Embry v. ACER America Corporation
Plaintiff: Kevin Embry
Defendant: ACER America Corporation
Case Number: 5:2009cv01808
Filed: April 24, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Presiding Judge: James Ware
Nature of Suit: Defendant
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 282 ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte denying 277 Motion for Further Sanctions.(rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2012)
October 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 279 ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte granting 278 Motion to Shorten Time.(rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2012)
June 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 253 ORDER Granting 232 MOTION for Bond filed by Kevin Embry. Signed by Judge James Ware on June 5, 2012. (jwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2012)
April 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 247 ORDER REQUESTING ADDITIONAL BRIEFING ON THE STATUS OF APPEALS AT THE NINTH CIRCUIT. Signed by Judge James Ware on 4/26/2012. (kns, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2012)
February 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 221 ORDER re 219 Letter filed by Kevin Embry. Signed by Judge James Ware on February 24, 2012. (jwlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2012)
January 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 207 AMENDED ORDER REQUIRING MODIFICATION OF PROPOSED FINAL APPROVAL ORDER; REQUIRING SUBMISSION OF ADDITIONAL INFORMATION. Signed by Judge James Ware on 1/31/12. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2012)
November 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 197 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 196 Stipulation filed by ACER America Corporation. Signed by Judge James Ware on 11/7/11. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2011)
October 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 193 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 192 Stipulation filed by Kevin Embry. Signed by Judge James Ware on 10/5/11. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2011)
September 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 191 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 190 Stipulation filed by Kevin Embry. Signed by Judge James Ware on 9/28/11. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2011)
September 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 184 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 183 Stipulation filed by Kevin Embry. Signed by Judge James Ware on 9/12/11. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2011)
September 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 182 ORDER requesting further revised proposed order. Signed by Judge James Ware on September 9, 2011. (jwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2011)
July 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 174 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 173 Stipulation filed by ACER America Corporation. Signed by Judge James Ware on 7/27/11. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2011)
July 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 171 ORDER RE: DISCOVERY REFERRAL. Signed by Judge James Ware on 7/14/11. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2011)
June 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ORDER re 165 Stipulation filed by ACER America Corporation, Set/Reset Deadlines 165 Stipulation, 150 MOTION to Certify Class PLAINTIFFS RENEWED MOTION; MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT THEREOF [REDACTED] MOTION to Certify Class PLAINTIFFS RENEWE D MOTION; MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT THEREOF [REDACTED]. Opposition due by 7/25/2011. Replies due by 8/29/2011. Motion Hearing set for 9/12/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 15, 18th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. James Ware. Signed by Judge James Ware on 6/30/11. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2011)
June 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 164 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd granting in part and denying in part 128 plaintiff's Fourth Motion to Compel and for Sanctions. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2011)
June 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd denying 156 defendant's Ex Parte Motion for Additional Deposition Time. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2011)
February 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 121 STIPULATION AND ORDER AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT TO CONTINUE DISCOVERY CUT OFF AND MOTION TO COMPEL DEADLINE re 116 Stipulation. Discovery cut off set for 2/28/2011. Signed by Judge James Ware on 2/16/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2011)
January 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd granting in part and denying in part 97 plaintiff's motion to compel re documents and interrogatories; granting in part and denying in part 101 plaintiff's motion to compel re depositions. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2011)
July 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER DENYING 62 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Deposition Attendance. Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-1(b), the Court finds this matter suitable for determination without oral argument, and the July 20, 2010 hearing is VACATED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 07/16/2010.(hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2010)
July 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER GRANTING 64 Plaintiff's Motion to Shorten Time for Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion Compel Deposition Attendance. The motion will be heard on Tuesday, July 20, 2010. Any opposition shall be served and filed by Monday, July 12, 2010 at 5:00 p.m., and any reply shall be served and filed by Wednesday, July 14, 2010 at 5:00 p.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 07/06/2010. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2010)
June 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. All other case deadlines shall remain unchanged. The Court will set a further Case Management Conference, if necessary, in its order addressing Plaintiff's anticipated motion for class certification. ***CMC Deadlines terminated. Signed by Judge James Ware on 6/16/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2010)
March 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 56 STIPULATION AND ORDER AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT TO CONTINUE CLASS CERTIFICATION DISCOVERY CUTOFF AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 55 Stipulation. Close of Discovery due by 4/5/2010. Certification Motion due by 4/26 /2010. Joint Case Management Conference statement due 6/11/2010. Case Management Conference set for 6/21/2010 10:00 AM. Motion Hearing set for 6/21/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Please see Order for further specifics. Signed by Judge James Ware on 3/16/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2010)
February 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER CONTINUING 2/22/2010 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Conference Statement due 4/16/2010. Case Management Conference set for 4/26/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. James Ware. Signed by Judge James Ware on 2/17/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2010)
February 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 53 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER (MODIFIED BY THE COURT). Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 2/16/2010. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2010)
January 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 39 Motion to Compel by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2010)
December 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 49 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 48 Stipulation filed by ACER America Corporation. Hearing for 39 Motion to Compel continued to 1/26/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 12/14/2009. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2009)
December 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 46 STIPULATION AND ORDER AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT to Continue Class Certification Scheduling Deadlines re 38 Stipulation. Close of Class Discovery due by 3/5/2010. Deadline to file Motion due by 3/22/2010. Opposition due 4/5/2010. Reply due 4/9/2010. Motion Hearing set for 4/26/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge James Ware on 12/8/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2009)
October 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER DENYING STIPULATION TO CONTINUE CLASS CERTIFICATION DISCOVERY CUTOFF AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE re 36 Stipulation. The Stipulation is DENIED because the dates proposed are invalid. Signed by Judge James Ware on 10/30/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2009)
September 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT re 31 Stipulation. Set/Reset Deadlines 27 MOTION to Strike Defendant's Affirmative Defenses.On or before 10/19/2009, Defendant shall file its Opposition. On or before 10/26/2009, Plaintiffs shall file their Reply. Motion Hearing set for 11/9/2009 09:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge James Ware on 9/29/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2009)
August 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULE FOR CLASS DISCOVERY AND PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION re 26 Joint Case Management Statement. The Court VACATES the 8/31/2009 Case Management Conference. Close of CLASS discovery to be completed on or before 12/4/2009. Motion Hearing set for 2/22/2010 09:00 AM, Plaintiff shall notice its Motion in accordance with the Civil Local Rules of the Court. Further Case Management Conference set for 2/22/2010 10:00 AM. On or before 2/12/2010, the parties shall file a Joint Case Management Statement. The Statement shall provide a proposed schedule for the close of all merits discovery. Please see Order for further specifics. Signed by Judge James Ware on 8/27/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2009)
July 31, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 21 STIPULATION AND ORDER Granting Extension of Time for Defendant Acer America Corporation to Respond to the Complaintre 20 Stipulation. Deadline for ACER America Corporation to respond by 8/14/2009. Signed by Judge James Ware on 7/31/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Embry v. ACER America Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Embry
Represented By: Seth Adam Safier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACER America Corporation
Represented By: Jeffery David McFarland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?