State Farm Life Insurance Company v. Cai et al
Plaintiff: State Farm Life Insurane Company
Defendant: Jason Cai and The Estate of Ying Deng
Case Number: 5:2009cv00396
Filed: January 28, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Interpleader Action
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 270 ORDER. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on October 16, 2014. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2014)
October 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 269 ORDER FOR RELEASE OF FUNDS. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on October 14, 2014. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2014)
October 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 262 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on October 3, 2014. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2014)
October 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 259 FINAL JURY INSTRUCTIONS (ANNOTATED). Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on October 2, 2014. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2014)
October 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 254 PROPOSED FINAL JURY INSTRUCTIONS. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on October 1, 2014. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2014)
September 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 239 ORDER REGARDING FORMER TESTIMONY OF GRACE SHUM. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on September 25, 2014. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2014)
September 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 225 UNANNOTATED PRELIMINARY JURY INSTRUCTIONS. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on September 19, 2014. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2014)
September 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 218 LIST OF PARTIES, ATTORNEYS, LAW FIRMS, POTENTIAL WITNESSES, AND TRIAL DATES (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2014)
September 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 208 ORDER REGARDING LIST OF PARTIES, ATTORNEYS, LAW FIRMS, AND POTENTIAL WITNESSES. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on September 17, 2014. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2014)
September 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 200 ORDER REGARDING EX PARTE COMMUNICATIONS. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on September 16, 2014. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2014)
September 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 197 ORDER RE GRACE SHUM FORMER TESTIMONY. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on September 15, 2014. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2014)
September 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 195 PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on September 12, 2014. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2014)
May 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 116 Case Management Order. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 5/21/2014. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2014)
May 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 112 Order Directing Parties to File a Joint Case Management Statement. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 5/15/2014. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2014)
January 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 99 Order Regarding Filing of Joint Case Management Statement. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 01/03/2014. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2014)
September 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER GRANTING 83 STATE FARMS RENEWED MOTION FOR JUDGMENT IN INTERPLEADER AND GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART STATE FARMS MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2013)
June 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER REGARDING FILING OF CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on June 13, 2013. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2013)
February 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 80 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh denying 78 Motion to Appoint Counsel.(lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2013)
December 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER LIFTING STAY AND SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on December 17, 2012. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2012)
February 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 69 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 68 Motion to Stay.(lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2012)
January 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER Continuing Case Management Conference and Recommending Stipulation of Dismissal. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 1/19/2012. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2012)
April 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER That Case Be Reassigned to a District Court Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 4/6/2010. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2010)
March 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER (1) granting in part 24 request for continuance and (2) setting deadline for consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Consents or declinations due by 3/31/2010. Case management conference continued to 5/25/2010, 1:30 PM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 3/22/2010. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State Farm Life Insurance Company v. Cai et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State Farm Life Insurane Company
Represented By: Robert Reins Pohls
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Cai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Estate of Ying Deng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?