Facebook, Inc. v. Guerbuez et al Featured Case

Plaintiff Facebook, Inc. alleged that Defendants improperly and illegally accessed Facebook's computers and user information to conduct vast spamming campaigns targeted at Facebook users.

Plaintiff: Facebook, Inc.
Defendant: Adam Guerbuez and Atlantis Blue Capital
Case Number: 5:2008cv03889
Filed: August 14, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Contract: Other Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Jeremy Fogel
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 30, 2009 FILE located at Federal Records Center (FRC), San Bruno, CA: Accession No: 021-2009-5152; Box No: 149. (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2009)
November 16, 2009 SEALED DOCUMENTS LOCATED AT FEDERAL RECORDS CENTER (FRC) San Bruno, CA. Accession #:021-09-5150 Box #:48. (pmc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2009)
April 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER BY JUDGE JEREMY FOGEL GRANTING 29 MISCELLANEOUS ADMINISTRATIVE REQUEST. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2009)
April 10, 2009 Filing 29 MOTION Miscellaneous Administrative Request for Determination of Enforceability and Non-Appealability; [Proposed] Order filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Gray, Thomas) (Filed on 4/10/2009)
December 10, 2008 Filing 28 FINAL JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 12/9/08. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2008)
December 8, 2008 Filing 27 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Remaining Parties and Claims Without Prejudice and Request for Entry of Final Judgment by Facebook, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Hale, Peter) (Filed on 12/8/2008)
November 21, 2008 Filing 26 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 11/21/2008 before Judge Jeremy Fogel (Date Filed: 11/21/2008) re 13 MOTION for Default Judgment. The motion is taken under submission. (See Order Docket 25 ) (Court Reporter Kristen Moody.) (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/21/2008)
November 21, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER GRANTING 13 FACEBOOK, INC.'S APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT AGAINST ADAM GUERBUEZ AND ATLANTIS BLUE CAPITAL. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 11/21/08. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2008)
November 20, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER BY JUDGE JEREMY FOGEL GRANTING 17 FACEBOOK, INC.'S MOTION TO SHORTEN TIME FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT HEARING. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2008)
November 18, 2008 Filing 24 Sealed Document. (srm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2008)
November 18, 2008 Filing 23 Sealed Document. (srm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2008)
November 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER GRANTING re 10 MOTION to Seal Documents. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 11/12/08. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2008)
November 12, 2008 Filing 20 Proposed Order re 17 MOTION to Shorten Time for Default Judgment Hearing by Facebook, Inc.. (Hale, Peter) (Filed on 11/12/2008)
November 12, 2008 Filing 19 Declaration of Bernard Cantin in Support of 17 MOTION to Shorten Time for Default Judgment Hearing filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Related document(s) 17 ) (Hale, Peter) (Filed on 11/12/2008)
November 12, 2008 Filing 18 Declaration of Thomas J. Gray in Support of 17 MOTION to Shorten Time for Default Judgment Hearing filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Related document(s) 17 ) (Hale, Peter) (Filed on 11/12/2008)
November 12, 2008 Filing 17 MOTION to Shorten Time for Default Judgment Hearing filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Hale, Peter) (Filed on 11/12/2008)
November 10, 2008 **DOCKETED IN ERROR, PLEASE DISREGARD**Received Exhibit B to the Declaration (FILED UNDER SEAL). (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2008) Modified on 11/18/2008 (dlm, COURT STAFF).
November 10, 2008 Received Exhibit N to the Declaration (FILED UNDER SEAL). (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2008)
November 10, 2008 Received Application for Default Judgment (FILED UNDER SEAL). (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2008) Modified on 11/13/2008 (sp, COURT STAFF).
November 10, 2008 Filing 16 Proposed Order re 13 Notice (Other) by Facebook, Inc.. (Hale, Peter) (Filed on 11/10/2008)
November 10, 2008 Filing 15 Declaration of Christine Clement in Support of 13 Notice (Other) filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) 13 ) (Hale, Peter) (Filed on 11/10/2008)
November 10, 2008 Filing 14 Declaration of P. Wayne Hale in Support of 13 Notice (Other) filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O)(Related document(s) 13 ) (Hale, Peter) (Filed on 11/10/2008)
November 10, 2008 Filing 13 NOTICE by Facebook, Inc. Manual Filing Notification Regarding Application for Default Judgment Against Adam Guerbuez and Atlantis Blue Capital (Hale, Peter) (Filed on 11/10/2008)
November 10, 2008 Filing 12 Proposed Order re 10 MOTION to Seal Plaintiff's Application for Default Judgment and Exhibit N to the Declaration of P. Wayne Hale ISO Application for Default Judgment by Facebook, Inc.. (Hale, Peter) (Filed on 11/10/2008)
November 10, 2008 Filing 11 Declaration of Thomas J. Gray in Support of 10 MOTION to Seal Plaintiff's Application for Default Judgment and Exhibit N to the Declaration of P. Wayne Hale ISO Application for Default Judgment filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Related document(s) 10 ) (Hale, Peter) (Filed on 11/10/2008)
November 10, 2008 Filing 10 MOTION to Seal Plaintiff's Application for Default Judgment and Exhibit N to the Declaration of P. Wayne Hale ISO Application for Default Judgment filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Hale, Peter) (Filed on 11/10/2008)
October 7, 2008 Filing 9 Clerks Notice ENTRY OF DEFAULT (Attachments: # 1 Default Entered) (Related documents(s) 7 ) (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2008)
September 10, 2008 Filing 8 Declaration of Thomas J. Gray in Support of 7 MOTION for Entry of Default filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Related document(s) 7 ) (Gray, Thomas) (Filed on 9/10/2008)
September 10, 2008 Filing 7 MOTION for Entry of Default filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 [Proposed] Entry of Default Against Adam Guerbuez and Atlantis Blue Capital)(Gray, Thomas) (Filed on 9/10/2008)
August 22, 2008 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint, Summons and Related Court Papers Upon Adam Guerbuez served on Adam Guerbuez on 8/14/08, filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Hale, Peter) (Filed on 8/22/2008)
August 22, 2008 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Facebook, Inc.. Adam Guerbuez served on 8/14/2008, answer due 9/3/2008. (Hale, Peter) (Filed on 8/22/2008)
August 14, 2008 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2008)
August 14, 2008 Filing 4 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 1/2/2009. Case Management Conference set for 1/9/2009 10:30 AM. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order, # 2 CM Standing Order, # 3 JF Pretrial Standing Order)(gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2008)
August 14, 2008 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Adam Guerbuez, Atlantis Blue Capital. (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2008)
August 14, 2008 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Facebook, Inc. (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2008) (gm, COURT STAFF).
August 14, 2008 Filing 1 COMPLAINT - Breach of Contract; Demand for Jury Trial; against Adam Guerbuez, Atlantis Blue Capital ( Filing fee $ 350.00, receipt number 54611003736.). Filed byFacebook, Inc.. (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2008) (gm, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Facebook, Inc. v. Guerbuez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Facebook, Inc.
Represented By: Peter Wayne Hale, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam Guerbuez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atlantis Blue Capital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?