 10/31/2007)
October 26, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to District Judge Jeremy Fogel for all further proceedings and Magistrate Richard Seeborg for all discovery matters. Signed by The Executive Committee on 10/26/07. (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2007) Additional attachment(s) added on 10/26/2007 (tsh, COURT STAFF).
October 26, 2007 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2007)
October 25, 2007 Filing 7 Certificate of Interested Entities by FSB, Wachovia Mortgage Corporation, World Savings, Inc., World Savings Bank (Nelson, Jack) (Filed on 10/25/2007)
October 25, 2007 Filing 6 First Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge by FSB, Wachovia Mortgage Corporation, World Savings, Inc., World Savings Bank - and Request for Reassignment to a United States District Judge. (Nelson, Jack) (Filed on 10/25/2007)
October 11, 2007 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against all defendants. Filed by Delores Mandrigues. (Arbogast, David) (Filed on 10/11/2007) Modified on 10/12/2007 (bw, COURT STAFF).
August 31, 2007 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE re: Failure to E-File and/or Failure to Register as an E-Filer On August 27, 2007, counsel for Defendant Radioshack Corporation filed a Notice of Removal manually, on paper. This case has been designated for electronic filing, pursuant to Local Rule 5-4 and General Order 45.The above mentioned paper document has been filed and docketed. However, General Order 45 provides at Section III that cases assigned to judges who participate in the e-filing program shall be presumptively designated as e-filing cases. Therefore, counsel for defendant should submit the document, in PDF format within 10 days, as an attachment in an e-mail message directed to the judges chamber's "PDF" email box listed at http://ecf.cand.uscourts.gov. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2007)
August 30, 2007 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2007)
August 30, 2007 Filing 3 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 12/5/2007. Case Management Conference set for 12/12/2007 02:30 PM. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2007) Additional attachment(s) added on 8/30/2007 (bw, COURT STAFF).
August 30, 2007 Filing 2 Certification of Interested Entities or Persons by Delores Mandrigues (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2007) Additional attachment(s) added on 8/31/2007 (bw, COURT STAFF).
August 30, 2007 Filing 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT (Summons Issued); jury demand; against all defendants (Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 54611001628). Filed by Delores Mandrigues. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2007) Additional attachment(s) added on 8/31/2007 (bw, COURT STAFF).
August 30, 2007 Summons Issued as to FSB, Wachovia Mortgage Corporation, World Savings, Inc., World Savings Bank. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2007)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mandrigues et al-v-World Savings, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilma R Minyen
Represented By: David M. Arbogast
Represented By: Brian Stephen Kabateck
Represented By: Jeffrey K Berns
Represented By: Michael J. Quirk
Represented By: Andrew Hoyt Rowell, III
Represented By: Mark R. Cuker
Represented By: Eric Marc George
Represented By: Evan Dean Buxner
Represented By: Christopher A. Seeger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles R. Whipple
Represented By: Adriana Elaine Dominguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juanita Jones
Represented By: David M. Arbogast
Represented By: Jeffrey K Berns
Represented By: Michael J. Quirk
Represented By: Andrew Hoyt Rowell, III
Represented By: Mark R. Cuker
Represented By: Eric Marc George
Represented By: Evan Dean Buxner
Represented By: Christopher A. Seeger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christina Clausen
Represented By: David M. Arbogast
Represented By: Brian Stephen Kabateck
Represented By: Jeffrey K Berns
Represented By: Michael J. Quirk
Represented By: Andrew Hoyt Rowell, III
Represented By: Mark R. Cuker
Represented By: Eric Marc George
Represented By: Evan Dean Buxner
Represented By: Christopher A. Seeger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dolores Mandrigues
Represented By: Jonathan Shub
Represented By: Brian Stephen Kabateck
Represented By: Jeffrey K Berns
Represented By: Michael J. Quirk
Represented By: Andrew Hoyt Rowell, III
Represented By: James Mark Moore
Represented By: Mark R. Cuker
Represented By: Michael C Eyerly
Represented By: David M. Arbogast
Represented By: Paul R. Kiesel
Represented By: Ira Spiro
Represented By: Patrick DeBlase
Represented By: Eric Marc George
Represented By: Evan Dean Buxner
Represented By: Christopher A. Seeger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bonnie Mincey
Represented By: Daniel O. Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Clausen
Represented By: David M. Arbogast
Represented By: Brian Stephen Kabateck
Represented By: Jeffrey K Berns
Represented By: Michael J. Quirk
Represented By: Andrew Hoyt Rowell, III
Represented By: Mark R. Cuker
Represented By: Eric Marc George
Represented By: Evan Dean Buxner
Represented By: Christopher A. Seeger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: World Savings Bank
Represented By: Jack R. Nelson
Represented By: Theodore Tyler Ting
Represented By: Keith David Yandell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: World Savings, Inc.
Represented By: Jack R. Nelson
Represented By: Theodore Tyler Ting
Represented By: Keith David Yandell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FSB
Represented By: Jack R. Nelson
Represented By: Theodore Tyler Ting
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wachovia Mortgage Corporation
Represented By: Jack R. Nelson
Represented By: Theodore Tyler Ting
Represented By: Keith David Yandell
Represented By: Alicia Anne Baiardo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Susan Nava
Represented By: Adriana Elaine Dominguez
Represented By: Mikyla Miller
Represented By: William Breck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Chad Ryan
Represented By: Adriana Elaine Dominguez
Represented By: Mikyla Miller
Represented By: William Breck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Andy Nava
Represented By: Adriana Elaine Dominguez
Represented By: Mikyla Miller
Represented By: William Breck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Michael V. Hargett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Nathaniel C. Dayton
Represented By: Adriana Elaine Dominguez
Represented By: Mikyla Miller
Represented By: William Breck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?