DMP ERSB LLC v. Longwood San Benito LLC et al
Plaintiff: DMP ERSB LLC
Defendant: Longwood San Benito LLC and El Rancho San Benito LLC
Case Number: 5:2009cv02003
Filed: May 6, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Presiding Judge: James Ware
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 45 STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING DISMISSAL OF ALL CLAIMS WITH PREJUDICE re 44 Stipulation. The Clerk shall close this file ***Deadlines terminated. Signed by Judge James Ware on 9/2/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2010)
August 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER CONTINUING CONFERENCE RE STATUS OF SETTLEMENT re 41 Status Report. On or before 9/3/2010, the parties shall either file a Joint Status Report or the Stipulated Dismissal to bring this case to a close. Status Conference set for 9/13/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge James Ware on 8/25/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2010)
July 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 40 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO COMPLETE MEDIATION AND FOR NOMINAL DEFENDANT EL RANCHO SAN BENITO LLC TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT re 39 Stipulation. Signed by Judge James Ware on 7/19/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2010)
June 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 38 MODIFYING CASE SCHEDULE; SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE RE:SETTLEMENT re 37 Stipulation. Status Conference set for 8/30/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Accordingly, the Court modifies the current Case Schedule as follows: Close of Al l Discovery due by 12/7/2010. Last Date to Hear Dispositive Motions due by 3/7/2011. Preliminary Pretrial Conference statement due 10/29/2010. Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 11/8/2010 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose ***Deadlines terminated re 25 SCHEDULING ORDER. Status Report due by 8/13/2010. Signed by Judge James Ware on 6/28/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2010)
May 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 36 STIPULATION AND ORDER Granting Extension of Time Time to Complete Mediation and for Nominal Defendant El Rancho San Benito LLC to Respond to the Complaint; re 35 Stipulation. Mediation deadline 7/16/2010. Response to Complaint due 7/30/2010. Signed by Judge James Ware on 5/10/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2010)
April 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 34 STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER AS AMENDED BY THE COURT re 33 Stipulation filed by DMB ERSB LLC, DMB Communities LLC, DMB Realco, LLC, DMB Communites II, LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 4/6/2010. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2010)
March 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 32 STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by re 31 Stipulation; Finding as MOOT 30 Stipulation. Deadline to respond by 6/1/2010. Signed by Judge James Ware on 3/1/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2010)
December 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 28 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR NOMINAL DEFENDANT EL RANCHO SAN BENITO LLC TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT re 27 Stipulation. Deadline to respond due 2/1/2010. Signed by Judge James Ware on 12/9/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2009)
November 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Private ADR re 19 Stipulation. Signed by Judge James Ware on 11/20/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2009)
September 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STIPULATION AND ORDER NOMINAL DEFENDANT EL RANCHO SAN BENITO LLC TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT re 16 Stipulation. Deadline to respond by 11/9/2009. Signed by Judge James Ware on 9/14/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2009) Modified docket text re clerical typographical error on 9/14/2009 (ecg, COURT STAFF).
July 31, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR PLAINTIFF/CROSS-DEFENDANT DMB ERSB, LLC AND CROSS-DEFENDANTS DMB REALCO, LLC, DMB COMMUNITIES, LLC, AND DMB COMMUNITIES II, LLC TO ANSWER re 12 Stipulation. Deadline to answer due 8/14/2009. Signed by Judge James Ware on 7/31/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DMP ERSB LLC v. Longwood San Benito LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DMP ERSB LLC
Represented By: Courtney Shaw Huizar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Longwood San Benito LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: El Rancho San Benito LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?