Sanbrook v. Office Depot, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Mary Sanbrook
Defendant: Office Depot, Inc. and Does 1-20
Case Number: 5:2007cv05938
Filed: November 26, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Ronald M. Whyte
Presiding Judge: Patricia V. Trumbull
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Non-Motor Vehicle
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 259 ORDER by Judge Whyte granting 235 Motion for Attorney Fees (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/23/2010)
April 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 244 STIPULATION AND ORDER 243 to Amend Order Preliminary Approving Class Action Settlement. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 4/15/10. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2010)
March 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 242 ORDER by Judge Whyte granting 226 Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2010)
December 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 223 STIPULATION AND ORDER 222 Staying Action. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 12/23/09. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2009)
August 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 216 ORDER 214 of Substitution of Attorneys, Attorney David Michael Walsh, Esq terminated. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 8/11/09. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2009)
July 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 213 ORDER by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull re 159 Plaintiff's Second Motion to Compel and re 139 Plaintiff's Motion for an Order to Show Cause Why Office Depot Should Not Be Held in Contempt. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 7/17/2009)
May 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER by Judge Whyte granting 133 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2009)
March 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull re 108 Named Plaintiff's Motion to Compel. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 3/30/2009)
March 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 126 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER re 49 AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on 3/23/09. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 3/23/2009)
March 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER regarding 46 MOTION to Certify Class filed by Mary Sanbrook. Signed by Judge Whyte on 03/06/09. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2009)
February 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER by Judge Whyte denying 58 Motion for Summary Judgment. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2009)
January 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER 98 , 99 to Continue Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification: Motion Hearing set for 2/20/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 1/20/09. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2009)
December 16, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER CONTINUING HEARING ON 46 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION AND REQUESTING ADDITIONAL BRIEFING. Signed by Judge Whyte on 12/16/08. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2008)
November 26, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER by Judge Whyte denying 68 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2008)
November 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 73 STIPULATION AND ORDER 67 to Continue Hearing on Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. Motion Hearing set for 12/19/2008 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 11/24/8. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2008)
November 6, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER 56 ; 57 on the Stipulated Request for an Extension of Time to Submit a Reply Memorandum and Continue the Motion Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification. Motion Hearing set for 12/19/2008 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 11/5/08. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sanbrook v. Office Depot, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Sanbrook
Represented By: Scott Richard Kaufman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Office Depot, Inc.
Represented By: Laura Michelle Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-20
Represented By: Laura Michelle Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?