C&C Jewelry Mfg Inc v. Trent West
Plaintiff: C&C Jewelry Mfg Inc
Defendant: Trent West
Counter-claimant: Trent West
Counter-defendant: C&C Jewelry Mfg Inc
Case Number: 5:2009cv01303
Filed: March 25, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Los Angeles
Presiding Judge: James Ware
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 250 STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING Dismissal with prejudice Pursuant to Rules 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) and 41(c) re 249 Stipulation. The Clerk shall close this file. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 1/12/2012. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2012)
November 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 248 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SETTLEMENT. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 1/20/2012 10:00 AM. Show Cause Response due by 1/10/2012. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 11/30/2011. (ejdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2011)
November 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 245 ORDER VACATING 243 ORDER OF DISMISSAL, AND DIRECTING THAT CASE BE REOPENED AND REASSIGNED TO JUDGE EDWARD DAVILA (addressing 244 ). Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 11/28/2011. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2011)
July 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 243 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 7/28/11. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2011)
July 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 240 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING (1) DEADLINE FOR C&C JEWELRY MANUFACTURING, INC. TO RESPOND TO TRENT WEST'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF INFRINGEMENT, AND TRENT WEST'S MOTION FOR PRESUMPTION AND BURDEN SHIFTING AND (2) DEADLINE FOR PARTIES TO FILE DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS re 197 . Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 7/7/11. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2011)
June 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 187 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF PARTIAL DISMISSAL re 180 . Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 6/8/11. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2011)
June 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 186 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd granting in part and denying in part 177 defendant's Motion to Compel Documents. 6/14/2011 hearing is vacated. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2011)
April 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 175 ORDER Vacating Motion Hearing re 165 defendant's motion to compel discovery. Motion deemed submitted without oral argument. 5/3/2011 hearing is vacated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 4/29/2011. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2011)
March 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 164 ORDER DENYING 124 C&C'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND ITS INVALIDITY CONTENTIONS. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 3/4/2011. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2011)
February 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd granting in part and denying in part 112 plaintiff's Motion to Compel Responses to Requests for Admission. 3/1/2011 motion hearing is vacated. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2011)
February 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER GRANTING 153 PLAINTIFF C&C MANUFACTURING, INC.'S UNOPPOSED MOTION TO CHANGE HEARING DATE ON ITS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND INVALIDITY CONTENTIONS. The Motion Hearing set for 2/11/2011 is CONTINUED to 2/25/2011 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Jeremy Fogel. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 2/1/2011. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2011)
December 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 135 STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR ENTRY OF SUBSEQUENT CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULE SETTING CASE SCHEDULE THROUGH TRIAL re 122 . Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 11/23/10. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2010)
December 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER STAYING CASE. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 12/1/2010. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2010)
October 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd granting 107 plaintiff's Motion to Compel Production of Unredacted Licenses. 10/12/2010 hearing is vacated. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2010)
September 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 100 INTERIM ORDER re 99 Plaintiff's Motion to Seal Documents. Defendant to file supporting declaration(s) by 9/15/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 9/8/2010. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2010)
July 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 93 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO ALLOW DEFENDANT TRENT WEST TO SERVE AMENDED DISCLOSURE OF ASSERTED CLAIMS AND INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS ON PLAINTIFF C&C JEWELRY MFG. re 88 . Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 7/8/10. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2010)
July 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER APPROVING 89 JOINT STIPULATION AND REQUEST FOR SUBSEQUENT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE PURSUANT TO CIVIL L.R. 16-10(c). A Further Case Management Conference is set for 7/30/2010 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 7/15/2010. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2010)
July 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER CONSTRUING CLAIMS OF UNITED STATES PATENT NOS. 6,928,734; 6,990,736; 7,032,314; AND 7,076,972. (Also DENYING 80 ). Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 7/6/2010. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2010)
May 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER APPROVING 77 STIPULATION TO MODIFY CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 5/17/2010. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2010)
April 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 76 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO AMEND PLAINTIFF C&C JEWELRY MFG., INC.'S PATENT L.R. 3-3 INVALIDITY CONTENTIONS re 75 . Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 4/15/10. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2010)
March 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 69 AMENDED ORDER REQUESTING FURTHER BRIEFING. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 3/23/10. (jflc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2010)
March 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER REQUESTING FURTHER BRIEFING. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 3/16/2010. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2010)
February 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 51 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO AMEND PLAINTIFF C&C JEWELRY MFG., INC.'S PATENT L.R. 3-3 INVALIDITY CONTENTIONS re 50 . Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 2/5/10. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2010)
January 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER APPROVING 47 STIPULATION TO MODIFY CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 1/7/2010. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2010)
November 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 32 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COUNTS 1, II, AND V re 30 . Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 11/24/09. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2009)
November 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 31 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO MODIFY CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULE re 28 . Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 11/16/09. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2009)
October 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 27 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER (MODIFIED BY THE COURT) re 26 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 10/19/2009. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2009)
August 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER re 22 Substitution of Counsel filed by C&C Jewelry Mfg Inc. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 7/30/09. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: C&C Jewelry Mfg Inc v. Trent West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C&C Jewelry Mfg Inc
Represented By: Raymond Joseph Trojan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trent West
Represented By: Alvin Brock Lindsay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter-claimant: Trent West
Represented By: Alvin Brock Lindsay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter-defendant: C&C Jewelry Mfg Inc
Represented By: Raymond Joseph Trojan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?