Scott v. Antioch Police Department et al
Plaintiff: Edjuan C. Scott
Defendant: Antioch Police Department and Pittsburg Police Department
Case Number: 5:2009cv00720
Filed: February 18, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Jeremy Fogel
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. The Court DISMISSES this action WITH PREJUDICE for failure to prosecute, and failure to comply with Court orders. The Clerk shall terminate all pending motions, enter judgment and close the file. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 7/17/2012. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2012)
April 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR STAY WITHOUT PREJUDICE re 22 . Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 4/13/11. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2011)
August 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH LEAVE TO AMEND. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 8/9/10. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2010)
May 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 5/18/09. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scott v. Antioch Police Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edjuan C. Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Antioch Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pittsburg Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?