Celestino et al v. The Wildcat Vineyards LLC
Plaintiff: Roberto Celestino, Geraldo Pacheco, Jose Montejano and Gerardo M. Celestino
Defendant: The Wildcat Vineyards LLC
Case Number: 5:2008cv00994
Filed: February 19, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Presiding Judge: James Ware
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 32 STIPULATION AND ORDER AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT to Dismiss with Prejudice re 31 Stipulation. Please see Order for further specifics. The Clerk shall close this file. Signed by Judge James Ware on 8/12/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2009)
July 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re Settlement. Stipulated Dismissal or Show Cause Response due by 8/10/2009. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 8/31/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. James Ware. Signed by Judge James Ware on 7/15/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2009)
May 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 25 STIPULATION AND ORDER AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT MODIFICATION THE COURT'S SEPTEMBER 11, 2008 SCHEDULING ORDER re 22 Stipulation filed by The Wildcat Vineyards LLC. The Court grants only a 60 day extension. The Court will not entertain further re quests for discovery extension. Close of All Discovery due by 9/25/2009. Last Date to Hear Dispositive Motions by 10/26/2009. Preliminary Pretrial Conference statement due 8/21/2009, Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 8/31/2009 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge James Ware on 5/21/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2009)
January 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO ADR FOR SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE re 20 Stipulation and Proposed Order selecting Arbitration. Signed by Judge James Ware on 1/26/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Celestino et al v. The Wildcat Vineyards LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roberto Celestino
Represented By: Adam Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Geraldo Pacheco
Represented By: Adam Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Montejano
Represented By: Adam Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerardo M. Celestino
Represented By: Adam Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Wildcat Vineyards LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?