Nygren v. Hewlett-Packard Company
Plaintiff: Nathan Nygren
Defendant: Hewlett-Packard Company
Case Number: 5:2007cv05793
Filed: November 14, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Fraud or Truth-In-Lending
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 259 ORDER Granting 106 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Robert A. Particelli, Daniel E. McGuire, Meredith A. Galto and Thomas R. Green. Attorney Daniel Emmett McGuire; Robert A. Particelli; Meredith Ann Galto and Thomas R. Green terminated. Motions terminated: 106 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney. Signed by Judge James Ware on 6/24/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2010)
June 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 253 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd DENYING as moot 193 HP's May 17, 2010 Administrative Motion; 195 Plaintiffs' May 18, 2010 Motion to Unseal All Sealed Documents; and 207 Plaintiffs' May 21, 2010 Administrative Motion. The Court further VACATES the June 22, 2010 hearing on Plaintiffs' May 18, 2010 motion. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2010)
May 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 227 ORDER DENYING AS MOOT Non-Party NVIDIA Corporation's 221 Motion to Shorten Time and 223 Motion to Intervene. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 05/25/2010. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2010)
March 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER FINDING AS MOOT 105 Stipulation to Extend Class Certification Briefing. Please see the Court's Order as Modified 124 Stipulation to Extend Class Certification Briefing. Signed by Judge James Ware on 3/25/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2010)
March 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 124 STIPULATION AND ORDER Granting Request to Extend Class Certification Briefing and Hearing re 122 Stipulation. Set/Reset Deadlines 107 REDACTION of Motion for Class Certification. Motion Hearing set for 5/24/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge James Ware on 3/9/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2010)
February 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 104 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 103 Stipulation filed by Stephen Shifflette, Nathan Nygren, Amy Fromkin. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 2/8/2010. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2010)
January 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 96 STIPULATION AND ORDER AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT Regarding Class Certification Briefing and Motion to Compel Discovery Deadline re 95 Stipulation. Set/Reset Deadlines as to 95 Stipulation: Motion Hearing set for 5/3/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge James Ware on 1/22/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2010)
January 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 94 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 93 Stipulation filed by Stephen Shifflette, Nathan Nygren, Amy Fromkin. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 1/14/2010. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2010)
November 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 92 STIPULATION AND ORDER AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT Granting Request to Extend Class Discovery and Briefing Deadlines re 90 Stipulation. Set/Reset Deadlines: Close of Class Certification Discovery due by 1/8/2010. Deadline to File Class Certification M otion due by 1/29/2010. Opposition due 3/5/2010. Reply due 3/26/20010. Class Certification Motion Hearing set for 4/12/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge James Ware on 11/19/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2009)
August 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 89 STIPULATION AND ORDER AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT Extending Class Discovery and Briefing Deadlines re 87 Stipulation. Close of Class Discovery due 11/30/2009, Deadline to file Motion for Class Certification due 12/21/2009, Opposition due 1/29/2010, Reply due 2/19/2010. Motion Hearing re Class Certification set for 3/8/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge James Ware on 8/19/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2009)
December 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 68 STIPULATION AND ORDER AS FURTHER MODIFIED BY THE COURT TO AMEND THE JOINT STATEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER re 67 Stipulation. Please see Order for further specifics. Motion Hearing set for 12/14/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge James Ware on 12/10/2008. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2008)
December 1, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 65 STIPULATION AND ORDER Regarding Mediation Deadline re 62 Stipulation filed by Hewlett-Packard Company. Signed by Judge James Ware on 12/1/2008. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nygren v. Hewlett-Packard Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nathan Nygren
Represented By: Robert M. Roseman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hewlett-Packard Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?