Mou v. City of San Jose et al Featured Case

Complaint against library for banning patron after altercation (allegedly by another).

Plaintiff: Chin-Li Mou
Defendant: City of San Jose and San Jose Public Library Education Park Branch
Case Number: 5:2007cv05740
Filed: November 13, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 14, 2011 Filing 89 SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT re 86 Order, 56 Judgment entered In favor of City of San Jose Against Chin-Li Mou, In favor of San Jose Public Library Education Park Branch Against Chin-Li Mou and Proof of Service by City of San Jose, San Jose Public Library Education Park Branch. (Burchfiel, Robert) (Filed on 3/14/2011)
February 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER RE: 88 ACCESS TO COURT'S LAW LIBRARY. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on February 1, 2011. (jflc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2011) Modified on 2/7/2011 (gm, COURT STAFF).
January 19, 2011 Filing 88 REQUEST for access to Court's Law Livrary by Chin-Li Mou. (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2011)
January 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER AWARDING COSTS. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on January 18, 2011. (jflc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2011)
December 7, 2010 Filing 85 Proof of Service re (Proposed) Order Denying defendant's Bill of Costs by City of San Jose, San Jose Public Library Education Park Branch (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2010)
December 6, 2010 Filing 84 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Chin-Li Mou re 82 Response ( Non Motion ), 83 Proposed Order (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2010)
December 6, 2010 Filing 83 Proposed Order denying re 57 Bill of Costs by Chin-Li Mou. (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2010)
December 6, 2010 Filing 82 REPLY to re 80 Memorandum on Award of Costs by Chin-Li Mou. (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2010)
November 15, 2010 Filing 81 Declaration of Robert B. Burchfiel in Support of 80 Brief Declaration of Robert B. Burchfiel iso of City of San Jose's MPA on Award of Costs with Exhibits 1-6 and POS filed byCity of San Jose. (Related document(s) 80 ) (Burchfiel, Robert) (Filed on 11/15/2010)
November 15, 2010 Filing 80 Brief re 75 Order, Terminate Motions City of San Jose's Memorandum of Points and Authorities on Award of Costs filed byCity of San Jose. (Related document(s) 75 ) (Burchfiel, Robert) (Filed on 11/15/2010)
November 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER re PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION 77 FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE BRIEF AND FOR PERMISSION FOR PAGE EXTENSION. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 11/12/10.
November 8, 2010 Filing 78 Proposed Order re 77 Ex Parte Application for Extension of Time to File by Chin-Li Mou. (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2010)
November 8, 2010 Filing 77 Ex Parte Application for Extension of Time to File Brief filed by Chin-Li Mou. (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2010)
November 5, 2010 Filing 76 Ex Parte Application Ex Parte Request for Extension of Time to File Brief filed by City of San Jose. (Burchfiel, Robert) (Filed on 11/5/2010)
October 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER FOLLOWING DEBTOR'S EXAMINATION. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 10/25/2010. (jflc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2010)
October 8, 2010 Filing 74 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 72 Ex Parte Application re 70 Order Ex Parte Request for Briefing Schedule and Proof of Service filed byChin-Li Mou. (Related document(s) 72 ) (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2010)
October 6, 2010 Filing 72 Ex Parte Application re 70 Order Ex Parte Request for Briefing Schedule and Proof of Service filed by City of San Jose. (Burchfiel, Robert) (Filed on 10/6/2010)
October 4, 2010 Filing 73 Letter from Chin-Li Mou with Exhibits. (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2010)
October 4, 2010 Filing 71 Received Letter from Chin-Li Mou. (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2010)
June 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER REQUESTING DEBTOR'S EXAMINATION. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 6/8/2010. (jflc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2010)
May 11, 2010 Filing 69 Letter from Plaintiff Chin Li Mou to Judge Fogel. (srm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2010)
May 5, 2010 Filing 68 RESPONSE to Plaintiff's Communication to the Court by City of San Jose. (Burchfiel, Robert) (Filed on 5/5/2010)
April 19, 2010 Filing 66 Letter from Chin-Li Mou. (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2010)
April 1, 2010 Filing 63 OBJECTIONS to re 57 Bill of Costs by Chin-Li Mou. (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2010)
March 16, 2010 Filing 62 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Thomas R. Hogan Notice of Withdrawal as Counsel of Record (Hogan, Thomas) (Filed on 3/16/2010)
March 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER AMENDING ORDER OF FEBRUARY 25, 2010. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 3/11/2010. (jflc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2010)
February 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER RESPONDING TO PLAINTIFF'S FEBRUARY 18, 2009, LETTER RE: COSTS. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 2/25/2010. (jflc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2010)
February 18, 2010 Filing 59 Letter from Chin-Li Mou. (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2010)
October 22, 2009 Filing 58 Costs Taxed in amount of $ 1029.90 against Chin-Li Mou. (srm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2009)
October 8, 2009 Filing 57 BILL OF COSTS and Declaration of Robert Burchfiel In Support of Defendant's Bill of Cost with Exhibits by City of San Jose. (Burchfiel, Robert) (Filed on 10/8/2009)
September 29, 2009 Filing 56 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 9/29/2009. (jflc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2009)
September 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 9/29/2009. (jflc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2009)
September 25, 2009 Filing 54 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 9/25/2009 before Judge Jeremy Fogel (Date Filed: 9/25/2009) re 42 MOTION for Summary Judgment. The motion is taken under submission. (Court Reporter Summer Clanton.) (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/25/2009)
September 17, 2009 Filing 53 CLERKS NOTICE Pretrial Conference set for 10/16/2009 is reset for 10/9/2009 11:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2009)
September 1, 2009 Filing 52 CLERKS NOTICE: Settlement Conference originally scheduled for 9/24/2009 has been re-scheduled for 10/16/2009 09:30 AM. (rslc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2009)
August 31, 2009 Filing 51 CLERKS NOTICE The hearing on the Motion For Summary Judgment set for 9/11/2009 is CONTINUED to 9/25/2009 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2009)
August 26, 2009 Filing 50 CLERKS NOTICE The Motion For Summary Judgment set for 8/28/2009 is CONTINUED to 9/11/2009 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2009)
August 17, 2009 Filing 49 Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition Defendant's Summary Judgment re ( 42 ) filed by City of San Jose. (Burchfiel, Robert) (Filed on 8/17/2009) Modified on 8/19/2009 linkage added (bw, COURT STAFF).
August 10, 2009 Filing 48 DECLARATION of Chin-Li Mou in Support of 47 Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment filed byChin-Li Mou. (Hogan, Thomas) (Filed on 8/10/2009) Modified on 8/11/2009 (gm, COURT STAFF).
August 10, 2009 Filing 47 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition to Defendant's 42 Motion for Summary Judgment filed byChin-Li Mou. (Hogan, Thomas) (Filed on 8/10/2009) Modified on 8/11/2009 (gm, COURT STAFF).
July 17, 2009 Filing 46 Declaration of Daisy Porter in Support of 42 MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendant's Notice of Motion for Summary Judgment and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support with Exhibits A-C filed byCity of San Jose. (Related document(s) 42 ) (Burchfiel, Robert) (Filed on 7/17/2009)
July 17, 2009 Filing 45 Declaration of Carol Frost in Support of 42 MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendant's Notice of Motion for Summary Judgment and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support with Exhibit A filed byCity of San Jose. (Related document(s) 42 ) (Burchfiel, Robert) (Filed on 7/17/2009)
July 17, 2009 Filing 44 Declaration of Ned Himmel in Support of 42 MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendant's Notice of Motion for Summary Judgment and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support with Exhibit A filed byCity of San Jose. (Related document(s) 42 ) (Burchfiel, Robert) (Filed on 7/17/2009)
July 17, 2009 Filing 43 Declaration of Robert B. Burchfiel in Support of 42 MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendant's Notice of Motion for Summary Judgment and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support and Exhibit A filed byCity of San Jose. (Related document(s) 42 ) (Burchfiel, Robert) (Filed on 7/17/2009)
July 17, 2009 Filing 42 MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendant's Notice of Motion for Summary Judgment and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support filed by City of San Jose. Motion Hearing set for 8/28/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. (Burchfiel, Robert) (Filed on 7/17/2009)
June 18, 2009 Filing 41 Order Setting Settlement Conference before Magistrate Judge: Settlement Conference set for 9/24/2009 09:30 AM. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 6/18/09. (rslc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2009)
June 12, 2009 Filing 40 Minute Entry: Further Case Management Conference held on 6/12/2009 before Judge Jeremy Fogel (Date Filed: 6/12/2009). The case is referred to Magistrate Judge Seeborg for settlement conference. Jury Trial set for 10/23/2009 01:30 PM. Pretrial Conference set for 10/16/2009 11:00 AM. (Court Reporter Summer Clanton.) (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/12/2009)
May 29, 2009 Filing 39 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT JOINT CMC STATEMENT filed by Chin-Li Mou, City of San Jose. (Burchfiel, Robert) (Filed on 5/29/2009)
May 7, 2009 Filing 38 CLERKS NOTICE Further Case Management Conference set for 6/12/2009 10:30 AM. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2009)
November 24, 2008 Filing 37 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas R. Hogan of Pro Bono Counsel (Hogan, Thomas) (Filed on 11/24/2008)
October 10, 2008 Filing 36 Minute Entry: Further Case Management Conference held on 10/10/2008 before Judge Jeremy Fogel (Date Filed: 10/10/2008). (Court Reporter Summer Clanton.) (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/10/2008)
October 9, 2008 Filing 35 NOTICE by Chin-Li Mou, City of San Jose - Proposed Joint Discovery Plan and POS - (Burchfiel, Robert) (Filed on 10/9/2008)
September 24, 2008 Filing 34 Minute Entry: Discovery Hearing not held on 9/24/2008 before Judge Richard Seeborg. No appearances in Court by either side (Date Filed: 9/24/2008). (not reported.) (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/24/2008)
September 16, 2008 Filing 33 NOTICE by City of San Jose re 31 Notice (Other) - Defendant City of San Jose's Discovery Plan w/ POS - (Burchfiel, Robert) (Filed on 9/16/2008)
August 29, 2008 Filing 32 Minute Entry: Further Case Management Conference held on 8/29/2008 before Judge Jeremy Fogel (Date Filed: 8/29/2008). The case is referred to Magistrate Judge Seeborg for a discovery conference. Further Case Management Conference set for 10/10/2008 10:30 AM. (Court Reporter Summer Clanton.) (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/29/2008)
August 29, 2008 Filing 31 NOTICE by City of San Jose Notice of Hearing (Burchfiel, Robert) (Filed on 8/29/2008)
August 19, 2008 Filing 30 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Chin-Li Mou. (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2008)
August 13, 2008 Filing 29 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT w/ POS filed by City of San Jose. (Burchfiel, Robert) (Filed on 8/13/2008)
July 23, 2008 Filing 28 Letter from Chin-Li Mou. (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2008)
July 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER VACATING 13 REFERRAL TO ADR PROGRAM FOR EARLY NEUTRAL EVALUATION. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 7/8/08. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2008)
July 8, 2008 Filing 26 ADR Clerk's Notice Vacating Appointment of Evaluator Carol Webster Millie. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2008)
June 24, 2008 Filing 25 Letter from Chin-Li Mou. (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2008)
June 19, 2008 Copy of the File mailed, by certified mail, to Irene G. Cortez, Coordinator, Federal Pro Bono Project. (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2008)
June 19, 2008 ADR Unit RECEIVED OBJECTIONS to 20 ADR Clerks Notice Appointing ENE Evaluator, Carol Webster Millie, by Chin-Li Mou. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2008)
May 30, 2008 Filing 24 REFERRAL TO FEDERAL PRO BONO PROJECT re 23 MOTION to Appoint Counsel (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2008)
May 30, 2008 Filing 23 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Chin-Li Mou. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2008)
May 30, 2008 Filing 22 Minute Entry: Initial Case Management Conference held on 5/30/2008 before Judge Jeremy Fogel (Date Filed: 5/30/2008). The case is referred to the Federal Pro Bono Project. Further Case Management Conference set for 8/29/2008 10:30 AM. (Court Reporter Summer Clanton.) (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/30/2008)
May 30, 2008 Filing 21 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Chin-Li Mou. (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2008)
May 20, 2008 Filing 20 ADR Clerk's Notice Appointing Carol Webster Millie as ENE Evaluator. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2008)
May 15, 2008 Filing 19 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT and POS filed by Defendant. (Burchfiel, Robert) (Filed on 5/15/2008)
April 7, 2008 Filing 18 ADR Clerk's Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference on 4/15/2008 at 10:00 AM. ADR Unit will initiate the call. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2008)
March 31, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to District Judge Jeremy Fogel for all further proceedings and Magistrate Judge Richard Seeborg for all discovery matters. Signed by The Executive Committee on 03/27/08. (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2008)
March 27, 2008 Filing 16 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2008) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/27/2008: # 1 certificate of maling) (mpb, COURT STAFF).
March 27, 2008 Filing 15 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT; and [Proposed] Order filed by City of San Jose. (Burchfiel, Robert) (Filed on 3/27/2008) Modified on 3/31/2008 (bw, COURT STAFF).
March 26, 2008 Filing 14 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Chin-Li Mou. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2008)
March 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Early Neutral Evaluation. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 3/25/08. (rssec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2008)
March 25, 2008 Filing 12 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Early Neutral Evaluation by Chin-Li Mou, City of San Jose (Burchfiel, Robert) (Filed on 3/25/2008)
March 20, 2008 Filing 11 ADR Clerks Notice re: Non-Compliance with Court Order. (tjs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2008)
February 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Initial Case Management Conference continued to 4/2/2008 02:30 PM. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 2/7/08. (rssec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2008)
January 23, 2008 Filing 9 REQUEST for Appointment of Counsel Under 42 U.S.C. 1983; Declaration in Suport of Request by Chin-Li Mou. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2008) (bw, COURT STAFF).
January 14, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; denying 6 Motion to Appoint Counsel (rssec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2008)
December 6, 2007 Filing 7 ANSWER to Plaintiff's Complaint for Violation of Civil Rights, First, Eight and Fourteenth Amendments of the United States Constitution ( 1 ; Jury Trial Demand by City of San Jose. (Burchfiel, Robert) (Filed on 12/6/2007) Text modified, linkage added on 12/7/2007 (bw, COURT STAFF).
November 21, 2007 Filing 6 Request for Appointment of Counsel; Declaration in Suport of Request filed by Chin-Li Mou. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2007) (bw, COURT STAFF).
November 19, 2007 Filing 5 Return of Service re ( 3 ) ADR Scheduling Order, ( 1 ) Complaint, by Chin-Li M( bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2007)
November 19, 2007 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Chin-Li Mou. San Jose Public Library Education Park Branch served on 11/14/2007, answer due 12/4/2007. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2007) Additional attachment(s) added on 11/19/2007 (bw, COURT STAFF).
November 13, 2007 Summons Issued as to City of San Jose, San Jose Public Library Education Park Branch. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2007)
November 13, 2007 Filing 3 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 2/27/2008. Case Management Conference set for 3/5/2008 02:30 PM. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2007)
November 13, 2007 Filing 2 Application to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Chin-Li Mou. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2007) (bw, COURT STAFF).
November 13, 2007 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Violation of Civil Rights, First, Eighth and Fourteenth Amendments of the United States Constitution (NO PROCES); IFPP; against City of San Jose, San Jose Public Library Education Park Branch. Filed by Chin-Li Mou. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2007)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mou v. City of San Jose et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chin-Li Mou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of San Jose
Represented By: Robert Baker Burchfiel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Jose Public Library Education Park Branch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?