Halo Electronics, Inc. v. Bel Fuse Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Halo Electronics, Inc.
Defendant: Bel Fuse Inc., Elec & Eltek (USA) Corporation, Wurth Electronics Midcom, Inc. and XFMRS, Inc.
Mediator: William A. Fenwick
Case Number: 5:2007cv06222
Filed: February 2, 2010
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
Referring Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Presiding Judge: Ronald M. Whyte
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: 35:145 Patent Infringement

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 15, 2012 410 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR A LIMITED MODIFICATION OF THE PROTECTIVE ORDER re 399 . Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on June 15, 2012. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2012)
June 13, 2012 407 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER 401 to Shorten Time to June 15, 2012 on Halo's Motion to Modify the Protective Order, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 399 MOTION to Amend/Correct 149 Stipulation and Order, Protective Order FOR LIMITED MODIFICATI ON OF THE PROTECTIVE ORDER. Motion Hearing set for 6/15/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Ronald M. Whyte. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 6/13/12. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2012) Modified on 6/13/2012 (jg, COURT STAFF).
May 7, 2012 396 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte denying 383 Motion Order of Contempt (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2012)
April 19, 2012 391 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING HALOS MOTION FOR ADMINISTRATIVE RELIEF TO FILE CERTAIN DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL by Hon. Ronald M. Whyte re 387 .(rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2012)
July 22, 2011 376 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER 375 Re: Settlement. Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal due by 8/1/2011. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 7/22/11. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2011)
May 18, 2011 371 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd granting 364 plaintiff's Motion to Compel Discovery from Defendant XFMRS, Inc. 5/24/2011 hearing is vacated. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2011)
May 17, 2011 370 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER 366 Revising Case Schedule. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 5/17/11. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2011)
March 24, 2011 360 Opinion or Order of the Court JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER 359 Setting Case Schedule Through Trial, or in the Alternative, for a Case Management Conference: Case Management Conference set for 9/23/2011 10:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. Jury Trial set for 12/5/2011 0 1:30 PM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Ronald M. Whyte. Motion Hearing set for 9/23/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Ronald M. Whyte. Pretrial Conference set for 11/10/2011 02:00 PM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Ronald M. Whyte. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 3/23/11. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2011)
November 16, 2010 357 Opinion or Order of the Court CLAIM CONSTRUCTION ORDER Signed by Judge Whyte on 11/16/2010. (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2010)
November 9, 2010 354 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd denying 319 Nonparty Cisco Systems, Inc.'s Motion for Attorney's Fees and Costs; denying as moot 349 and 352 Motions to Appear by Telephone. 11/16/2010 motion hearing is vacated. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2010)
November 4, 2010 351 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd granting in part and denying in part 263 plaintiff's motion to compel discovery. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2010)
October 25, 2010 343 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Whyte granting 342 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2010)
October 21, 2010 341 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Whyte granting 340 Motion for Leave to File Certain Documents Under Seal. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2010)
October 4, 2010 333 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Whyte granting 328 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2010)
September 3, 2010 317 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd granting 292 defendants' Motion for Leave to Amend Invalidity Contentions. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2010)
August 16, 2010 298 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER 297 Re: Joint Claim Construction ad Prehearing Statement; Further Status Conference; and Claim Construction Hearing Date: Further Case Management Conference set for 8/27/2010 10:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. Claims Construction Hearing set for 10/27/2010 09:00 AM. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 8/16/10. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2010) Modified on 8/16/2010 (jg, COURT STAFF).
August 6, 2010 289 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 288 Stipulation filed by Halo Electronics, Inc. Signed by Judge Whyte on 8/6/10. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2010)
August 5, 2010 287 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Whyte granting 285 Motion to Appear by Telephone (rmwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2010)
July 14, 2010 273 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER 268 Vacating July 23, 2010 Hearing on Halo's Motion to Strike and Extending the Time for Elec & Eltek and E & E Magnetic Products to Answer and Counterclaim to halo's First Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 7/14/10. (jgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2010)
June 28, 2010 260 Opinion or Order of the Court Unredacted ORDER by Judge Whyte denying in part and deferring ruling in part on 190 MOTION to Dismiss for Insufficient Service and Lack of Jurisdiction. 240 Redacted Order previously filed on 6/14/10. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2010)
June 18, 2010 245 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 211 plaintiff's motion to seal. Defendant Bel Fuse, Inc. to submit supporting declarations by 6/22/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 6/18/2010. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2010)
June 17, 2010 242 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 229 Defendant Elec & Eltek (USA) Corporation's Motion to Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 6/17/2010. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2010)
June 14, 2010 238 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Whyte denying 178 Motion for Leave to File First Amended Answer and Counterclaims. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2010)
June 8, 2010 232 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Whyte granting in part and denying in part 220 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2010)
June 3, 2010 230 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER requesting briefing within 5 days from Elec & Eltek (USA) Corp. regarding 220 Motion to Seal. Signed by Judge Whyte on 6/3/10. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2010)
May 25, 2010 214 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Whyte granting 203 Motion to Seal (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2010)
May 20, 2010 202 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER 198 re: Case Schedule: Status Conference set for 8/6/2010 10:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 5/20/10. (jgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2010)
May 6, 2010 189 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER 186 Extending Time for Halo Electronics, Inc. to Respond to Elec & Eltek and Wurth Electronics's Answer and Counterclaim to Halo's First Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 5/6/10. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2010)
April 21, 2010 179 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER 177 Extending Time for Plaintiff to Respond to Elec & Eltek (USA) and Wurth Electronics Midcom's Answer and Counterclaim. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 4/21/10. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2010)
March 19, 2010 157 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Whyte granting 147 Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2010)
March 1, 2010 154 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 150 Letter filed by Halo Electronics, Inc., declining telephonic conference and declining to postpone claim construction and related dates. Signed by Judge Whyte on 3/1/10. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2010)
February 16, 2010 149 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER (MODIFIED BY THE COURT). Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 2/16/2010. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2010)
February 2, 2010 141 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER 140 Granting Substitution of Attorney for Elec & Eltek, Attorney Terry John Mollica for Elec & Eltek (USA) Corporation added. Attorney David S. Brun terminated. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 2/2/10. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2010)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Halo Electronics, Inc. v. Bel Fuse Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Halo Electronics, Inc.
Represented By: John Cameron Adkisson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bel Fuse Inc.
Represented By: Martin C. Fliesler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elec & Eltek (USA) Corporation
Represented By: Sarah Katherine Casey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wurth Electronics Midcom, Inc.
Represented By: Emily Rita Frank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XFMRS, Inc.
Represented By: Harold C. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Mediator: William A. Fenwick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?