May 15, 2013 |
Filing
224
ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION DISMISSING ACTION WITH PREJUDICE. All hearings and deadlines are VACATED. The clerk shall close this file. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/15/2013. (ejdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2013)
|
April 16, 2013 |
Filing
221
STIPULATION AND ORDER AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT re 220 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO RESCHEDULE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Eneida Amparan, Guadalupe Cisneros, Rafael Cisneros. Motion Deadline 5/10/2013. Joint Case Mana gement Statement due by 5/10/2013. Case Management Conference set for 5/17/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose. This is the final continuance of the Case Management Conference. All parties shall be personally present at the conference scheduled for May 17, 2013, unless it is vacated in advance. Requests for telephonic appearance will not be considered. **4/19/2013 CMC Deadlines terminated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 4/16/2013. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2013)
|
November 28, 2012 |
Filing
214
ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; CONTINUING STAY; SETTING DEADLINE FOR ADR REFERRAL. Joint Case Management Statement due by 2/22/2013. Case Management Conference set for 3/1/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Within 10 days of this order, the parties shall meet and confer in order to select a private mediator and shall file with this court the ADR form "Stipulation and Proposed Order Selecting ADR Process" indicating their sele ction. If the parties are unable to reach an agreement, they shall file the ADR form "Notice of Need for ADR Phone Conference" within the same timeframe. *** 11/30/2012 CMC deadlines terminated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 11/28/2012. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2012)
|
October 1, 2012 |
Filing
209
ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE RE WaMu Asset Acceptance Corp. and Washington Mutual Mortgage Securities Corp. ONLY. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a), and upon consideration of the Stipulation of Dismissal Without Prejudice filed by Plaintiffs Eneida Amparan and Defendants Washington Mutual Mortgage Securities Corp. and WaMu Asset Acceptance Corp. (collectively, "WAMU"), all claims against WAMU in this action are hereby dismissed without prejudice, without co sts or attorney's fees as to any party, and with each party waiving any right to appeal. Motions terminated: 207 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation of Dismissal without Prejudice filed by Eneida Amparan., WaMu Asset Acceptance Corp. and Washington Mutual Mortgage Securities Corp. terminated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 10/1/2012. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2012)
|
May 4, 2012 |
Filing
204
ORDER STAYING CASE AND SETTING FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The case is hereby STAYED until 8/31/2012, except that the parties shall respond to any outstanding discovery requests. Joint Case Management Statement due by 8/21/2012. Case Management Conference set for 8/31/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/4/2012. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2012)
|
April 27, 2012 |
Filing
202
ORDER GRANTING 198 STIPULATION (Stipulation of Dismissal without Prejudice) as to Countrywide Bank, FSB, Countrywide Home Loans, Inc. ONLY (Correction of 200 Order). Countrywide Bank, FSB and Countrywide Home Loans, Inc. terminated. Case Management Conference set for 5/4/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 4/27/2012. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2012)
|
July 8, 2011 |
Filing
184
STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: ADJOURNING CASE DEADLINES PENDING MEDIATION re 183 . Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 6/21/11. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2011)
|
December 2, 2010 |
Filing
174
ORDER GRANTING 171 JOINT STIPULATION TO RESCHEDULE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Case Management Conference set for 12/3/2010 is CONTINUED to 12/17/2010 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 12/2/2010. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2010)
|
September 23, 2010 |
Filing
164
ORDER DENYING 141 MOTION TO TRANSFER; GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 140 , 146 MOTIONS TO DISMISS, WITH LEAVE TO AMEND; AND OVERRULING 149 OBJECTIONS TO JOINDERS. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 9/23/2010. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2010)
|
July 15, 2010 |
Filing
160
ORDER GRANTING PERMISSION TO FILE STATEMENT OF RECENT NINTH CIRCUIT DECISION (approving 159 ). Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 7/15/2010. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2010)
|
October 28, 2009 |
Filing
144
ORDER GRANTING 142 JOINT STIPULATION TO RESCHEDULE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Case Management Conference set for 10/30/2009 is RESET for 1/29/2010 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 10/28/2009. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2009)
|
October 5, 2009 |
Filing
136
STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR DEFENDANTS WASHINGTON MUTUAL MORTGAGE SECURITIES CORP., WAMU ASSET ACCEPTANCE CORP., AND PLAZA HOME MORTGAGE, INC. TO RESPOND TO THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT re 135 . Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 10/1/09. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2009)
|
August 28, 2009 |
Filing
125
ORDER GRANTING 114 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 8/28/09. (jflc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2009)
|
January 5, 2009 |
Filing
93
ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting 72 Motion to Compel (rssec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2009)
|
December 17, 2008 |
Filing
86
ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 59 & 60 MOTIONS TO DISMISS AND TO STRIKE. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 12/17/08. (jflc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2008)
|
October 23, 2008 |
Filing
64
ORDER APPROVING re 61 Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 10/15/08. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2008)
|
October 20, 2008 |
Filing
63
STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE HEARING ON DEFENDANT PLAZA HOME MORTGAGE, INC.'S MOTION TO DISMISS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT, MOTION TO STRIKE AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FROM NOVEMBER 7, 2008 TO DECEMBER 12, 2008 (granting docket no. 62 ). Motion hearing CONTINUED from 11/7/08 to 12/12/2008 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 10/20/08. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2008)
|
September 24, 2008 |
Filing
56
STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE SEPTEMBER 26, 2008 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE TO NOVEMBER 7, 2008, granting docket no. 55 . Further Case Management Conference is RESET for 11/7/2008 at 9:00 a.m. to be heard with motions. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 9/24/08. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2008)
|
September 19, 2008 |
Filing
54
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 53 for Defendant's Time to File Responsive Pleading to Second Amended Complaint. Motion Hearing set for 11/7/2008 09:00 AM. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 9/18/08. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2008)
|
September 2, 2008 |
Filing
52
ORDER GRANTING re 48 MOTION for leave by REBECCA TINGEY to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 210.00, receipt number 54611003815.) filed by Eneida Amparan. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 8/28/08. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2008)
|