June 20, 2013 |
Filing
245
ORDER by Judge Whyte granting 218 219 defendants' motions for summary judgment. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2013)
|
November 20, 2012 |
Filing
236
Order denying 232 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages and adjusting briefing schedule. Defendants' reply briefs are due on December 3, 2012. The hearing is moved to December 14, 2012 at 9AM. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2012)
|
November 19, 2012 |
Filing
235
ORDER by Judge Whyte denying 228 Motion for Extension of Time to File. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2012)
|
November 6, 2012 |
Filing
227
ORDER by Judge Whyte extending time to file. The opposition is due 11/7/2012 and the reply is due 11/15/2012. The hearing is moved to 12/7/2012 at 9 AM. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2012)
|
October 10, 2012 |
Filing
225
ORDER by Judge Whyte granting 223 Motion for Extension of Time to File Opposition re 219 218 MOTIONS for Summary Judgment. Opposition due by 11/5/2012. Replies due by 11/13/2012. Hearing set for 11/30/2012. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2012)
|
August 20, 2012 |
Filing
216
STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE DEADLINES FOR DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS AND TO EXTEND DISCOVERY re 214 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by J.J. Last Day to Hear Dispositive Motions: 10/29/2012. Signed by Chief Judge James Ware on August 20, 2012. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2012)
|
June 20, 2012 |
Filing
209
ORDER VACATING PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Signed by Chief Judge James Ware on June 20, 2012. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2012)
|
December 15, 2011 |
Filing
203
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 202 Stipulation filed by Atkinson Andelson Loya Ruud & Romo, Deanna Jean Mouser. Signed by Judge James Ware on 12/15/11. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2011)
|
November 3, 2011 |
Filing
200
ORDER vacating hearing on 189 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint filed by Atkinson Andelson Loya Ruud & Romo, Deanna Jean Mouser, 190 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint filed by Oak Grove School Dist rict, Jacqueline Adams, Richard Holtermann, Katherine Baker, Nancy Lettenberger, Dianne Lemke, Risa Quon, Dennis Hawkins, Jeremy Nishihara, Tamara Unck, Emanuel Barbara; vacating case management conference; scheduling order. Signed by Judge James Ware on November 3, 2011. (jwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2011)
|
August 4, 2011 |
Filing
187
ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME FOR FILING OF AMENDEDCOMPLAINT re 184 Stipulation filed by J. J. Amended Pleadings due by 8/11/2011. Signed by Judge James Ware on 8/4/11. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2011)
|
July 14, 2011 |
Filing
182
ORDER RE: DISCOVERY REFERRAL. Signed by Judge James Ware on 7/14/11. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2011)
|
June 15, 2011 |
Filing
181
ORDER VACATING HEARING. Signed by Judge James Ware on 6/15/11. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2011)
|
January 26, 2011 |
Filing
171
ORDER REFERRING CASE TO ACTING CHIEF MAGISTRATE JUDGE SPERO FOR DETERMINATION OFAPPROPRIATE REASSINGMENT FOR SETTLEMENT PURPOSES re 168 Order of Recusal, 169 Clerks Notice Vacating Settlement Conference. In light of Judge Grewal's recusal, t he Court refers this matter to Acting Chief Magistrate Judge Spero for determination of appropriate reassignment of this case to another magistrate judge for a settlement conference. Within ten (10) days of Judge Spero's determination, the parties shall contact the newly assigned Magistrate Judge's Chambers to set a settlement conference prior to the May hearing on pending dispositive Motions. Signed by Judge James Ware on 1/26/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2011)
|
January 25, 2011 |
Filing
170
STIPULATION AND ORDER Granting Request to Continue Motion to Dismiss from 2/14/2011 to 5/2/2011 re 167 Stipulation. Set/Reset Deadlines as to 167 Stipulation, 160 MOTION for Joinder, 159 MOTION to Dismiss. Motion Hearing set for 5/2/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. James Ware. Signed by Judge James Ware on 1/25/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2011)
|
January 3, 2011 |
Filing
166
STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING CONTINUANCE OF MOTION re 165 Stipulation. Set/Reset Deadlines as to 152 MOTION to Dismiss and MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint. Motion Hearing set for 5/2/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. James Ware. Signed by Judge James Ware on 1/3/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2011)
|
September 8, 2010 |
Filing
158
STIPULATION AND ORDER Granting Extension of Time to Respond to First Amended Complaint re 157 Stipulation. Deadline for Defendants Oak Grove School District, Richard Holtermann, Katherine Baker, Nancy Lettenberger, Dianne Lemke, Risa Quon, Dennis Hawkins, Tamara Unck, Jeremy Nishihara, Emanuel Barbara response due 9/24/2010. Signed by Judge James Ware on 9/8/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2010)
|
August 25, 2010 |
Filing
156
ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. With respect to the issue regarding the potential conflict of interests with Defendant Mouser and her law firm representing themselves as well as acting as counsel of record for the remaining public entity Defendants, the Court refers this matter to Chief Magistrate Judge James for her determination as to any conflicts. Joint Case Management Statement due by 12/3/2010. Case Management Conference set for 12/13/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Please see Order for further specifics. Signed by Judge James Ware on 8/25/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2010)
|
June 24, 2010 |
Filing
147
STIPULATION AND ORDER AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT EXTENDING TIME TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT AND CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 146 Stipulation filed. Amended Complaint due by 7/30/2010. Mediation Deadline set for 8/16/2010. Joint Case Manage ment Statement due by 8/20/2010. Case Management Conference set for 8/30/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. This is a FINAL continuance. ***CMC Deadlines terminated re 141 STIPULATION. Signed by Judge James Ware on 6/24/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2010)
|
November 17, 2009 |
Filing
97
SECOND ORDER REFERRING PLAINTIFFS TO FEDERAL PRO BONO PROJECT re 96 Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. The Clerk shall forward this Order and a copy of the Court file with a notice of referral pursuant to the guidelines of the Federal Pro Bono Project to the Volunteer Legal Services Program for the Santa Clara County Bar Association.(jwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2009) Modified text on 11/17/2009 (ecg, COURT STAFF).
|
September 30, 2009 |
Filing
75
ORDER APPOINTING PRO BONO COUNSEL; DENYING MOTION TO DECIDE PROTECTIVE ORDER;VACATING 10/5/2009 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Finding as Moot 71 Motion to Appear by Telephone; Denying 65 MOTION for Judge Ware to decide protective order. Motions te rminated: 71 MOTION to Appear by Telephone at Further Case Management Conference filed by Adam Fiss, 65 MOTION for Judge Ware to decide protective order re 57 Proposed Order filed by Evelyn Jackson, Troy Jackson. Joint Case Management Co nference statement due 10/16/2009, Further Case Management Conference set for 10/26/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Please see Order for further specifics. Signed by Judge James Ware on 9/29/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2009)
|
September 2, 2009 |
Filing
62
ORDER re Parties' Proposed Protective Orders. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 9/2/2009. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2009)
|
July 2, 2009 |
Filing
50
ORDER FOLLOWING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 46 Motion. The Clerk of Court shall forward this Order and a copy of the Court file with a notice of referral pursuant to the guidelines of the Federal Pro Bono Project to the Volunteer Legal Serv ices Program for the San Francisco Bar Association. Joint Case Management Statement due 8/21/2009. Further Case Management Conference set for 8/31/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Please see Order for further specifics. Signed by Judge James Ware on 6/30/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2009) Modified docket relationship on 7/2/2009 (ecg, COURT STAFF). Modified on 7/2/2009 (cv, COURT STAFF). Modified on 7/2/2009 (cv, COURT STAFF).
|