Walsh v. Apple, Inc. et al Featured Case

Plaintiff David Walsh alleged that Defendant Apple Inc. consistently and uniformly denied its network engineers the required regular, overtime, and other compensation that federal and state laws require

Plaintiff: David Walsh
Defendant: Apple, Inc. and Does
Case Number: 5:2008cv04918
Filed: October 28, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Labor: Fair Standards Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Jeremy Fogel
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Both
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2010 Filing 49 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 7/23/2010 before Judge Jeremy Fogel (Date Filed: 7/23/2010) re 42 MOTION for Final Approval of Settlement, 43 MOTION for Attorney Fees. The motions are granted. (Court Reporter Summer Fisher.) (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/23/2010)
July 23, 2010 Filing 48 JUDGMENT BY JUDGE JEREMY FOGEL. (jflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2010)
July 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER BY JUDGE JEREMY FOGEL 43 AWARDING ATTORNEYS' FEES AND LITIGATION EXPENSES TO CLASS COUNSEL. (jflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2010)
July 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER BY JUDGE JEREMY FOGEL GRANTING 42 FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT. (jflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2010)
July 8, 2010 Filing 45 Declaration of Rachel Christman (Claims Administrator) in Support of 42 MOTION for Settlement Final Approval, 43 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs Award filed byDavid Kalua, David Walsh. (Related document(s) 42 , 43 ) (Nordrehaug, Kyle) (Filed on 7/8/2010)
June 24, 2010 Filing 44 CLERKS NOTICE The Motion Hearing set for 7/9/2010 is CONTINUED to 7/23/2010 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2010)
June 11, 2010 Filing 43 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs Award filed by David Kalua, David Walsh. Motion Hearing set for 7/9/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for Attorneys Fees and Costs, # 2 Proposed Order)(Blumenthal, Norman) (Filed on 6/11/2010)
June 11, 2010 Filing 42 MOTION for Settlement Final Approval filed by David Kalua, David Walsh. Motion Hearing set for 7/9/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for Final Approval, # 2 Affidavit of Norman Blumenthal in Support of Motion for Final Approval and Motion for Award of Attorneys Fees and Costs, # 3 Proof of Service, # 4 Proposed Order For Final Approval, # 5 Proposed Order For Judgment)(Blumenthal, Norman) (Filed on 6/11/2010)
February 26, 2010 Filing 41 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 2/26/2010 before Judge Jeremy Fogel (Date Filed: 2/26/2010) re 40 MOTION for Preliminary Approval of Settlement held. The motion is granted. Motion for Final Approval of Settlement Hearing set for 7/9/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. (Court Reporter Summer Clanton.) (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/26/2010)
January 21, 2010 Filing 40 MOTION for Settlement Preliminary Approval for Class Settlement filed by David Kalua, David Walsh. Motion Hearing set for 2/26/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for Preliminary Approval, # 2 Declaration of Norman B. Blumenthal in support of Motion for Preliminary Approval, # 3 Certificate of Service, # 4 Proposed Order)(Blumenthal, Norman) (Filed on 1/21/2010)
January 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Howard R. Lloyd for all further discovery matters. Judge Richard Seeborg no longer assigned to the case.Signed by The Executive Committee on 01/14/2010. (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2010)
June 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 38 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: 37 PROTECTIVE ORDER REGARDING CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT (rslc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2009) Modified on 6/14/2009 (rslc2, COURT STAFF).
June 4, 2009 Filing 37 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] PROTECTIVE ORDER REGARDING CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION by Apple, Inc.. (Perry, Jessica) (Filed on 6/4/2009)
May 18, 2009 Filing 35 Defendant Apple Inc.'s ANSWER to Amended Complaint byApple, Inc.. (Liburt, Joseph) (Filed on 5/18/2009)
May 15, 2009 Filing 36 Minute Entry: Initial Case Management Conference held on 5/15/2009 before Judge Jeremy Fogel (Date Filed: 5/15/2009). Motion Hearing set for 5/21/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. (Court Reporter Summer Clanton.) (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/15/2009)
May 8, 2009 Filing 34 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT AND RULE 26(F) REPORT filed by Apple, Inc. (Liburt, Joseph) (Filed on 5/8/2009) Modified on 5/12/2009 (bw, COURT STAFF).
May 5, 2009 Filing 33 Certificate of Interested Entities by David Walsh, David Kalua (Bhowmik, Aparajit) (Filed on 5/5/2009)
May 5, 2009 Filing 32 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options on behalf of Plaintiffs (Nordrehaug, Kyle) (Filed on 5/5/2009)
May 1, 2009 Filing 31 AMENDED COMPLAINT (Third Amended) against Apple, Inc.. Filed byDavid Kalua, David Walsh. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Blumenthal, Norman) (Filed on 5/1/2009)
April 13, 2009 Filing 30 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options by Defendant Apple Inc. and Counsel (Liburt, Joseph) (Filed on 4/13/2009)
April 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 29 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 26 Selecting ADR Process, Case referred to Private ADR. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 3/31/09. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2009)
March 31, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 28 STIPULATION AND ORDER Continuing Initial Case Management Conference and Associatd Deadlines re 24 . Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/15/2009 10:30 AM. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 3/26/09. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2009)
March 27, 2009 Filing 27 Declaration of Joseph C. Liburt in Support of 26 Stipulation and Proposed Order selecting Private ADR filed byApple, Inc.. (Related document(s) 26 ) (Liburt, Joseph) (Filed on 3/27/2009)
March 27, 2009 Filing 26 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Private ADR by Apple, Inc. (Liburt, Joseph) (Filed on 3/27/2009)
March 25, 2009 Filing 25 Declaration of JOSEPH C. LIBURT in Support of 24 Stipulation CONTINUING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND ASSOICATED DEADLINES filed byApple, Inc.. (Related document(s) 24 ) (Liburt, Joseph) (Filed on 3/25/2009)
March 25, 2009 Filing 24 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER CONTINUING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND ASSOCIATED DEADLINES by Apple, Inc.. (Liburt, Joseph) (Filed on 3/25/2009)
March 24, 2009 Filing 23 Certificate of Interested Entities by Apple, Inc. (Liburt, Joseph) (Filed on 3/24/2009)
March 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART MOTIONS TO STRIKE AND FOR A MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 3/16/09. (jflc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2009)
March 13, 2009 Filing 22 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 3/13/2009 before Judge Jeremy Fogel (Date Filed: 3/13/2009) re 17 MOTION to Strike and for a More Definite Statement. The motion is taken under submission. (Court Reporter Summer Clanton.) (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/13/2009)
February 27, 2009 Filing 20 Reply Memorandum in Support of Defendant Apple Inc.'s 17 Motion to Strike and for a More Definite Statement filed byApple, Inc.. (Liburt, Joseph) (Filed on 2/27/2009) Modified on 3/2/2009 (gm, COURT STAFF).
February 23, 2009 Filing 19 Memorandum in Opposition re 17 MOTION to Strike and for a More Definite Statement filed byDavid Walsh. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Norman Blumenthal in Support of Opposition, # 2 Proof of Service)(Blumenthal, Norman) (Filed on 2/23/2009)
January 29, 2009 Filing 18 Proposed Order re 17 MOTION to Strike and for a More Definite Statement by Apple, Inc.. (Liburt, Joseph) (Filed on 1/29/2009)
January 29, 2009 Filing 17 MOTION to Strike and for a More Definite Statement filed by Apple, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 3/13/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. (Liburt, Joseph) (Filed on 1/29/2009)
December 30, 2008 Filing 16 AMENDED COMPLAINT (filed in accordance with order dated October 24, 2008) against Apple, Inc.. Filed byDavid Walsh. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Blumenthal, Norman) (Filed on 12/30/2008)
December 16, 2008 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Allison Elizabeth Pitigoi , Lynne C. Hermle, Joseph C. Liburt and Sitthikit Chariyasatit (Pitigoi, Allison) (Filed on 12/16/2008)
October 28, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 4/10/2009. Case Management Conference set for 4/17/2009 10:30 AM.. Signed by Judge Fogel on 10/28/08. (srm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2008)
October 28, 2008 Filing 13 Case transferred in from District of California Southern; Case Number 3:08-cv-01410. Original file with documents numbered 1 - 12, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
October 24, 2008 Filing 12 Case transferred to District of USDC, Northern District of CA, San Jose Division. Files transferred electronically to: *District of USDC, Northern District of CA, San Jose Division*.*280 South First Street**San Jose, CA 95113*. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 10/24/08. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(tkl) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/27/2008: # 1 Order) (tkl).
October 22, 2008 Filing 11 Joint MOTION for Change Venue and to Permit Plaintiff to file Second Amended Complaint by David Walsh. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Nordrehaug, Kyle)
September 25, 2008 Filing 10 MOTION for More Definite Statement by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Memo of Points and Authorities MPA 1-16)(Perry, Jessica)
September 25, 2008 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple, Inc. re 7 MOTION for Change Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1404(a) MOTION for Change Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1404(a) Corrected (Perry, Jessica)
September 25, 2008 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple, Inc. re 6 MOTION to Strike and for a More Definite Statement Corrected (Perry, Jessica)
September 23, 2008 Filing 7 MOTION for Change Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1404(a) by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Memo of Points and Authorities MPA 1-9, # 2 Declaration of Heather Ramirez (DEC 1-3))(Perry, Jessica). Modified on 9/25/2008 (tkl). Emailed atty re S/ on proof of service.
September 23, 2008 Filing 6 MOTION to Strike and for a More Definite Statement by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Memo of Points and Authorities MPA 1-16)(Perry, Jessica) Modified on 9/25/2008 (tkl). Emailed atty. This should be efiled as a 2 part motions. Atty to efile notice to withdraw document and re-efile motion; s/ on proof of service.
September 9, 2008 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against all defendants, filed by David Walsh. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Blumenthal, Norman)
August 27, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting 3 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Time extended for Dft Apple, Inc. to answer to Complaint, Answer due 9/11/2008. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 8/27/2008. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(jah)
August 26, 2008 Filing 3 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Complaint by Apple, Inc.. (Perry, Jessica) (jpp). Modified on 8/27/2008 - Corrected motion event (jah).
August 4, 2008 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Apple, Inc., DOES. (jmz)
August 4, 2008 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Apple, Inc., DOES ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt #153621) filed by David Walsh.(jmz) (kaj).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walsh v. Apple, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Walsh
Represented By: Kyle Nordrehaug
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple, Inc.
Represented By: Jessica R. Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?