Facebook, Inc. v. Power Ventures, Inc. Featured Case
Plaintiff: Facebook, Inc.
Defendant: Power Ventures, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2008cv05780
Filed: December 30, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Jeremy Fogel
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 8, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 92 SCHEDULING ORDER: The Case Management Conference set for 8/24/2010 is VACATED. The parties are ordered to comply with the following scheduling order: Close of all Discovery due by 9/30/2011. Last Date for Hearing Dispositive Motions due by 12/5/2011. Preliminary Pretrial Conference statement due 8/19/2010. Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 8/29/2011 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. None of the dates set in this Order may be changed without an order of the Court made after a motion is filed pursuant to the Civil Local Rules of Court. ***CMC Deadlines terminated. Please see Order for further specifics. Signed by Judge James Ware on 8/18/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2010)
August 16, 2010 Filing 91 CLERKS NOTICE CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Conference set for 8/24/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2010)
August 13, 2010 ***Deadlines terminated. 90 Case Management Statement filed by Power Ventures, Inc., Steven Vachani, Facebook, Inc.. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2010)
August 13, 2010 Filing 90 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Facebook, Inc., Power Ventures, Inc., Steven Vachani. (Gray, Thomas) (Filed on 8/13/2010) Modified on 8/16/2010,(counsel selected incorrect event.) (cv, COURT STAFF).
July 20, 2010 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Case Management Statement due by 8/13/2010. Case Management Conference set for 8/23/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2010)
July 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER DENYING FACEBOOKS MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS; DENYING THE PARTIES CROSS-MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; GRANTING FACEBOOKS MOTION TO DISMISS DEFENDANTS COUNTERCLAIMS; DENYING FACEBOOKS MOTION TO STRIKE DEFENDANTS AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by Judge James Ware denying 56 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; granting in part and denying in part 58 Motion to Dismiss; denying 62 Motion for Summary Judgment (jwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2010)
July 6, 2010 Filing 88 Request for Judicial Notice re 86 Response ( Non Motion ) filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Related document(s) 86 ) (Avalos, Julio) (Filed on 7/6/2010)
July 6, 2010 Filing 87 Declaration of Julio C. Avalos in Support of 86 Response ( Non Motion ) filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Related document(s) 86 ) (Avalos, Julio) (Filed on 7/6/2010)
July 6, 2010 Filing 86 REPLY to 83 Amicus Curiae Electronic Frontier Foundation's Brief in Support of Dfendant Power Ventures' Motion for Summary Judgment by Facebook, Inc.. (Avalos, Julio) (Filed on 7/6/2010) Modified text on 7/8/2010 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
July 6, 2010 Filing 85 Defendants' Supplemental Brief in Support of 62 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment and in Opposition to 56 Facebook's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings or, in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment filed by Power Ventures, Inc., Steven Vachani. (Fisher, Lawrence) (Filed on 7/6/2010) Modified on 7/8/2010 counsel failed to link entry to document #62 and #56 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
June 21, 2010 Filing 84 Declaration of Seth Schoen in Support of 83 Brief of Amicus Curiae Electronic Frontier Foundation in Support of Defendant Power Ventures' Motion for Summary Judgment on Cal. Penal Code 502(c) filed byElectronic Frontier Foundation. (Related document(s) 83 ) (Cohn, Cindy) (Filed on 6/21/2010)
June 21, 2010 Filing 83 Brief of Amicus Curiae in Support of Defendant Power Ventures' 62 Motion for Summary Judgment on Cal. Penal Code 502(c) filed by Electronic Frontier Foundation. (Cohn, Cindy) (Filed on 6/21/2010) Modified on 6/22/2010,(counsel failed to properly link to motion.) (cv, COURT STAFF).
June 8, 2010 Filing 82 Transcript of Proceedings held on 06/07/2010, before Judge James Ware. Court Reporter/Transcriber Summer Fisher, Telephone number 408-288-6150. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/7/2010. (Fisher, Summer) (Filed on 6/8/2010)
June 7, 2010 Filing 81 AMENDED Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 6/7/2010 before Judge James Ware (Date Filed: 6/7/2010) re 56 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings, 58 MOTION to Dismiss, 62 MOTION for Summary Judgment. The Court set the following deadlines for supplemental briefing: Supplemental Amicus Brief due June 21, 2010. Simultaneous reply briefing due July 6, 2010. The Court took the matter under submission after oral argument pending supplemental. The Court to issue further order following hearing and completion of supplemental briefing. (Court Reporter Summer Fisher.) (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/7/2010)
June 7, 2010 Filing 80 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 6/7/2010 before Judge James Ware (Date Filed: 6/7/2010) re 56 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings, 58 MOTION to Dismis, 62 MOTION for Summary Judgment. The Court set the following deadlines for supplemental briefing: Supplemental Amicus Brief due June 21, 2010. Simultaneous reply briefing due July 6, 2010. The Court took the matter under submission after oral argument pending supplemental. The Court to issue further order following hearing and completion of supplemental briefing. (Court Reporter Summer Fisher.) (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/7/2010)
May 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER by Judge James Ware granting 78 Motion to File Amicus Curiae Brief (jwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2010)
May 3, 2010 Filing 78 MOTION to File Amicus Curiae Brief Electronic Frontier Foundation in Support of Defendant Power Ventures' 62 Motion for Summary Judgment on Cal. Penal Code 502 (c) filed by Electronic Frontier Foundation. Motion Hearing set for 6/7/2010 01:30 PM. (Attachments: # 1 Brief, # 2 Affidavit Declaration in Support of Motion, # 3 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Cohn, Cindy) (Filed on 5/3/2010) Modified on 5/3/2010 (cv, COURT STAFF).
March 16, 2010 Filing 77 Renotice motion hearing 62 on Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Power Ventures, Inc.(a Cayman Island Corporation), Steven Vachani. Motion Hearing set for 6/7/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Fisher, Lawrence) (Filed on 3/16/2010) Modified on 3/17/2010,(counsel failed to properly link to motion.) (cv, COURT STAFF).
March 10, 2010 Set/Reset Deadlines as to 56 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings, 58 MOTION to Dismiss Counterlcaims and Strike Affirmative Defenses. Motion Hearing set for 6/7/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2010)
March 10, 2010 Filing 76 RE-NOTICE of MOTION hearing re 56 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings or in the Alternative, MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment] (Avalos, Julio) (Filed on 3/10/2010) Modified on 3/12/2010,(counsel selected incorrect event. Correct event to be used is Re-Notice of motion hearing.) (cv, COURT STAFF).
March 10, 2010 Filing 75 RE-NOTICE of MOTION hearing re 58 MOTION to Dismiss Counterlcaims and Strike Affirmative Defenses (Avalos, Julio) (Filed on 3/10/2010) Modified on 3/12/2010,(counsel selected incorrect event. Correct event to be used is re-notice of motion hearing.) (cv, COURT STAFF).
March 2, 2010 Filing 74 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Facebook Inc.'s 56 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.12(c) or, in the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment of Liability Under California Penal Code Section 502(c) CORRECTION to 64 filed by Power Ventures, Inc.(a Cayman Island Corporation), Steven Vachani. (Fisher, Lawrence) (Filed on 3/2/2010) Modified on 3/2/2010,(counsel failed to properly link to motion.) (cv, COURT STAFF). Modified on 3/2/2010 (cv, COURT STAFF).
March 2, 2010 Filing 73 Pursuant to Signed Order of Recusal ( 72 ). Case reassigned to District Judge James Ware for all further proceedings.Signed by The Executive Committee on 03/02/2010. (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2010)
March 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 2/26/10. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2010)
February 26, 2010 ***Deadlines terminated. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2010)
February 26, 2010 Filing 71 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 2/26/2010 before Judge Jeremy Fogel (Date Filed: 2/26/2010) re 56 MOTION for Summary Judgment, 58 MOTION to Dismiss, 62 MOTION for Summary Judgment. The Court recuses itself and orders the case shall be reassigned. (Court Reporter Summer Clanton.) (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/26/2010)
February 25, 2010 Filing 70 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Gray, Thomas) (Filed on 2/25/2010)
February 24, 2010 Filing 69 OBJECTIONS to re 65 Declaration in Support, Facebook, Inc.'s Objections to the Declaration of Steve Vachani Submitted in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Facebook's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(c) or, in the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment of Liability Under California Penal Code Section 502(c) by Facebook, Inc.. (Avalos, Julio) (Filed on 2/24/2010)
February 9, 2010 Filing 68 Reply Memorandum Defendants' Reply Brief in Support of 62 Motion for Summary Judgment filed byPower Ventures, Inc.(a Cayman Island Corporation), Steven Vachani. (Fisher, Lawrence) (Filed on 2/9/2010) Modified on 2/10/2010 (gm, COURT STAFF).
January 29, 2010 Filing 67 Reply Memorandum re 58 MOTION to Dismiss Facebook Inc.'s Notice of Motion, Motion and Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss Counterlcaims and Strike Affirmative Defenses filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Pers, Jessica) (Filed on 1/29/2010)
January 29, 2010 Filing 66 Reply Memorandum re 56 MOTION for Summary Judgment Notice of Motion, Motion and Memorandum of Points and Authorities for Judgment on the Pleadings Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(c) or, in the Alternative Partial Summary Judgment of Liability Under California Penal Code S MOTION for Summary Judgment 62 Notice of Motion, Motion and Memorandum of Points and Authorities for Judgment on the Pleadings Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(c) or, in the Alternative Partial Summary Judgment of Liability Under California Penal Code S filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Gray, Thomas) (Filed on 1/29/2010) Modified on 2/1/2010 (gm, COURT STAFF).
January 15, 2010 Filing 65 Declaration of Steve Vachani in Support of 64 Memorandum in Opposition, of Defendants' Opposition to Facebook Inc.'s Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(c) or, in the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment of Liability Under California Penal Code Section 502(c) filed byPower Ventures, Inc.(a Cayman Island Corporation), Steven Vachani. (Related document(s) 64 ) (Fisher, Lawrence) (Filed on 1/15/2010)
January 15, 2010 Filing 64 MEMORANDUM in Opposition Defendants' Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Facebook Inc.'s 56 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(c) or, in the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment of Liability Under California Penal Code Section 502(c) filed byPower Ventures, Inc.(a Cayman Island Corporation), Steven Vachani. (Fisher, Lawrence) (Filed on 1/15/2010) Modified on 1/19/2010 (gm, COURT STAFF).
January 15, 2010 Filing 63 MEMORANDUM in Opposition Memorandum of Law in Opposition to 58 Motion of Facebook, Inc. to Dismiss Counterclaims and Strike Affirmative Defenses filed byPower Ventures, Inc.(a Cayman Island Corporation), Steven Vachani. (Fisher, Lawrence) (Filed on 1/15/2010) Modified on 1/19/2010 (gm, COURT STAFF).
January 15, 2010 Filing 62 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Count 3 of the complaint and Memorandum of Law in Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Power Ventures, Inc.(a Cayman Island Corporation), Steven Vachani. (Fisher, Lawrence) (Filed on 1/15/2010) Modified on 3/12/2010 (cv, COURT STAFF).
January 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd for all discovery matters. Judge Richard Seeborg no longer assigned to the case.Signed by The Executive Committee on 01/14/2010. (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2010)
January 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 60 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND TIME AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE PURSUANT TO CIVIL L.R. 6-2 (approving 55 ). The Case Management Conference set for 1/29/2010 is CONTINUED to 2/26/2010 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 1/6/2010. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2010)
December 28, 2009 Filing 59 CERTIFICATION OF ENE Session dated 12/18/2009 by Evaluator, Daralyn Durie; ENE session held 12/14/2009; Case did not settle; Further facilitated discussion expected by 3/14/2010; ENE process continues. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/28/2009)
December 23, 2009 Filing 58 MOTION to Dismiss Counterlcaims and MOTION to Strike Affirmative Defenses filed by Facebook, Inc.(a Delaware corporation). Motion Hearing set for 2/26/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Pers, Jessica) (Filed on 12/23/2009) Modified on 3/12/2010,(counsel failed to properly select multiple motions.) (cv, COURT STAFF).
December 23, 2009 Filing 57 Declaration of Julio C. Avalos in Support of 56 MOTION for Summary Judgment Notice of Motion, Motion and Memorandum of Points and Authorities for Judgment on the Pleadings Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(c) or, in the Alternative Partial Summary Judgment of Liability Under California Penal Code S MOTION for Summary Judgment Notice of Motion, Motion and Memorandum of Points and Authorities for Judgment on the Pleadings Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(c) or, in the Alternative Partial Summary Judgment of Liability Under California Penal Code S filed byFacebook, Inc.(a Delaware corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 56 ) (Pers, Jessica) (Filed on 12/23/2009)
December 23, 2009 Filing 56 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings or, in the Alternative MOTION Partial Summary Judgment of Liability Under California Penal Code Section 502(c) filed by Facebook, Inc.(a Delaware corporation). Motion Hearing set for 2/26/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Pers, Jessica) (Filed on 12/23/2009) Modified on 3/2/2010,(counsel failed to properly select multiple motions.) (cv, COURT STAFF). Modified on 3/12/2010 (cv, COURT STAFF).
December 17, 2009 Filing 55 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER TO EXTEND TIME AND [PROPOSED] BRIEFING SCHEDULE PURSUANT TO CIVIL L.R. 6-2 by Facebook, Inc.(a Delaware corporation). (Chatterjee, I.) (Filed on 12/17/2009)
November 23, 2009 Filing 54 Amended Answer and Counterclaims of Defendants Power Ventures, Inc. and Steve Vachani against Facebook, Inc.. Filed bySteven Vachani, Power Ventures, Inc.(a Cayman Island Corporation). (Plutzik, Alan) (Filed on 11/23/2009) Modified on 3/2/2010,(counsel selected incorrect event.) (cv, COURT STAFF).
November 18, 2009 Filing 53 CLERKS NOTICE Case Management Conference set for 1/29/2010 10:30 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2009)
October 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER BY JUDGE JEREMY FOGEL GRANTING 49 MOTION TO DISMISS COUNTER-COMPLAINT AND STRIKE AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND VACATING HEARING DATE. (jflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2009)
October 16, 2009 Filing 51 Reply to Opposition re 49 MOTION to Dismiss COUNTERCLAIMS AND STRIKE AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES Facebook Inc.'s Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss Counterclaims and Strike Affirmative Defenses filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Pers, Jessica) (Filed on 10/16/2009)
October 9, 2009 Filing 50 Memorandum in Opposition Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition to 49 Motion of Facebook, Inc. to Dismiss Counterclaims and Strike Affirmative Defenses filed byPower Ventures, Inc.(a Cayman Island Corporation), Steven Vachani. (Plutzik, Alan) (Filed on 10/9/2009) Modified on 10/13/2009 (gm, COURT STAFF).
September 2, 2009 Filing 49 MOTION to Dismiss COUNTERCLAIMS AND STRIKE AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES filed by Facebook, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 10/30/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Pers, Jessica) (Filed on 9/2/2009)
July 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 48 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND TIME re 44 . Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 7/24/09. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2009)
July 27, 2009 Filing 47 NOTICE of Appearance by I. Neel Chatterjee Notice of Appearance of Counsel (Chatterjee, I.) (Filed on 7/27/2009)
July 24, 2009 Pre ENE phone conference scheduled on 7/30/2009 at 9:00 a.m. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2009)
July 24, 2009 Filing 46 NOTICE of Appearance by Julio Cesar Avalos (Avalos, Julio) (Filed on 7/24/2009)
July 24, 2009 Filing 45 NOTICE of Appearance by I. Neel Chatterjee (Chatterjee, I.) (Filed on 7/24/2009)
July 23, 2009 Filing 44 STIPULATION To Extend Time to Respond and [Proposed] Order by Facebook, Inc.. (Gray, Thomas) (Filed on 7/23/2009)
July 23, 2009 Filing 43 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Thomas J. Gray and [Proposed] Order (Gray, Thomas) (Filed on 7/23/2009)
July 23, 2009 Filing 42 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas J. Gray (Gray, Thomas) (Filed on 7/23/2009)
July 9, 2009 Filing 41 Power Ventures, Inc.'s and Steve Vachani's ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM of Power Ventures, Inc. and Steve Vachani against Facebook, Inc. bySteven Vachani, Power Ventures, Inc.(a California corporation), Power Ventures, Inc.(a Cayman Island Corporation). (Fisher, Lawrence) (Filed on 7/9/2009)
June 10, 2009 Filing 40 Statement Plaintiff Facebook, Inc.'s More Definitive Statement Regarding Count Eight of its Complaint by Facebook, Inc.. (Cutler, Joseph) (Filed on 6/10/2009)
May 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER by Judge Jeremy Fogel denying 17 Motion to Dismiss and granting in part Motion for a more definite statement (jflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2009)
May 8, 2009 Filing 39 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 5/8/2009 before Judge Jeremy Fogel (Date Filed: 5/8/2009) re 17 MOTION to Dismiss. The motion is taken under submission. (Court Reporter Gina Galvan.) (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/8/2009)
May 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER by Judge Jeremy Fogel granting 35 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Scott Bursor (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2009)
May 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER by Judge Jeremy Fogel granting 32 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Joseph P. Cutler (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2009)
May 7, 2009 Filing 35 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for attorney Scott A. Bursor ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611031824.) filed by Power Ventures, Inc.(a Cayman Island Corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(srm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2009)
May 6, 2009 Filing 34 CLERKS NOTICE The Motion Hearing set for 5/8/2009 at 9:00 AM is RESET for 5/8/2009 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2009) Modified on 5/6/2009 (dlm, COURT STAFF).
May 1, 2009 Filing 33 Proposed Order re 32 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 210.00, receipt number 54611005169.) by Facebook, Inc.. (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2009)
May 1, 2009 Filing 32 MOTION for Attorney Joseph P. Cutler for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 210.00, receipt number 54611005169.) filed by Facebook, Inc.. (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2009)
April 24, 2009 Filing 31 Reply Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of ( 17 ) Motion to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, for a more Definite Statement filed byPower Ventures, Inc.(a Cayman Island Corporation), Steven Vachani. (Plutzik, Alan) (Filed on 4/24/2009) Modified text to add linkage on 4/27/2009 (srm, COURT STAFF).
April 17, 2009 Filing 30 Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants Power Ventures, Inc.'s and Steven Vachani's 17 Motion to Dismiss filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Chiappetta, David) (Filed on 4/17/2009) Modified on 4/20/2009 (gm, COURT STAFF).
April 16, 2009 Filing 29 ADR Clerk's Notice Appointing Daralyn Durie as ENE Evaluator. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2009)
April 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 28 SCHEDULING ORDER PURSUANT TO 23 STIPULATION. The Case Management Conference set for 4/17/2009 is VACATED, and will be reset after a ruling on Defendants' pending Motion To Dismiss. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 4/9/2009. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2009)
April 6, 2009 Filing 27 Proposed Order re 23 Stipulation [Proposed] Scheduling Order Pursuant to Stipulation by Power Ventures, Inc.(a Cayman Island Corporation), Steven Vachani. (Plutzik, Alan) (Filed on 4/6/2009)
April 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 26 STIPULATION AND ORDER Selecting ADR Process re 25 , Case referred to Early Neutral Evaluation. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 3/31/09. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2009)
March 25, 2009 Filing 25 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Early Neutral Evaluation by Facebook, Inc. (Chiappetta, David) (Filed on 3/25/2009)
March 25, 2009 Filing 24 *** FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE REFER TO DOCUMENT 25 . *** STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Early Neutral Evaluation by Facebook, Inc., Power Ventures, Inc.(a Cayman Island Corporation), Steven Vachani Correcting Docket Entry #21 (Chiappetta, David) (Filed on 3/25/2009) Modified on 3/26/2009 (feriab, COURT STAFF).
March 25, 2009 Filing 23 STIPULATION by Power Ventures, Inc.(a Cayman Island Corporation), Steven Vachani. (Plutzik, Alan) (Filed on 3/25/2009)
March 25, 2009 Filing 22 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options Defendants Power Ventures, Inc.'s and Steven Vachani's Alternative Dispute Resolution Certification (Plutzik, Alan) (Filed on 3/25/2009)
March 25, 2009 Filing 21 *** FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE REFER TO DOCUMENT 25 . *** STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Early Neutral Evaluation by Facebook, Inc. (Chiappetta, David) (Filed on 3/25/2009) Modified on 3/26/2009 (feriab, COURT STAFF).
March 25, 2009 Filing 20 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Chiappetta, David) (Filed on 3/25/2009)
March 24, 2009 Filing 19 Corrected 18 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of 17 Motion to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, For a More Definite Statement filed byPower Ventures, Inc.(a Cayman Island Corporation), Steven Vachani. (Related document(s) 18 ) (Plutzik, Alan) (Filed on 3/24/2009) Modified on 3/26/2009 (gm, COURT STAFF).
March 23, 2009 Filing 18 Brief re 17 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative, for a More Definite Statement Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, For a More Definite Statement filed byPower Ventures, Inc.(a Cayman Island Corporation), Steven Vachani. (Related document(s) 17 ) (Plutzik, Alan) (Filed on 3/23/2009)
March 23, 2009 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative, for a More Definite Statement filed by Power Ventures, Inc.(a Cayman Island Corporation), Steven Vachani. Motion Hearing set for 5/8/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Plutzik, Alan) (Filed on 3/23/2009)
March 10, 2009 Filing 16 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to Defendant Power Ventures, Inc., a California corporation by Facebook, Inc. (Chiappetta, David) (Filed on 3/10/2009)
March 2, 2009 Filing 15 STIPULATION by Power Ventures, Inc.(a Cayman Island Corporation), Steven Vachani, Power Ventures, Inc.(a California corporation). (Plutzik, Alan) (Filed on 3/2/2009)
February 27, 2009 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Facebook, Inc.. Power Ventures, Inc.(a Cayman Island Corporation) served on 2/11/2009, answer due 3/3/2009. (Chiappetta, David) (Filed on 2/27/2009)
February 19, 2009 Filing 13 CLERKS NOTICE Case Management Conference set for 4/17/2009 10:30 AM. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2009)
January 14, 2009 Filing 12 Summons Issued as to Doe 1. (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2009)
January 14, 2009 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to Steven Vachani. (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2009)
January 14, 2009 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Power Ventures, Inc. a Cayman Island Corporation. (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2009)
January 13, 2009 Filing 9 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Chiappetta, David) (Filed on 1/13/2009) Modified on 1/14/2009 (gm, COURT STAFF).
January 5, 2009 Filing 8 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding trademark (cc: form mailed to register). (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2009)
January 5, 2009 Case Assigned to Judge Richard Seeborg for all discovery matters. (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2009)
December 31, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Hon. Jeremy Fogel for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Wayne D. Brazil no longer assigned to the case. Signed by the Executive Committee on December 31, 2008. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/31/2008)
December 31, 2008 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/31/2008)
December 31, 2008 Filing 5 Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge by Facebook, Inc.. (Chiappetta, David) (Filed on 12/31/2008)
December 30, 2008 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2008)
December 30, 2008 Filing 4 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 4/8/2009. Case Management Conference set for 4/15/2009 04:00 PM. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order)(cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2008)
December 30, 2008 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Power Ventures, Inc. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2008) (kc, COURT STAFF).
December 30, 2008 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Facebook, Inc. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2008) (kc, COURT STAFF).
December 30, 2008 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (with jury demand) against Power Ventures, Inc. (Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 54611004445). Filed by Facebook, Inc. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2008) (kc, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Facebook, Inc. v. Power Ventures, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Facebook, Inc.
Represented By: David P. Chiappetta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Power Ventures, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?