General Retirement System of the City of Detroit v. The Wells Fargo Mortgage Backed Securities 2006-AR18 Trust et al

Plaintiff: General Retirement System of the City of Detroit, New Orleans Employees' Retirement System, Government of Guam Retirement Fund, Alameda County Employees' Retirement Association, Louisiana Sheriffs' Pension and Relief Fund, Plumbers & Steamfitters Local 60 Pension Plan, Southeastern Pennsylvania Transportation Authority, Vermont Pension Investment Committee, Public Employees' Retirement System of Mississippi and Policemen's Annuity & Benefit Fund of the City of Chicago
Defendant: The Wells Fargo Mortgage Backed Securities 2006-AR18 Trust, The Wells Fargo Mortgage Backed Securities 2006-17 Trust, The Wells Fargo Morgage Backed Secuirites 2006-15 Trust, The Wells Fargo Morgage Backed Securities 2006-16 Trust, The Wells Fargo Mortgage Backed Securities 2006-AR19 Trust, The Wells Fargo Mortgage Backed Securities 2006-18 Trust, The Wells Fargo Mortgage Backed Securities 2006-19 Trust, The Wells Fargo Mortgage Backed Securities 2007-1 Trust, The Wells Fargo Alternative Loan 2007-PA1 Trust, The Wells Fargo Mortgage Backed Securities 2007-2 Trust, The Wells Fargo Mortgage Backed Securities 2007-AR3 Trust, The Wells Fargo Mortgage Backed Securities 2007-4 Trust, The Wells Fargo Mortgage Backed Securities 2007-3 Trust, The Wells Fargo Mortgage Backed Securities 2007-5 Trust, The Wells Fargo Mortgage Backed Securities 2007-7 Trust, The Wells Fargo Mortgage Backed Securities 2007-8 Trust, The Wells Fargo Mortgage Backed Securities 2007-9 Trust, The Wells Fargo Mortgage Backed Securities 2007-10 Trust, The Wells Fargo Mortgage Backed Securities 2007-11 Trust, The Wells Fargo Mortgage Backed Securities 2007-12 Trust, Wells Fargo Asset Securities Corporation, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., David Moskowitz, Franklin Codel, Thomas Neary, Douglas K. Johnson, Goldman, Sachs & Co., JPMorgan Chase, Inc., HSBC Securities (USA), Inc., Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc., UBS Securities, LLC, CitiGroup Global Merkets, Inc., Greenwich Capital Markets, Inc., Barclays Capital, Inc., Banc of America Securities, LLC, Bank of America Corporation, Moody's Investor Services, Inc., The McGraw-Hill Companies, The Wells Fargo Mortgage Backed Securities 2006-20 Trust, The Wells Fargo Mortgage Backed Securities 2007-6 Trust, Fitch Ratings, Inc., Credit Suisse Securities (USA), LLC, Bear, Stearns & Co. Inc., Countrywide Securities Corporation, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, RBS Securities, Inc. and Morgan Stanley & Co., Inc.
Movant: Institutional Investor Group, New Orleans Employees' Retirement System, Louisiana Sheriffs' Pension and Relief Fund, Government of Guam Retirement Fund and Alameda County Employees' Retirement Association
Case Number: 5:2009cv01376
Filed: March 27, 2009
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: Lucy H. Koh
Referring Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities/Exchanges
Cause of Action: 15:77
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 30, 2013 480 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 478 Motion for Approval of Distribution Plan.(lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2013)
November 14, 2011 475 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 452 Motion for Attorney Fees and Reimbursement of Litigation Expenses. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2011)
November 9, 2011 471 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 470 Authorizing Publication of Reminders to Submit Claim Forms. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 11/9/11. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2011)
October 13, 2011 466 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 463 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2011)
July 21, 2011 445 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Regarding Edits to Class Notice and Proposed Order. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 7/21/2011. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2011)
June 10, 2011 435 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 400 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting in part and denying in part 405 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting in part and denying in part 422 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting in part and denying in part 430 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2011)
May 24, 2011 421 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Regarding Administrative Motions to Seal, Dkt. Nos. 400 and 405 . Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 5/24/2011. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2011)
May 10, 2011 418 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 417 Request for Leave To File Additional Statement of Recent Decision. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on May 10, 2011. (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2011)
May 2, 2011 398 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 396 Lead Plaintiffs' Request For Leave To File Statement of Recent Decisions. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on May 2, 2011. (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2011)
April 29, 2011 397 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule and Hearing for F.R.C.P. 12(c) Motion. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 4/29/2011. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2011)
April 20, 2011 393 Opinion or Order of the Court Protective ORDER re 392 . Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on April 20, 2011. (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2011).
March 22, 2011 387 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 347 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2011)
March 10, 2011 369 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Regarding Administrative Motion to Seal (Dkt. No. 347). Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 3/10/2011. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2011)
March 3, 2011 364 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re Parties' Proposed Form of Protective Order 305 . Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on March 3, 2011. (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2011)
February 15, 2011 350 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER Shortening Time re 345 . Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on February 15, 2011. (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2011)
January 11, 2011 334 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 333 Stipulated Request to Shorten Time. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on 1/11/11. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 1/11/2011)
December 27, 2010 329 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 302 Motion for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b). (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/27/2010)
November 29, 2010 318 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule for 54(b) Motion. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 11/29/2010. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2010)
November 24, 2010 315 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 307 to Extend Time to Serve Initial Disclosures. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on 11/24/10. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 11/24/2010)
November 22, 2010 309 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 305 Parties' Proposed Form of Protective Order. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on 11/22/10. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 11/22/2010)
October 19, 2010 299 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh Granting Underwriter Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (212); denying (224) Motion to Intervene; denying (255) Motion to Consolidate Cases; denying (276) Motion to Relate Case; Finding as Moot (32) Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel.(lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2010)
October 5, 2010 290 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Regarding Case Management Statement Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 10/05/2010. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2010)
September 22, 2010 271 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 266 Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration.(lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2010)
September 2, 2010 254 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 250 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Judge Lucy H. Koh. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2010)
August 12, 2010 223 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 221 Denying Motion for Administrative Relief. Signed by Judge Koh on August 12, 2010. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2010)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: General Retirement System of the City of Detroit v. The Wells Fargo Mortgage Backed Securities 2006-AR18 Trust et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: General Retirement System of the City of Detroit
Represented By: Francis M. Gregorek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: New Orleans Employees' Retirement System
Represented By: Timothy Alan DeLange
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Government of Guam Retirement Fund
Represented By: Timothy Alan DeLange
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alameda County Employees' Retirement Association
Represented By: Timothy Alan DeLange
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louisiana Sheriffs' Pension and Relief Fund
Represented By: Timothy Alan DeLange
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Plumbers & Steamfitters Local 60 Pension Plan
Represented By: David Ronald Stickney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Southeastern Pennsylvania Transportation Authority
Represented By: David Ronald Stickney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vermont Pension Investment Committee
Represented By: David Ronald Stickney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Public Employees' Retirement System of Mississippi
Represented By: David Ronald Stickney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Policemen's Annuity & Benefit Fund of the City of Chicago
Represented By: Joel P Laitman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Wells Fargo Mortgage Backed Securities 2006-AR18 Trust
Represented By: Marc T. Dworsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Wells Fargo Mortgage Backed Securities 2006-17 Trust
Represented By: Marc T. Dworsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Wells Fargo Morgage Backed Secuirites 2006-15 Trust
Represented By: Marc T. Dworsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Wells Fargo Morgage Backed Securities 2006-16 Trust
Represented By: Marc T. Dworsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Wells Fargo Mortgage Backed Securities 2006-AR19 Trust
Represented By: Marc T. Dworsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Wells Fargo Mortgage Backed Securities 2006-18 Trust
Represented By: Marc T. Dworsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Wells Fargo Mortgage Backed Securities 2006-19 Trust
Represented By: Marc T. Dworsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Wells Fargo Mortgage Backed Securities 2007-1 Trust
Represented By: Marc T. Dworsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Wells Fargo Alternative Loan 2007-PA1 Trust
Represented By: Carolyn Veronica Zabrycki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Wells Fargo Mortgage Backed Securities 2007-2 Trust
Represented By: Marc T. Dworsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Wells Fargo Mortgage Backed Securities 2007-AR3 Trust
Represented By: Marc T. Dworsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Wells Fargo Mortgage Backed Securities 2007-4 Trust
Represented By: Marc T. Dworsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Wells Fargo Mortgage Backed Securities 2007-3 Trust
Represented By: Marc T. Dworsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Wells Fargo Mortgage Backed Securities 2007-5 Trust
Represented By: Marc T. Dworsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Wells Fargo Mortgage Backed Securities 2007-7 Trust
Represented By: Marc T. Dworsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Wells Fargo Mortgage Backed Securities 2007-8 Trust
Represented By: Marc T. Dworsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Wells Fargo Mortgage Backed Securities 2007-9 Trust
Represented By: Marc T. Dworsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Wells Fargo Mortgage Backed Securities 2007-10 Trust
Represented By: Marc T. Dworsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Wells Fargo Mortgage Backed Securities 2007-11 Trust
Represented By: Marc T. Dworsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Wells Fargo Mortgage Backed Securities 2007-12 Trust
Represented By: Marc T. Dworsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Asset Securities Corporation
Represented By: Marc T. Dworsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Marc T. Dworsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Moskowitz
Represented By: David T. Biderman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Franklin Codel
Represented By: Marc T. Dworsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Neary
Represented By: Marc T. Dworsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas K. Johnson
Represented By: Marc T. Dworsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goldman, Sachs & Co.
Represented By: Bruce A. Ericson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase, Inc.
Represented By: Bruce A. Ericson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSBC Securities (USA), Inc.
Represented By: Bruce A. Ericson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc.
Represented By: Bruce A. Ericson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UBS Securities, LLC
Represented By: Bruce A. Ericson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CitiGroup Global Merkets, Inc.
Represented By: Bruce A. Ericson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greenwich Capital Markets, Inc.
Represented By: Bruce A. Ericson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barclays Capital, Inc.
Represented By: Bruce A. Ericson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Banc of America Securities, LLC
Represented By: Bruce A. Ericson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America Corporation
Represented By: Bruce A. Ericson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Moody's Investor Services, Inc.
Represented By: Floyd Abrams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The McGraw-Hill Companies
Represented By: Floyd Abrams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Wells Fargo Mortgage Backed Securities 2006-20 Trust
Represented By: Marc T. Dworsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Wells Fargo Mortgage Backed Securities 2007-6 Trust
Represented By: Marc T. Dworsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fitch Ratings, Inc.
Represented By: Floyd Abrams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Credit Suisse Securities (USA), LLC
Represented By: Bruce A. Ericson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bear, Stearns & Co. Inc.
Represented By: Bruce A. Ericson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Countrywide Securities Corporation
Represented By: Bruce A. Ericson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated
Represented By: Bruce A. Ericson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RBS Securities, Inc.
Represented By: Bruce A. Ericson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morgan Stanley & Co., Inc.
Represented By: Bruce A. Ericson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Institutional Investor Group
Represented By: Erik David Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: New Orleans Employees' Retirement System
Represented By: David Ronald Stickney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Louisiana Sheriffs' Pension and Relief Fund
Represented By: Timothy Alan DeLange
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Government of Guam Retirement Fund
Represented By: Timothy Alan DeLange
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Alameda County Employees' Retirement Association
Represented By: Timothy Alan DeLange
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?