Everflow Technology Corporation v. Millenium Electronics, Inc.
Plaintiff: Everflow Technology Corporation
Defendant: Millenium Electronics, Inc., Jamel Enterprises, LLC, Loroco Sales, Inc., James E Loro, Melva Loro, Nadine Loro Snapp, County Bank, Inc., Peralta Investment Group, LLC, JDC Partners, LLC, Jose Luis Alvarez, Xtreme Natural Stone, LLC, Michael Callaghan and Jamel Enterprises
Mediator: Daniel Bowling
Miscellaneous: Millennium International and County Bank, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2007cv05795
Filed: November 14, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Outside US
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 372 WRIT of Execution issued (San Diego County) in the amount of $1,370,453.65 against Millennium Electronics, Inc., James Loro, Melva Loro. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2015)
October 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 360 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 353 Motion for Default Judgment; adopting Report and Recommendations as to 357 Report and Recommendations. The Clerk shall close the file (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2014)
April 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 346 ORDER re 343 Objections to defendants' trial exhibits, 344 Objection to Plaintiff's Trial Exhibits. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 4/22/2014. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2014)
September 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 338 ORDER setting Pretrial Conference for 2/20/2014 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 9/26/13. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2013)
September 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 333 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd granting in part and denying in part 288 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying 300 Motion for Summary Judgment (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2013)
March 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 332 ORDER vacating Final Pretrial Conference and Trial. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on March 15, 2013. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2013)
February 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 322 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 316 Discovery Letter Brief. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2013)
January 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 303 STIPULATION AND ORDER DISMISSING DEFENDANT MICHAEL CALLAGHAN. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on January 28, 2013. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2013)
January 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 302 ORDER DENYING requests for telephone appearances at status conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on January 24, 2013. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2013)
January 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 287 ORDER setting status conference for January 29, 2013 at 1:30 p.m. in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, United States District Court, 280 South First Street, San Jose, California. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on January 11, 2013. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2013)
December 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 284 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER (MODIFIED BY THE COURT). Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on December 28, 2012. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/28/2012)
December 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 283 STIPULATION AND ORDER extending the fact discovery cut-off to December 28, 2012 for the depositions of James E. Loro and Everflow Technology Corp. The deadline for hearings on dispositive motions is now February 19, 2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on December 12, 2012. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2012)
August 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 276 ORDER RE: DISCOVERY DISPUTE JOINT REPORTS 1 272 AND 3 274 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 8/17/2012. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2012)
February 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 268 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE AT THE FEBRUARY 21 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 265 . Mr. Fang shall initiate a call to CourtCall at 866-582-6878 just before the time set for hearing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 2/16/12. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Everflow Technology Corporation v. Millenium Electronics, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Everflow Technology Corporation
Represented By: Mark M Fang, Esq
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Millenium Electronics, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jamel Enterprises, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Loroco Sales, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James E Loro
Represented By: David Ray Chamberlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melva Loro
Represented By: David Ray Chamberlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nadine Loro Snapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County Bank, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peralta Investment Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JDC Partners, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose Luis Alvarez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xtreme Natural Stone, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Callaghan
Represented By: Richard John La Fleur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jamel Enterprises
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Mediator: Daniel Bowling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: Millennium International
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: County Bank, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?