Pulaski & Middleman, LLC v. Google Inc. Featured Case
Plaintiff: Pulaski & Middleman, LLC
Defendant: Google Inc.
Case Number: 5:2008cv03888
Filed: August 14, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Presiding Judge: James Ware
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Howard R. Lloyd for all further discovery matters. Judge Richard Seeborg no longer assigned to the case.Signed by The Executive Committee on 01/14/2010. (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2010)
February 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER by Judge James Ware The Clerk of Court SHALL CONSOLIDATE C08-3369 JW, C08-3452 JW, C08-3888 JW, C08-4701 JW these actions such that the earlier filed action, C08-3369 JW, is the LEAD CASE. ALL future filings SHALL be in C08-3369 and bear the caption:"In re Google AdWords Litigation." In addition, the Clerk SHALL administratively close C08-3452 JW, C08-3888 JW and C08-4701 JW. Plaintiffs SHALL file and Amended Consolidated Complaint by 4/6/09 and Appointing Schubert Jonckheer Kolbe & Kralowec LLP Interim Class Counsel (jwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2009) Modified on 2/25/2009 (cv, COURT STAFF).
February 20, 2009 Filing 26 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Pulaski & Middleman, LLC. (Schubert, Dustin) (Filed on 2/20/2009)
February 12, 2009 Filing 25 CLERKS NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing (34 in 08-cv-03369-JW Levitte v. Google Inc.); Continuing Case Management Conference in ALL RELATED cases from 2/23/2009 to 3/2/2009. Motion Hearing set for 3/2/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Joint Case Management Statement due by 2/20/2009 to be filed in each respective case docket. Case Management Conference in all related cases set for 3/2/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. James Ware. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2009)
November 19, 2008 ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference held 11/19/2008 with Robin W. Siefkin, ADR Program Staff Attorney. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2008)
November 13, 2008 Filing 24 ADR Clerk's Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference on 11/19/2008 at 2:30 p.m. Please note that Plaintiff's counsel should initiate the call. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2008)
November 3, 2008 Pursuant to Related Case Order ( 23 ). Case reassigned to District Judge James Ware for all furhter proceedings and Magistrate Judge Richard Seeborg for all discovery matters. Judge Susan Illston no longer assigned to the case. (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2008)
November 3, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 23 RELATED CASE ORDER. C-08-3369 JW, C-08-3452 RMW, C-08-4701 PVT and C-08-3888 SI ARE RELATED. The parties are to file a joint case management conference statement in their respective case dockets by 2/13/2009. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/23/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. James Ware. Signed by Judge James Ware on 11/3/2008. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2008)
October 31, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation.. Signed by Judge Illston on 10/30/08. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2008)
October 29, 2008 Filing 21 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options Defendant Google Inc. (Norton, Leo) (Filed on 10/29/2008)
October 29, 2008 Filing 20 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Early Neutral Evaluation by Pulaski & Middleman, LLC (Saveri, Guido) (Filed on 10/29/2008)
October 22, 2008 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter Joel Willsey (Willsey, Peter) (Filed on 10/22/2008)
October 10, 2008 Filing 18 Plaintiff's Statement in Response to 14 Notice of Pendency of Other Civil Action [Civil Local Rule 3-13(c)] filed byPulaski & Middleman, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Saveri, Guido) (Filed on 10/10/2008) Modified on 10/14/2008 (ys, COURT STAFF).
October 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER by Judge Illston granting 16 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2008)
October 1, 2008 Filing 16 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Peter J. Willsey ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 54611003982.) filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 receipt, # 2 proposed order)(ys, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2008)
September 30, 2008 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Graham Rhodes (Rhodes, Michael) (Filed on 9/30/2008)
September 30, 2008 Filing 14 NOTICE by Google Inc. Pendency of Other Action (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-1, # 2 Exhibit A-2)(Norton, Leo) (Filed on 9/30/2008)
September 30, 2008 Filing 13 Certificate of Interested Entities by Google Inc. (Norton, Leo) (Filed on 9/30/2008)
September 30, 2008 Filing 12 NOTICE by Google Inc. Corporate Disclosure Statement (Norton, Leo) (Filed on 9/30/2008)
September 30, 2008 Filing 11 Defendant Google Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint byGoogle Inc.. (Norton, Leo) (Filed on 9/30/2008)
September 19, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Denying Plaintiffs' Motion to Relate Cases (jwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2008)
September 12, 2008 Filing 9 NOTICE by Pulaski & Middleman, LLC of Association of Counsel (Saveri, Guido) (Filed on 9/12/2008)
September 8, 2008 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE Case Management Conference set for 11/21/2008 02:00 PM. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order) (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2008)
September 4, 2008 Filing 7 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint (Civil L.R. 6-1) by Google Inc.. (Norton, Leo) (Filed on 9/4/2008)
August 25, 2008 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Pulaski & Middleman, LLC. Google Inc. served on 8/14/2008, answer due 9/3/2008. (Saveri, Guido) (Filed on 8/25/2008)
August 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. Susan Illston for all further proceedings. Judge Hon. Samuel Conti no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 8/18/08. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2008)
August 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 8/15/08. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2008)
August 14, 2008 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (ys, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2008)
August 14, 2008 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Google Inc. (aaa, Court Staff) (Filed on 8/14/2008)
August 14, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 11/14/2008. Case Management Conference set for 11/21/2008 10:00 AM. Signed by Senior Judge Samuel Conti on 8/14/08. (Attachments: # 1 SC Standing Order, # 2 Standing Order)(aaa, Court Staff) (Filed on 8/14/2008)
August 14, 2008 Filing 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT: JURY TRIAL DEMANDED against Google Inc. ( Filing fee $ 350.00, receipt number 34611022395.). Filed byPulaski & Middleman, LLC. (aaa, Court Staff) (Filed on 8/14/2008) (aaa, Court Staff).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pulaski & Middleman, LLC v. Google Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pulaski & Middleman, LLC
Represented By: Cadio Zirpoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google Inc.
Represented By: Peter Joel Willsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?