Leier v. San Benito County et al
Plaintiff: Gayle Leier
Defendant: San Benito County, Jennifer Cress and Tracey Belton
Case Number: 5:2009cv02240
Filed: May 20, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: San Benito
Presiding Judge: Patricia V. Trumbull
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 39 FIRST AMENDED ORDER Granting Petition for Approval of Minors' Compromise of Disputed Claims for Minors J.L. and D.L. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on 11/12/09. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 11/12/2009)
September 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER re 9 & 28 Granting Petition for Approval of Minors' Compromise of Disputed Claim for Minors J.L. and D.L. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on 9/3/09. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 9/3/2009)
September 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER re 21 Granting in Part Request to Seal Documents. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on 9/2/09. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 9/2/2009)
July 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Soliciting Further Declarations in Support of Ex Parte Petition for Approval of Minors' Compromise of Claims. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on 7/17/09. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 7/17/2009)
July 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Clarifying July 6, 2009 Order and Setting Deadline for Plaintiffs to Submit Correct Document. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on 7/8/09. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 7/8/2009)
June 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER re 9 Scheduling Further Briefing and Hearing on Ex Parte Petition for Approval of Minors' Compromise of Claims. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on 6/18/09. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 6/18/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Leier v. San Benito County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gayle Leier
Represented By: Robert Ross Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Benito County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Cress
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tracey Belton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?