Gall v. City Of San Jose
Plaintiff: Timothy L Gall
Defendant: City Of San Jose
Case Number: 5:2008cv00120
Filed: January 8, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Patricia V. Trumbull
Nature of Suit: American with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 75 STIPULATION AND ORDER Granting Dismissal pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1) re 74 Stipulation. The Clerk shall close this file. Signed by Judge James Ware on 1/21/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2010)
November 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE SETTLEMENT. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 12/21/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. James Ware. Stipulated Dismissal or Show Cause Response due by 12/16/2009. Signed by Judge James Ware on 11/12/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2009)
September 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re Settlement. Show Cause Response or Stipulated Dismissal due by 11/6/2009. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 11/16/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. James Ware. Signed by Judge James Ware on 9/16/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2009)
August 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER CONTINUING PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE re 65 Order. The Court directed the parties to submit a Joint Preliminary Pretrial Statement on or before 8/21/2009. To date, the parties have not filed the Statement. Accordingly, the Court continu es the Pretrial Conference to 9/21/2009 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. On or before 9/11/2009, the parties shall file a Joint Preliminary Pretrial Statement. The Statement include, among other things, a status on the parties' settlement efforts and the parties' readiness for trial, including a proposed trial schedule. Signed by Judge James Ware on 8/26/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2009)
July 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER TERMINATING SETTLEMENT COUNSEL PARTICIPATION IN THE ASSISTED SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE PROGRAM (rslc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2009)
May 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER CONTINUING PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE; MODIFYING SCHEDULING ORDER re 64 Pretrial Conference Statement. Close of All Discovery due by 7/27/2009. Last Date to Hear Dispositive Motions due by 9/28/2009. Joint Preliminary Pretrial Statement due 8/21/2009; Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 8/31/2009 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Please see Order for further specifics. Signed by Judge James Ware on 5/14/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2009)
March 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER re In Camera Review. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on 3/23/09. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 3/24/2009)
March 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 60 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER re 59 as modified by the court(see section 7.3(a)). Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on 3/6/09. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 3/6/2009)
February 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 57 STIPULATION AND ORDER AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT re 56 Stipulation filed by City Of San Jose. Motion to Compel reset to 3/24/2009 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Patricia V. Trumbull. Close of all Discovery due by 6/22/2009. Last Date to Hear Disposit ive Motions due by 7/6/2009. Preliminary Pretrial Conference statement due 5/8/2009. Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 5/18/2009 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge James Ware on 2/26/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2009)
December 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER RESCHEDULING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Settlement Conference rescheduled to 2/3/2009 09:30 AM. Signed by Judge r on 12/15/08. (rssec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2008)
December 5, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER SETTING FURTHER SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Further Settlement Conference set for 12/19/2008 09:30 AM. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/5/08. (rssec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2008)
November 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER by Judge James Ware denying 34 Motion to Amend/Correct ; (jwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2008)
October 20, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER re 43 Setting Briefing and Hearing Schedule for Plaintiff's Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on 10/17/08. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 10/20/2008)
October 2, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER CONSTRUING PLAINTIFFS FILING AS A MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT; REQUESTING RESPONSE FROM DEFENDANT re 34 MOTION to Amend/Correct 1 Complaint filed by Timothy L Gall. Signed by Judge James Ware on October 2, 2008. (jwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2008)
September 17, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 36 STIPULATION AND ORDER Modifying Scheduling Order re 35 Stipulation filed by City Of San Jose. Close of All Discovery due by 4/27/2009, Last Date to Hear Dispositive Motions due by 6/29/2009, Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 3/16/2009 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge James Ware on 9/17/2008. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gall v. City Of San Jose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy L Gall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City Of San Jose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?