Sorensen v. Lexar Media, Inc.
Plaintiff: Jens Erik Sorensen
Defendant: Lexar Media, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2008cv00095
Filed: January 7, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Presiding Judge: James Ware
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 253 ORDER Following Case Management Conference. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on June 7, 2012. (ejdlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2012)
March 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 229 Order Granting 203 Second Motion To Amend Pleadings. Signed by Hon. Edward J. Davila on 3/16/2012(ejdlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2012) Modified text on 3/19/2012 (ecg, COURT STAFF).
February 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 214 ORDER by Judge Edward J. Davila denying 202 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying 210 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (ejdlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2012)
December 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 200 STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE REPLY TO LEXAR'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON INTERVENING RIGHTS AND MOTION TO AMEND PLEADINGS re 199 Stipulation filed by Lexar Media, Inc. Reply due 12/12/2012. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 12/7/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2011)
October 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 183 STIPULATION AND ORDER Granting 182 Joint MOTION to Continue CMC by one week (stipulated) filed by Jens Erik Sorensen. ***10/28/2011 Deadlines terminated. Joint Case Management Statement due by 10/28/2011. Case Management Conference set for 11/4/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 5th Floor, San Jose. The parties are further ordered to provide a proposed order for all further requests of thisnature. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 10/19/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2011)
June 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ORDER GRANTING 171 MOTION SHORTENING TIME FOR HEARING ON THE MOTION FOR IMMEDIATE LIFT OF STAY IN LIGHT OF BPAI REVERSAL OF EXAMINER'S REJECTIONS AND ISSUANCE OF NIRC. The parties shall notify the Court immediately upon receipt of the reexami nation certificate. Should the parties fail to notify the Court prior to July 29, 2011 regarding receipt of the reexamination certificate, the Motion for Immediate Lift of Stay in Light of BPAI Reversal of Examiner's Rejections and Issuance of NIRC shall be taken off calendar for August 5, 2011 and must be re-noticed for a new hearing date. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 6/16/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2011)
February 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 164 ORDER Granting Withdrawal of Counsel re 163 Notice of Change In Counsel. Attorney Joseph Hyuk Lee terminated. Signed by Judge James Ware on 2/15/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2011)
January 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER re 118 Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court,. Signed by Judge James Ware on January 16, 2009. (jwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2009)
December 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg denying 82 Motion to Compel; granting 86 Motion to Compel; granting in part and denying in part 88 Motion to Compel (rssec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2008)
December 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 112 SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER. Settlement Conference set for 2/9/2009 09:30 AM. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/8/08. (rssec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2008)
November 24, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 94 STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING Extension of Time to Serve Invalidity Contentions re 90 Stipulation filed by Lexar Media, Inc. Deadline to serve set for 11/24/2008. Signed by Judge James Ware on 11/24/2008. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sorensen v. Lexar Media, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jens Erik Sorensen
Represented By: Melody Ann Kramer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lexar Media, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?