Google Inc. et al v. Egger et al Featured Case

Plaintiffs Google Inc., AOL LLC, Yahoo! Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc. and Lycos, Inc. seek a declaratory judgment that they have not infringed U.S. Patent Nos. 5,544,352, 5,832,494 and 6,233,571 (Method and Apparatus for Indexing, Searching and Displaying Data), that such patents are invalid, and that Defendants L. Daniel Egger, Software Rights Archive, LLC and Site Technologies, Inc. do not own the patents.

Plaintiff: Google Inc., AOL LLC, Yahoo! Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc. and Lycos Inc.
Defendant: L. Daniel Egger, Software Rights Archive LLC and Site Technologies Inc
Case Number: 5:2008cv03172
Filed: July 1, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Patent Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Ronald M. Whyte
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:2201 Declaratory Judgement
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2010 Filing 144 NOTICE by AOL LLC, Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Lycos Inc., Yahoo! Inc. Notice of Change of Firm Name (Kash, Jennifer) (Filed on 3/12/2010)
December 11, 2009 Filing 143 NOTICE of Change of Address by Jennifer A. Kash (Kash, Jennifer) (Filed on 12/11/2009)
October 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Granting 122 Motion to File Documents Under Seal. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2009)
September 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER Granting 58 Motion to Enlarge Time. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 9/29/09. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2009)
September 17, 2009 Filing 137 Transcript of Proceedings held on August 21, 2009, before Judge Ronald M. Whyte. Court Reporter/Transcriber Jana Ridenour, Telephone number (408) 390-7935. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/14/2009. (mz, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2009)
September 10, 2009 Filing 136 STIPULATION of L. Daniel Egger by L. Daniel Egger, Software Rights Archive LLC. (Kaplan, Lee) (Filed on 9/10/2009)
August 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 42 Motion to Dismiss, Transfer, or Stay; denying 64 Motion to Strike. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2009)
August 21, 2009 Filing 135 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 8/21/2009 before Ronald M. Whyte (Date Filed: 8/21/2009) re 42 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Software Rights Archive LLC, L. Daniel Egger, Site Technologies Inc, 64 MOTION to Strike 42 MOTION to Dismiss , Transfer or Stay filed by Yahoo! Inc.. (Court Reporter Jana Ridenour.) (jg, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/21/2009)
August 7, 2009 Filing 133 Declaration of Lee L. Kaplan in Support of 132 Response in Support filed byL. Daniel Egger, Software Rights Archive LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit)(Related document(s) 132 ) (Kaplan, Lee) (Filed on 8/7/2009)
August 7, 2009 Filing 132 RESPONSE in Support re 42 MOTION to Dismiss filed byL. Daniel Egger, Software Rights Archive LLC. (Kaplan, Lee) (Filed on 8/7/2009)
August 7, 2009 Filing 131 RESPONSE in Support re 64 MOTION to Strike 42 MOTION to Dismiss , Transfer or Stay filed byYahoo! Inc.. (Hung, Richard) (Filed on 8/7/2009)
July 27, 2009 Filing 130 NOTICE OF MANUAL FILING re EXHIBITS C, E, F, I, J, K, and L to 127 the 2nd Walsh Declaration - filed by Google Inc.. (Walsh, Thomas) (Filed on 7/27/2009) Modified on 8/3/2009 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
July 27, 2009 Filing 129 NOTICE OF MANUAL FILING re EXHIBITS B, D, K, O, R, S, T, U, V, BB, CC, DD, EE, FF, HH, KK, LL, & PP to 126 the First Walsh Declaration - filed by Google Inc.. (Walsh, Thomas) (Filed on 7/27/2009) Modified text on 8/3/2009 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
July 24, 2009 Filing 142 EXHIBITS FILED UNDER SEAL PURSUANT TO ORDER #139 POSTED ON 10/22/2009(dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2009)
July 24, 2009 Filing 141 EXHIBITS FILED UNDER SEAL PURSUANT TO ORDER #139 POSTED ON 10/22/2009(dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2009)
July 24, 2009 Filing 140 Opposition FILED UNDER SEAL PURSUANT TO ORDER #139 POSTED ON 10/22/2009 (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2009)
July 24, 2009 Filing 128 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Google Inc. re 124 Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and Various Supporting Documents (Walsh, Thomas) (Filed on 7/24/2009)
July 24, 2009 Filing 127 Declaration of Thomas B. Walsh, IV in Support of 124 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss - NUMBER TWO filed byGoogle Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, Part 1, # 3 Exhibit B, Part 2, # 4 Exhibit B, Part 3, # 5 Exhibit B, Part 4, # 6 Exhibit B, Part 5, # 7 Exhibit B, Part 6, # 8 Exhibit C - FILED UNDER SEAL, # 9 Exhibit D, Part 1, # 10 Exhibit D, Part 2, # 11 Exhibit D, Part 3, # 12 Exhibit D, Part 4, # 13 Exhibit D, Part 5, # 14 Exhibit E - FILED UNDER SEAL, # 15 Exhibit F - FILED UNDER SEAL, # 16 Exhibit G, # 17 Exhibit H, # 18 Exhibit I - FILED UNDER SEAL, # 19 Exhibit J - FILED UNDER SEAL, # 20 Exhibit K - FILED UNDER SEAL, # 21 Exhibit L - FILED UNDER SEAL, # 22 Exhibit M - FILED UNDER SEAL, # 23 Exhibit N, # 24 Exhibit O)(Related document(s) 124 ) (Walsh, Thomas) (Filed on 7/24/2009)
July 24, 2009 Filing 126 Declaration of Thomas B. Walsh, IV in Support of 124 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss filed byGoogle Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B - FILED UNDER SEAL, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D - FILED UNDER SEAL, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K - FILED UNDER SEAL, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O - FILED UNDER SEAL, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit R - FILED UNDER SEAL, # 19 Exhibit S - FILED UNDER SEAL, # 20 Exhibit T- FILED UNDER SEAL, # 21 Exhibit U - FILED UNDER SEAL, # 22 Exhibit V - FILED UNDER SEAL, # 23 Exhibit W, # 24 Exhibit X, # 25 Exhibit Y, # 26 Exhibit Z, # 27 Exhibit AA, # 28 Exhibit BB - FILED UNDER SEAL, # 29 Exhibit CC - FILED UNDER SEAL, # 30 Exhibit DD - FILED UNDER SEAL, # 31 Exhibit EE - FILED UNDER SEAL, # 32 Exhibit FF - FILED UNDER SEAL, # 33 Exhibit GG, # 34 Exhibit HH - FILED UNDER SEAL, # 35 Exhibit II, # 36 Exhibit JJ, # 37 Exhibit KK - FILED UNDER SEAL, # 38 Exhibit LL - FILED UNDER SEAL, # 39 Exhibit MM, # 40 Exhibit NN, # 41 Exhibit OO, # 42 Exhibit PP - FILED UNDER SEAL)(Related document(s) 124 ) (Walsh, Thomas) (Filed on 7/24/2009)
July 24, 2009 Filing 125 NOTICE by Yahoo! Inc. re 124 Memorandum in Opposition JOINDER RE: OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO DISMISS, TRANSFER OR STAY (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Hung, Richard) (Filed on 7/24/2009)
July 24, 2009 Filing 124 NOTICE OF MANUAL FILING of Opposition to 42 MOTION to Dismiss , Transfer, or Stay - filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Denying Defendants' Mtn to Dismiss)(Walsh, Thomas) (Filed on 7/24/2009) Modified text on 8/3/2009 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
July 24, 2009 Filing 123 Declaration of Thomas B. Walsh, IV in Support of 122 MOTION to File Opposition to Defendants' Mtn to Dismiss & Certain Exhibits to the Declaration ISO Same Under Seal filed byGoogle Inc.. (Related document(s) 122 ) (Walsh, Thomas) (Filed on 7/24/2009)
July 24, 2009 Filing 122 MOTION to File Opposition to Defendants' Mtn to Dismiss & Certain Exhibits to the Declaration ISO Same Under Seal filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Walsh, Thomas) (Filed on 7/24/2009)
July 24, 2009 Filing 121 RESPONSE to 64 Plaintiff's MOTION to Strike 42 MOTION to Dismiss , Transfer or Stay filed by L. Daniel Egger, Software Rights Archive LLC. (Kaplan, Lee) (Filed on 7/24/2009) Modified on 7/24/2009 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
July 24, 2009 Received Opposition SUBMITTED UNDER SEAL (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2009)
July 24, 2009 Received Exhibits SUBMITTED UNDER SEAL (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2009)
July 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 120 STIPULATION AND ORDER 119 for Continuance of Hearing and Briefing Schedule on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, Transfer, or Stay and Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Site Technologies, Inc., Motion to Dismiss, Transfer, or Stay. Motion Hearing is set for 8/21/2009 9:00 AM. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 7/8/09. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2009)
July 8, 2009 Set/Reset Hearings: Motion Hearing set for 8/21/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2009)
July 7, 2009 Filing 119 STIPULATION re 42 MOTION to Dismiss, 64 MOTION to Strike 42 MOTION to Dismiss , Transfer or Stay FOR CONTINUANCE OF HEARING AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE by Yahoo! Inc.. (Hung, Richard) (Filed on 7/7/2009)
June 29, 2009 Filing 118 Declaration of Russell J. Barron filed bySoftware Rights Archive LLC. (Kaplan, Lee) (Filed on 6/29/2009)
June 29, 2009 Filing 117 STIPULATION re 42 MOTION to Dismiss, 64 MOTION to Strike 42 MOTION to Dismiss , Transfer or Stay FOR CONTINUANCE OF THE BRIEFING SCHEDULE by Yahoo! Inc.. (Hung, Richard) (Filed on 6/29/2009)
June 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 116 STIPULATION AND ORDER 115 for Continuance of Hearing on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, Transfer, or Stay and Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike. Motion Hearing set for 7/31/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 6/11/09. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2009)
June 5, 2009 Filing 115 STIPULATION re 42 MOTION to Dismiss, 64 MOTION to Strike 42 MOTION to Dismiss , Transfer or Stay FOR CONTINUANCE by Yahoo! Inc.. (Hung, Richard) (Filed on 6/5/2009)
May 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER re 113 Stipulation filed by Yahoo! Inc.. Signed by Judge Whyte on 05/28/09. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2009)
May 27, 2009 Filing 113 STIPULATION re 42 MOTION to Dismiss, 64 MOTION to Strike 42 MOTION to Dismiss , Transfer or Stay FOR CONTINUANCE by Yahoo! Inc.. (Hung, Richard) (Filed on 5/27/2009)
April 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER by Judge Whyte denying 63 Motion to Quash; granting 72 Motion to Compel; and granting 105 Motion for Continuance of Hearing and Briefing Schedule. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2009)
April 30, 2009 Filing 111 Proposed Order re 110 Reply to Opposition, by L. Daniel Egger, Software Rights Archive LLC. (Kaplan, Lee) (Filed on 4/30/2009)
April 30, 2009 Filing 110 Reply to Opposition re 105 MOTION Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion For Continuance of the Briefing and Hearing Schedule for Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, Transfer or Stay and Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike filed byL. Daniel Egger, Software Rights Archive LLC. (Kaplan, Lee) (Filed on 4/30/2009)
April 30, 2009 Filing 109 STIPULATION re 108 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages and [Proposed] Order by IAC Search & Media, Inc., Lycos Inc.. (Kash, Jennifer) (Filed on 4/30/2009)
April 30, 2009 Filing 108 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages filed by IAC Search & Media, Inc., Lycos Inc.. (Kash, Jennifer) (Filed on 4/30/2009)
April 29, 2009 Filing 107 Proposed Order re 105 MOTION Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion For Continuance of the Briefing and Hearing Schedule for Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, Transfer or Stay and Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike by IAC Search & Media, Inc., Lycos Inc.. (Kash, Jennifer) (Filed on 4/29/2009)
April 29, 2009 Filing 106 Declaration of Jennifer A. Kash in Support of 105 MOTION Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion For Continuance of the Briefing and Hearing Schedule for Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, Transfer or Stay and Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike filed byIAC Search & Media, Inc., Lycos Inc.. (Related document(s) 105 ) (Kash, Jennifer) (Filed on 4/29/2009)
April 29, 2009 Filing 105 MOTION Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion For Continuance of the Briefing and Hearing Schedule for Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, Transfer or Stay and Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike filed by IAC Search & Media, Inc., Lycos Inc.. (Kash, Jennifer) (Filed on 4/29/2009)
April 29, 2009 Filing 104 Declaration of RICHARD S.J. HUNG in Support of 103 Response in Support, YAHOO!'S RESPONSE TO SOFTWARE RIGHTS ARCHIVE LLC'S AND DANIEL EGGER'S POST-HEARING BRIEF RE: YAHOO!'S MOTIONS TO COMPEL COMPLIANCE WITH SUBPOENAS ON WSGR AND MURRAY filed byYahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) 103 ) (Hung, Richard) (Filed on 4/29/2009)
April 29, 2009 Filing 103 RESPONSE in Support YAHOO!'S RESPONSE TO SOFTWARE RIGHTS ARCHIVE LLC'S AND DANIEL EGGER'S POST-HEARING BRIEF RE: YAHOO!'S MOTIONS TO COMPEL COMPLIANCE WITH SUBPOENAS ON WSGR AND MURRAY filed byYahoo! Inc.. (Hung, Richard) (Filed on 4/29/2009)
April 23, 2009 Filing 102 Declaration of Lee L. Kaplan in Support of 101 Brief Concerning Privileged Patent Files filed byL. Daniel Egger, Software Rights Archive LLC. (Related document(s) 101 ) (Kaplan, Lee) (Filed on 4/23/2009)
April 23, 2009 Filing 101 Brief Concerning Privileged Patent Files filed byL. Daniel Egger, Software Rights Archive LLC. (Kaplan, Lee) (Filed on 4/23/2009)
April 17, 2009 Filing 100 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 4/17/2009 before Ronald M. Whyte (Date Filed: 4/17/2009) re 63 MOTION to Quash filed by Software Rights Archive LLC, L. Daniel Egger, Site Technologies Inc. (Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge.) (jg, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/17/2009)
April 3, 2009 Filing 99 Declaration of Jennifer A. Kash In Further Support of Plaintiffs' Cross-Motion to Compel Production of Documents From Defendant Software Rights Archive, LLC filed byIAC Search & Media, Inc., Lycos Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Kash, Jennifer) (Filed on 4/3/2009)
April 3, 2009 Filing 98 Reply Memorandum Plaintiffs' Reply In Support of Their Cross-Motion to Compel Production of Documents From Defendant Software Rights Archive, LLC filed byIAC Search & Media, Inc., Lycos Inc.. (Kash, Jennifer) (Filed on 4/3/2009)
April 3, 2009 Filing 97 RESPONSE to re 94 Statement of Recent Decision by Yahoo! Inc.. (Hung, Richard) (Filed on 4/3/2009)
April 3, 2009 Filing 96 Declaration of RICHARD S.J. HUNG ISO Yahoo!'s Motions to Compel Compliance with Subpoenas on Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati and Murray & Murray P.C. filed byYahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K)(Hung, Richard) (Filed on 4/3/2009)
April 3, 2009 Filing 95 Reply Memorandum ISO Yahoo!'s Motions to Compel Compliance with Subpoenas on Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati and Murray & Murray P.C. filed byYahoo! Inc.. (Hung, Richard) (Filed on 4/3/2009)
April 2, 2009 Filing 94 Statement of Recent Decision by Software Rights Archive LLC. (Kaplan, Lee) (Filed on 4/2/2009)
March 27, 2009 Filing 93 Declaration of Lee L. Kaplan in Support of 92 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion to Compel Compliance with Yahoo!'s Subpoena on Murray & Murray filed byL. Daniel Egger, Software Rights Archive LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-4, # 2 Exhibit 5-11)(Related document(s) 92 ) (Kaplan, Lee) (Filed on 3/27/2009) Modified on 4/4/2009 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
March 27, 2009 Filing 92 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion to Compel Compliance with Yahoo!'s Subpoena on Murray & Murray filed byL. Daniel Egger, Software Rights Archive LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Kaplan, Lee) (Filed on 3/27/2009) Modified on 4/4/2009 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
March 27, 2009 Filing 91 Declaration of Lee L. Kaplan in Support of 90 Reply Memorandum, to Software Rights Archive, LLC's (1) Reply in Further Support of Its Motion to Quash Plaintiffs' 30(b)(6) Notice of Deposition and (2) Opposition to Plaintiffs' Cross-Motion to Compel Production of Documents filed bySoftware Rights Archive LLC. (Related document(s) 90 ) (Kaplan, Lee) (Filed on 3/27/2009)
March 27, 2009 Filing 90 Reply Memorandum re 63 MOTION to Quash Plaintiffs' 30(b)(6) Notice of Deposition and (2) Opposition to Plaintiffs' Cross-Motion to Compel Production of Documents filed bySoftware Rights Archive LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Kaplan, Lee) (Filed on 3/27/2009)
March 27, 2009 Filing 89 **POSTED IN ERROR/WRONG CASE** Declaration of Lee L. Kaplan in Support of 88 Reply to Opposition to Motion to Compel Compliance with Yahoo!'s Subpoena on Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati filed byL. Daniel Egger, Software Rights Archive LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-4, # 2 Exhibit 5-11)(Related document(s) 88 ) (Kaplan, Lee) (Filed on 3/27/2009) Modified on 4/4/2009 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
March 27, 2009 Filing 88 **POSTED IN ERROR/WRONG CASE** Reply to Opposition to Motion to Compel Compliance with Yahoo!'s Subpoena on Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati filed byL. Daniel Egger, Software Rights Archive LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Kaplan, Lee) (Filed on 3/27/2009) Modified on 4/4/2009 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
March 27, 2009 Filing 87 **POSTED IN ERROR/WRONG CASE** Declaration of Mark Parnes in Support of 86 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion to Compel by Yahoo! Inc. filed byWilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati, P.C.. (Related document(s) 86 ) (Parnes, Mark) (Filed on 3/27/2009) Modified on 4/4/2009 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
March 27, 2009 Filing 86 **POSTED IN ERROR/WRONG CASE**Memorandum in Opposition to Motion to Compel by Yahoo! Inc. filed byWilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati, P.C.. (Parnes, Mark) (Filed on 3/27/2009) Modified on 4/4/2009 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
March 24, 2009 Filing 85 DECLARATION of Joseph J. De Hope, Jr. in Opposition to 64 MOTION to Strike 42 MOTION to Dismiss , Transfer or Stay filed byMurray & Murray, PC. (Related document(s) 64 ) (De Hope, Joseph) (Filed on 3/24/2009)
March 24, 2009 Filing 84 Memorandum in Opposition re 64 MOTION to Strike 42 MOTION to Dismiss , Transfer or Stay filed byMurray & Murray, PC. (De Hope, Joseph) (Filed on 3/24/2009)
March 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Granting 79 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Kristen L. McKeever. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2009)
February 27, 2009 Filing 82 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Yahoo! Inc. re 81 Notice (Other) JOINT AMENDED NOTICE OF MOTIONS (Hung, Richard) (Filed on 2/27/2009)
February 27, 2009 Filing 81 NOTICE by Yahoo! Inc. JOINT AMENDED NOTICE OF MOTIONS (Hung, Richard) (Filed on 2/27/2009)
February 17, 2009 Filing 80 Proposed Order re 79 APPLICATION of Kristen L. McKeever for Admission Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 54611004720) by L. Daniel Egger, Software Rights Archive LLC. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2009)
February 17, 2009 Filing 79 APPLICATION of Kristen L. McKeever for Admission Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 54611004720) filed by L. Daniel Egger, Software Rights Archive LLC. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2009)
February 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 78 Joint STIPULATION AND ORDER 76 . Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 2/13/09. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2009)
February 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Granting 70 Motion to Consolidate Pending Motions and Assign Related Miscellaneous Action to This Court. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2009)
February 6, 2009 Filing 76 STIPULATION Joint Stipulation and [Proposed] Order by IAC Search & Media, Inc., Lycos Inc.. (Madigan, Kristin) (Filed on 2/6/2009)
February 3, 2009 Filing 75 STIPULATION re 72 Memorandum in Opposition, Stipulated Request for Order and [Proposed] Order Shortening Time for Hearing on Plaintiffs' Cross-Motion to Compel Production of Documents From Defendant Software Rights Archive, LLC by IAC Search & Media, Inc., Lycos Inc.. (Kash, Jennifer) (Filed on 2/3/2009)
February 3, 2009 Filing 74 Proposed Order re 72 Memorandum in Opposition, and Plaintiffs' Cross-Motion to Compel Production of Documents From Defendant Software Rights Archive, LLC by Yahoo! Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Lycos Inc., Google Inc., AOL LLC. (Kash, Jennifer) (Filed on 2/3/2009)
February 3, 2009 Filing 73 Declaration of Jennifer A. Kash in Support of 72 Memorandum in Opposition, and Plaintiffs' Cross-Motion to Compel Production of Documents From Defendant Software Rights Archive, LLC filed byYahoo! Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Lycos Inc., Google Inc., AOL LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I)(Related document(s) 72 ) (Kash, Jennifer) (Filed on 2/3/2009)
February 3, 2009 Filing 72 Memorandum in Opposition re 63 MOTION to Quash and Plaintiffs' Cross-Motion to Compel Production of Documents From Defendant Software Rights Archive, LLC filed byYahoo! Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Lycos Inc., Google Inc., AOL LLC. (Kash, Jennifer) (Filed on 2/3/2009)
January 29, 2009 Filing 71 Proposed Order Re: Agreed Rule 7-11 Motion to Consolidate Pending Motions and Assign Related Miscellaneous Action to This Court by Yahoo! Inc.. (Hung, Richard) (Filed on 1/29/2009)
January 29, 2009 Filing 70 MOTION Agreed Rule 7-11 Motion to Consolidate Pending Motions and Assign Related Miscellaneous Action to this Court filed by Yahoo! Inc.. (Hung, Richard) (Filed on 1/29/2009)
January 29, 2009 Filing 69 STIPULATION Re: Agreed Rule 7-11 Motion to Consolidate Pending Motions and Assign Related Miscellaneous Action to This Court by Yahoo! Inc.. (Hung, Richard) (Filed on 1/29/2009)
January 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Granting 9 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Mark D. Baker. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2009)
January 21, 2009 Filing 67 Proposed Order re 9 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 54611003562.) by IAC Search & Media, Inc., Lycos Inc.. (Kash, Jennifer) (Filed on 1/21/2009)
January 20, 2009 Filing 66 Proposed Order re 64 MOTION to Strike 42 MOTION to Dismiss , Transfer or Stay by Yahoo! Inc.. (Hung, Richard) (Filed on 1/20/2009)
January 20, 2009 Filing 65 Declaration of FRANCIS C. HO in Support of 64 MOTION to Strike 42 MOTION to Dismiss , Transfer or Stay filed byYahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N)(Related document(s) 64 ) (Hung, Richard) (Filed on 1/20/2009)
January 20, 2009 Filing 64 MOTION to Strike 42 MOTION to Dismiss , Transfer or Stay filed by Yahoo! Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 2/27/2009 09:00 AM. (Hung, Richard) (Filed on 1/20/2009)
January 20, 2009 Filing 63 MOTION to Quash filed by L. Daniel Egger, Software Rights Archive LLC, Site Technologies Inc. Motion Hearing set for 2/24/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom #5, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Kaplan, Lee) (Filed on 1/20/2009)
January 16, 2009 Case Assigned to Magistrate Judge Patricia V. Trumbull for all discovery matters. (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2009)
January 15, 2009 Filing 62 OBJECTIONS to Plaintiffs Notice of 30(B)(6) Deposition by L. Daniel Egger, Software Rights Archive LLC. (Kaplan, Lee) (Filed on 1/15/2009)
December 29, 2008 Filing 61 OBJECTIONS to Plaintiffs Notice of Deposition of L. Daniel Egger by L. Daniel Egger, Software Rights Archive LLC, Site Technologies Inc. (Smegal, Thomas) (Filed on 12/29/2008)
December 24, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 60 STIPULATION AND ORDER 59 for Continuance of Hearing for Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, Transfer, or Stay. Motion Hearing set for 2/27/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 12/24/08. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/24/2008)
December 22, 2008 Filing 59 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER FOR CONTINUANCE OF HEARING FOR DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS, TRANSFER, OR STAY by Yahoo! Inc.. (Hung, Richard) (Filed on 12/22/2008)
December 19, 2008 Filing 58 MOTION for Extension of Time to File filed by L. Daniel Egger, Software Rights Archive LLC, Site Technologies Inc. (Kaplan, Lee) (Filed on 12/19/2008)
December 19, 2008 Filing 57 NOTICE of Appearance by Ramon K Tabtiang (Tabtiang, Ramon) (Filed on 12/19/2008)
December 17, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER 52 Governing Live Technology Tutorial. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 12/17/08. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2008)
December 17, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 55 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER 53 : Tutorial/Claims Construction Hearing set for 12/15/2010 09:00 AM. Case Management Conference set for 8/20/2010 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 12/17/08. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2008)
December 17, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Granting 50 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Ramon K. Tabtiang. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2008)
December 15, 2008 Filing 53 Proposed Order AGREED SCHEDULE AND [PROPOSED] ORDER by Yahoo! Inc.. (Hung, Richard) (Filed on 12/15/2008)
December 15, 2008 Filing 52 STIPULATION GOVERNING LIVE TECHNOLOGY TUTUORIAL AND [PROPOSED] ORDER by Yahoo! Inc.. (Hung, Richard) (Filed on 12/15/2008)
December 10, 2008 Filing 49 NOTICE by Yahoo! Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Lycos Inc., Google Inc., AOL LLC Notice of Re-Opening of Chapter 11 Case (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Kash, Jennifer) (Filed on 12/10/2008)
December 9, 2008 Filing 51 Proposed Order re 50 APPLICATION of Ramon K. Tabtiang for Admission Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 54611004355) by Google Inc., AOL LLC. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2008)
December 9, 2008 Filing 50 APPLICATION of Ramon K. Tabtiang for Admission Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 54611004355) filed by Google Inc., AOL LLC. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2008)
November 20, 2008 Filing 48 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Bernard Walsh, IV (Walsh, Thomas) (Filed on 11/20/2008)
November 19, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Granting 43 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Thomas B. Walsh, IV. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2008)
November 18, 2008 Filing 46 Declaration of L. Daniel Egger in Support of 42 MOTION to Dismiss filed byL. Daniel Egger. (Related document(s) 42 ) (Smegal, Thomas) (Filed on 11/18/2008)
November 14, 2008 Filing 45 Minute Entry: Case Management Conference held on 11/14/2008 before Ronald M. Whyte (Date Filed: 11/14/2008). Further Case Management Conference set for 8/20/2010 02:00 PM. Claims Construction Hearing set for 12/15/2010 09:00 AM. (Court Reporter Not Reported.) (jg, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/14/2008)
November 10, 2008 Filing 42 MOTION to Dismiss filed by L. Daniel Egger, Software Rights Archive LLC, Site Technologies Inc. Motion Hearing set for 1/23/2009 10:30 AM. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 Cal. Complaint, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 Google Answer, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 Defs' Mot. to Dismiss, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 4 Pl.'s Opp., # 5 Exhibit Exhibit 5 Tex. Compl., # 6 Exhibit Exhibit 6 Ait Dec., # 7 Exhibit Exhibit 7 Site Tech Assmt., # 8 Exhibit Exhibit 8 Egger Assmt., # 9 Exhibit Exhibit 9 Bill of Sale, # 10 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Smegal, Thomas) (Filed on 11/10/2008)
November 7, 2008 Filing 41 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (Joint) and [Proposed] Order filed by Yahoo! Inc.. (Hung, Richard) (Filed on 11/7/2008)
November 7, 2008 Filing 40 Certificate of Interested Entities by L. Daniel Egger, Software Rights Archive LLC, Site Technologies Inc (Ellwanger, Jay) (Filed on 11/7/2008)
November 6, 2008 Filing 39 *** FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE REFER TO DOCUMENT 41 . *** CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (Joint) filed by Yahoo! Inc.. (Hung, Richard) (Filed on 11/6/2008) Modified on 11/7/2008 (feriab, COURT STAFF).
November 6, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER by Judge Jeremy Fogel Granting 33 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Attorney Narasa R. Duvvuri. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2008)
November 5, 2008 Filing 44 Proposed Order re 43 APPLICATION of Thomas B. Walsh, IV for Admission Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 54611004168) by Google Inc., AOL LLC. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2008)
November 5, 2008 Filing 43 APPLICATION of Thomas B. Walsh for Admission Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 54611004168) filed by Google Inc., AOL LLC. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2008)
October 28, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER by Judge Jeremy Fogel Granting 31 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Attorney Jeffrey A. Potts. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2008)
October 28, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER by Judge Jeremy Fogel Granting 29 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Attorney Lee L. Kaplan. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2008)
October 28, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 35 STIPULATION AND ORDER 25 Selecting ADR Process. Mediation. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 10/28/08. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2008)
October 24, 2008 Filing 34 Proposed Order re 33 APPLICATION of Narasa R. Duvvuri for Admission Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 54611004101) by L. Daniel Egger, Software Rights Archive LLC, Site Technologies Inc. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2008)
October 24, 2008 Filing 33 APPLICATION of Narasa R. Duvvuri for Admission Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 54611004101) filed by L. Daniel Egger, Software Rights Archive LLC, Site Technologies Inc. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2008)
October 24, 2008 Filing 32 Proposed Order re 31 APPLICATION of Jeffrey A. Potts for Admission Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 54611004101) by L. Daniel Egger, Software Rights Archive LLC, Site Technologies Inc. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2008)
October 24, 2008 Filing 31 APPLICATION of Jeffrey A. Potts for Admission Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 54611004101) filed by L. Daniel Egger, Software Rights Archive LLC, Site Technologies Inc. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2008)
October 24, 2008 Filing 30 Proposed Order re 29 APPLICATION of Lee L. Kaplan for Admission Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 54611004101) by L. Daniel Egger, Software Rights Archive LLC, Site Technologies Inc. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2008)
October 24, 2008 Filing 29 APPLICATION of Lee L. Kaplan for Admission Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 54611004101) filed by L. Daniel Egger, Software Rights Archive LLC, Site Technologies Inc. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2008)
October 24, 2008 Filing 28 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options BY PLAINTIFF IAC SEARCH & MEDIA, INC. (Kash, Jennifer) (Filed on 10/24/2008)
October 24, 2008 Filing 27 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options BY PLAINTIFF LYCOS, INC. (Kash, Jennifer) (Filed on 10/24/2008)
October 24, 2008 Filing 26 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Attachments: # 1 Signature Page (Declarations/Stipulations) Declaration of Consent in Support of ADR Certification for Yahoo! Inc.)(Hung, Richard) (Filed on 10/24/2008)
October 24, 2008 Filing 25 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Mediation by Yahoo! Inc. (Hung, Richard) (Filed on 10/24/2008)
October 24, 2008 Filing 24 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options by Plaintiff AOL LLC (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Consent in Support of Plaintiff AOL LLC's ADR Certification)(Wolff, Jason) (Filed on 10/24/2008)
October 24, 2008 Filing 23 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options by Plaintiff Google Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Consent in Support of Plaintiff Google Inc.'s ADR Certification)(Wolff, Jason) (Filed on 10/24/2008)
October 24, 2008 Filing 22 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Ellwanger, Jay) (Filed on 10/24/2008)
September 24, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 21 STIPULATION AND ORDER 20 to Continue the Case Management Conference:Case Management Conference set for 11/14/2008 10:30 AM. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 9/24/08. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2008)
September 22, 2008 Filing 20 STIPULATION JOINT STIPULATED REQUEST TO RESCHEDULE INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE by Yahoo! Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Lycos Inc., Google Inc., AOL LLC. (Kash, Jennifer) (Filed on 9/22/2008)
September 11, 2008 Filing 19 CLERK'S NOTICE OF SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Case Management Conference set for 10/10/2008 10:30 AM. Joint Case Management Statement due by 10/3/2008. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2008)
August 22, 2008 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Google Inc., AOL LLC re 1 Complaint, Summons and Other Pleadings on Defendant Software Rights Archive, LLC (Brooks, Juanita) (Filed on 8/22/2008)
August 22, 2008 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Google Inc., AOL LLC re 1 Complaint, Summons and Other Pleadings on Defendant L. Daniel Egger (Brooks, Juanita) (Filed on 8/22/2008)
August 22, 2008 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Google Inc., AOL LLC. Software Rights Archive LLC served on 8/19/2008, answer due 9/8/2008. (Brooks, Juanita) (Filed on 8/22/2008)
August 22, 2008 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Google Inc., AOL LLC. L. Daniel Egger served on 8/19/2008, answer due 9/8/2008. (Brooks, Juanita) (Filed on 8/22/2008)
August 18, 2008 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Yahoo! Inc. re 1 Complaint, Summons in a Civil Case (Hung, Richard) (Filed on 8/18/2008)
August 6, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. Ronald M. Whyte for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 8/6/08. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2008)
August 5, 2008 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (bjt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2008)
August 1, 2008 Filing 11 Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge by IAC Search & Media, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE)(Kash, Jennifer) (Filed on 8/1/2008)
July 24, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER TO FILE CONSENT/DECLINATION re 9 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 54611003562.) filed by IAC Search & Media, Inc., Lycos Inc.. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 7/24/2008. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2008)
July 21, 2008 Filing 9 MOTION for attorney Mark D. Baker leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 54611003562.) filed by IAC Search & Media, Inc., Lycos Inc.. (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2008)
July 17, 2008 Filing 8 Certificate of Interested Entities by Google Inc. (Wolff, Jason) (Filed on 7/17/2008)
July 17, 2008 Filing 7 Certificate of Interested Entities by AOL LLC (Wolff, Jason) (Filed on 7/17/2008)
July 17, 2008 Filing 6 Certificate of Interested Entities by Yahoo! Inc. (Hung, Richard) (Filed on 7/17/2008)
July 17, 2008 Filing 5 Certificate of Interested Entities by Lycos Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Daum Communications Corporation for Lycos Inc.. (Kash, Jennifer) (Filed on 7/17/2008)
July 17, 2008 Filing 4 Certificate of Interested Entities by IAC Search & Media, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent IAC/InterActiveCorp. for IAC Search & Media, Inc.. (Kash, Jennifer) (Filed on 7/17/2008)
July 7, 2008 Filing 3 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding patent infringement (cc: form mailed to register). (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2008)
July 1, 2008 Filing 2 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 10/2/2008. Case Management Conference set for 10/9/2008 10:00 PM. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order)(slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2008)
July 1, 2008 Filing 1 COMPLAINT; summonses issued against L. Daniel Egger, Software Rights Archive LLC, Site Technologies Inc (Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 54611003457.). Filed by Yahoo! Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Lycos Inc., Google Inc., AOL LLC. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2008) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/12/2008: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G) (ga, COURT STAFF).
July 1, 2008 Set/Reset Hearings: Case Management Conference set for 10/9/2008 10:00 AM. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2008)
July 1, 2008 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Google Inc. et al v. Egger et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Google Inc.
Represented By: Jerry T. Yen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AOL LLC
Represented By: Jerry T. Yen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yahoo! Inc.
Represented By: Michael A. Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IAC Search & Media, Inc.
Represented By: Claude Michael Stern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lycos Inc.
Represented By: Claude Michael Stern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. Daniel Egger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Software Rights Archive LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Site Technologies Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?