Patricia Galvin v. Provident Life and Accident Insurance Company, et al
Plaintiff: Patricia Galvin
Defendant: The Group Long Term Disability Plan for Heller, Erhman, White & McAuliffe and Provident Life and Accident Insurance Company
Case Number: 5:2007cv05195
Filed: October 10, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Jeremy Fogel
Presiding Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER VACATING 79 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 3/1/2011. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2011)
September 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER RE COMPUTATION OF BENEFITS AND INTEREST DUE 49 . Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 9/13/2010. (jflc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2010)
September 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER DIRECTING CLERK TO LODGE DOCUMENTS SUBMITTED FOR IN CAMERA REVIEW Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 9/2/2010. (jflc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2010)
August 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER BY JUDGE JEREMY FOGEL RE 69 DISCLOSURE OF CONFIDENTIAL SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT. Signed by Judge JEREMY FOGEL on 8/18/2010. (jflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2010)
August 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER RE PRODUCTION OF CONFIDENTIAL SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT BETWEEN GALVIN AND HELLER, EHRMAN, WHITE & MCAULIFFE. Signed by Judge JEREMY FOGEL on 8/13/2010. (jflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2010)
June 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER BY JUDGE JEREMY FOGEL GRANTING DEFENDANTS' 55 MOTION TO CONTINUE HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR CALCULATION OF BENEFITS BECAUSE OF EXCUSABLE NEGLECT OF THEIR COUNSEL. (jflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2010)
June 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 54 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR COMPUTATION OF BENEFITS (approving 53 ). The Motion Hearing set for 6/11/2010 is CONTINUED to 7/2/2010 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 6/7/2010. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2010)
August 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 47 STIPULATION AND ORDER Re: Bill of Costs and Motion for Attorney's Fees and Prejudgment Interest re 46 . Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 7/30/09. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2009)
July 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ****PLEASE DISREGARD--ORDER FILED IN INCORRECT DOCKET****ORDER OVERRULING IN PART 315 OBJECTIONS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S ORDER. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 7/20/09. (jflc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2009) Modified on 7/20/2009 (jflc3, COURT STAFF).
July 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER RE 30 & 35 CROSS-MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 7/17/09. (jflc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2009)
May 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 40 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE SUMMARY JUDGMENT BRIEFING AND HEARING SCHEDULE (approving 39 ). The hearing on the cross-motions for summary judgment set for 5/29/2009 is CONTINUED to 6/5/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 5/13/2009. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2009)
February 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 29 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 28 Trial Schedule. Bench Trial/Hearing on Cross Motions for Summary Judgment set for 5/29/2009 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 2/4/09. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Patricia Galvin v. Provident Life and Accident Insurance Company, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Group Long Term Disability Plan for Heller, Erhman, White & McAuliffe
Represented By: John C. Ferry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Provident Life and Accident Insurance Company
Represented By: John C. Ferry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Galvin
Represented By: Scott D. Kalkin, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?