Emerging Vision, Inc. et al v. For Eyes Optical Company
Plaintiff: Emerging Vision, Inc. and Sterling Vision of California, Inc.
Defendant: For Eyes Optical Company
Counter-claimant: For Eyes Optical Company
Counter-defendant: Emerging Vision, Inc. and Sterling Vision of California, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2009cv01343
Filed: March 27, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: James Ware
Nature of Suit: Defendant
Cause of Action: 15:1114 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 29 STIPULATION AND ORDER Granting Dismissal with Prejudice Pursuant to FRCP 41 re 26 Stipulation. The Clerk shall close this file. Signed by Judge James Ware on 1/20/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2010)
November 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS re 19 Case Management Statement. The parties may Stipulate to a briefing schedule. However, all briefing shall be completed on or before 1/18/2010. Motion Hearing set for 2/8/2010 09: 00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Preliminary Pretrial Conference statement due 3/12/2010. Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 3/22/2010 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Please see Order for further specifics. Signed by Judge James Ware on 11/3/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2009)
October 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 17 Joint Case Management Statement. Joint Case Management Conference statement due 10/30/2009. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/9/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. James Ware. This is the parties' final continuance as the Court previously granted one for the same purposes. Signed by Judge James Ware on 10/1/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2009)
September 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND ORDER Continuing Case Management Conference from 9/21/2009 to 10/5/2009 re 15 Stipulation. Joint Case Management Conference statement due 9/25/2009. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/5/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. James Ware. Signed by Judge James Ware on 9/16/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2009)
August 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STIPULATION AND ORDER AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT to Continue Case Management Conference from 8/31/2009 to 9/21/2009 re 13 Stipulation. Joint Case Management Conference statement set for 9/11/2009. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/21/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. James Ware. Signed by Judge James Ware on 8/21/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Emerging Vision, Inc. et al v. For Eyes Optical Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emerging Vision, Inc.
Represented By: Todd S. Sharinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sterling Vision of California, Inc.
Represented By: Todd S. Sharinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: For Eyes Optical Company
Represented By: Herbert Teitelbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter-claimant: For Eyes Optical Company
Represented By: Julie Marie McGoldrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter-defendant: Emerging Vision, Inc.
Represented By: Todd S. Sharinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter-defendant: Sterling Vision of California, Inc.
Represented By: Bruce H. Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?