Fresh Start Advantage, Inc. et al v. Tamagni et al
Plaintiff: Fresh Start Advantage, Inc. and Fresh Kist Produce, LLC
Defendant: John D. Tamagni and Robert Elliott
Case Number: 5:2008cv03697
Filed: November 17, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Presiding Judge: Ronald M. Whyte
Nature of Suit: Agriculture Acts
Cause of Action: 07:499 Agricultural Commodities Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 32 STIPULATION AND ORDER 31 for Dismissal, ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 11/17/09. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2009)
August 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 28 STIPULATION AND ORDER 26 to Extend Deadline for ADR Session. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 8/25/09. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2009)
June 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER 23 to Continue Case Management Conference: Case Management Conference set for 8/28/2009 10:30 AM. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 6/11/09. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2009)
April 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STIPULATION AND ORDER 18 Selecting ADR Process. Mediation. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 4/20/09. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2009)
January 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER GRANTING 15 Stipulation For Change of Venue. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 1/7/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2009)
January 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER re 13 Case Management Statement CONTINUING Case Management Conference. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on January 5, 2009. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2009)
November 6, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING 8 Request to Continue CMC. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 11/6/087. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fresh Start Advantage, Inc. et al v. Tamagni et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fresh Start Advantage, Inc.
Represented By: Marion I Quesenbery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fresh Kist Produce, LLC
Represented By: Marion I Quesenbery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John D. Tamagni
Represented By: Clyde Charles Pearce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Elliott
Represented By: Clyde Charles Pearce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?