January 22, 2013 |
Filing
160
ORDER DENYING PENDING MOTIONS by Judge Alsup denying 135 Motion in Limine; denying 136 Motion in Limine; denying 137 Motion in Limine; denying 138 Motion in Limine; denying 139 Motion in Limine; denying 140 Motion in Limine; denying 142 Motion in Limine; denying 143 Motion in Limine; denying 144 Motion in Limine; denying 145 Motion in Limine; denying 146 Motion in Limine (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2013)
|
January 17, 2013 |
Filing
158
ORDER GRANTING CONTINUANCE [re 155 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER To Continue Trial and PreTrial Dates filed by United States of America]. Case Management Statement due by 5/30/2013. Further Case Management Conference set for 6/6/2013 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 1/17/2013. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2013)
|
August 6, 2012 |
Filing
150
ORDER DENYING MOTION TO BIFURCATE AND VACATING HEARING by Hon. William Alsup denying 128 Motion to Bifurcate.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2012)
|
January 18, 2012 |
Filing
121
ORDER GRANTING 102 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION IN PART AND MODIFYING ORDER OF SEPTEMBER 21, 2011. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 1/18/2012. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2012)
|
December 7, 2011 |
Filing
116
STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE [re 114 Stipulation filed by Santa Clara Valley Housing Group, Inc.]. Case Management Statement due by 1/12/2012. Case Management Conference set for 1/19/2012 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 12/7/2011. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2011)
|
November 9, 2011 |
Filing
110
ORDER APPROVING 109 JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE DEFENDANT'S OPPOSITION, AND PLAINTIFF'S REPLY, TO MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 11/7/2011. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2011)
|
October 5, 2011 |
Filing
100
SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 99 Clerks Notice,. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 7/6/11. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2011)
|
June 6, 2011 |
Filing
92
ORDER EXCUSING PERSONAL ATTENDANCE AT SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. See order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 6/6/2011. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2011)
|
May 5, 2011 |
Filing
87
ORDER APPROVING 86 JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE HEARING DATE FOR DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS. The Motion Hearing set for 6/10/2011 is CONTINUED to 7/21/2011 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Jeremy Fogel. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 5/5/2011. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2011)
|
April 14, 2011 |
Filing
77
STIPULATION AND ORDER RE-NOTICING CROSS-MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND ESTABLISHING BRIEFING SCHEDULE re 76 , Set/Reset Deadlines as to 76 Stipulation, 71 MOTION for Summary Judgment, 66 MOTION for Summary Adjudication of Issues, 70 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Second Class of Stock Issue. Motion Hearing set for 6/10/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Jeremy Fogel. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 4/13/11. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2011)
|
February 18, 2011 |
Filing
73
ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Judge Koh on 2/18/2011. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2011)
|
January 10, 2011 |
Filing
64
ORDER Granting Stipulated Extension of Certain Deadlines. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 1/10/2011. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2011)
|
January 5, 2011 |
Filing
62
ORDER Denying 61 Motion to Set Aside Denial of Motion to Compel. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2011)
|
December 17, 2010 |
Filing
60
ORDER Granting Extension per Party Stipulation. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 12/17/2010. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2010)
|
December 14, 2010 |
Filing
59
ORDER DENYING 42 Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Third Party Duncan Douglas to Testify. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 12/14/2010. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2010)
|
November 16, 2010 |
Filing
49
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 47 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 11/16/2010. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2010)
|
September 28, 2010 |
Filing
39
ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 38 Stipulated Motion to Continue. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2010).
|
August 16, 2010 |
Filing
36
STIPULATION AND ORDER AS AMENDED BY THE COURT re 33 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 08/16/2010. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2010)
|
July 1, 2010 |
Filing
32
STIPULATION AND ORDER AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT Granting Third Stipulation to Extend the Discovery Period and Other Pretrial Dates re 31 Stipulation. Close of All Discovery due by 12/15/2010. Last Date for Hearing Motions due by 3/21/2011. Prelimina ry Pretrial Conference statement due 9/10/2010. Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 9/20/2010 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. This is a final continuance. Signed by Judge James Ware on 7/1/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2010)
|
May 10, 2010 |
Filing
30
STIPULATION AND ORDER Granting Second Stipulation to Extend the Discovery Period and Other Pretrial Date re 29 Stipulation. Close of All Discovery due by 11/1/2010. Last Date for Hearing Dispositive Motions due by 1/31/2011. Preliminary Pretrial Conference state due 7/23/2010. Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 8/2/2010 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Please see Order for further specifics. Signed by Judge James Ware on 5/10/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2010)
|
January 14, 2010 |
Filing
27
STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF SCHEDULING ORDER DEADLINES re 26 Stipulation. Close of All Discovery due by 7/12/2010. Last Date For Hearing Dispositive Motions due by 9/27/2010. Preliminary Pretrial Conference statement due 5/28/2010. Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 6/7/2010 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge James Ware on 1/14/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2010)
|
November 12, 2009 |
Filing
25
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 23 Proposed Order filed by United States of America. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 11/12/2009. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2009)
|
September 4, 2009 |
Filing
22
STIPULATION AND ORDER (AS AMENDED BY THE COURT) re 20 Proposed Order filed by United States of America. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 9/4/2009. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2009)
|
January 16, 2009 |
Filing
13
STIPULATION AND ORDER Continuing Case Management Conference from 3/9/2009 to 4/13/2009 re 11 Stipulation. Joint Case Management Conference statement due 4/3/2009. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/13/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. James Ware. Signed by Judge James Ware on 1/16/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2009)
|