Sarkis v. Lajcak et al
Plaintiff: Anthony Sarkis
Defendant: Office of the High Representative and Miroslav Lajcak
Case Number: 5:2008cv01911
Filed: April 10, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Contract: Other Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Patricia V Trumbull
Referring Judge: Ronald M Whyte
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2011. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2011 Filing 81 USCA Memorandum as to #66 Notice of Appeal, filed by Anthony Sarkis The petition for writ of certiorari was denied on 10/11/2011. Supreme Court of United States number 11-167 (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2011)
October 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER of Supreme Court of the United States Office of the Clerk as to #66 Notice of Appeal filed by Anthony Sarkis. The petition for writ of certiorari was denied on 10/11/2011. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2011)
August 16, 2011 Filing 80 USCA Memorandum as to #66 Notice of Appeal for Supreme Court of the United States filed by Anthony Sarkis. Received notice from the Supreme Court the petition for writ of certiorari in the above entitled case was filed on 08/05/2011 and placed on the docket 08/10/11 as No. 11167. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2011)
June 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER of USCA as to #66 Notice of Appeal, filed by Anthony Sarkis The appellees opposed motion for costs is granted. Costs shall be taxed against the appellant in the amount of $84.90. A copy of this order shall serve to amend the courts prior mandate. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2011)
May 25, 2011 Filing 78 CLERKS NOTICE Spreading Mandate of this court. (Attachments: #1 Mandate of the United States Court of Appeals) (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2011)
May 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER of USCA as to #66 Notice of Appeal. Plaintiff-Appellants Motion to Stay Mandate, filed May 16, 2011, is DENIED. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2011)
May 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER of USCA as to #66 Notice of Appeal, filed by Anthony Sarkis The panel has voted to deny the petition for rehearing. Judge Clifton has voted to deny the petition for rehearing en banc, and Judge Wallace and Judge Fernandez have so recommended. The full court has been advised of the petition for rehearing en banc and no judge of the court has requested a vote on whether to rehear the matter en banc. Fed. R. App. P. 35. The petition for rehearing and the petition for rehearing en banc, filed April 11, 2011, are DENIED (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2011)
March 28, 2011 Filing 75 USCA Memorandum as to #66 Notice of Appeal, filed by Anthony Sarkis FILED MEMORANDUM DISPOSITION AFFIRMED. FILED AND ENTERED JUDGMENT (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2011)
March 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER of USCA as to #66 Notice of Appeal, filed by Anthony Sarkis. Plaintiff-Appellants Motion for Leave to File on an Expedited Basis a Supplemental Brief on Authorities Arising Following Completion of Parties Briefing, filed March 24, 2011, is DENIED (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2011)
June 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER of USCA as to #66 Notice of Appeal, filed by Anthony Sarkis. Appellees motion for dismissal or summary affirmance of this appeal is denied because the arguments raised in the opening brief are sufficiently substantial to warrant further consideration by a merits panel. Appellees alternate request for additional time to file their answering brief is granted. The answering brief and supplemental excerpts are due July 9, 2010, and the optional reply brief is due within 14 days after service of the answering brief. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2010)
January 8, 2010 Filing 72 Certificate of Record forwarded to USCA re appeal #66 Notice of Appeal (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2010)
December 22, 2009 Filing 70 Transcript of Proceedings held on 09/11/09, before Judge Ronald M. Whyte. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lee-Anne Shortridge, Telephone number 408-287-4580. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/22/2010. (las, ) (Filed on 12/22/2009)
December 1, 2009 Filing 69 Transcript Designation and Ordering Form for proceedings held on 12/19/2008, C/R: Jana Ridenour, 09/11/2009, C/R: Lee-Anne Shortridge, hearings held before Judge Ronald M. Whyte (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2009)
December 1, 2009 Filing 68 NOTICE OF DESIGNATION of Portions of the Record re #66 Notice of Appeal, (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2009)
November 9, 2009 Filing 71 USCA Case Number 09-17506 Ninth Circuit for #66 Notice of Appeal, filed by Anthony Sarkis. (Attachments: #1 USCA time schedule order)(dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2009)
November 6, 2009 Filing 67 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re #66 Notice of Appeal, (Attachments: #1 Counsel Information, #2 Docket Sheet)(dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2009)
November 6, 2009 Filing 66 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #63 Order Granting Motion to Dismiss, #65 Judgment by Anthony Sarkis. Filing fee paid $ 455., receipt #5461006282 Appeal Record due by 12/7/2009. (docketing statement forwarded to the Ninth Circuit) (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2009)
October 15, 2009 Filing 65 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Whyte on 10/14/09. (rmwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2009)
October 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER by Judge Whyte finding as moot #45 Motion for Leave to File; finding as moot #47 Motion to Substitute Party. (rmwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2009)
October 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER by Judge Whyte granting #21 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (rmwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2009)
October 7, 2009 Filing 62 NOTICE by Miroslav Lajcak, Office of the High Representative re #61 Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of Transcript SPECIALLY APPEARING DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF RESCISSION OF NOTICE OF INTENT TO REQUEST REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPT [DOC. NO. 61] (Carteen, Lisa) (Filed on 10/7/2009)
September 24, 2009 Filing 61 NOTICE of Intent to Request Redaction of Transcript by Lisa Inez Carteen (Carteen, Lisa) (Filed on 9/24/2009)
September 17, 2009 Filing 60 Transcript of Proceedings held on December 19, 2008, before Judge Ronald M. Whyte. Court Reporter/Transcriber Jana Ridenour, Telephone number (408) 390-7935. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/14/2009. (mz, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2009)
September 11, 2009 Filing 59 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 9/11/2009 before Ronald M. Whyte (Date Filed: 9/11/2009) re #47 MOTION to Substitute Party Valentin Inzko in the Instant Action for all Purposes in Place of Co-Defendant Miroslav Lajcak filed by Anthony Sarkis. (Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge.) (jg, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/11/2009)
August 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER by Judge Whyte continuing hearing date on plaintiff's motion to substitute defendants, resolving #53 plaintiff's administrative request and #54 defendants' administrative request. (rmwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2009)
August 4, 2009 Filing 57 Memorandum in Opposition re #54 MOTION Administrative Relief Continuing Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion to Substitute Specially Appearing Defendants' (1) Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Administrative Relief Requesting That His Motion to Substitute Be Determined MOTION Administrative Relief Continuing Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion to Substitute Specially Appearing Defendants' (1) Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Administrative Relief Requesting That His Motion to Substitute Be Determined MOTION Administrative Relief Continuing Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion to Substitute Specially Appearing Defendants' (1) Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Administrative Relief Requesting That His Motion to Substitute Be Determined MOTION Administrative Relief Continuing Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion to Substitute Specially Appearing Defendants' (1) Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Administrative Relief Requesting That His Motion to Substitute Be Determined MOTION Administrative Relief Continuing Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion to Substitute Specially Appearing Defendants' (1) Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Administrative Relief Requesting That His Motion to Substitute Be Determined filed byAnthony Sarkis. (Musolino, Philip) (Filed on 8/4/2009)
July 31, 2009 Filing 56 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Anthony Sarkis re #52 Reply to Opposition to Motion to Substitute Valentin Inzko in the Instant Action for All Purposes in Place of Co-Defendant Miroslav Lajcak (Musolino, Philip) (Filed on 7/31/2009)
July 30, 2009 Filing 55 NOTICE by Miroslav Lajcak, Office of the High Representative re #21 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction SPECIALLY APPEARING DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS Specially Appearing Defendants' Notice Regarding Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Under Submission [Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-13] (Carteen, Lisa) (Filed on 7/30/2009)
July 30, 2009 Filing 54 MOTION Administrative Relief Continuing Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion to Substitute Specially Appearing Defendants' (1) Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Administrative Relief Requesting That His Motion to Substitute Be Determined Without Oral Argument Or Via Telephone, and (2) Motion for Administrative Relief Continuing the Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion to Substitute filed by Miroslav Lajcak, Office of the High Representative. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Bruce Baumgartner in Support of Specially Appearing Defendants' (1) Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Administrative Relief Requesting That His Motion to Substitute Be Determined Without Oral Argument and (2) Motion for Administrative Relief Continuing Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion to Substitute, #2 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order (1) Denying Plaintiff's Motion for Administrative Relief Requesting That His Motion to Substitute Be Determined Without Oral Argument and (2) Granting Defendants' Motion for Administrative Relief Continuing Hearing on Plainitiff's Moiton to Substitute)(Carteen, Lisa) (Filed on 7/30/2009)
July 27, 2009 Filing 53 MOTION Requesting Order that Plaintiff Anthony Sarkis's Motion to Substitute Valentin Inzko in the Instant Action for All Purposes in Place of Co-Defendant Miroslav Lajcak be Determined Without Oral Argument or, in the alternative, That The August 21, 2009 Hearing Thereon Be Conducted Via Telephone Conference Call re #47 MOTION to Substitute Party Valentin Inzko in the Instant Action for all Purposes in Place of Co-Defendant Miroslav Lajcak filed by Anthony Sarkis. (Musolino, Philip) (Filed on 7/27/2009)
July 24, 2009 Filing 52 Reply to Opposition re #47 MOTION to Substitute Party Valentin Inzko in the Instant Action for all Purposes in Place of Co-Defendant Miroslav Lajcak filed byAnthony Sarkis. (Musolino, Philip) (Filed on 7/24/2009)
July 17, 2009 Filing 51 Specially Appearing Defendants' Opposition to #47 Plaintiff's Motion to Substitute Valentin Inzko in the Instant Action for All Purposes in Place of Co-Defendant Miroslav Lajcak filed by Miroslav Lajcak, Office of the High Representative. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Substitute Valentin Inzko in Place of Miroslav Lajcak, #2 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Denying Plaintiff's Motion to Substitute Valentin Inzko in Place of Miroslav Lajcak)(Cymrot, Mark) (Filed on 7/17/2009) Modified on 7/22/2009. Counsel failed to link entry to document #47 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
July 8, 2009 Filing 50 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Anthony Sarkis re #49 Certificate of Service, #48 Clerks Notice Continuing Motion Hearing (Musolino, Philip) (Filed on 7/8/2009)
June 26, 2009 Filing 49 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Anthony Sarkis re #47 MOTION to Substitute Party Valentin Inzko in the Instant Action for all Purposes in Place of Co-Defendant Miroslav Lajcak (Musolino, Philip) (Filed on 6/26/2009)
June 24, 2009 Filing 48 CLERKS NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion to Substitute a Party. Motion Hearing set for 8/21/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2009)
June 12, 2009 Filing 47 MOTION to Substitute Party Valentin Inzko in the Instant Action for all Purposes in Place of Co-Defendant Miroslav Lajcak filed by Anthony Sarkis. Motion Hearing set for 8/7/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Musolino, Philip) (Filed on 6/12/2009)
April 15, 2009 Filing 46 Memorandum in Opposition re #45 MOTION for Leave to File Specially Appearing Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion for Leave to File Supplememtal Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss filed byAnthony Sarkis. (Musolino, Philip) (Filed on 4/15/2009)
April 13, 2009 Filing 45 MOTION for Leave to File Specially Appearing Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion for Leave to File Supplememtal Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss filed by Miroslav Lajcak, Office of the High Representative. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Second Declaration of Mark A. Cymrot in Support of Specially Appearing Defendants' Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit Exhbits A-E to Second Declaration of Mark A. Cymrot, #3 Proposed Order (Proposed) Order Granting Specially Appearing Defendants' Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss)(Carteen, Lisa) (Filed on 4/13/2009)
December 19, 2008 Filing 44 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 12/19/2008 before Judge Ronald M. Whyte (Date Filed: 12/19/2008) re #21 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction SPECIALLY APPEARING DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS filed by Office of the High Representative, Miroslav Lajcak. The Court took the matter under submission after oral argument. The Court VACATED the case management conference. The Court to issue further order on Motion and scheduling dates. (Court Reporter Jana Ridenour.) (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/19/2008)
December 17, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte granting #42 Motion to Appear by Telephone.(rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2008)
December 12, 2008 Filing 42 MOTION to Appear by Telephone filed by Anthony Sarkis. (Musolino, Philip) (Filed on 12/12/2008)
December 10, 2008 Filing 41 Statement Specially Appearing Defendants' Statement In Lieu Of Joint Case Management Conference Statement by Miroslav Lajcak, Office of the High Representative. (Carteen, Lisa) (Filed on 12/10/2008)
December 10, 2008 Filing 40 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT and Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) Report filed by Anthony Sarkis. (Musolino, Philip) (Filed on 12/10/2008)
December 5, 2008 Filing 39 Request for Judicial Notice re #38 Reply to Opposition,, Specially Appearing Defendants' Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion to Dismiss filed byMiroslav Lajcak, Office of the High Representative. (Related document(s) #38 ) (Carteen, Lisa) (Filed on 12/5/2008)
December 5, 2008 Filing 38 Reply to Opposition re #21 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction SPECIALLY APPEARING DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS Specially Appearing Defendants' Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion to Dismiss filed byMiroslav Lajcak, Office of the High Representative. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Gisbert Bruns in Support of Specially Appearing Defendants' Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion to Dismiss)(Carteen, Lisa) (Filed on 12/5/2008)
November 12, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte granting #36 Motion for clarification of filing deadline. (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2008)
November 7, 2008 Filing 36 MOTION Specially Appearing Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion for Administrative Relief Regarding Court's Continuance of Motion to Dismiss Hearing and Filing of Defendants' Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion to Dismiss filed by Miroslav Lajcak, Office of the High Representative. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Lisa I. Carteen in Support of Specially Appearing Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion for Administrative Relief Regarding Court's Continuance of Motion to Dismiss Hearing and Filing of Defendants' Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Specially Appearing Defendants' Motion for Administrative Relief Regarding Court's Contnuance of Motion to Dismiss Hearing and Filing of Defendants' Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion to Dismiss)(Carteen, Lisa) (Filed on 11/7/2008)
November 6, 2008 Filing 35 CLERKS NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing -- Motion Hearing set for 12/19/2008 09:00 AM. (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2008)
October 28, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 34 STIPULATION AND ORDER #32 Continuing Case Management Conference and Due Date for Specially Appearing Defendants' Reply to Opposition to motion to Dismiss.Case Management Conference set for 12/19/2008 10:30 AM. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 10/28/08. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2008)
October 23, 2008 Filing 33 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options ADR CERTIFICATION BY SPECIALLY APPEARING DEFENDANTS AND COUNSEL (Carteen, Lisa) (Filed on 10/23/2008)
October 23, 2008 Filing 32 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND DUE DATE FOR SPECIALLY APPEARING DEFENDANTS' REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO DISMISS by Miroslav Lajcak, Office of the High Representative. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit DECLARATION OF LISA I. CARTEEN IN SUPPORT OF STIPULATION CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND DUE DATE FOR SPECIALLY APPEARING DEFENDANTS' REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO DISMISS, #2 Proposed Order PROPOSED ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND DUE DATE FOR SPECIALLY APPEARING DEFENDANTS' REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO DISMISS)(Carteen, Lisa) (Filed on 10/23/2008)
October 17, 2008 Filing 31 Memorandum in Opposition re #21 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction SPECIALLY APPEARING DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS filed byAnthony Sarkis. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit)(Musolino, Philip) (Filed on 10/17/2008)
October 9, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 30 STIPULATION AND ORDER #29 Continuing Hearing on Specially Appearing Deendants' Motion to Dismiss and Case Management Conference:Case Management Conference set for 11/21/2008 10:30 AM. Motion Hearing set for 11/21/2008 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 10/9/08. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2008)
October 8, 2008 Filing 29 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER CONTINUING HEARING ON SPECIALLY APPEARING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS by Miroslav Lajcak, Office of the High Representative. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit DECLARATION OF LISA I. CARTEEN IN SUPPORT OF STIPULATION CONTINUING HEARING ON SPECIALLY APPEARING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS, #2 Proposed Order PROPOSED ORDER CONTINUING HEARING ON SPECIALLY APPEARING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS)(Carteen, Lisa) (Filed on 10/8/2008)
September 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Granting #25 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Bruce O. Baumgartner. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2008)
September 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 27 STIPULATION AND ORDER #24 to Continue Case Management Conference: Case Management Conference set for 10/31/2008 10:30 AM. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 9/23/08. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2008)
September 10, 2008 Filing 24 STIPULATION CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE by Miroslav Lajcak, Office of the High Representative. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Continuing Case Management Conference)(Carteen, Lisa) (Filed on 9/10/2008)
September 9, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Granting #19 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Mark A. Cymrot. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2008)
September 2, 2008 Filing 26 Proposed Order re #25 APPLICATION of Bruce O. Baumgartner for Admission Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 54611003833) by Miroslav Lajcak, Office of the High Representative. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2008)
September 2, 2008 Filing 25 APPLICATION of Bruce O. Baumgartner for Admission Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 54611003833.) filed by Miroslav Lajcak, Office of the High Representative. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2008)
August 29, 2008 Filing 22 Declaration of MARK A CYMROT in Support of #21 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction SPECIALLY APPEARING DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS filed byMiroslav Lajcak, Office of the High Representative. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EXHIBITS A-K TO DECLARATION OF MARK CYMROT IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS, #2 Exhibit EXHIBITS L-X TO DECLARATION OF MARK CYMROT IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS)(Related document(s) #21 ) (Carteen, Lisa) (Filed on 8/29/2008)
August 29, 2008 Filing 21 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction SPECIALLY APPEARING DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS filed by Miroslav Lajcak, Office of the High Representative. Motion Hearing set for 10/31/2008 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS)(Carteen, Lisa) (Filed on 8/29/2008)
August 29, 2008 Filing 20 Proposed Order re #19 APPLICATION of Mark A. Cymrot for Admission Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 54611003823) by Miroslav Lajcak, Office of the High Representative. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2008)
August 29, 2008 Filing 19 APPLICATION of Mark A. Cymrot for Admission Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 54611003823) filed by Miroslav Lajcak, Office of the High Representative. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2008)
July 24, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STIPULATION AND ORDER #16 Continuing Case Management Conference and Extending the Time for Specially Appearing Defendants to Respond to the Complaint. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/26/2008 10:30 AM. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 7/24/08. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2008)
July 22, 2008 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Lisa Inez Carteen for Specially Appearing Defendants (Carteen, Lisa) (Filed on 7/22/2008)
July 21, 2008 Filing 16 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND EXTENDING THE TIME FOR SPECIALLY APPEARING DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT by Miroslav Lajcak, Office of the High Representative. (Carteen, Lisa) (Filed on 7/21/2008)
July 18, 2008 Filing 15 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Musolino, Philip) (Filed on 7/18/2008)
July 3, 2008 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Anthony Sarkis on Office of the High Representative (Musolino, Philip) (Filed on 7/3/2008)
July 3, 2008 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Anthony Sarkis on Miroslav Lajcak (Musolino, Philip) (Filed on 7/3/2008)
July 3, 2008 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Office of the High Representative on 6/16/2008, filed by Anthony Sarkis. (Musolino, Philip) (Filed on 7/3/2008)
July 3, 2008 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Summons served on Miroslav Lajcak on 6/16/2008, filed by Anthony Sarkis. (Musolino, Philip) (Filed on 7/3/2008)
May 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Granting #5 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Philip M. Musolino. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2008)
May 1, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to District Judge Ronald M. Whyte for all further proceedings and Magistrate Judge Patricia V. Trumbull for all discovery matters. Signed by The Executive Committee on 05/01/08. (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2008) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/2/2008: #1 Certificate of Service) (tsh, COURT STAFF).
May 1, 2008 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT. Case Management Conference set for 8/8/2008 10:30 AM Before Ronald M. Whyte. Case Management Statement due by 8/1/2008. (cm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2008)
April 30, 2008 Filing 7 Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge and Request for Reassignment to a United States District Judge by Anthony Sarkis. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2008)
April 30, 2008 Filing 6 Received (Proposed) Order Granting Application for Admission of Attorney Philip M. Musolino to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Anthony Sarkis. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2008)
April 30, 2008 Filing 5 Application for Admission of Attorney Philip M. Musolino to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 54611003072) filed by Anthony Sarkis. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2008)
April 10, 2008 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Office of the High Representative. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2008)
April 10, 2008 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Miroslav Lajcak. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2008)
April 10, 2008 Filing 2 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Conference set for 7/29/2008 02:00 PM. Case Management Statement due by 7/22/2008. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2008)
April 10, 2008 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Demand for Jury Trial (Summons Issued) against Miroslav Lajcak, Office of the High Representative ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 54611002942). Filed by Anthony Sarkis. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2008) (bw, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/1/2008: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E) (bw, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/1/2008: #6 Exhibit F) (bw, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sarkis v. Lajcak et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Sarkis
Represented By: Philip M. Musolino
Represented By: Jeffrey Mark Forster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Office of the High Representative
Represented By: Mark A. Cymrot
Represented By: Bruce O. Baumgartner
Represented By: Lisa Inez Carteen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miroslav Lajcak
Represented By: Mark A. Cymrot
Represented By: Bruce O. Baumgartner
Represented By: Lisa Inez Carteen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?