v. Google, Inc. Featured Case

Movant Eric M. Albritton subpoenaed Google, Inc. seeking documents referring or relating to communications regarding Eric M. Albritton, ESN, LLC v. Cisco Systems, Inc., and certain postings on www.trolltracker.blogspot.com.

Respondent: Google, Inc.
Movant: Eric M. Albritton
Case Number: 5:2008mc80153
Filed: August 8, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Presiding Judge: James Ware
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2008 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Cisco Systems, Inc., Richard Frenkel, Mallun Yen, John Noh, Mark Chandler re 15 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion, PROOF OF SERVICE (Holderness, Howard) (Filed on 10/10/2008)
October 10, 2008 Filing 15 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion DEFENDANTS CISCO SYSTEMS, INC., RICHARD FRENKEL, MALLUN YEN, JOHN NOH & NON-PARTY MARK CHANDLER'S NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENA AND MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER filed byCisco Systems, Inc., Richard Frenkel, Mallun Yen, John Noh, Mark Chandler. (Holderness, Howard) (Filed on 10/10/2008)
September 9, 2008 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re: 2 MOTION to Quash, 5 Declaration in Support, 4 Declaration in Support, 6 Proposed Order, 3 Declaration in Support, (Holderness, Howard) (Filed on 9/9/2008) Modified text on 9/26/2008 (cv, COURT STAFF).
September 8, 2008 Set/Reset Deadlines as to 2 Motion to Quash Subpoena; Motion for Protective Order; Opposition brief due by 9/23/2008. Replies due by 9/30/2008. Motion Hearing set for 10/14/2008 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, San Jose. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2008)
September 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER re 2 MOTION to Quash issued to Non-Party Google, Inc., by Eric M. Albritton pending in federal court in Texas and Alternative MOTION for Protective Order; Motion Hearing set for 10/14/2008 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, San Jose. *Counsel are responsible for distributing copies of this document to co-counsel who have not registered for e-filing under the court's CM/ECF program.* Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 9/8/08. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2008) Modified text on 9/26/2008 (cv, COURT STAFF). .
September 5, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Granting 9 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for George L. McWilliams. Signed by Judge James Ware on 9/5/2008. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2008)
September 5, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Granting 7 Motion for Pro Hac Vice of Charles L. Babcock. Signed by Judge James Ware on 9/5/2008. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2008)
September 5, 2008 Filing 10 Proposed Order re 9 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of George L. McWilliams by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2008)
September 5, 2008 Filing 9 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of George L. McWilliams ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 54611003852.) filed by Cisco Systems, Inc., Richard Frenkel, Mallun Yen, John Noh, Mark Chandler. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2008)
September 5, 2008 Filing 8 Proposed Order re 7 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Charles L. Babcock by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2008)
September 5, 2008 Filing 7 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Charles L. Babcock ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 54611003853.) filed by Cisco Systems, Inc., Richard Frenkel, Mallun Yen, John Noh, Mark Chandler. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2008)
September 4, 2008 Filing 6 Proposed Order re 2 MOTION to Quash issued to Non-Party Google, Inc., by Eric M. Albritton pending in federal court in Texas and MOTION for Protective Order; by Cisco Systems, Inc., Richard Frenkel, Mallun Yen, John Noh, Mark Chandler. (Holderness, Howard) (Filed on 9/4/2008) Modified text on 9/26/2008 (cv, COURT STAFF).
September 4, 2008 Filing 5 Declaration of William Friedman in Support of 2 MOTION to Quash Defendants Cisco Systems, Inc., Richard Frenkel, Mallun Yen, John Noh & Non-Party Mark Chandler's Notice of Motion; Motion to Quash Subpoena; Motion for Protective Order; and Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed byCisco Systems, Inc., Richard Frenkel, Mallun Yen, John Noh, Mark Chandler. (Related document(s) 2 ) (Holderness, Howard) (Filed on 9/4/2008)
September 4, 2008 Filing 4 Declaration of Richard Frenkel in Support of 2 MOTION to Quash issued to Non-Party Google, Inc., by Eric M. Albritton pending in federal court in Texas and MOTION for Protective Order; filed by Cisco Systems, Inc., Richard Frenkel, Mallun Yen, John Noh, Mark Chandler. (Related document(s) 2 ) (Holderness, Howard) (Filed on 9/4/2008) Modified text on 9/26/2008 (cv, COURT STAFF).
September 4, 2008 Filing 3 Declaration of Charles L. Babcock in Support of 2 MOTION to Quash issued to Non-Party Google, Inc., by Eric M. Albritton pending in federal court in Texas and MOTION for Protective Order; filed by Cisco Systems, Inc., Richard Frenkel, Mallun Yen, John Noh, Mark Chandler. (Related document(s) 2 ) (Holderness, Howard) (Filed on 9/4/2008) Modified text on 9/26/2008 (cv, COURT STAFF).
September 4, 2008 Filing 2 MOTION to Quash the subpoena issued to Non-Party Google, Inc., by Eric M. Albritton pending in federal court in Texas and MOTION for Protective Order; and Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Cisco Systems, Inc., Richard Frenkel, Mallun Yen, John Noh, Mark Chandler. (Holderness, Howard) (Filed on 9/4/2008) Modified text on 9/26/2008,(counsel failed to select multiple motions.) (cv, COURT STAFF).
August 8, 2008 Filing 1 SUBPOENA issued on the Custodian of Records for Google, Inc requesting production of the documents. Exhibit A attached. by Eric M. Albritton.Receipt number 54611003704. (srm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2008) Modified text on 9/26/2008 (cv, COURT STAFF).
August 8, 2008 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (srm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: v. Google, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Google, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Eric M. Albritton
Represented By: James A Holmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?