Yahoo! Inc. v. American Airlines, Inc. Featured Case
Plaintiff: Yahoo! Inc.
Defendant: American Airlines, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2008cv05308
Filed: November 21, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Trademark Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Jeremy Fogel
Presiding Judge: Patricia V. Trumbull
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 30, 2009 FILE located at Federal Records Center (FRC), San Bruno, CA: Accession No: 021-2009-5152; Box No: 153. (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2009)
March 16, 2009 Filing 12 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal WITHOUT PREJUDICE by Yahoo! Inc. (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 3/16/2009)
March 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER APPROVING 10 STIPULATION AND REQUEST FOR COURT ORDER FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT AND RESCHEDULING OF INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Case Management Conference set for 4/17/2009 is CONTINUED to 6/19/2009 at 10:30 AM. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 3/2/09. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2009)
February 27, 2009 Filing 10 STIPULATION Request for Order Changing Time by American Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration [Local Civ. R. 6-2])(Brown, Frederick) (Filed on 2/27/2009)
January 27, 2009 Filing 9 STIPULATION to Extension of Time to Answer Complaint by American Airlines, Inc.. (Brown, Frederick) (Filed on 1/27/2009)
January 5, 2009 Filing 8 STIPULATION to Extension of Time to Answer Complaint by American Airlines, Inc.. (Brown, Frederick) (Filed on 1/5/2009)
December 19, 2008 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Yahoo! Inc. PROOF OF SERVICE (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 12/19/2008)
November 26, 2008 Filing 6 Certificate of Interested Entities by Yahoo! Inc. (Amended) (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 11/26/2008)
November 25, 2008 Filing 5 Copy of ( 1 ) Complaint mailed to the Director of the US Patent & Trademark Office, Mail Stop 8, PO Box 1450, Alexandria, VA 22313-1450. (srm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2008)
November 21, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 4/10/2009. Case Management Conference set for 4/17/2009 10:30 AM.. Signed by Judge Fogel on 11/21/08. (Attachments: # 1 Judge Fogel's Standing Order, # 2 CM Standing Order, # 3 Standing Order)(srm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2008)
November 21, 2008 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by Yahoo! Inc. (srm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2008) (gm, COURT STAFF).
November 21, 2008 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to American Airlines, Inc.. (srm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2008)
November 21, 2008 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against American Airlines, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 54611004251.). Filed byYahoo! Inc.. (srm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2008) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/5/2008: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (gm, COURT STAFF).
November 21, 2008 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (srm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yahoo! Inc. v. American Airlines, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yahoo! Inc.
Represented By: J. Thomas McCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Airlines, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?