Troupe v. Mullen et al
Plaintiff: |
James Clavon Troupe |
Defendant: |
V. Raso, Ben Curry, P. Mullen and Elijah Klein |
Case Number: |
5:2009cv00207 |
Filed: |
January 27, 2009 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Northern District of California |
Office: |
Prisoner: Prison Condition Office |
County: |
Monterey |
Presiding Judge: |
James Ware |
Nature of Suit: |
None |
Cause of Action: |
Federal Question |
Jury Demanded By: |
42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
January 13, 2011 |
Filing
41
Amended WRIT of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum issued to transport Plaintiff for a settlement conference to California State Prison-Solano on February 1, 2011 at 1:00 p.m. Signed by Judge Nandor J. Vadas on January 13, 2011. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (njvlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2011)
|
October 19, 2010 |
Filing
38
ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR PRO SE PRISONER MEDIATION PROCEEDINGS. The Court requests that Judge Vadas complete the mediation on or before 2/11/2011. Signed by Judge James Ware on 10/18/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2010)
|
October 12, 2010 |
Filing
37
ORDER REFERRING CASE TO PRO SE PRISONER MEDIATION PROGRAM; STAYING CASE;INSTRUCTIONS TO CLERK. The clerk shall mail a copy of the court file, including a copy of this order, to Magistrate Judge Vadas in Eureka, California. This action is hereby STAY ED, except to the extent necessary to conduct the mediation proceedings ordered herein, until further order of the court, if necessary, following completion of the mediation proceedings. ***Case stayed. Signed by Judge James Ware on 10/12/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2010)
|
April 12, 2010 |
Filing
8
ORDER OF SERVICE; DIRECTING DEFENDANTS TO FILE DISPOSITIVE MOTION OR NOTICEREGARDING SUCH MOTION; INSTRUCTIONS TO CLERK. The clerk of the Court shall issue summons and the United States Marshal shall serve, without prepayment of fees, a copy of the a mended complaint, (Docket No. 7), all attachments thereto, and a copy of this order upon defendants Elijah Klein, P. Mullen, V. Rasso and Ben Curry at the Correctional Training Facility in Soledad, (P.O. Box 686, Soledad, Ca 93960-0686). Signed by Judge James Ware on 4/8/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2010)
|
May 28, 2009 |
Filing
5
ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH LEAVE TO AMEND within 30 days from the date of this order. Signed by Judge James Ware on 5/19/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2009) Modified on 5/28/2009 (cv, COURT STAFF).
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?