January 11, 2021 |
Filing
716
ORDER DENYING RELIEF by Judge William H. Orrick denying 713 , 714 , 715 letters and administrative motion. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2021)
|
January 4, 2021 |
Filing
711
ORDER ON MOTIONS FOR 705 WRIT OF EXECUTION, 708 CONTEMPT, 706 SEALING. This matter is referred to Magistrate Judge to oversee the execution of debtor examination. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 1/4/2021. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2021)
|
December 4, 2019 |
Filing
688
ORDER ON MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES AND MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL by Judge William H. Orrick. 659 IITs motion for attorney fees is DENIED. 667 Singhs motion to withdraw as counsel forM.A. Mobile is GRANTED. The 658 , 678 , 684 motions to seal are resolved as set forth in the order. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2019)
|
November 4, 2019 |
Filing
676
ORDER granting 675 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Opposition 667 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney. Responses due by 11/8/2019. Replies due by 11/15/2019. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 11/4/2019. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2019)
|
October 4, 2019 |
Filing
669
ORDER granting 665 STIPULATION to extend deadlines re: 659 MOTION for Attorney Fees. Response due by 10/30/2019. Reply due by 11/13/2019. Motion Hearing set for 12/4/2019 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor before Judge William H. Orrick. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 10/4/2019. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2019)
|
September 5, 2019 |
Filing
655
ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND DISMISSING COUNTERCLAIMS. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 09/05/2019. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2019)
|
March 5, 2019 |
Filing
583
CIVIL PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 03/05/2019. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2019)
|
October 31, 2017 |
Filing
537
ORDER granting 536 STIPULATION (as modified) to extend deadlines re 534 MOTION to Dismiss. Response due by 11/20/2017. Reply due by 11/29/2017. Motion Hearing reset for 12/13/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 4, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Judge William H. Orrick. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 10/31/2017. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2017)
|
April 3, 2017 |
Filing
512
ORDER granting 510 STIPULATION re 508 Case Management Scheduling Order. Case Management Conference set for 5/9/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by 5/2/2017. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 04/03/2017. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2017)
|
May 29, 2014 |
Filing
497
ORDER by Judge Ronald M Whyte granting 493 Motion to Stay (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2014)
|
April 4, 2014 |
Filing
492
ORDER by Judge Ronald M Whyte granting in part and denying in part 460 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting 472 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting 481 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. No limited waiver of privilege re 472 , see 491 . (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2014)
|
March 26, 2014 |
Filing
488
ORDER dismissing TIETS. Signed by Judge Ronald M Whyte on 3/25/14. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2014)
|
March 25, 2014 |
Filing
487
ORDER by Judge Ronald M Whyte denying 403 Motion to Dismiss; finding as moot 413 Motion to Stay; denying 420 Motion to Dismiss; finding as moot 437 Motion for Discovery (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2014)
|
February 28, 2014 |
Filing
485
ORDER by Judge Ronald M Whyte granting 458 Motion to Quash Subpoena of Atty Chatterjee (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2014)
|
February 13, 2014 |
Filing
476
Order by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd re 470 Discovery Dispute Joint Report No. 1. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2014)
|
October 22, 2013 |
Filing
453
ORDER vacating November 1, 2013 hearing. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2013)
|
October 16, 2013 |
Filing
450
STIPULATION AND ORDER 449 to Continue the October 18, 2013 Motion Hearing Date. Motion Hearing is set for 11/1/2013 9:00 AM. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 10/16/13. (jgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2013)
|
September 20, 2013 |
Filing
441
ORDER for more briefing. Signed by Judge Whyte on 9/20/2013. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2013)
|
July 24, 2013 |
Filing
412
STIPULATION AND ORDER 408 Continuing Filing Deadlines and Hearing. Set/Reset Deadlines as to 403 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to the Foreign Sovereign Immunities Act and Motion to Vacate Prior Immunity Ruling. Motion Hearing set for 9/20/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Ronald M. Whyte. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 7/24/13. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2013)
|
July 19, 2013 |
Filing
410
Order by Hon. Ronald M. Whyte denying without prejudice 406 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2013)
|
July 17, 2012 |
Filing
397
ORDER by Judge Whyte granting 382 Motion Requiring Defendants' Counsel to Comply with September 30, 2011 Stipulation. (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2012)
|
March 26, 2012 |
Filing
377
ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS' ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION PURSUANT TO CIVIL LOCAL RULE 7-11 REQUESTING CERTIFICATION OF DEFENDANT IITK'S INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL OF THE COURT'S JANUARY 26, 2010 AS FRIVOLOUS re 364 . Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on March 26, 2012. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2012)
|
February 21, 2012 |
Filing
362
ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on February 21, 2012. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2012)
|
January 25, 2012 |
Filing
347
STIPULATION AND ORDER 342 Continuing Filing Deadlines and Hearing Date. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh for Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 1/24/12. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2012)
|
January 12, 2012 |
Filing
341
ORDER re 290 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint Based on Forum Non Conveniens and Foreign Sovereign Immunities Act filed by Technology Entrepreneurship and Training Society, 287 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Technology Incubati on and Entrepreneurship Training Society's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(C) filed by Technology Entrepreneurship and Training Society, 286 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Defendant Partha P. Chakrabarti's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(C) filed by Partha P Chakrabarti. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on January 12, 2012. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2012)
|
October 20, 2011 |
Filing
325
STIPULATION AND ORDER 314 Extending Briefing Schedule on Motion for Non Disqualification of Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 10/20/11. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2011)
|
September 30, 2011 |
Filing
323
STIPULATION AND ORDER 321 , 322 Regarding Non Disqualification of Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 9/30/11. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2011)
|
August 11, 2011 |
Filing
298
ORDER continuing filing deadlines and hearing date. Signed by Judge Whyte on 8/11/2011. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2011)
|
July 7, 2011 |
Filing
282
ORDER correcting 281 Order on Motion to Dismiss, Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction, Order on Motion for Hearing. Signed by Judge WHYTE on 7/7/2011. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2011)
|
February 22, 2011 |
Filing
272
AMENDED ORDER granting 265 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2011)
|
February 15, 2011 |
Filing
271
ORDER granting 265 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2011)
|
January 10, 2011 |
Filing
253
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd granting 208 plaintiffs' Motion for an Order Deeming Trade Secrets Disclosure Sufficient. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2011)
|
January 3, 2011 |
Filing
246
ORDER by Judge Whyte granting 242 Motion Leave to File Sur-Reply (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2011)
|
December 3, 2010 |
Filing
226
ORDER Vacating Motion Hearing re 208 plaintiffs' trade secret disclosure motion. Matter deemed submitted on the papers without oral argument. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 12/3/2010. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2010)
|
September 7, 2010 |
Filing
201
ORDER by Judge Whyte granting in part and denying in part 174 Motion to Strike and granting in part and denying in part 175 Motion to Dismiss. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2010)
|
September 3, 2010 |
Filing
200
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd re 183 (1) denying plaintiffs' motion for entry of protective order; and (2) granting in part and denying in part plaintiffs' motion for an order deeming trade secrets disclosure sufficient. Motion hearing set for 9/7/2010 is vacated. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2010)
|
July 29, 2010 |
Filing
182
ORDER by Judge Whyte denying 151 Motion for order permitting alternative service of process. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2010)
|
July 22, 2010 |
Filing
178
ORDER by Judge Whyte granting in part and denying in part 146 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2010)
|
July 21, 2010 |
Filing
177
ORDER by Judge Whyte denying 168 Motion for Discovery. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2010)
|
July 9, 2010 |
Filing
164
ORDER re 146 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. Signed by Judge Whyte on 7/9/10. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2010)
|
July 6, 2010 |
Filing
160
ORDER by Judge Whyte granting 158 Motion Setting Time to Respond to Third Amended Complaint. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2010)
|
July 2, 2010 |
Filing
159
ORDER re Unserved Defendants and 144 Order to Show Cause. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2010)
|
June 2, 2010 |
Filing
144
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 7/2/2010 09:00 AM. Show Cause Response due by 6/22/2010. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 6/2/10. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2010)
|
June 1, 2010 |
Filing
143
ORDER by Judge Whyte granting in part and denying in part 112 Motion to Dismiss; denying 120 Motion to Stay; granting 124 Motion to Dismiss; denying 126 Motion to Dismiss. (rmwlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2010)
|
May 10, 2010 |
Filing
135
ORDER re 128 Parties' Proposals for Limited Discovery Pending Outcome of Defendants' Motions. Signed by Judge Whyte on 5/10/10. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2010)
|
April 13, 2010 |
Filing
119
ORDER re 117 request for CMC. Signed by Judge Whyte on 4/13/10. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2010)
|
January 26, 2010 |
Filing
107
ORDER denying 60 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction.(rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2010)
|
January 21, 2010 |
Filing
103
STIPULATION AND ORDER 99 Setting Hearing for Defendant's Motion to Dismiss: Motion Hearing set for 1/22/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 1/21/10. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2010)
|
January 13, 2010 |
Filing
98
ORDER by Judge Whyte denying 29 Motion to Disqualify Counsel. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2010)
|
December 23, 2009 |
Filing
95
ORDER re 87 plaintiff's motion for jurisdictional discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 12/23/2009. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2009)
|
December 10, 2009 |
Filing
94
STIPULATION AND ORDER 92 Setting Hearing for 1/12/2010 re Plaintiffs' Motion to Disqualify and Defendant IIT's Motion to Dismiss: Motion Hearing set for 1/12/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 12/10/09. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2009)
|
October 27, 2009 |
Filing
86
ORDER re 29 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel filed by Mandana D Farhang. Signed by Judge Whyte on 10/27/09. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2009)
|
September 24, 2009 |
Filing
78
STIPULATION AND ORDER 74 Extending Time to File Reply Brief and Continuing Hearing on Motion to Dismiss: Case Management Conference set for 10/30/2009 10:30 AM. Motion Hearing set for 10/30/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 9/24/09. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2009)
|
August 25, 2009 |
Filing
70
STIPULATION AND ORDER 69 Re: Sequencing Defendant IITs Motions to Dismiss Frist Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 8/25/09. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2009)
|
August 12, 2009 |
Filing
68
STIPULATION AND ORDER to Continue Hearing on Defendant's Motions to Dismiss and Filing Deadline: Motion Hearing set for 9/25/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 8/12/09. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2009)
|
December 12, 2008 |
Filing
6
ORDER denying plaintiff's second request to continue initial case management conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 12/12/2008. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2008)
|
September 10, 2008 |
Filing
4
ORDER Granting in Part Plaintiff's Request to Continue Initial Case Management Conference. Case management conference continued to 12/16/08, 1:30 PM. Joint case management conference statement due 12/9/2008. If defendants not served by then, plaintiff to file status report re service by 12/9/2008. Parties' consents or declinations to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge due 12/9/2008. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 9/10/2008. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2008)
|