Hunter et al v. Citibank, N.A. et al

Plaintiff: Anita Hunter, Johnna Bozza, Celltex Site Services, LTD, Grande Investment LLC, Quirk Infiniti, Inc. and Whitton Michael
Defendant: Citibank, N.A., Countrywide Bank, FSB, Bank of America Corporation, United Western Bank, Boulder Capital, LLC, Boulder Columbus, LLC, Boulder West Oaks, LLC, Boulder Holdings, VI, LLC, Roy S. McDowell, Jr., Cordell Funding LLLP, Cordell Consultants, Inc., Cordell Money Purchase Plan, Robin Rodriguez, Jorden Burt, LLP, Kutak Rock, LLP, Joseph O. Kavan, Foley & Lardner, LLP, Stephen I Burr and Silicon Valley Law Group
Case Number: 5:2009cv02079
Filed: May 12, 2009
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: James Ware
Referring Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 25, 2016 646 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE 629 Providing Instructions regarding payment of assigned claims. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on March 25, 2016. (jcslc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2016)
March 11, 2016 641 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER FOR REPLY BRIEF FROM ASM CAPITAL, NOT TO EXCEED TEN PAGES, TO BE FILED BY MARCH 18, 2016. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on March 11, 2016. (jcslc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2016)
February 5, 2016 638 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING FEBRUARY 12, 2016 HEARING ON MOTION FOR INSTRUCTIONS AND MODIFICATION OF SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on February 5, 2016. (jcslc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2016)
June 11, 2013 621 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING re 620 Letter filed by Anita Hunter for Robert Brace & Irwin Gilbert to appear by phone on 6/14/13 at 9:30 AM for hearing on the Motion for Order Approving Sale of Millersville Property. Court will initiate phone contact. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 6/11/13. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2013)
September 11, 2012 615 Opinion or Order of the Court JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 9/11/12. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2012)
July 18, 2012 611 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Updated Case Management Conference Statement due 9/7/12. Case Management Conference set for 9/14/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 7/18/12. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2012)
January 19, 2012 590 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REQUIRING MODIFICATION OF PARTIES PROPOSED ORDER. Signed by Judge James Ware on 1/19/12. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2012)
November 17, 2011 586 Opinion or Order of the Court PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SCHEDULING ORDER; ORDER VACATING HEARING ON MOTIONS Joint Pretrial Conference Statement due by 8/24/2012. Motions in Limine due by 8/24/2012. Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/24/2012 11:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Jury Selection set for 10/9/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. James Ware. Jury Trial set for 10/9/2012 01:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. James Ware. Jury Trial se t for 10/10/2012 01:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. James Ware. Jury Trial set for 10/11/2012 01:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. James Ware. Jury Trial set for 10/12/2012 01:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. James Ware. Jury Trial set for 10/16/2012 01:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. James Ware. Jury Trial set for 10/17/2012 01:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before H on. James Ware. Jury Trial set for 10/18/2012 01:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. James Ware. Jury Trial set for 10/19/2012 01:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. James Ware. Jury Trial set for 10 /23/2012 01:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. James Ware. Jury Trial set for 10/24/2012 01:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. James Ware. Jury Trial set for 10/25/2012 01:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. James Ware. Jury Trial set for 10/26/2012 01:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. James Ware.. Signed by Judge James Ware on 11/17/11. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2011)
October 26, 2011 584 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING STATUS CONFERENCE AND SETTING PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT AS TO THE CORDELL DEFENDANTS; CONTINUING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AS TO DEFENDANT SVLG Motions due by 12/2/2011. Motion Hearing set for 12/19/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. James Ware. Signed by Judge James Ware on 10/25/11. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2011)
July 15, 2011 568 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: DISCOVERY REFERRAL. Signed by Judge James Ware on 7/15/11. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2011)
March 8, 2011 497 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER Modifying the Scheduling Order as to Expert Disclosure re 491 Proposed Order. Expert disclosure deadline 5/13/2011. Rebuttal Expert Disclosure deadline 5/27/2011. Signed by Judge James Ware on 3/8/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2011)
March 2, 2011 495 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Revised Order Preliminarily Approving the Wave III Class Settlement with the Boulder Defendants and MacDowell Parties re (487 in 5:09-cv-02079-JW) Proposed Order filed by Anita Hunter. Signed by Judge James Ware on 3/2/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2011)
February 25, 2011 482 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REQUESTING AMENDED PROPOSED ORDER. Accordingly, on or before February 28, 2011, the parties shall submit Amended Proposed Orders that comport with the timing requirements of In re Mercury, namely, the parties shall include timing provisions for the filing of requests for attorneys fees and the class members' objections, if any, to the fee requests. Further, pending preliminary approval of the settlement, the Court will set a Final Fairness Hearing for June 27, 2011, at 9 a.m. Thus, in their Amended Proposed Orders, the parties shall use this putative Final Fairness Hearing date to adjust all other deadlines accordingly. Signed by Judge James Ware on 2/25/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2011)
January 20, 2011 455 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER Continuing Wave III Preliminary Hearing re 452 Stipulation. All supporting Motions and Proposed Order due 2/15/2011. Motion Hearing set for 2/28/2011 09:00 AM before Hon. James Ware. Signed by Judge James Ware on 1/20/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2011)
January 5, 2011 433 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Motion to Shorten Time. Hearing on 429 Second MOTION for Protective Order filed by Silicon Valley Law Group set for 1/7/2011 09:30 AM by telephone conference call in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on January 5, 2011. (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2011)
January 3, 2011 427 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 426 Application for Order Shortening Time to Hear Motion for Protective Order filed by Silicon Valley Law Group. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on January 3, 2011. (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2011)
December 6, 2010 424 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT re 423 Proposed Order filed by Anita Hunter. Jorden Burt's Motion to Dismiss is deemed as withdrawn. The Clerk shall terminate Docket Item No. 408. Motions terminated: 408 MOTION to Dismiss Third Amended Complaint filed by Jorden Burt, LLP. Signed by Judge James Ware on 12/6/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2010)
November 30, 2010 422 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 311 Deposition Protocol. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on 11/30/10. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 11/30/2010)
November 12, 2010 416 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 415 STIPULATION filed by Anita Hunter. The Court does not find good cause to grant the parties' stipulation. Signed by Judge James Ware on 11/12/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2010)
October 20, 2010 414 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT SETTING WAVE III PRELIMINARY APPROVAL HEARING re 413 Proposed Order. All supporting Motions and Proposed Orders due by 1/21/2011. Motion Hearing set for 2/7/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge James Ware on 10/20/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2010)
October 14, 2010 411 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER Excusing Defendant Foley & Lardner LLP and Stephen I. Burr from Discovery and Other Deadlines re 407 Stipulation. Signed by Judge James Ware on 10/14/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2010)
October 13, 2010 410 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. In light of Defendants' pending dispositive Motion and the parties' failure to file a Joint Case Management Statement, the Court finds that an Interim Case Management Conference is unnecessary at t his time. Accordingly, the Court VACATES the October 18 Conference. The Court will set a new Case Management Conference date in its Order addressing Defendants pending Motion to Dismiss, if necessary. ***CMC Deadlines terminated. Signed by Judge James Ware on 10/13/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2010)
October 1, 2010 398 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending the Time for Defendants to Respond to Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint by 11/30/2010 re 397 Stipulation. Signed by Judge James Ware on 10/1/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2010)
September 28, 2010 396 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Stipulation Excusing Defendant Citibank, N.A. From Responding to or Answering Third Amended Complaint re 395 Stipulation. Signed by Judge James Ware on 9/28/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2010)
September 23, 2010 394 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING OCTOBER 12, 2010 TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT AND TO EXTEND PAGE LIMITS as to Cordell Defendants re 391 Stipulation. In the event the Cordell Defendants file a motion and brief in response to the Third Amended Complaint, the page limit for their motion and brief shall be extended from 25 pages to 35 pages. Signed by Judge James Ware on 9/23/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2010)
September 21, 2010 388 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND TIME TO OCTOBER 11, 2010 FOR DEFENDANT UNITED WESTERN BANK TO RESPOND TO THE THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT re 386 Stipulation. Signed by Judge James Ware on 9/21/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2010)
September 15, 2010 385 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER EXCUSING DEFENDANTS KUTAK ROCK, LLP AND JOSEPH O. KAVAN FROM RESPONDING TO OR ANSWERING THE THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT re 383 Stipulation. Signed by Judge James Ware on 9/15/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2010)
August 31, 2010 377 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 375 Response to Hon. Mag. Trumbull Order 372 . Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on 8/30/10. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 8/31/2010)
August 17, 2010 372 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 311 Stipulation re: Deposition Protocol. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on 8/12/10. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 8/17/2010)
August 11, 2010 370 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT MODIFYING CASE SCHEDULE re 365 Proposed Order. Finding as Moot re 361 Proposed Order to Continue Case Management Conference. The Case Management Conference set for 8/23/2010 is VACATED. The Court se ts the following modified scheduling order: Third Amended Complaint due by 9/10/2010. Close of All Discovery due by 7/12/2011. Motion Hearing re Class Certification set for 6/28/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Last Date for Hearin g Dispositive Motions due by 9/19/2011. Interim Joint Case Management Statement due by 10/8/2010. Interim Case Management Conference set for 10/18/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. ***Deadlines terminated re 317 Stipulation. Signed by Judge James Ware on 8/11/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2010)
May 28, 2010 329 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 328 Depositions of Incarcerated Defendants. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on 5/26/10. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 5/28/2010)
May 13, 2010 324 Opinion or Order of the Court Preliminary Approval Order of Settlement with Bank of America / Countrywide Bank. re 323 Proposed Order. Motion Hearing set for 8/30/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge James Ware on 5/13/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2010)
April 29, 2010 317 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT Continuing Case Schedule Deadlines re 315 Amended Document. Close of All Discovery due by 3/15/2011. Last Date for Hearing Dispositive Motions due by 5/16/2011. Joint Preliminary Pretrial Conference Statement due 2/4/2011. Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 2/14/2011 11:00 AM, Motion Hearing re Class Certification set for 2/28/2011 09:00 AM. in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge James Ware on 4/29/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2010)
April 15, 2010 313 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER Granting Extendsion Time for Defendants to Respond to Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint re 297 Stipulation. Signed by Judge James Ware on 4/15/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2010)
April 2, 2010 299 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 209 Vacating Hearing and Deeming Motion Submitted on the Papers. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on 4/2/10. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 4/2/2010)
March 29, 2010 296 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER Granting Request Extending the Time for Defendant Jorden Burt to Respond to Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint re 273 Stipulation. Signed by Judge James Ware on 3/29/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2010)
March 24, 2010 292 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING Extension of Time to April 9, 2010 for Defendant United Western Bank to Respond to the Second Amended Complaint re 287 Stipulation. Signed by Judge James Ware on 3/24/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2010)
March 16, 2010 275 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 270 Motion to Withdraw as Counsel filed by Jorden Burt, LLP. Attorney Bryan Thomas West terminated. Signed by Judge James Ware on 3/16/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2010)
February 4, 2010 265 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; SETTING HEARING ON MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF WAVE II SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT re 261 Case Management Statement. The Case Management Conference set for 2/8/2010 is VACATED. The Court sets a Hearing on Preliminary Approval of Wave II Settlement Agreement for for 5/10/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. The parties shall notice their motion in accordance with the Civil Local Rules of the Court. Signed by Judge James Ware on 2/3/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2010)
January 27, 2010 259 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER DENYING REQUEST to Change the Hearing Date for the Cordell Defendants' Motion to Dismiss re 257 Proposed Order. The hearing remains on calendar for 2/8/2010 as previously scheduled. Signed by Judge James Ware on 1/27/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2010)
January 25, 2010 252 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT Continuing Motion to Dismiss Hearing from 2/9/2010 to 3/22/2010 re 247 Stipulation. Set/Reset Deadlines as to 191 MOTION to Dismiss. Replies due by 3/8/2010. Motion Hearing set for 3/22/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge James Ware on 1/25/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2010)
January 11, 2010 221 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER to Move Hearing Date from 2/8/2010 to 3/22/2010 for 176 Boulder Defendants' Motion to Dismiss re 219 Stipulation and [Proposed] Order. Set/Reset Deadlines as to 176 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction: Motion Hearing set for 3/22/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge James Ware on 1/11/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2010)
December 18, 2009 208 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING Request to Excuse Defendants Bank Of America, N.A. and Countrywide, FSB From Responding To Amended Complaint re 205 Stipulation. Signed by Judge James Ware on 12/18/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2009)
October 27, 2009 171 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER Granting Extension of Time For Defendants To Respond To Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint re 163 Stipulation. Deadline for Bank of America Corporation, Countrywide Bank, FSB to respond by 12/15/2009. Signed by Judge James Ware on 10/27/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2009)
October 2, 2009 151 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending Time for Defendants Kutak Rock, LLP and Joseph O. Kavan to Respond to the Amended Complaint by 12/1/2009 re 126 Stipulation. Signed by Judge James Ware on 10/2/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2009)
September 24, 2009 112 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING THE PARTIES TO SET UP TELEPHONIC CONFERENCE LINE FOR HEARING. On or before 10/1/2009, the parties shall contact Ms. Elizabeth Garcia, Courtroom Deputy for Judge James Ware to provide her with the call in number and an email list of all those who will be making appearances by telephone. Signed by Judge James Ware on 9/24/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2009)
September 14, 2009 99 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending the Time for Defendant to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint re 98 Stipulation. Deadline for Citibank, N.A. to respond by 10/2/2009. Signed by Judge James Ware on 9/14/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2009)
August 18, 2009 92 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting re 81 MOTION for Leave to Appear in Pro Hac Vice ; Vacating, 91 Order Denying on Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Lawrence A. Kellogg. Signed by Judge James Ware on 8/18/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2009)
August 14, 2009 90 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER Granting Extension of Time for Defendants to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint. Deadline for Defendants' Cordell Consultants Inc. Money Purchase Plan, Cordell Consultants New York, LLC, Cordell Funding LLLP, Robin Rodriguez, Cordell Consultants Money Purchase Plan to respond by 10/2/2009 re 88 Stipulation. Signed by Judge James Ware on 8/14/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2009)
July 31, 2009 80 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER Granting Extension of time for Defendants Foley & Lardner LLP and Stephen I. Burr's to respond to Amended Complaint re 78 Stipulation. Deadline for Foley & Lardner, LLP, Stephen I Burr to respond by 10/2/2009. Signed by Judge James Ware on 7/31/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2009)
May 26, 2009 31 Opinion or Order of the Court RELATED CASE ORDER. Joint Case Management Conference statement due 6/12/2009 Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/22/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. James Ware. Create association to 5:07-cv-02795-JW. Signed by Judge James Ware on 5/26/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2009)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hunter et al v. Citibank, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anita Hunter
Represented By: Anthony Robert Zelle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnna Bozza
Represented By: Anthony Robert Zelle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Celltex Site Services, LTD
Represented By: Anthony Robert Zelle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Grande Investment LLC
Represented By: Anthony Robert Zelle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Quirk Infiniti, Inc.
Represented By: Anthony Robert Zelle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Whitton Michael
Represented By: Anthony Robert Zelle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citibank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Countrywide Bank, FSB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Western Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boulder Capital, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boulder Columbus, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boulder West Oaks, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boulder Holdings, VI, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roy S. McDowell, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cordell Funding LLLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cordell Consultants, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cordell Money Purchase Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robin Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jorden Burt, LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kutak Rock, LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph O. Kavan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foley & Lardner, LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen I Burr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Silicon Valley Law Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?