Farhang v. Indian institute of Technology Kharagpur et al

Plaintiff: Mandana D Farhang
Defendant: Indian institute of Technology Kharagpur, Technology Entrepreneurship and Training Society, Partha P Chakrabarti, Pallab Dasgupta, Gurashish S Brar, Rakesh Gupta, Choudhury Pravanjan, Subrat Panda and Animesh Naskar
Case Number: 5:2008cv02658
Filed: May 27, 2008
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Contract: Other Office
County: Marin
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 3, 2017 512 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 510 STIPULATION re 508 Case Management Scheduling Order. Case Management Conference set for 5/9/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by 5/2/2017. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 04/03/2017. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2017)
May 29, 2014 497 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Ronald M Whyte granting 493 Motion to Stay (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2014)
April 4, 2014 492 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Ronald M Whyte granting in part and denying in part 460 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting 472 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting 481 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. No limited waiver of privilege re 472 , see 491 . (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2014)
March 26, 2014 488 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER dismissing TIETS. Signed by Judge Ronald M Whyte on 3/25/14. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2014)
March 25, 2014 487 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Ronald M Whyte denying 403 Motion to Dismiss; finding as moot 413 Motion to Stay; denying 420 Motion to Dismiss; finding as moot 437 Motion for Discovery (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2014)
February 28, 2014 485 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Ronald M Whyte granting 458 Motion to Quash Subpoena of Atty Chatterjee (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2014)
February 13, 2014 476 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd re 470 Discovery Dispute Joint Report No. 1. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2014)
October 22, 2013 453 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER vacating November 1, 2013 hearing. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2013)
October 16, 2013 450 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER 449 to Continue the October 18, 2013 Motion Hearing Date. Motion Hearing is set for 11/1/2013 9:00 AM. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 10/16/13. (jgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2013)
September 20, 2013 441 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER for more briefing. Signed by Judge Whyte on 9/20/2013. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2013)
July 24, 2013 412 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER 408 Continuing Filing Deadlines and Hearing. Set/Reset Deadlines as to 403 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to the Foreign Sovereign Immunities Act and Motion to Vacate Prior Immunity Ruling. Motion Hearing set for 9/20/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Ronald M. Whyte. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 7/24/13. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2013)
July 19, 2013 410 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Hon. Ronald M. Whyte denying without prejudice 406 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2013)
July 17, 2012 397 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Whyte granting 382 Motion Requiring Defendants' Counsel to Comply with September 30, 2011 Stipulation. (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2012)
March 26, 2012 377 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS' ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION PURSUANT TO CIVIL LOCAL RULE 7-11 REQUESTING CERTIFICATION OF DEFENDANT IITK'S INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL OF THE COURT'S JANUARY 26, 2010 AS FRIVOLOUS re 364 . Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on March 26, 2012. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2012)
February 21, 2012 362 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on February 21, 2012. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2012)
January 25, 2012 347 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER 342 Continuing Filing Deadlines and Hearing Date. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh for Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 1/24/12. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2012)
January 12, 2012 341 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 290 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint Based on Forum Non Conveniens and Foreign Sovereign Immunities Act filed by Technology Entrepreneurship and Training Society, 287 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Technology Incubati on and Entrepreneurship Training Society's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(C) filed by Technology Entrepreneurship and Training Society, 286 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Defendant Partha P. Chakrabarti's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(C) filed by Partha P Chakrabarti. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on January 12, 2012. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2012)
October 20, 2011 325 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER 314 Extending Briefing Schedule on Motion for Non Disqualification of Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 10/20/11. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2011)
September 30, 2011 323 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER 321 , 322 Regarding Non Disqualification of Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 9/30/11. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2011)
August 11, 2011 298 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER continuing filing deadlines and hearing date. Signed by Judge Whyte on 8/11/2011. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2011)
July 7, 2011 282 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER correcting 281 Order on Motion to Dismiss, Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction, Order on Motion for Hearing. Signed by Judge WHYTE on 7/7/2011. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2011)
February 22, 2011 272 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER granting 265 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2011)
February 15, 2011 271 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 265 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2011)
January 10, 2011 253 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd granting 208 plaintiffs' Motion for an Order Deeming Trade Secrets Disclosure Sufficient. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2011)
January 3, 2011 246 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Whyte granting 242 Motion Leave to File Sur-Reply (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2011)
December 3, 2010 226 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Vacating Motion Hearing re 208 plaintiffs' trade secret disclosure motion. Matter deemed submitted on the papers without oral argument. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 12/3/2010. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2010)
September 7, 2010 201 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Whyte granting in part and denying in part 174 Motion to Strike and granting in part and denying in part 175 Motion to Dismiss. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2010)
September 3, 2010 200 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd re 183 (1) denying plaintiffs' motion for entry of protective order; and (2) granting in part and denying in part plaintiffs' motion for an order deeming trade secrets disclosure sufficient. Motion hearing set for 9/7/2010 is vacated. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2010)
July 29, 2010 182 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Whyte denying 151 Motion for order permitting alternative service of process. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2010)
July 22, 2010 178 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Whyte granting in part and denying in part 146 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2010)
July 21, 2010 177 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Whyte denying 168 Motion for Discovery. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2010)
July 9, 2010 164 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 146 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. Signed by Judge Whyte on 7/9/10. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2010)
July 6, 2010 160 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Whyte granting 158 Motion Setting Time to Respond to Third Amended Complaint. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2010)
July 2, 2010 159 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re Unserved Defendants and 144 Order to Show Cause. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2010)
June 2, 2010 144 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 7/2/2010 09:00 AM. Show Cause Response due by 6/22/2010. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 6/2/10. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2010)
June 1, 2010 143 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Whyte granting in part and denying in part 112 Motion to Dismiss; denying 120 Motion to Stay; granting 124 Motion to Dismiss; denying 126 Motion to Dismiss. (rmwlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2010)
May 10, 2010 135 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 128 Parties' Proposals for Limited Discovery Pending Outcome of Defendants' Motions. Signed by Judge Whyte on 5/10/10. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2010)
April 13, 2010 119 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 117 request for CMC. Signed by Judge Whyte on 4/13/10. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2010)
January 26, 2010 107 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 60 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction.(rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2010)
January 21, 2010 103 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER 99 Setting Hearing for Defendant's Motion to Dismiss: Motion Hearing set for 1/22/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 1/21/10. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2010)
January 13, 2010 98 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Whyte denying 29 Motion to Disqualify Counsel. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2010)
December 23, 2009 95 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 87 plaintiff's motion for jurisdictional discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 12/23/2009. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2009)
December 10, 2009 94 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER 92 Setting Hearing for 1/12/2010 re Plaintiffs' Motion to Disqualify and Defendant IIT's Motion to Dismiss: Motion Hearing set for 1/12/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 12/10/09. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2009)
October 27, 2009 86 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 29 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel filed by Mandana D Farhang. Signed by Judge Whyte on 10/27/09. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2009)
September 24, 2009 78 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER 74 Extending Time to File Reply Brief and Continuing Hearing on Motion to Dismiss: Case Management Conference set for 10/30/2009 10:30 AM. Motion Hearing set for 10/30/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 9/24/09. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2009)
August 25, 2009 70 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER 69 Re: Sequencing Defendant IITs Motions to Dismiss Frist Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 8/25/09. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2009)
August 12, 2009 68 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER to Continue Hearing on Defendant's Motions to Dismiss and Filing Deadline: Motion Hearing set for 9/25/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 8/12/09. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2009)
December 12, 2008 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying plaintiff's second request to continue initial case management conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 12/12/2008. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2008)
September 10, 2008 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting in Part Plaintiff's Request to Continue Initial Case Management Conference. Case management conference continued to 12/16/08, 1:30 PM. Joint case management conference statement due 12/9/2008. If defendants not served by then, plaintiff to file status report re service by 12/9/2008. Parties' consents or declinations to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge due 12/9/2008. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 9/10/2008. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Farhang v. Indian institute of Technology Kharagpur et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mandana D Farhang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Indian institute of Technology Kharagpur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Technology Entrepreneurship and Training Society
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Partha P Chakrabarti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pallab Dasgupta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gurashish S Brar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rakesh Gupta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Choudhury Pravanjan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Subrat Panda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Animesh Naskar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?