The Brix Group, Inc v. Coastal Wireless, LLC et al

Plaintiff: The Brix Group, Inc
Defendant: Coastal Wireless, LLC, Matthew S Blanc, Joshua Ethan Engstrom, Robert Whitney Ford and David Michael Licavoli
Case Number: 5:2008cv04713
Filed: October 11, 2008
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Contract: Other Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Patricia V. Trumbull
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 28, 2011 77 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL RE DEFENDANT DAVID MICHAEL LICAVOLI; ORDER re 74 Stipulation filed by The Brix Group, Inc. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on February 28, 2011. (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2011)
July 20, 2010 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED REQUEST TO CHANGE TIME FOR INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 53 Stipulation, filed by The Brix Group, Inc, Robert Whitney Ford. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on July 20, 2010. (pvtlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2010)
April 19, 2010 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 46 Stipulated Request to Change Time for Initial Case Management Conference and Time for Completing Mediation. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on 4/19/10. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 4/19/2010)
January 19, 2010 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED REQUEST TO CHANGE TIME FOR INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND DEADLINE FOR COMPLETING MEDIATION PURSUANT TO CIVIL L.R. 6-2 re 41 Stipulation, filed by The Brix Group, Inc, Coastal Wireless, LLC, Robert Whitney Ford, Joshua Ethan Engstrom. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on January 19, 2010. (pvtlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2010)
November 12, 2009 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED REQUEST FOR ORDER CHANGING TIME FOR COMPLETING MEDIATION PURSUANT TO CIVIL L.R. 6-2 re 39 Stipulation, filed by The Brix Group, Inc, Coastal Wireless, LLC, Robert Whitney Ford, Joshua Ethan Engstrom. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on November 12, 2009. (pvtlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2009)
August 21, 2009 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING DEADLINE FOR PARTIES TO FILE EITHER A "CONSENT TO PROCEED BEFORE A UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE," OR ELSE A "DECLINATION TO PROCEED BEFORE A UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND REQUEST FOR REASSIGNMENT." Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on August 21, 2009. (pvtlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2009)
June 15, 2009 21 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED REQUEST TO CHANGE TIME FOR THE INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND ASSOCIATED DATES, AND DEADLINE FOR COMPLETING MEDIATION, PURSUANT TO CIVIL L.R. 6-2 re 19 Stipulation, filed by The Brix Group, Inc. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on June 12, 2009. (pvtlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2009)
February 18, 2009 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 5 Granting Request to Change Time; and Setting Deadline for Plaintiff to File Motion to Extend the Time for Serving the Remaining Defendants. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on 2/18/09. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 2/18/2009)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Brix Group, Inc v. Coastal Wireless, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Brix Group, Inc
Represented By: Mark Kevin Oto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coastal Wireless, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew S Blanc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua Ethan Engstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Whitney Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Michael Licavoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?