Espinoza et al v. C & C Security Patrol, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: |
Leonardo Espinoza and Sergio Roque |
Defendant: |
C & C Security Patrol, Inc., Frank Russow and Hermenegildo Cough |
Case Number: |
5:2008cv01522 |
Filed: |
March 19, 2008 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Northern District of California |
Office: |
Labor: Fair Standards Office |
County: |
Alameda |
Presiding Judge: |
Howard R. Lloyd |
Nature of Suit: |
Plaintiff |
Cause of Action: |
Federal Question |
Jury Demanded By: |
29:201 Denial of Overtime Compensation |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
March 31, 2010 |
Filing
90
STIPULATION AND ORDER Granting Request to File Parties' Stipulated Request for Court Approval of Settlement; Granting Request to File Stipulated Settlement Under Seal re 89 Stipulation. Signed by Judge James Ware on 3/31/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2010)
|
February 16, 2010 |
Filing
88
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE SETTLEMENT. In light of the settlement, the Court vacates all trial and pretrial dates and DENIES all pending Motions as moot. Stipulated Dismissal or Show Cause Response due by 3/26/2010. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 4 /5/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. James Ware. Failure to comply with any part of this Order will be deemed sufficient grounds to dismissthis action. Motions terminated: 85 MOTION filed by Leonardo Espinoza. Signed by Judge James Ware on 2/16/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2010)
|
January 22, 2010 |
Filing
84
STIPULATION AND ORDER Granting One Week Extension to File Pre-Trial Materialsre 82 Stipulation. All pretrial materials due 1/29/2010. The Court will not entertain further requests for extension. Signed by Judge James Ware on 1/22/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2010)
|
January 12, 2010 |
Filing
81
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd denying as moot 77 defendants' motion for order shortening time; denying 79 defendants' Motion to Compel; and denying 80 defendants' Motion for Sanctions. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2010)
|
December 14, 2009 |
Filing
76
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd granting 63 defendants' motion to compel plaintiffs' depositions. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2009)
|
December 1, 2009 |
Filing
72
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd denying as moot 60 plaintiffs' motion to compel written discovery responses. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2009)
|
November 19, 2009 |
Filing
70
ORDER re 63 Defendants' Motion for Hearing re Motion to Compel Plaintiffs' Depositions. Plaintiffs' opposition due 12/1/2009. Defendants' reply due 12/8/2009. Unless otherwise ordered, matter to be deemed submitted without oral argument. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 11/19/2009. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2009)
|
October 16, 2009 |
Filing
56
STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT re 55 Stipulation. Plaintiffs shall file their Second Amended Complaint as a separate docket item number by 10/19/2009. Signed by Judge James Ware on 10/15/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2009)
|
May 5, 2009 |
Filing
48
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd granting 25 , 35 defendant Couoh's motions to compel; and granting in part and denying in part 29 , 32 defendant Couoh's motions for sanctions. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2009)
|
October 2, 2008 |
Filing
21
ORDER by Judge James Ware granting 16 Motion for Leave to File (jwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2008)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?