Yingling et al v. eBay, Inc.
Plaintiff: Brice Yingling doing business as Alamo Autosports and Andy Scott
Defendant: eBay, Inc.
Not Classified By Court: Joseph Balla
Case Number: 5:2009cv01733
Filed: April 21, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Edward J Davila
Referring Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2013. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 243 ORDER granting #237 Motion Administrative Motion for Approval of Cy Pres Distributions, Approval of Final Accounting; Termination of Settlement Administration, and Discharge of Class Counsel, Plaintiffs, and Settlement Administrator. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 8/30/2013. (ejdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2013)
August 30, 2013 Filing 242 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 8/30/2013 before Edward J. Davila (Date Filed: 8/30/2013) re #237 MOTION Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion for Approval of Cy Pres Distributions, Approval of Final Accounting; Termination of Settlement Administration, and Discharge of Class Counsel, Plaintiffs, and Settlement Administrator from Further Duties i filed by Andy Scott, Brice Yingling. The Court to issue further Order following hearing. (Court Reporter Irene Rodriguez.) (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/30/2013)
August 20, 2013 Filing 241 CLERKS NOTICE ADVANCING Motion Hearing. Set/Reset Deadlines as to #237 MOTION Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion for Approval of Cy Pres Distributions, Approval of Final Accounting; Termination of Settlement Administration, and Discharge of Class Counsel, Plaintiffs, and Settlement Administrator from Further Duties: Motion Hearing set for 8/30/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2013)
July 2, 2013 Filing 240 CLERKS NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing. Set/Reset Deadlines as to #237 MOTION Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion for Approval of Cy Pres Distributions, Approval of Final Accounting; Termination of Settlement Administration, and Discharge of Class Counsel, Plaintiffs, and Settlement Administrator from Further Duties: Motion Hearing set for 9/6/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2013)
June 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 239 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. Edward J. Davila for all further proceedings. Judge James Ware no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Judge Executive Committee on 6/24/2013. (sp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2013)
May 13, 2013 Filing 238 Statement of Non-Opposition to Plaintiff's re: #237 Administrative Motion filed by eBay, Inc.. (Penning, James) (Filed on 5/13/2013) Modified text on 6/24/2013,(to conform with document posted by counsel.) (cv, COURT STAFF).
May 8, 2013 Filing 237 MOTION Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion for Approval of Cy Pres Distributions, Approval of Final Accounting; Termination of Settlement Administration, and Discharge of Class Counsel, Plaintiffs, and Settlement Administrator from Further Duties in Connection Therewith filed by Andy Scott, Brice Yingling. Responses due by 5/22/2013. Replies due by 5/29/2013. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Verkhovskaya Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Verges, Keith) (Filed on 5/8/2013)
April 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 236 ORDER by Judge James Ware granting #235 Motion for Reconsideration (jwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2012)
April 13, 2012 Filing 235 MOTION for Reconsideration re #234 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief filed by eBay, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Amended Order)(Penning, James) (Filed on 4/13/2012)
April 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 234 ORDER by Chief Judge James Ware granting #233 Motion Regarding Additional Efforts to Locate Class Members and Distribute Settlement Funds (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2012)
April 10, 2012 Filing 233 MOTION (ADMINISTRATIVE) Re Additional Efforts to Locate Class Members and Distribute Settlement Funds filed by Andy Scott, Brice Yingling. Responses due by 4/16/2012. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Young, Parker) (Filed on 4/10/2012)
September 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 232 ORDER of USCA STIPULATED MOTION TO DISMISS - This order served on the district court shall act as and for the mandate of this court. re: #219 Notice of Appeal (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2011) Modified text on 6/24/2013 (cv, COURT STAFF).
August 5, 2011 Filing 231 AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #218 Judgment, #228 Order on Motion for Bond by Joseph Balla. Filing fee $ 455. Appeal Record due by 9/6/2011. (Palmer, Joseph) (Filed on 8/5/2011)
August 4, 2011 Filing 230 Transcript of Proceedings held on 12/20/2010, before Judge Ware. Court Reporter/Transcriber Irene L. Rodriguez, Telephone number (408)947-8160. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 8/25/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/6/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/2/2011. (Rodriguez, Irene) (Filed on 8/4/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 229 TRANSCRIPT DESIGNATION AND ORDERING FORM by Andy Scott, Brice Yingling for proceedings held on 12/20/10 and 03/28/11 before Judge Ware.. (Verges, Keith) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 228 ORDER by Judge James Ware granting #220 Motion for Bond (jwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2011)
June 3, 2011 Filing 227 Certificate of Record forwarded to USCA re appeal #219 Notice of Appeal : (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2011)
June 1, 2011 Filing 226 Transcript of Proceedings held on March 28, 2011, before Judge James Ware. Court Reporter/Transcriber Georgina Galvan Colin, Telephone number (408) 888-6697. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/30/2011. (mz, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2011)
May 23, 2011 Filing 225 Opposition of Objector Joseph Balla to Request for Appellate Bond w/Exhibit 1 - Joseph Balla's Evidentiary Objections and [Proposed] Order Sustaining and /or Overruling Objections filed by Joseph Balla. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Palmer, Joseph) (Filed on 5/23/2011) Modified on 6/24/2013 (cv, COURT STAFF).
May 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 224 ORDER by Judge James Ware granting #221 Motion to Expedite (jwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2011)
May 13, 2011 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #220 MOTION for Bond Notice of Motion and Motion for Appeal Bond Pursuant to Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 7. Opposition of Objector Balla due by 5/23/2011. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2011)
May 4, 2011 Filing 223 Transcript Designation and Ordering Form for proceedings held on 03/28/2011 before Judge James Ware, re #222 USCA Case Number,, #219 Notice of Appeal Transcript due by 6/3/2011. (Palmer, Joseph) (Filed on 5/4/2011)
April 26, 2011 Filing 222 USCA Case Number 11-16033 9th Circuit Court of Appeals. The schedule is set as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 05/03/2011. Transcript ordered by 05/04/2011. Transcript due 06/03/2011. Appellant Joseph Balla opening brief due 07/13/2011. Appellee Ebay, Inc., Appellee Andy Scott and Appellee Brice Yingling answering brief due 08/12/2011. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 14 days after service of the answering brief for #219 Notice of Appeal filed by Joseph Balla. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2011)
April 25, 2011 Filing 221 MOTION to Expedite Hearing on Plaintiffs' #220 Motion for Appeal Bond Pursuant to Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 7 filed by Andy Scott, Brice Yingling. Motion Hearing set for 7/11/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. James Ware. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Doc. 220)(Verges, Keith) (Filed on 4/25/2011) Modified on 4/25/2011 (cv, COURT STAFF).
April 25, 2011 Filing 220 MOTION for Bond Notice of Motion and Motion for Appeal Bond Pursuant to Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 7 filed by Andy Scott, Brice Yingling. Motion Hearing set for 7/11/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. James Ware. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Verges, Keith) (Filed on 4/25/2011)
April 4, 2011 Filing 219 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #218 Judgment by Joseph Balla. Filing fee $ 455 receipt number 34611058196. Appeal Record due by 5/4/2011. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit copy of receipt)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2011)
March 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 218 FINAL ORDER AND JUDGMENT. The Clerk shall close this file. Signed by Judge James Ware on 3/31/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2011)
March 28, 2011 Filing 217 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 3/28/2011 before Judge James Ware (Date Filed: 3/28/2011) re #213 MOTION for Settlement (Motion for Order Finally Approving Class Action Settlement, #211 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Expenses and Class Representative Incentive Compensation Awards. The Court took the matter under submission after oral argument. The Court to issue further Order following hearing. (Court Reporter Gina Colin.) (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/28/2011)
March 25, 2011 Filing 216 NOTICE by Andy Scott, Brice Yingling re #215 Order, Notice of Filing Revised Final Order and Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - [Proposed] Final Order and Judgment, #2 Exhibit A - List of Excluded Class Members)(Verges, Keith) (Filed on 3/25/2011)
March 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 215 ORDER REQUESTING REVISED FINAL APPROVAL ORDER AND JUDGMENT. Accordingly, on or before March 25, 2011, the parties shall file a Revised Proposed Final Order and Judgment adjusting the language in paragraph 15. Please see Order for further specifics as to Reviewd Proposed Order. Signed by Judge James Ware on March 24, 2011. (jwlc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2011) Modified text on 3/24/2011 (ecg, COURT STAFF).
March 7, 2011 Filing 214 REPLY (re #213 MOTION for Settlement (Motion for Order Finally Approving Class Action Settlement and Memorandum of Points and Authorities)filed by Andy Scott, Brice Yingling. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Verges, Keith) (Filed on 3/7/2011) Modified on 3/7/2011 (cv, COURT STAFF).
February 21, 2011 Filing 213 MOTION for Settlement (Motion for Order Finally Approving Class Action Settlement and Memorandum of Points and Authorities) filed by Andy Scott, Brice Yingling. Motion Hearing set for 3/28/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. James Ware. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Keith Verges, #2 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Michelle M. La Count, #3 Exhibit 3 - List of Excluded Class Members, #4 Exhibit 4 - Objection to Settlement (Graeser), #5 Proposed Order Text of Proposed Order)(Verges, Keith) (Filed on 2/21/2011)
February 14, 2011 Filing 212 OBJECTIONS to re #211 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Expenses and Class Representative Incentive Compensation Awards, and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof Objection of Joseph Balla to Proposed Settlement and Notice of Intent to Appear by Joseph Balla. (Palmer, Joseph) (Filed on 2/14/2011)
February 4, 2011 Filing 211 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Expenses and Class Representative Incentive Compensation Awards, and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Andy Scott, Brice Yingling. Motion Hearing set for 3/28/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. James Ware. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit /Declaration of Keith Verges, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Keith Verges, #3 Exhibit B to Declaration of Keith Verges, #4 Exhibit C to Declaration of Keith Verges)(Young, Parker) (Filed on 2/4/2011)
December 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 210 ORDER by Judge James Ware granting #205 Motion for Settlement (jwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2010)
December 21, 2010 Filing 209 [Proposed] Preliminarily Approving Proposed Settlement by eBay, Inc.. (Penning, James) (Filed on 12/21/2010) Modified on 12/21/2010 (cv, COURT STAFF).
December 20, 2010 Filing 208 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 12/20/2010 before Judge James Ware (Date Filed: 12/20/2010) re #205 Joint MOTION for Settlement - Preliminary Approval. The Court took the matter under submission after oral argument. The Court to issue further Order following hearing. (Court Reporter Irene Rodriguez.) (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/20/2010)
December 20, 2010 Filing 207 *** DUPLICATE FILING, PLEASE SEE #208 *** Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 12/20/2010 before Judge James Ware (Date Filed: 12/20/2010) re #205 Joint MOTION for Settlement. The Court took the matter under submission after oral argument. The Court to issue further Order following hearing. (Court Reporter Irene Rodriguez.) (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/20/2010) Modified text on 12/21/2010 (ecg, COURT STAFF).
December 15, 2010 Filing 206 Proposed Preliminarily Approving Settlement Order re #205 Joint MOTION for Settlement by Andy Scott, Brice Yingling, eBay, Inc.. (Walker, Raymond) (Filed on 12/15/2010) Modified on 12/15/2010 (cv, COURT STAFF).
December 14, 2010 Filing 205 Joint MOTION for an Order Preliminarily Approving Class Action Settlement filed by Andy Scott, Brice Yingling, eBay, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 12/20/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Walker, Raymond) (Filed on 12/14/2010) Modified on 12/15/2010 (cv, COURT STAFF).
December 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 204 ORDER REQUESTING AMENDED PROPOSED ORDER RE: PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS SETTLEMENT. Upon review, the Court finds the parties' submission insufficient, as the parties have failed to identify a Claims Administrator. Thus, on or before December 15, 2010 at 12 p.m., the parties shall submit an Amended Proposed Order for Preliminary Approval that includes the name of their elected Claims Administrator. Further, the Court finds that the parties' proposed date for the Final Fairness Hearing comports with the Court's calendar. Accordingly, in their Amended Proposed Order, the parties shall also include a revised schedule based on the confirmed Final Fairness Hearing date set for March 14, 2011 at 9 a.m. Signed by Judge James Ware on 12/14/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2010) Modified on 12/15/2010 (cv, COURT STAFF).
December 13, 2010 Filing 203 CLERK'S NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re #202 Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2010)
December 10, 2010 Filing 202 NOTICE by Andy Scott, Brice Yingling, eBay, Inc. re #201 Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings, Terminate Deadlines, Terminate Deadlines and Hearings, Terminate Hearings, Terminate Scheduling Order Deadlines, Terminate Trial Management Order Deadlines,,,,,,,,,,,,,, Joint Notice of Motion and Motion for Order (1) Preliminarily Approving Class Action Settlement; (2) Authorizing Distribution of Notice of Settlement; and (3) Setting a Schedule for the Final Approval Process; Memorandum of Points and Authorities (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Settlement Agreement, #2 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Keith Verges)(Verges, Keith) (Filed on 12/10/2010)
December 6, 2010 Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal for all discovery purposes. Magistrate Judge Patricia V. Trumbull no longer assigned to the case. (sp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2010)
November 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 201 ORDER VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; SETTING HEARING FOR PRELIMINARYAPPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT. The parties shall file their Joint Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Settlement supported by appropriate declarations AND Proposed Order for Preliminary Approval of Class Settlement due by 12/10/2010. Preliminary Approval of Class Settlement Hearing set for 12/20/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom No. 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Final Fairness Hearing set for 3/14/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom No. 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Please see Order for further specifics. Signed by Judge James Ware on 11/16/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2010)
November 15, 2010 Filing 200 STATUS REPORT REGARDING SETTLEMENT (JOINT) by Andy Scott, Brice Yingling, eBay, Inc.. (Verges, Keith) (Filed on 11/15/2010)
October 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 199 ORDER of USCA filed (DIARMUID F. O'SCANNLAIN and WILLIAM A. FLETCHER) The court, in its discretion, denies the petition for permission to appeal the district courts #185 July 16, 2010 order granting class action certification. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 23(f); Chamberlan v. Ford Motor Co., 402 F.3d 952 (9th Cir. 2005) (per curiam) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2010)
October 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 198 ORDER Granting Continuance of Status Conference re #197 Stipulation. Joint Status Report due by 11/15/2010. Status Conference set for 11/22/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge James Ware on 10/14/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2010)
October 8, 2010 Filing 197 STIPULATION Joint Update on Mediation Status; Request to Reschedule Status Conference; and [Proposed] Order by eBay, Inc.. (Penning, James) (Filed on 10/8/2010)
September 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 196 STIPULATION AND ORDER AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT GRANTING STIPULATION to Stay Litigation; Setting Status Heairng re #195 Stipulation. Joint Status Statement due by 11/5/2010. Status Conference set for 11/15/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge James Ware on 9/2/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2010)
August 27, 2010 Filing 195 RENEWED STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER FOR STAY IN LITIGATION by eBay, Inc.. (Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 8/27/2010) Modified on 8/30/2010 (cv, COURT STAFF).
August 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 194 ORDER DENYING STIPULATION FOR STAY IN LITIGATION WITHOUT PREJUDICE re #193 Stipulation filed by eBay, Inc. The Court DENIES the parties' Stipulation for a Stay in the Litigation without prejudice to renew based on the anticipated mediation. Any renewed stipulation shall clearly set forth the parties' agreed upon schedule for mediation. Signed by Judge James Ware on 8/20/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2010)
August 18, 2010 Filing 193 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order for Stay in Litigation by eBay, Inc.. (Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 8/18/2010)
August 2, 2010 Filing 192 USCA Order FILED ON 07/30/2010 PETITION FOR PERMISSION TO APPEAL PURSUANT TO RULE 23(f) +1 APPENDIXES IN SUPPORT. SERVED ON 07/30/2010. Case Number 10-80153 9th Circuit Court of Appeals (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2010)
July 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 191 ORDER MODIFYING CLASS END PERIOD; REQUESTING SUBMISSION OF PROPOSED FORM OF CLASS NOTICE AND DISSEMINATION FOR COURTS APPROVAL re #185 Order on Motion to Certify Class. On or before August 30, 2010, the parties shall file a proposed form of class notice and a joint proposal for dissemination of notice for the Court's approval. Signed by Judge James Ware on July 27, 2010. (jwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2010) Modified text on 7/29/2010 (cv, COURT STAFF). Modified text on 8/4/2010 (ecg, COURT STAFF).
July 23, 2010 Filing 190 EXHIBIT C (Copy of Transcript) in Support of Plaintiff's #180 Motion for Class Certification filed by Andy Scott, Brice Yingling. (Walker, Raymond) (Filed on 7/23/2010) Modified on 7/26/2010 (cv, COURT STAFF).
July 23, 2010 Filing 189 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #172 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits Filed Under Seal in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification by Andy Scott, Brice Yingling. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-8 to Motion for Class Certification, #2 Exhibit A-9 to Motion for Class Certification, #3 Exhibit C to Motion for Class Certification, #4 Exhibit C-1 to Motion for Class Certification, #5 Exhibit C-2 to Motion for Class Certification, #6 Exhibit C-3 to Motion for Class Certification, #7 Exhibit C-4 to Motion for Class Certification, #8 Exhibit I to Motion for Class Certification)(Walker, Raymond) (Filed on 7/23/2010)
July 23, 2010 Filing 188 Brief re #185 Order on Motion to Certify Class,,,,, Plaintiffs' Post-Certification Brief Regarding End Date of Class Period filed byAndy Scott, Brice Yingling. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Keith Verges)(Related document(s) #185 ) (Verges, Keith) (Filed on 7/23/2010)
July 23, 2010 Filing 187 Declaration of Whitty Somvichian in Support of #186 Brief eBay Inc.'s Supplemental Briefing in connection with Plaintiffs' Class Certification Motion filed byeBay, Inc.. (Related document(s) #186 ) (Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 7/23/2010)
July 23, 2010 Filing 186 Brief re #116 Memorandum in Opposition eBay's Supplemental Briefing in Connection with Plaintiffs' Class Certification Motion filed byeBay, Inc.. (Related document(s) #116 ) (Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 7/23/2010)
July 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 185 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION re #165 Motion to Certify Class; #180 Motion to Certify Class. Accordingly, on or before 7/23/2010, the parties shall each submit additional briefing not to exceed five pages. Upon completion of the supplemental briefing, the Court will consider any modification and set a deadline for the parties to file a proposed form of class notice and a joint proposal for dissemination of notice. Signed on 7/16/2010. (jwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2010) Modified on 7/19/2010 (ecg, COURT STAFF).
July 14, 2010 Filing 184 Transcript of Proceedings held on 07/12/2010, before Judge Ware. Court Reporter/Transcriber Irene L. Rodriguez, Telephone number (408)947-8160. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 8/4/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/16/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/12/2010. (Rodriguez, Irene) (Filed on 7/14/2010)
July 12, 2010 Filing 183 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 7/12/2010 before Judge James Ware (Date Filed: 7/12/2010) re #180 MOTION to Certify Class, #165 MOTION to Certify Class. The Court took the matter under submission after oral argument. The Court to issue further Order following hearing. (Court Reporter Irene Rodriguez.) (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/12/2010)
July 9, 2010 Filing 182 ERRATA re #180 MOTION to Certify Class Replacement - Table of Contents by Andy Scott, Brice Yingling. (Verges, Keith) (Filed on 7/9/2010)
July 6, 2010 Filing 181 Appendix re #179 Order, in Support of Class Certification filed byAndy Scott, Brice Yingling. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Declaration of R Walker, #2 Exhibit B Deposition of A Williams, #3 Exhibit C Filed Under Seal, #4 Exhibit D Deposition of R Bosch, #5 Exhibit E Deposition of G Ye, #6 Exhibit F Deposition of S Wai, #7 Exhibit G Deposition of R Gundmundsson, #8 Exhibit H Expert Report of G Durham, #9 Exhibit I Filed Under Seal in part, #10 Exhibit J Deposition of A Scott, #11 Exhibit K 1 Deposition of B Yingling, #12 Exhibit K 2 Deposition of B Yingling, #13 Exhibit K 3 Deposition of B Yingling, #14 Exhibit L Deposition of N King, #15 Exhibit M Declaration of K Verges)(Related document(s) #179 ) (Walker, Raymond) (Filed on 7/6/2010)
July 6, 2010 Filing 180 MOTION to Certify Class filed by Andy Scott, Brice Yingling. Motion Hearing set for 7/12/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Walker, Raymond) (Filed on 7/6/2010)
June 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 179 ORDER RE: STIPULATION REQUESTING CLARIFICATION OF SEALING ORDER, REQUEST TO EXTEND FILING DEADLINE re #170 Stipulation, #178 Statement. On or before 7/6/2010, Plaintiffs shall file a revised redacted version of their Motion for Class Certification and their Appendix in support of the Motion. Please see Order for further specifics. Signed by Judge James Ware on 6/30/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2010)
June 21, 2010 Filing 178 Joint Statement of Sealing Order Issues for Clarification and [Proposed] Order related document #170 Stipulation of clarification by eBay, Inc.. (Penning, James) (Filed on 6/21/2010) Modified on 6/22/2010 (cv, COURT STAFF). Modified on 6/22/2010 (cv, COURT STAFF).
June 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 177 ORDER by Judge James Ware granting #105 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages (jwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2010)
June 15, 2010 Filing 176 STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d filed byeBay, Inc.. (Related document(s) #116 ) (Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 6/15/2010)
June 15, 2010 Filing 175 AMENDED CLERK'S NOTICE Retrieval of Submitted Documents (srm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2010)
June 15, 2010 Filing 174 CLERK'S NOTICE Retrieval of Submitted Documents (srm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2010)
June 14, 2010 Filing 173 Reply Memorandum re #165 MOTION to Certify Class Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Motion for Class Certification filed byAndy Scott, Brice Yingling. (Verges, Keith) (Filed on 6/14/2010)
June 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 172 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO SEAL REPLY by Judge James Ware denying #149 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (jwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2010)
June 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 171 ORDER DENYING AS MOOT PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO EXCLUDE; ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL; AND ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR SANCTIONS by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull denying #147 Motion to Exclude, Compel, and for Sanctions (pvtlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2010)
June 4, 2010 Filing 170 STIPULATION Requesting Clarification of Sealing Order, Request to Extend Filing Deadline and [Proposed] Order by eBay, Inc.. (Penning, James) (Filed on 6/4/2010)
June 2, 2010 Filing 169 CLERKS NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing re #165 Motion for Class Certification. Motion Hearing set for 7/12/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2010)
June 2, 2010 Filing 168 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #150 Objection Ebay Inc.'s Response to Plaintiffs' Objections to Evidence In Support of eBay's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion For Class Certification filed byeBay, Inc.. (Related document(s) #150 ) (Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 6/2/2010)
June 1, 2010 Filing 167 RESPONSE in Support re #147 MOTION to Excluding certain evidence filed byAndy Scott, Brice Yingling. (Walker, Raymond) (Filed on 6/1/2010)
May 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 164 ORDER RE: ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION RE: FILING DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL by Judge James Ware granting #106 Motion to Seal (jwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2010)
May 25, 2010 Filing 163 Declaration of BENJAMIN F. CHAPMAN in Support of #157 Memorandum in Opposition eBay Inc.'s Opposition To Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude, Compel, and For Sanctions filed byeBay, Inc.. (Related document(s) #157 ) (Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 5/25/2010)
May 25, 2010 Filing 162 Declaration of STEVE ADAMS in Support of #157 Memorandum in Opposition eBay Inc.'s Opposition To Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude, Compel, and For Sanctions filed byeBay, Inc.. (Related document(s) #157 ) (Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 5/25/2010)
May 25, 2010 Filing 161 Declaration of LISSA RIGGS in Support of #157 Memorandum in Opposition eBay Inc.'s Opposition To Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude, Compel, and For Sanctions filed byeBay, Inc.. (Related document(s) #157 ) (Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 5/25/2010)
May 25, 2010 Filing 160 Declaration of BILL REVENE in Support of #157 Memorandum in Opposition eBay Inc.'s Opposition To Plaintiffs' Motion To Exclude, Compel, and For Sanctions filed byeBay, Inc.. (Related document(s) #157 ) (Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 5/25/2010)
May 25, 2010 Filing 159 Declaration of FAMOUS RHODES in Support of #157 Memorandum in Opposition eBay Inc.'s Opposition To Plaintiffs' Motion to exclude, Compel, and For Sanctions filed byeBay, Inc.. (Related document(s) #157 ) (Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 5/25/2010)
May 25, 2010 Filing 158 Declaration of WHITTY SOMVICHIAN in Support of #157 Memorandum in Opposition eBay Inc.'s Opposition To Plaintiffs' Motion To Exclude, Compel, and For Sanctions filed byeBay, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Related document(s) #157 ) (Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 5/25/2010)
May 25, 2010 Filing 157 Memorandum in Opposition re #147 MOTION to Excluding certain evidence eBay's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude, Compel, and For Sanctions filed byeBay, Inc.. (Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 5/25/2010)
May 21, 2010 Filing 156 Declaration of EDWARD TORPOCO in Support of #149 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Part of Plaintiff's Reply in Support of Class Certification filed byeBay, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-8 thru A-9, #2 Exhibit C)(Related document(s) #149 ) (Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 5/21/2010)
May 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO SHORTEN TIME by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull denying #148 Motion Shorten Time on Motion to Compel (pvtlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2010)
May 20, 2010 Filing 154 Response to Plaintiffs' Reply on Administrative Motion to Expedite Hearing on Their Motion to Exclude, Compel, and For Sanctions filed by eBay, Inc.. (Related document(s) #153 ) (Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 5/20/2010) Modified on 5/20/2010,(counsel selected incorrect event.) (cv, COURT STAFF).
May 19, 2010 Filing 153 REPLY in support of #148 Administrative Motion to Expedite Hearing on Their Motion to Exclude Compel and for Sanctions filed by Andy Scott, Brice Yingling. (Verges, Keith) (Filed on 5/19/2010) Modified on 5/20/2010 (cv, COURT STAFF).
May 18, 2010 Filing 152 Declaration of WHITTY SOMVICHIAN in Support of #151 Memorandum in Opposition eBay Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion To Expedite Hearing on Their Motion To Exclude, Compel, and For Sanctions filed byeBay, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #151 ) (Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 5/18/2010)
May 18, 2010 Filing 151 Memorandum in Opposition re #148 Administrative Motion to Expedite Hearing on Their Motion to Exclude Compel and for Sanctions filed byeBay, Inc.. (Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 5/18/2010)
May 17, 2010 Filing 150 OBJECTIONS to evidence in support of re #116 Memorandum in Opposition to plaintiffs' motion for class certification by Andy Scott, Brice Yingling. (Walker, Raymond) (Filed on 5/17/2010) Modified on 5/17/2010 (cv, COURT STAFF).
May 17, 2010 Filing 149 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions Reply in Support of Class Certification filed by Andy Scott, Brice Yingling. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Re Administrative Motion to File Under Seal)(Walker, Raymond) (Filed on 5/17/2010) Modified on 5/17/2010 (cv, COURT STAFF).
May 14, 2010 Filing 148 Administrative Motion to Expedite Hearing on Their #147 Motion to Exclude Compel and for Sanctions filed by Andy Scott, Brice Yingling. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration in Support, #2 Proposed Order on Motion to Expedite)(Walker, Raymond) (Filed on 5/14/2010) Modified on 5/14/2010 (cv, COURT STAFF).
May 11, 2010 Filing 147 MOTION to Excluding certain evidence and MOTION Compelling production of certain data, and MOTION for sanctions against defendant filed by Andy Scott, Brice Yingling. Motion Hearing set for 6/15/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Plaintiffs Motion to Exclude Compel and For Sanctions)(Walker, Raymond) (Filed on 5/11/2010) Modified on 5/12/2010,(counsel failed to properly select multiple motions.) (cv, COURT STAFF).
May 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER Granting #134 Motion to Seal. Signed by Judge James Ware 5/6/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2010)
May 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER Granting #114 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge James Ware on 5/5/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2010)
May 4, 2010 Filing 146 EXHIBIT E- L is a video file of K. Cooke Declaration - #124 , #125 #126 ( UNDER SEAL) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2010) Modified text on 9/13/2010 (cv, COURT STAFF). Modified on 9/13/2010 (cv, COURT STAFF).
May 4, 2010 Filing 145 EXHIBIT C.(UNDER SEAL) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2010) (bwS, COURT STAFF).
May 4, 2010 Filing 144 EXHIBIT B (UNDER SEAL). (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2010)
May 4, 2010 Filing 143 EXHIBIT A (UNDER SEAL). (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2010) (bwS, COURT STAFF).
May 4, 2010 Filing 142 Declaration (UNDER SEAL). (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2010) (bwS, COURT STAFF).
May 4, 2010 Filing 141 Declaration (UNDER SEAL). (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2010) (bwS, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/21/2017: #1 141) (bwS, COURT STAFF).
May 4, 2010 Filing 140 Declaration (UNDER SEAL). (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2010) (bwS, COURT STAFF).
May 4, 2010 Filing 139 Declaration (UNDER SEAL) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2010) (bwS, COURT STAFF).
May 4, 2010 Filing 138 Memorandum in Opposition (UNDER SEAL) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2010) (bwS, COURT STAFF).
May 4, 2010 Received Document Opposition (submitted) under seal. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2010)
May 4, 2010 Received Document Declaration (submitted) under seal. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2010)
May 4, 2010 Received Document Exhibit (submitted) under seal. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2010)
May 3, 2010 Filing 135 Declaration of EDWARD TORPOCO in Support of #134 MOTION to Seal portions of oppositions and declarations filed by e Bay, Inc.. (Related document(s) #134 ) (Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 5/3/2010) Modified on 5/4/2010 (cv, COURT STAFF).
May 3, 2010 Filing 134 Administrative MOTION to Seal Portions of the Oppositions and Declarations under seal. filed by eBay, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 5/3/2010) Modified on 5/4/2010,(counsel selected incorrect event.) (cv, COURT STAFF).
May 3, 2010 Filing 133 Declaration of BENJAMIN F. CHAPMAN in Support of #116 Memorandum in Opposition filed byeBay, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Related document(s) #116 ) (Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 5/3/2010)
May 3, 2010 Filing 132 EXHIBITS re #131 Declaration in Support, Exhibit E to Thomas Declaration filed byeBay, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit F, #2 Exhibit G, #3 Exhibit H, #4 Exhibit I)(Related document(s) #131 ) (Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 5/3/2010)
May 3, 2010 Filing 131 Declaration of MATTHEW DONALD THOMAS in Support of #116 Memorandum in Opposition filed byeBay, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Related document(s) #116 ) (Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 5/3/2010)
May 3, 2010 Filing 130 Declaration of ALONZO BERNARD WILLIAMS in Support of #116 Memorandum in Opposition filed byeBay, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Related document(s) #116 ) (Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 5/3/2010)
May 3, 2010 Filing 129 Declaration of GANG YE in Support of #116 Memorandum in Opposition filed byeBay, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Related document(s) #116 ) (Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 5/3/2010)
May 3, 2010 Filing 128 EXHIBITS re #127 Declaration in Support Exhibit D to Bosch Declaration filed byeBay, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit E, #2 Exhibit F, #3 Exhibit G)(Related document(s) #127 ) (Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 5/3/2010)
May 3, 2010 Filing 127 Declaration of RITA BOSCH in Support of #116 Memorandum in Opposition filed byeBay, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Related document(s) #116 ) (Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 5/3/2010)
May 3, 2010 Filing 126 EXHIBIT L re #123 Declaration in Support Exhibit L (NOTIFICATION OF MANUAL FILING) to Cooke Declaration filed by eBay, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit M, #2 Exhibit N)(Related document(s) #123 ) (Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 5/3/2010) Modified on 5/4/2010 (cv, COURT STAFF). Modified on 5/4/2010 (cv, COURT STAFF).
May 3, 2010 Filing 125 EXHIBITS re #123 Declaration in Support Exhibit H to Cooke Declaration filed by eBay, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit I, #2 Exhibit J, # (3) Exhibit K NOTIFICATION OF MANUAL FILING) (under seal)(Related document(s) #123 ) (Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 5/3/2010) Modified on 5/4/2010 (cv, COURT STAFF). Modified on 5/4/2010 (cv, COURT STAFF).
May 3, 2010 Filing 124 EXHIBIT D re #123 Declaration of K. Cooke filed by eBay, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit E Declaration (NOTIFICATION OF MANUAL FILING) , #2 Exhibit F, #3 Exhibit G)(Related document(s) #123 ) (Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 5/3/2010) Modified on 5/4/2010 (cv, COURT STAFF).
May 3, 2010 Filing 123 Declaration of KELLY COOKE in Support of #116 Memorandum in Opposition filed byeBay, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Related document(s) #116 ) (Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 5/3/2010)
May 3, 2010 Filing 122 EXHIBITS re #118 Declaration in Support Exhibit N to Hartrich Declaration filed byeBay, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit O, #2 Exhibit P)(Related document(s) #118 ) (Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 5/3/2010)
May 3, 2010 Filing 121 EXHIBITS re #118 Declaration in Support Exhibit J to Hartrich Declaration filed byeBay, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit K, #2 Exhibit L, #3 Exhibit M)(Related document(s) #118 ) (Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 5/3/2010)
May 3, 2010 Filing 120 EXHIBITS re #118 Declaration in Support Exhibit F to Hartrich Declaration filed byeBay, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit G, #2 Exhibit H, #3 Exhibit I)(Related document(s) #118 ) (Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 5/3/2010)
May 3, 2010 Filing 119 EXHIBITS re #118 Declaration in Support Exhibit B to Hartrich Declaration filed byeBay, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C, #2 Exhibit D, #3 Exhibit E)(Related document(s) #118 ) (Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 5/3/2010)
May 3, 2010 Filing 118 Declaration of LIZ HARTRICH in Support of #116 Memorandum in Opposition filed byeBay, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #116 ) (Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 5/3/2010)
May 3, 2010 Filing 117 Declaration of FAMOUS RHODES in Support of #116 Memorandum in Opposition filed byeBay, Inc.. (Related document(s) #116 ) (Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 5/3/2010)
May 3, 2010 Filing 116 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re Received Document eBay's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion For Class Certification filed byeBay, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Appendix)(Related document(s)[]) (Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 5/3/2010)
April 30, 2010 Filing 115 Declaration of JAMES PENNING in Support of #114 MOTION eBay's Administrative Motion to Extend Page Limit For Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion For Class Certification filed byeBay, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Stipulation and Order)(Related document(s) #114 ) (Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 4/30/2010)
April 30, 2010 Filing 114 Administrative Motion for Leave to File Excess For Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion For Class Certification filed by eBay, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 6/14/2010 09:00 AM. (Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 4/30/2010) Modified on 5/3/2010,(counsel selected incorrect event.) (cv, COURT STAFF).
April 21, 2010 Filing 113 Reply Memorandum re #106 MOTION to Seal MOTION to Seal Document Appendix in Support filed byAndy Scott, Brice Yingling. (Verges, Keith) (Filed on 4/21/2010)
April 19, 2010 Filing 112 EXHIBITS re #107 Declaration in Support, Exhibits E through G filed byeBay, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit F, #2 Exhibit G)(Related document(s) #107 ) (Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 4/19/2010)
April 19, 2010 Filing 111 EXHIBITS re #107 Declaration in Support, Exhibits C through D filed byeBay, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit D)(Related document(s) #107 ) (Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 4/19/2010)
April 19, 2010 Filing 110 EXHIBITS re #107 Declaration in Support, Exhibit B filed byeBay, Inc.. (Related document(s) #107 ) (Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 4/19/2010)
April 19, 2010 Filing 109 EXHIBITS re #108 Exhibits Exhibit A-10 through A-18 filed byeBay, Inc.. (Related document(s) #108 ) (Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 4/19/2010)
April 19, 2010 Filing 108 EXHIBITS re #107 Declaration in Support, Exhibit A through A-9 filed byeBay, Inc.. (Related document(s) #107 ) (Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 4/19/2010)
April 19, 2010 Filing 107 Declaration of Edward Torpoco in Support of #106 MOTION to Seal MOTION to Seal Document Appendix in Support filed byeBay, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment to Torpoco Declaration)(Related document(s) #106 ) (Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 4/19/2010)
April 12, 2010 Filing 166 Appendix (UNDER SEAL). (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2010) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/17/2017: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit) (cv, COURT STAFF).
April 12, 2010 Filing 165 MOTION to Certify Class (UNDER SEAL). (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2010) (bwS, COURT STAFF).
April 12, 2010 Received Document Motion (submitted) under seal. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2010)
April 12, 2010 Received Document Appendix (submitted) under seal. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2010)
April 12, 2010 Filing 106 MOTION to Seal portions of their Motion for Class Certification and Brief in Support and Appendix Exhibits A - K filed by Andy Scott, Brice Yingling. (Attachments: #1 [Proposed] Order)(Walker, Raymond) (Filed on 4/12/2010) Modified on 4/13/2010,(counsel selected multiple events.) (cv, COURT STAFF).
April 9, 2010 Filing 105 MOTION to Extend Page Limit for Motion for Class Certification filed by Andy Scott, Brice Yingling. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order)(Walker, Raymond) (Filed on 4/9/2010) Modified on 4/12/2010,(counsel selected incorrect event.) (cv, COURT STAFF).
March 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTIION TO FILE UNDER SEAL by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull granting #90 Motion to Seal (pvtlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2010)
March 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 102 STIPULATION AND ORDER AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT to Continue Briefing and Hearing Dates for Class Certification Motion re #98 Stipulation. Class Certification Motion due by 4/12/2010. Motion Hearing set for 6/14/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Please see Order for further specifics. Signed by Judge James Ware on 3/17/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2010)
March 12, 2010 Filing 101 Transcript of Proceedings held on March 2, 2010, before Judge Patricia V. Trumbull. Court Reporter/Transcriber Georgina Galvan Colin, Telephone number (408) 888-6697. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/10/2010. (mz, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2010)
March 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND by Judge James Ware denying #54 Motion for Leave to File (jwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2010)
March 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' SECOND MOTION TO COMPEL by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull granting #76 Motion to Compel.(pvtlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2010)
March 9, 2010 Filing 98 STIPULATION And Request To Continue Briefing and Hearing Dates for Class Certification Motion and [Proposed] Order by eBay, Inc.. (Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 3/9/2010)
March 3, 2010 Filing 97 Declaration of Edward Torpoco in Support of #90 MOTION to Seal Declaration of Edward Torpoco in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion To File Under Seal filed byeBay, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Torpoco Declaration, #2 Exhibit B to Torpoco Declaration, #3 Exhibit C to Torpoco Declaration)(Related document(s) #90 ) (Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 3/3/2010)
March 2, 2010 Filing 96 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 3/2/2010 before Magistrate Patricia V. Trumbull; Matter Submitted. (Date Filed: 3/2/2010) re #76 Second MOTION to Compel filed by Andy Scott, Brice Yingling.(Court Reporter G. Colin.) (cl, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/2/2010)
March 1, 2010 Filing 95 REPLY to Response to Motion re #54 MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiffs' Second Amended Class Action Complaint filed byAndy Scott, Brice Yingling. (Verges, Keith) (Filed on 3/1/2010)
February 25, 2010 Filing 104 RESPONSE in Support (UNDER SEAL)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2010) (bwS, COURT STAFF).
February 25, 2010 Filing 94 CLERKS NOTICE re: Failure to E-File the motion to file under seal and proposed order and/or Failure to Register as an E-Filer (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2010)
February 25, 2010 Filing 93 REDACTION to declaration of Keith Verges by Andy Scott, Brice Yingling. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2010) (cv, COURT STAFF). Modified on 2/26/2010 (cv, COURT STAFF).
February 25, 2010 Filing 92 REDACTION to Reply. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2010) (cv, COURT STAFF). Modified on 2/26/2010 (cv, COURT STAFF).
February 25, 2010 Filing 91 Proposed Order re #90 MOTION to Seal by Andy Scott, Brice Yingling. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2010) (cv, COURT STAFF).
February 25, 2010 Filing 90 MOTION to Seal portions of reply in support of second motion to compel filed by Andy Scott, Brice Yingling. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2010) (cv, COURT STAFF).
February 25, 2010 Filing 89 Declaration of John Miles in Support of #76 Second MOTION to Compel filed byAndy Scott, Brice Yingling. (Related document(s) #76 ) (Verges, Keith) (Filed on 2/25/2010)
February 25, 2010 Received Document Reply (submitted) under seal. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2010)
February 23, 2010 Filing 88 Declaration of Whitty Somvichian in Support of #86 Memorandum in Opposition eBay Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiffs' Second Motion to Compel filed byeBay, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Somvichian Decl., #2 Exhibit B to Somvichian Decl., #3 Exhibit C to Somvichian Decl.)(Related document(s) #86 ) (Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 2/23/2010)
February 23, 2010 Filing 87 Declaration of Darren Bruntz in Support of #86 Memorandum in Opposition eBay's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Second Motion to Compel filed byeBay, Inc.. (Related document(s) #86 ) (Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 2/23/2010)
February 23, 2010 Filing 86 Memorandum in Opposition re #76 Second MOTION to Compel eBay Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiffs' Second Motion to Compel filed byeBay, Inc.. (Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 2/23/2010)
February 22, 2010 Filing 85 Declaration of Whitty Somvichian in Support of #84 Memorandum in Opposition, eBay's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion For Leave to Amend filed byeBay, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Somvichian Decl., #2 Exhibit B to Somvichian Decl., #3 Exhibit C to Somvichian Decl., #4 Exhibit D to Somvichian Decl.)(Related document(s) #84 ) (Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 2/22/2010)
February 22, 2010 Filing 84 Memorandum in Opposition re #54 MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiffs' Second Amended Class Action Complaint eBay's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion For Leave to Amend filed byeBay, Inc.. (Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 2/22/2010)
February 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER DENYING ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION; OVERRULING DEFENDANTS OBJECTIONS TO MAGISTRATES DISCOVERY ORDER by Judge James Ware granting #73 Motion (jwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2010)
February 19, 2010 Filing 82 Response re #73 MOTION eBay's Administrative Motion for Clarification of the Court's Scheduling Order byAndy Scott, Brice Yingling. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Walker, Raymond) (Filed on 2/19/2010)
February 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO SHORTEN TIME by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull granting #78 Motion to Shorten Time (pvtlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2010)
February 12, 2010 Filing 80 Transcript of Proceedings held on 01/19/2010, before Judge Trumbull. Court Reporter/Transcriber Court Reporter Irene L. Rodriguez, Telephone number (408)947-8160. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 3/5/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/15/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/13/2010. (Rodriguez, Irene) (Filed on 2/12/2010)
February 12, 2010 Filing 79 Proposed Order re #78 MOTION to Shorten Time to Hear Second Motion to Compel by Andy Scott, Brice Yingling. (Verges, Keith) (Filed on 2/12/2010)
February 12, 2010 Filing 78 MOTION to Shorten Time to Hear #76 Second Motion to Compel filed by Andy Scott, Brice Yingling. Motion Hearing set for 3/2/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Verges, Keith) (Filed on 2/12/2010) Modified on 2/19/2010,(counsel failed to properly link to motion.) (cv, COURT STAFF).
February 11, 2010 Filing 77 STIPULATION for an Order to Change time to hear re #76 Second MOTION to Compel by Andy Scott, Brice Yingling. (Verges, Keith) (Filed on 2/11/2010) Modified on 2/12/2010 (cv, COURT STAFF).
February 11, 2010 Filing 76 Second MOTION to Compel filed by Andy Scott, Brice Yingling. Motion Hearing set for 3/2/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Proposed Order)(Verges, Keith) (Filed on 2/11/2010)
February 11, 2010 Filing 75 Proposed Order re #73 MOTION for Clarification of the Court's Scheduling Order by eBay, Inc.. (Penning, James) (Filed on 2/11/2010) Modified on 2/12/2010 (cv, COURT STAFF).
February 11, 2010 Filing 74 Declaration of James M. Penning in Support of #73 MOTION eBay's Administrative Motion for Clarification of the Court's Scheduling Order filed byeBay, Inc.. (Related document(s) #73 ) (Penning, James) (Filed on 2/11/2010)
February 11, 2010 Filing 73 MOTION for Clarification of the Court's #42 Scheduling Order filed by eBay, Inc.. (Penning, James) (Filed on 2/11/2010) Modified on 2/12/2010,(counsel failed to link to which document it relates to. (cv, COURT STAFF).
February 11, 2010 Filing 72 *** FILED IN ERROR. REFER TO DOCUMENT #75 . *** Proposed Order re #70 Notice (Penning, James) (Filed on 2/11/2010) Modified on 2/12/2010 (cv, COURT STAFF). Modified on 2/12/2010 (feriab, COURT STAFF).
February 11, 2010 Filing 71 *** FILED IN ERROR. REFER TO DOCUMENT #74 . *** Declaration of James M. Penning in Support of #70 Notice (Other) filed byeBay, Inc.. (Related document(s) #70 ) (Penning, James) (Filed on 2/11/2010) Modified on 2/12/2010 (feriab, COURT STAFF).
February 11, 2010 Filing 70 *** FILED IN ERROR. REFER TO DOCUMENT #73 . *** Motion for Clarification of the Court's #42 Scheduling Order (Penning, James) (Filed on 2/11/2010) Modified on 2/12/2010,(counsel failed to link to which document it relates to.) (cv, COURT STAFF). Modified on 2/12/2010 (feriab, COURT STAFF).
February 4, 2010 Filing 69 OBJECTIONS to re #64 Order on Motion to Compel eBay Inc.'s Objections to Magistrate Judge's January 29, 2010 Discovery Order by eBay, Inc.. (Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 2/4/2010)
February 3, 2010 *** CMC Deadlines terminated. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2010)
February 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR CLARIFICATION #62 Motion; VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The 2/8/2010 Conference is VACATED. Signed by Judge James Ware on 2/3/2010. (jwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2010) Modified on 2/4/2010 (ecg, COURT STAFF).
February 1, 2010 Filing 67 REPLY to Response to Motion re #62 MOTION For Clarification or Modification of the Scheduling Order filed byAndy Scott, Brice Yingling. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Walker, Raymond) (Filed on 2/1/2010)
January 29, 2010 Filing 66 Memorandum in Opposition re #62 MOTION For Clarification or Modification of the Scheduling Order eBay's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion For Clarification or Modification of the Scheduling Order filed byeBay, Inc.. (Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 1/29/2010)
January 29, 2010 Filing 65 SECOND JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Regarding Class Certification filed by eBay, Inc.. (Chapman, Benjamin) (Filed on 1/29/2010) Modified on 2/1/2010,(counsel selected incorrect event.) (cv, COURT STAFF).
January 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull granting #50 Motion to Compel (pvtlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2010)
January 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 63 STIPULATION AND ORDER AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT REGARDING Briefing on Plaintiffs' Request for Clarification or Modification of the Scheduling Order re: Class Certification re #61 Stipulation. The Matter is submitted without oral argument unless otherwise ordered by the Court. Signed by Judge James Ware on 1/27/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2010)
January 25, 2010 Filing 62 MOTION For Clarification or Modification of the Scheduling Order filed by Andy Scott, Brice Yingling. (Walker, Raymond) (Filed on 1/25/2010)
January 22, 2010 Filing 61 STIPULATION Regarding Briefing on Plaintiffs' Request for Clarification or Modification of the Scheduling Order re: Class Certification by Andy Scott, Brice Yingling. (Walker, Raymond) (Filed on 1/22/2010)
January 19, 2010 Filing 60 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 1/19/2010 before Magistrate Patricia V. Trumbull; Matter Submitted. (Date Filed: 1/19/2010) re #50 MOTION to Compel filed by Andy Scott, Brice Yingling.(Court Reporter, Irene Rodriguez)(cl, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/19/2010) Modified on 1/19/2010 (cl, COURT STAFF).
January 5, 2010 Filing 59 REPLY to Response to Motion re #50 MOTION to Compel filed byAndy Scott, Brice Yingling. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Thomas F. Stanek)(Verges, Keith) (Filed on 1/5/2010)
December 30, 2009 Filing 58 CLERKS NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing from 1/28/2010 re #54 Motion for Leave to Amend. Motion Hearing set for 3/15/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2009)
December 29, 2009 Filing 57 Declaration of Matthew Donald Thomas in Support of #56 Declaration in Support, #55 Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel and to Modify Scheduling Order filed byeBay, Inc.. (Related document(s) #56 , #55 ) (Penning, James) (Filed on 12/29/2009)
December 29, 2009 Filing 56 Declaration of James Penning in Support of #55 Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel and to Modify Scheduling Order filed byeBay, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Related document(s) #55 ) (Penning, James) (Filed on 12/29/2009)
December 29, 2009 Filing 55 Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs' #50 Motion to Compel and to Modify Scheduling Order filed by eBay, Inc.. (Penning, James) (Filed on 12/29/2009) Modified on 12/30/2009,(counsel failed to properly link to motion.) (cv, COURT STAFF).
December 23, 2009 Filing 54 MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiffs' Second Amended Class Action Complaint filed by Andy Scott, Brice Yingling. Motion Hearing set for 1/28/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plaintiffs' Second Amended Class Action Complaint, #2 Proposed Order)(Verges, Keith) (Filed on 12/23/2009)
December 18, 2009 Filing 53 Answer to Amended Complaint #19 Amended Complaint Defendant eBay Inc.'s Answer to Plaintiffs' First Amended Class Action Complaint byeBay, Inc.. (Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 12/18/2009)
December 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER GRANTING PARTIES' STIPULATED REQUEST TO SHORTEN TIME re #51 Stipulation filed by Andy Scott, Brice Yingling. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on December 18, 2009. (pvtlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2009)
December 17, 2009 Filing 51 STIPULATION re #50 MOTION to Compel and to Modify Scheduling Order Stipulated Request for Order Changing Time to Hear Discovery Motion by Andy Scott, Brice Yingling. (Verges, Keith) (Filed on 12/17/2009)
December 17, 2009 Filing 50 MOTION to Compel and to MOTION to Modify Scheduling Order filed by Andy Scott, Brice Yingling. Motion Hearing set for 1/19/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Proposed Order)(Verges, Keith) (Filed on 12/17/2009) Modified on 12/17/2009,(counsel failed to properly link to motion.) (cv, COURT STAFF).
November 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 49 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER re #48 Stipulation filed by eBay, Inc. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on November 13, 2009. (pvtlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2009)
November 12, 2009 Filing 48 STIPULATION Stipulated Protective Order by eBay, Inc.. (Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 11/12/2009)
November 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS; granting in part and denying in part #23 Motion to Dismiss . On or before 12/4/2009 Plaintiffs shall file their Second Amended Complaint consistent with this Order. Signed by Judge James Ware on 11/5/2009 (jwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2009) Modified docket text on 11/5/2009 (ecg, COURT STAFF).
October 20, 2009 Filing 46 Transcript of Proceedings held on 10/05/09, before Judge Ware. Court Reporter/Transcriber Irene L. Rodriogez, Telephone number (408)947-8160. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 11/9/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/17/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/15/2010. (Rodriguez, Irene) (Filed on 10/20/2009)
October 5, 2009 Filing 45 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 10/5/2009 before Judge James Ware (Date Filed: 10/5/2009) re #23 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint. The Court took the matter under submission after oral argument. The Court to issue further Order following hearing. (Court Reporter Irene Rodriguez.) (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/5/2009)
October 2, 2009 Filing 44 Response re #38 Request for Judicial Notice byAndy Scott, Brice Yingling. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Verges, Keith) (Filed on 10/2/2009)
October 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER DENYING STIPULATION TO CONTINUE HEARING ON THE MOTION TO DISMISS re #41 Stipulation. The parties shall appear for the scheduled 10/5/2009 hearing at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. James Ware. Signed by Judge James Ware on 10/2/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2009)
October 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 42 SCHEDULING ORDER RE CLASS CERTIFICATION: The Case Management Conference set for 10/5/209 is VACATED. The parties are ordered to comply with the following scheduling order: Joint Interim Case Management Conference statement due 1/29/2010, Interim Case Management Conference set for 2/8/2010 10:00 AM. Close of Class Discovery due by 2/22/2010. Completed briefing re Class Certification due by 4/26/2010. Motion Hearing re Class Certification set for 5/24/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Please see Order for further specifics. Signed by Judge James Ware on 10/1/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2009)
September 24, 2009 Filing 41 STIPULATION and Request to Continue Hearing on Defendant eBay Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss by eBay, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Chapman, Benjamin) (Filed on 9/24/2009)
September 18, 2009 Filing 40 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by eBay, Inc.. (Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 9/18/2009)
September 11, 2009 Filing 39 Declaration of Paul Armbruster in Support of #37 Reply to Response to Motion, #38 Request for Judicial Notice filed byeBay, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Armbruster Declaration)(Related document(s) #37 , #38 ) (Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 9/11/2009)
September 11, 2009 Filing 38 Request for Judicial Notice re #37 Reply to Response to Motion, filed byeBay, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Request For Judicial Notice)(Related document(s) #37 ) (Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 9/11/2009)
September 11, 2009 Filing 37 REPLY to Response to Motion re #23 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Proc. 12(B)(6) MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Proc. 12(B)(6) filed byeBay, Inc.. (Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 9/11/2009)
September 4, 2009 Filing 36 Letter from Benjamin F. Chapman to the Court re Joint Case Management Statement. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Chapman, Benjamin) (Filed on 9/4/2009)
September 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER GRANTING AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT #32 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Plaintiffs' opposition shall be no more than 30 pages long. Signed by Judge James Ware on 9/1/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2009)
August 28, 2009 Filing 34 Appendix re #33 Response, Plaintiffs' Appendix in Support of Response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss filed byAndy Scott, Brice Yingling. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit)(Related document(s) #33 ) (Verges, Keith) (Filed on 8/28/2009)
August 28, 2009 Filing 33 Response re #23 MOTION to Dismiss by Andy Scott, Brice Yingling. (Verges, Keith) (Filed on 8/28/2009) Modified on 8/31/2009 (cv, COURT STAFF).
August 27, 2009 Filing 32 MOTION for Leave to file Excess Pages for Opposition to Motion to Dismiss and [Proposed] Order by Andy Scott, Brice Yingling. (Walker, Raymond) (Filed on 8/27/2009) Modified on 8/27/2009,(counsel used incorrect event.) (cv, COURT STAFF).
July 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 31 STIPULATION AND ORDER to Continue Case Management Conference and Hearing on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss re #30 Stipulation. Set/Reset Deadlines as to #23 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Proc. 12(B)(6). Motion Hearing set for 10/5/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/5/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge James Ware on 7/27/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2009)
July 27, 2009 Filing 30 STIPULATION and Request to Continue Case Management Conference and Hearing on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by Andy Scott, Brice Yingling. (Walker, Raymond) (Filed on 7/27/2009)
July 24, 2009 Filing 29 *** FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE DOCKET #30 . *** STIPULATION and Request to Continue Case Management Conference by eBay, Inc.. (Walker, Raymond) (Filed on 7/24/2009) Modified on 7/27/2009 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
July 10, 2009 Filing 28 CLERKS NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing re #23 Motion to Dismiss. Motion Hearing set for 9/21/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2009)
July 6, 2009 Filing 27 Certificate of Interested Entities by eBay, Inc. (Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 7/6/2009)
July 6, 2009 Filing 26 Proposed Order re #23 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint by eBay, Inc.. (Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 7/6/2009) Modified on 5/18/2010 (cv, COURT STAFF).
July 6, 2009 Filing 25 Declaration of Matthew McDonald in Support of #24 Request for Judicial Notice,, filed by eBay, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to McDonald Declaration, #2 Exhibit B to McDonald Declaration, #3 Exhibit C to McDonald Declaration, #4 Exhibit D to McDonald Declaration)(Related document(s) #23 , #24 ) (Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 7/6/2009) Modified on 7/7/2009 (cv, COURT STAFF).
July 6, 2009 Filing 24 Request for Judicial Notice re #23 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Proc. 12(B)(6) filed by eBay, Inc.. (Related document(s) #23 ) (Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 7/6/2009) Modified on 7/7/2009 (cv, COURT STAFF).
July 6, 2009 Filing 23 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Proc. 12(B)(6) filed by eBay, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 8/31/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 7/6/2009) Modified on 7/7/2009 (cv, COURT STAFF).
June 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to District Judge James Ware for all further proceedings and Magistrate Judge Patricia V. Trumbull for all discovery matters. Signed by The Executive Committee on 06/30/09. (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2009)
June 30, 2009 Filing 21 CLERKS NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT. Case Management Conference set for 9/21/2009 10:00 AM Before the Honorable James Ware. Case Management Statement due by 9/4/2009. (cm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2009)
June 26, 2009 Filing 20 Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge and Request for Reassignment to a United States District Judge by eBay, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Chapman, Benjamin) (Filed on 6/26/2009) Text modified on 6/26/2009 (bw, COURT STAFF).
June 16, 2009 Filing 19 FIRST CLASS ACTION AMENDED COMPLAINT against eBay, Inc. Filed byAndy Scott, Brice Yingling. (Walker, Raymond) (Filed on 6/16/2009) Modified on 6/16/2009 (bw, COURT STAFF).
May 20, 2009 Filing 18 STIPULATION Extending Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint re ( #1 ) by eBay, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service) (Chapman, Benjamin) (Filed on 5/20/2009) Modified on 5/20/2009 (bw, COURT STAFF).
April 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull granting #5 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (pvtlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2009)
April 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull granting #3 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (pvtlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2009)
April 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull granting #13 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (pvtlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2009)
April 27, 2009 Filing 14 (Proposed) Order Granting Application for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for attorney Parker D. Young re ( #13 ) by Brice Yingling, Andy Scott. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2009)
April 27, 2009 Filing 13 Application for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for attorney Parker D. Young ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 5461100516) filed by Brice Yingling, Andy Scott. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2009)
April 23, 2009 Filing 12 AMENDED (Proposed) Order Granting Application for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Raymond R. Walker re ( #5 ) (by Brice Yingling, Andy Scott. (Walker, Raymond) (Filed on 4/23/2009) Text modified on 4/23/2009 (bw, COURT STAFF).
April 23, 2009 Filing 11 Amended (Proposed) Order Granting Application for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Keith R. Verges re #3 by Brice Yingling, Andy Scott. (Walker, Raymond) (Filed on 4/23/2009) Text modified on 4/23/2009 (bw, COURT STAFF).
April 23, 2009 Filing 10 *** FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE DOCKET #11 . *** Amended (Proposed) Order Granting Application for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Keith R. Verges re #3 by Brice Yingling, Andy Scott. (Walker, Raymond) (Filed on 4/23/2009) Modified on 4/23/2009 (bw, COURT STAFF). Modified on 4/23/2009 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
April 23, 2009 Filing 9 *** FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE DOCKET #12 . *** AMENDED (Proposed) Order Granting Application for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Raymond R. Walker re #5 by Brice Yingling, Andy Scott. (Walker, Raymond) (Filed on 4/23/2009) Text modified on 4/23/2009 (bw, COURT STAFF). Modified on 4/23/2009 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
April 21, 2009 Filing 8 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 8/25/2009. Case Management Conference set for 9/1/2009 02:00 PM. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2009)
April 21, 2009 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to eBay, Inc. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2009)
April 21, 2009 Filing 6 (Proposed) Order Granting Application for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Raymond E. Walker re #5 by Brice Yingling, Andy Scott. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2009)
April 21, 2009 Filing 5 Application for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Raymond E. Walker ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 54611005119) filed by Brice Yingling, Andy Scott. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2009)
April 21, 2009 Filing 4 (Proposed) Order Granting Application for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Keith R. Verges re #3 by Brice Yingling, Andy Scott. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2009)
April 21, 2009 Filing 3 Application for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Keith R. Verges ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 54611005119) filed by Brice Yingling, Andy Scott. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2009)
April 21, 2009 Filing 2 Certification of Interested Entities or Persons by Brice Yingling, Andy Scott (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2009)
April 21, 2009 Filing 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against eBay, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 54611005119). Filed by Brice Yingling, Andy Scott. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2009)
April 21, 2009 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2009)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yingling et al v. eBay, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brice Yingling doing business as Alamo Autosports
Represented By: Keith R Verges
Represented By: Parker D Young
Represented By: Raymond Earl Walker
Represented By: Shawn Tenzing Leuthold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andy Scott
Represented By: Keith R Verges
Represented By: Parker D Young
Represented By: Raymond Earl Walker
Represented By: Shawn Tenzing Leuthold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: eBay, Inc.
Represented By: Benjamin F Chapman
Represented By: James M. Penning
Represented By: Michael Graham Rhodes
Represented By: Whitty Somvichian
Represented By: Raymond Earl Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Joseph Balla
Represented By: Joseph Darrell Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?