Capcom Co. LTD. et al v. The MKR Group, Inc.

Plaintiff: Capcom Co. LTD. and Capcom Entertainment, Inc.
Defendant: The MKR Group, Inc.
3rd_party_defendant: Capcom U.S.A., Inc.
3rd_party_plaintiff: The MKR Group, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2008cv00904
Filed: February 12, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Outside US
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER AND JUDGMENT re 68 (rslc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2008) Modified on 12/1/2008 (rssec, COURT STAFF).
November 12, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER VACATING REFERRAL TO MEDIATION. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 11/12/08. (rssec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2008)
October 29, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER re 64 Stipulation filed by The MKR Group, Inc. Stipulation Modified by the Court. Further Case Management Conference set for 1/7/2009 02:30 PM. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 10/29/08. (rssec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2008)
October 20, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER re 61 Stipulation filed by The MKR Group, Inc. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 10/20/08. (rssec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Capcom Co. LTD. et al v. The MKR Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Capcom Co. LTD.
Represented By: Rodger R. Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Capcom Entertainment, Inc.
Represented By: Rodger R. Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The MKR Group, Inc.
Represented By: Philip Joseph McCabe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd_party_defendant: Capcom U.S.A., Inc.
Represented By: Rodger R. Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd_party_plaintiff: The MKR Group, Inc.
Represented By: Philip Joseph McCabe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?