Sedusa Studio, Inc. v. Hellman
Plaintiff: Sedusa Studio, Inc.
Defendant: Lisa Hellman
Case Number: 5:2009cv02002
Filed: May 6, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Ronald M. Whyte
Presiding Judge: Patricia V. Trumbull
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 15:1114 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 37 STIPULATION AND ORDER 34 for Injunction and JUDGMENT, ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 12/16/09. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2009)
October 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER DENYING SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY. Signed by Judge Whyte on 10/15/09. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2009)
August 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER by Judge Whyte denying 2 , 12 , 15 Motions for Preliminary Injunction; (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2009)
July 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER FOR REASSIGNMENT TO A DISTRICT COURT JUDGE. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on July 6, 2009. (pvtlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2009)
May 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER SETTING DEADLINE FOR PARTIES TO FILE EITHER A "CONSENT TO PROCEED BEFORE A MAGISTRATE JUDGE," OR ELSE A "DECLINATION TO PROCEED BEFORE A UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND REQUEST FOR REASSIGNMENT." Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on May 29, 2009. (pvtlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sedusa Studio, Inc. v. Hellman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sedusa Studio, Inc.
Represented By: Nicholas Heimlich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Hellman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?