HTC Corporation et al v. Technology Properties Limited et al
Plaintiff: HTC Corporation and HTC America, Inc.
Defendant: Technology Properties Limited, Patriot Scientific Corporation and Alliacense Limited
Case Number: 5:2008cv00882
Filed: February 8, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Jeremy Fogel
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:2201 Declaratory Judgement
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 756 ORDER RELATING CASES - The Clerk shall notify the parties and the affected judges accordingly. With the parties consent to magistrate judge jurisdiction secured long ago, the undersign will continue to preside over HTC Corp. v. Technology Properties, Ltd. (PSG). Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on October 15, 2014. (psglc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2014) Modified on 10/15/2014 (cv, COURT STAFF).
October 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 754 ORDER CONTINUING STATUS CONFERENCE Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on October 3, 2014 re 752 . (psglc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2014)
September 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 752 ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on September 29, 2014. (psglc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2014)
September 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 750 ORDER OF REFERRAL FOR PURPOSES OF DETERMINING RELATIONSHIP. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 9/24/14. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2014)
July 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 748 ORDER RE: TAXATION OF COSTS by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting-in-part 706 , 710 and 714 (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2014)
January 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 709 ORDER MODIFYING JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on January 21, 2014. (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2014)
October 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 650 FINAL VERDICT FORM. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on October 1, 2013. (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2013)
September 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 646 FINAL JURY INSTRUCTIONS. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on September 30, 2013. (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2013)
September 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 615 ORDER RE: REVISIONS TO PRELIMINARY JURY INSTRUCTIONS. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on September 23, 2013. (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2013)
September 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 608 ORDER RE: PRELIMINARY JURY INSTRUCTIONS 513 . Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on September 20, 2013. (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2013)
September 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 601 ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION FOR PERMISSION TO BRING EQUIPMENT FOR USE DURING TRIAL, granting 597 . Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on 9/19/2013. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2013)
September 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 585 ORDER RE: MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting-in-part 457 and 458 (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2013)
September 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 564 ORDER ON MOTIONS IN LIMINE by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting in part and denying in part 488 , 489 , 490 , 492 , 495 , 499 , 501 , 503 , and 504 (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2013)
January 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 355 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 354 Proposed Order filed by HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation. Signed by Judge James Ware on 1/24/12. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2012)
April 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 299 ORDER GRANTING ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION 295 TO SEAL. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on April 20, 2011. (jflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2011)
April 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 290 ORDER AMENDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on April 7, 2011. (jflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2011)
March 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 279 ORDER SCHEDULING BRIEFING FOR MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on March 23, 2011. (jflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2011)
March 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 271 ORDER DENYING 235 Defendants' Motion to Modify the Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 3/1/2011. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2011)
February 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 257 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION 246 TO FILE CONFIDENTIAL EXHIBITS UNDER SEAL. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on February 9, 2011. (jflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2011)
January 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 240 (1) ORDER DENYING 191 Defendants' Motion to Compel Interrogatory Responses and Production of Documents and (2) INTERIM ORDER RE: 197 Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Responses to Interrogatory Nos. 3 and 4 and RFP Nos. 3, 5, 6, and 8, 11. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 1/12/2011. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2011)
December 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 233 ORDER DENYING 231 Plaintiffs' Request for Leave to File a Supplemental Statement. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 12/13/2010. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2010)
December 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 226 ORDER GRANTING IN PART PLAINTIFFS' MOTION 206 FOR ADMINISTRATIVE RELIEF FROM CLAIM CONSTRUCTION SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on December 1, 2010.
November 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 211 ORDER DENYING 201 . In light of Plaintiffs' administrative motion before Judge Fogel (Docket No. 206), this Court DENIES Defendants' motion for an order shortening time for hearing their motion to compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 11/19/2010. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2010)
June 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 174 ORDER BY JUDGE JEREMY FOGEL DENYING 155 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ORDER PROHIBITING DANIEL LECKRONE FROM CONTACTING HTC EMPLOYEES. (jflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2010)
May 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 171 STIPULATION AND ORDER AMENDING SCHEDULING ORDER re 164 . Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 5/17/10. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2010)
April 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 163 SEALING ORDER. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 4/26/2010. (jflc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2010)
April 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 161 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 153 Stipulated Protective Order filed by HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 4/21/2010. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2010)
March 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 152 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO DISMISS THE SECOND CLAIM OF PLAINTIFFS' FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT re 151 . Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 3/25/10. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2010)
February 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER GRANTING REQUEST FOR WITHDRAW OF COUNSEL AND SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL BY DEFENDANTS TECHNOLOGY PROPERTIES LIMITED AND ALLIACENSE LIMITED re 144 Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed by Technology Properties Limited. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 2/12/10. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2010)
September 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER of Substitution of Counsel for Plaintiffs HTC Corporation and HTC America, Inc. re 136 . Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 9/22/09. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2009)
May 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd granting in part and denying in part 93 Motion for disclosure of defendants' Preliminary Infringement Contentions (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2009)
April 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd granting 96 Motion to Seal (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2009)
December 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 70 RELATED CASE ORDER. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 12/17/08. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2008)
December 16, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd granting in part and denying in part 54 Motion to Compel (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2008)
November 21, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 59 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 57 Proposed Order, filed by Technology Properties Limited, Alliacense Limited. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 11/21/08. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2008)
October 21, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER BY JUDGE JEREMY FOGEL DENYING 15 MOTION TO DISMISS, TO TRANSFER VENUE, AND TO STAY. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HTC Corporation et al v. Technology Properties Limited et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HTC Corporation
Represented By: Mark R. Weinstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HTC America, Inc.
Represented By: Mark R. Weinstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Technology Properties Limited
Represented By: Christopher Lee Ogden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patriot Scientific Corporation
Represented By: Christopher Lee Ogden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alliacense Limited
Represented By: Christopher Lee Ogden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?